Catalog management module in a custom product configuration system

Patent Application United States Patent and Trademark Office, Patent Application No. 10888070
Examiner Nirav K Khakhar, presiding
Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Examiner Nirav K Khakhar
Update UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert AlertsSpaceJump Jump
Summary

No one has written a summary of this case yet. Sign up or sign in to contribute one.

Parties
No Logo Chad Christenson, North Mankato, MN, Applicant

Represented by Hershikovitz & Associates

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Brian Berman +1 301 412 6500
Space Brian Hearn +1 540 899 6218
Space ABRAHAM HERSHKOVITZ +1 703 370 4800
Space Jae Youn Kim +1 703 546 8554
Space Leila Naghibi +1 703 370 4800
Space Dinh Nguyen +1 703 370 4800
Space Harold L. Novick docket@nkllaw.com
Space EUGENE RZUCIDLO +1 703 370 4800
Space JOSEPH A. SCCARETTRA, JR +1 703 413 3000
Attributes
Patent Type Utility
First Named Inventor Chad Christenson, North Mankato, MN, ()
Filing Date July 9, 2004
Status Abandoned -- Failure to Respond to an Office Action
Status Date Unknown
Location Electronic
USPTO Customer Number Unknown
Attorney Docket Number P65335
Confirmation Number 1385
Group Art Unit 2167
Class / Sub-Class 707 / 104
Timeline
  Entries (205) Tab Overlap Assignments (5) Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank  Filed: 6/3/2011, Entered: None Transaction History
Email Notification
LREF
Blank  Filed: 6/3/2011, Entered: None Transaction History
Mail Abandonment for Failure to Respond to Office Action
LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 6/3/2011, Entered: None Prosecution - ABN
Abandonment (1 Page)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 6/3/2011, Entered: None Prosecution - EXIN
Examiner Interview Summary Record (PTOL - 413) (2 Pages)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Blank  Filed: 5/26/2011, Entered: None Transaction History
Aband. for Failure to Respond to O. A.
LREF
Blank  Filed: 5/6/2011, Entered: None Transaction History
Request for Extension of Time - Granted
LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 5/6/2011, Entered: None Prosecution - N417
EFS Acknowledgment Receipt (2 Pages)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 5/6/2011, Entered: None Prosecution - WFEE
Fee Worksheet (SB06) (2 Pages)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 5/6/2011, Entered: None Prosecution - LET.
Miscellaneous Incoming Letter (1 Page)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 5/6/2011, Entered: None Prosecution - XT/
Extension of Time (1 Page)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Blank  Filed: 2/8/2011, Entered: None Transaction History
Email Notification
LREF
Blank  Filed: 2/8/2011, Entered: None Transaction History
Mail Advisory Action (PTOL - 303)
LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 2/8/2011, Entered: None Prosecution - CTAV
Advisory Action (PTOL-303) (3 Pages)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Blank  Filed: 2/3/2011, Entered: None Transaction History
Advisory Action (PTOL-303)
LREF
Blank  Filed: 1/27/2011, Entered: None Transaction History
Date Forwarded to Examiner
LREF
Blank  Filed: 1/18/2011, Entered: None Transaction History
Amendment after Final Rejection
LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 1/18/2011, Entered: None Prosecution - WFEE
Fee Worksheet (SB06) (1 Page)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 1/18/2011, Entered: None Prosecution - TRAN.LET
Transmittal Letter (1 Page)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 1/18/2011, Entered: None Prosecution - N417
EFS Acknowledgment Receipt (2 Pages)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 1/18/2011, Entered: None Prosecution - REM
Applicant Arguments/Remarks Made in an Amendment (16 Pages)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 1/18/2011, Entered: None Prosecution - CLM
Claims (5 Pages)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 1/18/2011, Entered: None Prosecution - A.NE
Amendment After Final (1 Page)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Blank  Filed: 11/15/2010, Entered: None Transaction History
Electronic Review
LREF
Blank  Filed: 11/15/2010, Entered: None Transaction History
