SHOWING ANIMALS RESPECT AND KINDNESS v. UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF INTERIOR et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit District Of Columbia District Court, Case No. 1:09-cv-00877
District Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated September 28, 2016 at 6:21 PM DT (4.8 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo SHOWING ANIMALS RESPECT AND KINDNESS, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Animal Legal Defense Fund

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Carter Dillard +1 707 795 2533 +1 707 795 7280 cdillard@aldf.org

Toggle Switch Represented by Meyer & Glitzenstein

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Howard M. Crystal +1 202 588 5206 +1 202 588 5049 howardcrystal@meyerglitz.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED William Stewart Eubanks, II +1 202 588 5206 +1 202 588 5049 beubanks@meyerglitz.com
v.
United States Department of the Interior United States Department of the Interior, Defendant
Officially listed as "UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF INTERIOR"

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY Judith A. Kidwell +1 202 514 7250 +1 202 307 2304 judith.a.kidwell@usdoj.gov
No Logo UNITED STATES FISH AND WILDLIFE SERVICE, Defendant
Citation Section 05 U.S.C. § 552
Nature of Suit 895 - Freedom of Information Act
  Entries (29) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 29 Filed: 10/26/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
STIPULATION AND ORDER regarding showing animals respect and kindness's claim for attorneys' fees and costs and dismissal of action with prejudice. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on 10/26/10. (dot, ) (Entered: 10/27/2010)
    LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 10/22/2010, Entered: None
    STIPULATION Regarding Attorneys' Fees & Costs and Dismissal of Action by SHOWING ANIMALS RESPECT AND KINDNESS. (Eubanks, II, William) (Entered: 10/22/2010)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 8/24/2010, Entered: None
      Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Motion for Attorneys' Fees and Costs by SHOWING ANIMALS RESPECT AND KINDNESS (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Eubanks, II, William) (Entered: 08/24/2010)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 8/12/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
        MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on August 12, 2010. (lcckk1) (Entered: 08/12/2010)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 8/12/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
          ORDER. For the reasons stated in the accompanying Memorandum Opinion, Defendants' 16 Motion for Summary Judgment Or Alternatively, Motion for Partial Summary Judgment and In Camera Review of Certain Records is GRANTED-IN-PART and DENIED-IN-PART. Defendants' motion is granted except with respect to the three video recordings contained on Disks 6, 8, and 9. Defendants shall disclose these video recordings to Plaintiff after making any redactions necessary to protect the privacy interests of third parties, i.e., persons other than Troy Lee Gentry and Lee Marvin Greenly. Plaintiff's 20 Motion for Summary Judgment is GRANTED-IN-PART with respect to these three video recordings and DENIED-IN-PART in all other respects. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on August 12, 2010. (lcckk1) (Entered: 08/12/2010)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 11/20/2009, Entered: None
            REPLY to opposition to motion re 20 MOTION for Summary Judgment , Supporting Memorandum, Statement of Facts, and Proposed Order filed by SHOWING ANIMALS RESPECT AND KINDNESS. (Attachments: # 1 Attachment 25, # 2 Proposed Order (Revised))(Crystal, Howard) (Entered: 11/20/2009)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 10/30/2009, Entered: None
              Memorandum in opposition to re 20 MOTION for Summary Judgment , Supporting Memorandum, Statement of Facts, and Proposed Order filed by UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF INTERIOR, UNITED STATES FISH AND WILDLIFE SERVICE. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration Supplemental Declaration of Marion Dean, # 2 Exhibit S, # 3 Exhibit T)(Kidwell, Judith) (Entered: 10/30/2009)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 10/30/2009, Entered: None
                REPLY to opposition to motion re 17 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment, 16 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF INTERIOR, UNITED STATES FISH AND WILDLIFE SERVICE. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration Supplemental Declaration of Marion Dean, # 2 Exhibit S, # 3 Exhibit T)(Kidwell, Judith) (Entered: 10/30/2009)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 10/9/2009, Entered: None
                  Memorandum in opposition to re 17 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment filed by SHOWING ANIMALS RESPECT AND KINDNESS. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Crystal, Howard) (Entered: 10/09/2009)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 10/9/2009, Entered: None
                    MOTION for Summary Judgment , Supporting Memorandum, Statement of Facts, and Proposed Order by SHOWING ANIMALS RESPECT AND KINDNESS (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order, # 2 Declaration of Steve Hindi, # 3 Hindi Decl. Att. 1, # 4 Hindi Decl. Att. 2, # 5 Hindi Decl. Att. 3, # 6 Hindi Decl. Att. 4, # 7 Hindi Decl. Att. 5, # 8 Hindi Decl. Att. 6, # 9 Hindi Decl. Att. 7, # 10 Hindi Decl. Att. 8, # 11 Hindi Decl. Att. 9, # 12 Hindi Decl. Att. 10, # 13 Hindi Decl. Att. 11, # 14 Hindi Decl. Att. 12, # 15 Hindi Decl. Att. 13, # 16 Hindi Decl. Att. 14, # 17 Hindi Decl. Att. 15, # 18 Hindi Decl. Att. 16, # 19 Hindi Decl. Att. 17, # 20 Hindi Decl. Att. 18, # 21 Hindi Decl. Att. 19, # 22 Hindi Decl. Att. 20, # 23 Hindi Decl. Att. 21, # 24 Hindi Decl. Att. 22, # 25 Hindi Decl. Att. 23, # 26 Hindi Decl. Att. 24)(Crystal, Howard) (Entered: 10/09/2009)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 9/18/2009, Entered: None
                      Consent MOTION For A Briefing Schedule on Motions For Summary Judgment by SHOWING ANIMALS RESPECT AND KINDNESS (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Crystal, Howard) (Entered: 09/18/2009)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 9/11/2009, Entered: None
