Hand tool structure

Patent Application United States Patent and Trademark Office, Patent Application No. 10879070
Examiner Hadi Shakeri, presiding
Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Examiner Hadi Shakeri
Update UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert AlertsSpaceJump Jump
Summary

No one has written a summary of this case yet. Sign up or sign in to contribute one.

Parties
No Logo Hu, Ming, Applicant

Represented by Rosenberg Klein and Lee

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space David Klein +1 212 338 3636
Space Jun Lee +1 410 465 6678
Space Morton Rosenberg +1 410 465 6678
Space Harry Sernaker +1 202 570 1016
Space David Wood +1 301 424 3640
Attributes
Patent Type Utility
First Named Inventor Hu, Ming, Tainan Hsien (TW)
Filing Date June 30, 2004
Status Abandoned -- Failure to Respond to an Office Action
Status Date Unknown
Location Electronic
USPTO Customer Number Unknown
Attorney Docket Number MR1111-1265
Confirmation Number 8078
Group Art Unit 3723
Class / Sub-Class 81 / 489
Timeline
  Entries (26) Tab Overlap Assignments (3) Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank  Filed: 6/7/2006, Entered: None Transaction History
Mail Abandonment for Failure to Respond to Office Action
LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 6/7/2006, Entered: None Prosecution - ABN
Abandonment (2 Pages)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Blank  Filed: 5/30/2006, Entered: None Transaction History
Aband. for Failure to Respond to O. A.
LREF
Blank  Filed: 9/20/2005, Entered: None Transaction History
Mail Non-Final Rejection
LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 9/20/2005, Entered: None Prosecution - FWCLM
Index of Claims (1 Page)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 9/20/2005, Entered: None Prosecution - SRFW
Search information including classification, databases and other search related notes (1 Page)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 9/20/2005, Entered: None Prosecution - 892
List of references cited by examiner (1 Page)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 9/20/2005, Entered: None Prosecution - CTNF
Non-Final Rejection (4 Pages)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Blank  Filed: 9/16/2005, Entered: None Transaction History
Non-Final Rejection
LREF
Blank  Filed: 11/24/2004, Entered: None Transaction History
IFW TSS Processing by Tech Center Complete
LREF
Blank  Filed: 11/24/2004, Entered: None Transaction History
Case Docketed to Examiner in GAU
LREF
Blank  Filed: 8/19/2004, Entered: None Transaction History
Application Is Now Complete
LREF
Blank  Filed: 8/18/2004, Entered: None Transaction History
Application Return from OIPE
LREF
Blank  Filed: 8/18/2004, Entered: None Transaction History
Application Return TO OIPE
LREF
Blank  Filed: 8/18/2004, Entered: None Transaction History
Application Dispatched from OIPE
LREF
Blank  Filed: 8/11/2004, Entered: None Transaction History
Cleared by OIPE CSR
LREF
Blank  Filed: 7/27/2004, Entered: None Transaction History
IFW Scan & PACR Auto Security Review
LREF
Blank  Filed: 6/30/2004, Entered: None Transaction History
Initial Exam Team nn
LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 6/30/2004, Entered: None Prosecution - WFEE
Fee Worksheet (SB06) (1 Page)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 6/30/2004, Entered: None Prosecution - WFEE
Fee Worksheet (SB06) (1 Page)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 6/30/2004, Entered: None Prosecution - OATH
Oath or Declaration filed (1 Page)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 6/30/2004, Entered: None Prosecution - DRW
Drawings-only black and white line drawings (4 Pages)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 6/30/2004, Entered: None Prosecution - ABST
Abstract (1 Page)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 6/30/2004, Entered: None Prosecution - CLM
Claims (1 Page)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 6/30/2004, Entered: None Prosecution - SPEC
Specification (4 Pages)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 6/30/2004, Entered: None Prosecution - TRNA
Transmittal of New Application (2 Pages)
Request RequestSpace LREF

Statistics

This case has been viewed 2 times.

Space
Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
 
PlainSite
Sign Up
Need Password Help?