Email Notification
LREF
Blank  Filed: 11/15/2010, Entered: None Transaction History
Mail Final Rejection (PTOL - 326)
LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 11/15/2010, Entered: None Prosecution - SRFW
Search information including classification, databases and other search related notes (1 Page)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 11/15/2010, Entered: None Prosecution - FWCLM
Index of Claims (1 Page)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 11/15/2010, Entered: None 1 - SRNT
Examiner's search strategy and results (2 Pages)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 11/15/2010, Entered: None Prosecution - CTFR
Final Rejection (22 Pages)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Blank  Filed: 11/8/2010, Entered: None Transaction History
Final Rejection
LREF
Blank  Filed: 9/2/2010, Entered: None Transaction History
Date Forwarded to Examiner
LREF
Blank  Filed: 8/27/2010, Entered: None Transaction History
Response after Non-Final Action
LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 8/27/2010, Entered: None Prosecution - WFEE
Fee Worksheet (SB06) (1 Page)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 8/27/2010, Entered: None Prosecution - TRAN.LET
Transmittal Letter (1 Page)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 8/27/2010, Entered: None Prosecution - N417
EFS Acknowledgment Receipt (2 Pages)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 8/27/2010, Entered: None Prosecution - REM
Applicant Arguments/Remarks Made in an Amendment (10 Pages)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 8/27/2010, Entered: None Prosecution - CLM
Claims (8 Pages)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 8/27/2010, Entered: None Prosecution - A...
Amendment/Req. Reconsideration-After Non-Final Reject (1 Page)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Blank  Filed: 5/27/2010, Entered: None Transaction History
Electronic Review
LREF
Blank  Filed: 5/27/2010, Entered: None Transaction History
Email Notification
LREF
Blank  Filed: 5/27/2010, Entered: None Transaction History
Mail Non-Final Rejection
LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 5/27/2010, Entered: None 1 - SRNT
Examiner's search strategy and results (3 Pages)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 5/27/2010, Entered: None Prosecution - SRFW
Search information including classification, databases and other search related notes (1 Page)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 5/27/2010, Entered: None Prosecution - FWCLM
Index of Claims (1 Page)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 5/27/2010, Entered: None Prosecution - 892
List of references cited by examiner (1 Page)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 5/27/2010, Entered: None Prosecution - CTNF
Non-Final Rejection (19 Pages)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Blank  Filed: 5/24/2010, Entered: None Transaction History
Non-Final Rejection
LREF
Blank  Filed: 1/17/2010, Entered: None Transaction History
Date Forwarded to Examiner
LREF
Blank  Filed: 11/27/2009, Entered: None Transaction History
Response after Non-Final Action
LREF
Blank  Filed: 11/27/2009, Entered: None Transaction History
Request for Extension of Time - Granted
LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 11/27/2009, Entered: None Prosecution - WFEE
Fee Worksheet (SB06) (1 Page)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 11/27/2009, Entered: None Prosecution - XT/
Extension of Time (2 Pages)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 11/27/2009, Entered: None Prosecution - TRAN.LET
Transmittal Letter (1 Page)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 11/27/2009, Entered: None Prosecution - N417
EFS Acknowledgment Receipt (2 Pages)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 11/27/2009, Entered: None Prosecution - WFEE
Fee Worksheet (SB06) (2 Pages)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 11/27/2009, Entered: None Prosecution - REM
Applicant Arguments/Remarks Made in an Amendment (11 Pages)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 11/27/2009, Entered: None Prosecution - CLM
Claims (8 Pages)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 11/27/2009, Entered: None Prosecution - A...