                        MOTION for In Camera Review by UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF INTERIOR, UNITED STATES FISH AND WILDLIFE SERVICE. (See Docket Entry 16 or 17 to view document). (znmw, ) (Entered: 09/14/2009)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 9/11/2009, Entered: None
                          MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment Or Alternatively, Motion for Partial Summary Judgment and In Camera Review of Certain Records by UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF INTERIOR, UNITED STATES FISH AND WILDLIFE SERVICE (Kidwell, Judith) Modified relief on 9/14/2009 (znmw, ). (Entered: 09/11/2009)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 9/11/2009, Entered: None
                            MOTION for Summary Judgment by UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF INTERIOR, UNITED STATES FISH AND WILDLIFE SERVICE (Attachments: # 1 Declaration Marion Dean, # 2 Exhibit 1-5, # 3 Supplement Vaughn Index)(Kidwell, Judith) (Entered: 09/11/2009)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 9/4/2009, Entered: None
                              MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Amended Complaint by UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF INTERIOR, UNITED STATES FISH AND WILDLIFE SERVICE (Kidwell, Judith) (Entered: 09/04/2009)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 8/26/2009, Entered: None
                                Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answers or Other Responses to Amended Complaint by UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF INTERIOR, UNITED STATES FISH AND WILDLIFE SERVICE (Kidwell, Judith) (Entered: 08/26/2009)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 8/11/2009, Entered: None
                                  ENTERED IN ERROR.....MOTION for Further Stay by SHOWING ANIMALS RESPECT AND KINDNESS, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF INTERIOR, UNITED STATES FISH AND WILDLIFE SERVICE. (See Docket Entry 8 to view document). (nmw, ) Modified on 9/8/2009 (nmw, ). (Entered: 08/12/2009)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 8/6/2009, Entered: None
                                    Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Other Response by UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF INTERIOR, UNITED STATES FISH AND WILDLIFE SERVICE (Kidwell, Judith) (Entered: 08/06/2009)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 7/17/2009, Entered: None
                                      MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer Or Other Response To Amended Complaint by UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF INTERIOR, UNITED STATES FISH AND WILDLIFE SERVICE (Kidwell, Judith) (Entered: 07/17/2009)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 7/10/2009, Entered: None
                                        SUMMONS Returned Executed by SHOWING ANIMALS RESPECT AND KINDNESS. UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF INTERIOR served on 5/20/2009, answer due 6/19/2009; UNITED STATES FISH AND WILDLIFE SERVICE served on 5/20/2009, answer due 6/19/2009. (nmw, ) (Entered: 07/13/2009)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 7/10/2009, Entered: None
                                          AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE by SHOWING ANIMALS RESPECT AND KINDNESS. (Eubanks, II, William) (Entered: 07/10/2009)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 7/10/2009, Entered: None
                                            NOTICE of Appearance by William Stewart Eubanks, II on behalf of SHOWING ANIMALS RESPECT AND KINDNESS (Eubanks, II, William) (Entered: 07/10/2009)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 6/11/2009, Entered: None
                                              AMENDED COMPLAINT against UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF INTERIOR, UNITED STATES FISH AND WILDLIFE SERVICE filed by SHOWING ANIMALS RESPECT AND KINDNESS.(nmw, ) (Entered: 06/12/2009)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 6/11/2009, Entered: None
                                                NOTICE of Appearance by Howard M. Crystal on behalf of SHOWING ANIMALS RESPECT AND KINDNESS (Crystal, Howard) (Entered: 06/11/2009)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 6/5/2009, Entered: None
                                                  Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer s or Other Responses by UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF INTERIOR, UNITED STATES FISH AND WILDLIFE SERVICE (Kidwell, Judith) (Entered: 06/05/2009)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 6/4/2009, Entered: None
                                                    NOTICE of Appearance by Judith A. Kidwell on behalf of UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF INTERIOR, UNITED STATES FISH AND WILDLIFE SERVICE (Kidwell, Judith) (Entered: 06/04/2009)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 5/13/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                      ORDER Establishing Procedures for Electronic Filing for Cases Assigned to Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly, signed on May 13, 2009. (SM) (Entered: 05/13/2009)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 5/12/2009, Entered: None
                                                        LCvR 7.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by SHOWING ANIMALS RESPECT AND KINDNESS identifying Corporate Parent NONE for SHOWING ANIMALS RESPECT AND KINDNESS. (td, ) (Entered: 05/13/2009)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 5/12/2009, Entered: None
                                                          COMPLAINT against UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF INTERIOR, UNITED STATES FISH AND WILDLIFE SERVICE ( Filing fee $ 350, receipt number 4616020597) filed by SHOWING ANIMALS RESPECT AND KINDNESS. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet)(td, ) (Entered: 05/13/2009)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                            Statistics

                                                            This case has been viewed 110 times.

                                                            No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                            Space
                                                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                             
                                                            PlainSite
                                                            Sign Up
                                                            Need Password Help?