Amendment/Req. Reconsideration-After Non-Final Reject (1 Page)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Blank  Filed: 6/26/2009, Entered: None Transaction History
Electronic Review
LREF
Blank  Filed: 6/26/2009, Entered: None Transaction History
Email Notification
LREF
Blank  Filed: 6/26/2009, Entered: None Transaction History
Mail Non-Final Rejection
LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 6/26/2009, Entered: None 1 - SRNT
Examiner's search strategy and results (3 Pages)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 6/26/2009, Entered: None Prosecution - SRFW
Search information including classification, databases and other search related notes (1 Page)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 6/26/2009, Entered: None Prosecution - FWCLM
Index of Claims (1 Page)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 6/26/2009, Entered: None Prior Art - 892
List of references cited by examiner (1 Page)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 6/26/2009, Entered: None Prosecution - CTNF
Non-Final Rejection (19 Pages)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Blank  Filed: 6/22/2009, Entered: None Transaction History
Non-Final Rejection
LREF
Blank  Filed: 4/15/2009, Entered: None Transaction History
Date Forwarded to Examiner
LREF
Blank  Filed: 4/15/2009, Entered: None Transaction History
Date Forwarded to Examiner
LREF
Blank  Filed: 4/15/2009, Entered: None Transaction History
Request for Continued Examination (RCE)
LREF
Blank  Filed: 4/15/2009, Entered: None Transaction History
Disposal for a RCE / CPA / R129
LREF
Blank  Filed: 4/15/2009, Entered: None Transaction History
Workflow - Request for RCE - Begin
LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 4/15/2009, Entered: None Prosecution - TRAN.LET
Transmittal Letter (1 Page)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 4/15/2009, Entered: None Prosecution - N417
EFS Acknowledgment Receipt (2 Pages)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 4/15/2009, Entered: None Prosecution - WFEE
Fee Worksheet (SB06) (2 Pages)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 4/15/2009, Entered: None Prosecution - RCEX
Request for Continued Examination (RCE) (1 Page)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Blank  Filed: 3/10/2009, Entered: None Transaction History
Email Notification
LREF
Blank  Filed: 3/10/2009, Entered: None Transaction History
Mail Advisory Action (PTOL - 303)
LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 3/10/2009, Entered: None Prosecution - CTAV
Advisory Action (PTOL-303) (3 Pages)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Blank  Filed: 3/5/2009, Entered: None Transaction History
Advisory Action (PTOL-303)
LREF
Blank  Filed: 2/25/2009, Entered: None Transaction History
Date Forwarded to Examiner
LREF
Blank  Filed: 2/24/2009, Entered: None Transaction History
Amendment after Final Rejection
LREF
Blank  Filed: 2/24/2009, Entered: None Transaction History
Request for Extension of Time - Granted
LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 2/24/2009, Entered: None Prosecution - WFEE
Fee Worksheet (SB06) (1 Page)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 2/24/2009, Entered: None Prosecution - XT/
Extension of Time (2 Pages)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 2/24/2009, Entered: None Prosecution - LET.
Miscellaneous Incoming Letter (1 Page)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 2/24/2009, Entered: None Prosecution - N417
EFS Acknowledgment Receipt (2 Pages)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 2/24/2009, Entered: None Prosecution - WFEE
Fee Worksheet (SB06) (2 Pages)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 2/24/2009, Entered: None Prosecution - REM
Applicant Arguments/Remarks Made in an Amendment (12 Pages)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 2/24/2009, Entered: None Prosecution - CLM
Claims (8 Pages)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 2/24/2009, Entered: None Prosecution - AMSB
Amendment Submitted/Entered with Filing of CPA/RCE (1 Page)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Blank  Filed: 10/17/2008, Entered: None Transaction History
Electronic Review
LREF
Blank  Filed: 10/17/2008, Entered: None Transaction History
Email Notification
LREF
Blank  Filed: 10/17/2008, Entered: None Transaction History
Mail Final Rejection (PTOL - 326)
LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 10/17/2008, Entered: None Prosecution - SRFW
Search information including classification, databases and other search related notes (1 Page)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 10/17/2008, Entered: None Prosecution - FWCLM
Index of Claims (1 Page)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 10/17/2008, Entered: None Prosecution - CTFR
Final Rejection (19 Pages)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Blank  Filed: 10/14/2008, Entered: None Transaction History
Final Rejection
LREF
Blank  Filed: 8/8/2008, Entered: None Transaction History
Date Forwarded to Examiner
LREF
Blank  Filed: 7/11/2008, Entered: None Transaction History
Response after Non-Final Action
LREF
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 7/11/2008, Entered: None Prosecution - 136A
Authorization for Extension of Time all replies (1 Page)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 7/11/2008, Entered: None Prosecution - LET.
Miscellaneous Incoming Letter (1 Page)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 7/11/2008, Entered: None Prosecution - N417
EFS Acknowledgment Receipt (2 Pages)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 7/11/2008, Entered: None Prosecution - REM
Applicant Arguments/Remarks Made in an Amendment (5 Pages)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 7/11/2008, Entered: None Prosecution - A...
Amendment/Req. Reconsideration-After Non-Final Reject (2 Pages)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Blank  Filed: 4/24/2008, Entered: None Transaction History
Electronic Review
LREF
Blank  Filed: 4/23/2008, Entered: None Transaction History
Email Notification
LREF
Blank  Filed: 4/23/2008, Entered: None Transaction History
Email Notification
LREF
Blank  Filed: 4/23/2008, Entered: None Transaction History
Mail Examiner Interview Summary (PTOL - 413)
LREF
Blank  Filed: 4/23/2008, Entered: None Transaction History
Mail Non-Final Rejection
LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 4/23/2008, Entered: None Prosecution - SRFW
Search information including classification, databases and other search related notes (1 Page)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 4/23/2008, Entered: None Prosecution - FWCLM
Index of Claims (1 Page)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 4/23/2008, Entered: None Prosecution - CTNF
Non-Final Rejection (1 Page)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 4/23/2008, Entered: None Prior Art - 892
List of references cited by examiner (1 Page)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 4/23/2008, Entered: None Prosecution - CTNF
Non-Final Rejection (18 Pages)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Blank  Filed: 4/16/2008, Entered: None Transaction History
Non-Final Rejection
LREF
Blank  Filed: 4/4/2008, Entered: None Transaction History
Examiner Interview Summary Record (PTOL - 413)
LREF
Blank  Filed: 3/22/2008, Entered: None Transaction History
Email Notification
LREF
Blank  Filed: 3/21/2008, Entered: None Transaction History
Mail Advisory Action (PTOL - 303)
LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 3/21/2008, Entered: None 1 - SRNT
Examiner's search strategy and results (2 Pages)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 3/21/2008, Entered: None Prosecution - CTAV
Advisory Action (PTOL-303) (3 Pages)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Blank  Filed: 3/16/2008, Entered: None Transaction History
Advisory Action (PTOL-303)
LREF
Blank  Filed: 3/11/2008, Entered: None Transaction History
Date Forwarded to Examiner
LREF
Blank  Filed: 3/3/2008, Entered: None Transaction History
Amendment after Final Rejection
LREF
Blank  Filed: 3/3/2008, Entered: None Transaction History
Request for Extension of Time - Granted
LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 3/3/2008, Entered: None Prosecution - WFEE
Fee Worksheet (SB06) (1 Page)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 3/3/2008, Entered: None Prosecution - XT/
Extension of Time (2 Pages)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 3/3/2008, Entered: None Prosecution - LET.
Miscellaneous Incoming Letter (1 Page)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 3/3/2008, Entered: None Prosecution - N417
EFS Acknowledgment Receipt (2 Pages)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 3/3/2008, Entered: None Prosecution - WFEE
Fee Worksheet (SB06) (2 Pages)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 3/3/2008, Entered: None Prosecution - REM
Applicant Arguments/Remarks Made in an Amendment (6 Pages)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 3/3/2008, Entered: None Prosecution - CLM
Claims (10 Pages)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 3/3/2008, Entered: None Prosecution - A.NE
Amendment After Final (2 Pages)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Blank  Filed: 10/17/2007, Entered: None Transaction History
Mail Final Rejection (PTOL - 326)
LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 10/17/2007, Entered: None Prosecution - SRFW
Search information including classification, databases and other search related notes (1 Page)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 10/17/2007, Entered: None Prosecution - FWCLM
Index of Claims (1 Page)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 10/17/2007, Entered: None Prior Art - 892
List of references cited by examiner (1 Page)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 10/17/2007, Entered: None Prosecution - CTFR
Final Rejection (19 Pages)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Blank  Filed: 10/15/2007, Entered: None Transaction History
Final Rejection
LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 10/14/2007, Entered: None 1 - SRNT
Examiner's search strategy and results (2 Pages)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Blank  Filed: 7/18/2007, Entered: None Transaction History
Date Forwarded to Examiner
LREF
Blank  Filed: 7/5/2007, Entered: None Transaction History
Response after Non-Final Action
LREF
Blank  Filed: 7/5/2007, Entered: None Transaction History
Request for Extension of Time - Granted
LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 7/5/2007, Entered: None Prosecution - WFEE
Fee Worksheet (SB06) (1 Page)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 7/5/2007, Entered: None Prosecution - XT/
Extension of Time (2 Pages)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 7/5/2007, Entered: None Prosecution - LET.
Miscellaneous Incoming Letter (1 Page)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 7/5/2007, Entered: None Prosecution - REM
Applicant Arguments/Remarks Made in an Amendment (12 Pages)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 7/5/2007, Entered: None Prosecution - CLM
Claims (10 Pages)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 7/5/2007, Entered: None Prosecution - A...
Amendment/Req. Reconsideration-After Non-Final Reject (2 Pages)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Blank  Filed: 5/23/2007, Entered: None Transaction History
Mail Examiner Interview Summary (PTOL - 413)
LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 5/23/2007, Entered: None Prosecution - BIB
Bibliographic Data Sheet (1 Page)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 5/23/2007, Entered: None Prosecution - EXIN
Examiner Interview Summary Record (PTOL - 413) (3 Pages)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Blank  Filed: 5/16/2007, Entered: None Transaction History
Examiner Interview Summary Record (PTOL - 413)
LREF
Blank  Filed: 4/30/2007, Entered: None Transaction History
Correspondence Address Change
LREF
Blank  Filed: 4/30/2007, Entered: None Transaction History
Change in Power of Attorney (May Include Associate POA)
LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 4/30/2007, Entered: None Prosecution - N570
Communication - Re: Power of Attorney (PTOL-308) (2 Pages)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Blank  Filed: 4/17/2007, Entered: None Transaction History
Statement Filed Indicating a Loss of Entitlement to Small Entity Status
LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 4/17/2007, Entered: None Prosecution - IMIS
Miscellaneous Internal Document (1 Page)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 4/17/2007, Entered: None Prosecution - PA..
Power of Attorney (6 Pages)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 4/17/2007, Entered: None Prosecution - LET.
Miscellaneous Incoming Letter (1 Page)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Blank  Filed: 1/23/2007, Entered: None Transaction History
Case Docketed to Examiner in GAU
LREF
Blank  Filed: 1/11/2007, Entered: None Transaction History
Mail Non-Final Rejection
LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 1/11/2007, Entered: None Prosecution - SRFW
Search information including classification, databases and other search related notes (1 Page)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 1/11/2007, Entered: None Prosecution - FWCLM
Index of Claims (1 Page)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 1/11/2007, Entered: None Prosecution - BIB
Bibliographic Data Sheet (1 Page)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 1/11/2007, Entered: None Prior Art - 892
List of references cited by examiner (1 Page)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 1/11/2007, Entered: None Prosecution - CTNF
Non-Final Rejection (9 Pages)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Blank  Filed: 1/8/2007, Entered: None Transaction History
Non-Final Rejection
LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 1/3/2007, Entered: None 1 - SRNT
Examiner's search strategy and results (2 Pages)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Blank  Filed: 11/28/2006, Entered: None Transaction History
Case Docketed to Examiner in GAU
LREF
Blank  Filed: 6/7/2006, Entered: None Transaction History
Correspondence Address Change
LREF
Blank  Filed: 6/7/2006, Entered: None Transaction History
Change in Power of Attorney (May Include Associate POA)
LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 6/7/2006, Entered: None Prosecution - N570
Communication - Re: Power of Attorney (PTOL-308) (2 Pages)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Blank  Filed: 5/23/2006, Entered: None Transaction History
Correspondence Address Change
LREF
Blank  Filed: 5/23/2006, Entered: None Transaction History
Change in Power of Attorney (May Include Associate POA)
LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 5/23/2006, Entered: None Prosecution - N570
Communication - Re: Power of Attorney (PTOL-308) (2 Pages)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Blank  Filed: 3/22/2006, Entered: None Transaction History
Case Docketed to Examiner in GAU
LREF
Blank  Filed: 3/18/2006, Entered: None Transaction History
IFW TSS Processing by Tech Center Complete
LREF
Blank  Filed: 3/18/2006, Entered: None Transaction History
Case Docketed to Examiner in GAU
LREF
Blank  Filed: 9/26/2005, Entered: None Transaction History
Correspondence Address Change
LREF
Blank  Filed: 9/26/2005, Entered: None Transaction History
Change in Power of Attorney (May Include Associate POA)
LREF
Blank  Filed: 9/26/2005, Entered: None Transaction History
Correspondence Address Change
LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 9/26/2005, Entered: None Prosecution - N570
Communication - Re: Power of Attorney (PTOL-308) (2 Pages)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 9/21/2005, Entered: None Prosecution - PA..
Power of Attorney (2 Pages)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 3/31/2005, Entered: None Prosecution - PA..
Power of Attorney (2 Pages)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Blank  Filed: 3/11/2005, Entered: None Transaction History
Application Return from OIPE
LREF
Blank  Filed: 3/11/2005, Entered: None Transaction History
Application Return TO OIPE
LREF
Blank  Filed: 3/11/2005, Entered: None Transaction History
Application Dispatched from OIPE
LREF
Blank  Filed: 3/11/2005, Entered: None Transaction History
Application Is Now Complete
LREF
Blank  Filed: 2/22/2005, Entered: None Transaction History
Payment of additional filing fee/Preexam
LREF
Blank  Filed: 2/22/2005, Entered: None Transaction History
A statement by one or more inventors satisfying the requirement under 35 USC 115, Oath of the Applic
LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 2/22/2005, Entered: None Prosecution - XT/
Extension of Time (1 Page)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 2/22/2005, Entered: None Prosecution - OATH
Oath or Declaration filed (3 Pages)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 2/22/2005, Entered: None Prosecution - PEFR
Applicant Response to Pre-Exam Formalities Notice (5 Pages)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Blank  Filed: 8/30/2004, Entered: None Transaction History
Notice Mailed--Application Incomplete--Filing Date Assigned
LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 8/30/2004, Entered: None Prosecution - PEFN
Pre-Exam Formalities Notice (2 Pages)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Blank  Filed: 8/24/2004, Entered: None Transaction History
Cleared by OIPE CSR
LREF
Blank  Filed: 8/1/2004, Entered: None Transaction History
IFW Scan & PACR Auto Security Review
LREF
Blank  Filed: 7/9/2004, Entered: None Transaction History
Initial Exam Team nn
LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 7/9/2004, Entered: None Prosecution - WFEE
Fee Worksheet (SB06) (1 Page)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 7/9/2004, Entered: None Prosecution - DRW
Drawings-only black and white line drawings (8 Pages)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 7/9/2004, Entered: None Prosecution - ABST
Abstract (1 Page)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 7/9/2004, Entered: None Prosecution - CLM
Claims (6 Pages)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 7/9/2004, Entered: None Prosecution - SPEC
Specification (16 Pages)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 7/9/2004, Entered: None Prosecution - TRNA
Transmittal of New Application (2 Pages)
Request RequestSpace LREF

Statistics

This case has been viewed 30 times.

Space
Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
 
PlainSite
Sign Up
Need Password Help?