USA v. Danyale L. Simmons
Criminal Case Illinois Northern District Court, Case No. 1:08-cr-00462

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

United States of America United States of America, Plaintiff
Officially listed as "USA"

Represented by United States Department of Justice

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Entity DB

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Probation Department +4085 408 408 5197 Intake_Docket_ILNP@ilnp.uscourts.gov
Space Pretrial Services +4355 435 435 5545 ilnptdb_Court_Action_Notice@ilnpt.uscourts.gov
v.
No Logo Danyale L Simmons, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Michael F. Clancy +1 773 238 6000 mfclancylaw@netscape.net

Note: Criminal cases with multiple defendants may have several records with the same case number: one record for the master file (all defendants), as well as one record per defendant. It can often be difficult to tell which record is which. Other likely matches for this case include:

Office Chicago
Filed 6/26/2008
County Cook
Terminated
Reopened
Other Court Case None
Count 1
Citation Section 18 U.S.C. § 2113A.F
Offense Level 4
Def Custody Status Custody This Court
Flag SCHENKIER
  Entries (22) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document 19 Filed: 7/30/2008, Entered: 8/4/2008 Plea Agreement
PLEA Agreement as to Danyale L Simmons (yap, )
    LREF
    Legal Document 18 Filed: 7/30/2008, Entered: 8/4/2008 Description not available
    MINUTE entry before the Honorable Joan H. Lefkow as to Danyale L Simmons: Change of plea hearing held. Maureen Marin appears for the Government and Michael F. Clancy appears for defendant Danyale Simmons who was also present in court. Defendant enters a voluntary plea of guilty to count one of the indictment in this case. Enter Plea Agreement. Plea of guilty is accepted and defendant is adjudged guilty of count one of the indictment in this case. Trial date of 1/12/09 is stricken. Cause is referred to the Probation Department for preparation of the pre-sentence investigation report. Sentencing is set for 10/24/08 at 9:30 a.m. Mailed notice (yap, )
      LREF
      Legal Document 17 Filed: 7/21/2008, Entered: 7/21/2008 Terminate HearingsCourt Filing
      MINUTE entry before the Honorable Joan H. Lefkow as to Danyale L Simmons:Upon request of the parties, Change of Plea Hearing is set for 7/30/2008 at 11:30 AM. Status hearing of 8/6/2008 is stricken. Counsel must contact Judge Lefkow's Courtroom Deputy at least one day in advance of a change of plea hearing if the plea is not going forward. In addition, a draft copy of the proposed plea agreement should be delivered to the judge's chambers at least one day in advance of the date of the hearing. The ends of justice served by exclusion of time outweigh the best interest of the defendant in a speedy trial, namely: additional time for diligent plea negotiations is needed in order to facilitate defendant's advantages related to acceptance of responsibility. The period beginning 7/21/2008 through 7/30/2008 is excluded pursuant to 18.3161(h)(1)(I). Telephoned and mailed notice (mad, )
        LREF
        Legal Document 16 Filed: 7/2/2008, Entered: 7/2/2008 Order on Motion to Exclude
        MINUTE entry before the Honorable Joan H. Lefkow as to Danyale L Simmons (1); Arraignment held, Renato Mariotti appearing for government, and William Sullivan appearing for defendantDanyale Simmons, who was also present in court. Defendant enters a plea of non-guilty and waives formalreading of the indictment. 16.1 conference to be held by 7/9/2008. Any pretrial motions to be filed by8/6/2008. Status hearing set for 8/6/2008 at 9:30 a.m. Trial is set for 1/12/2009 at 9:30 a.m. Oral motion ofthe Government to exclude time is granted without objection. In the interest of justice, the period beginning7/2/2008 through 8/6/2008 is excluded pursuant to 18.3161(h)(1)(F).Mailed notice (yap, )
          LREF
          Blank -- Filed: 7/2/2008, Entered: 7/2/2008, Terminated: 7/2/2008 Motion to Exclude
          ORAL MOTION by USA to exclude time as to Danyale L Simmons (yap, )
            LREF
            Legal Document 15 Filed: 6/27/2008, Entered: 6/30/2008 notice of arraignment
            NOTICE of Arraignment as to Danyale L Simmons before Honorable Joan H. Lefkow on 7/2/2008 at 10:00 AM. in courtroom 1925. (yap, )
              LREF
              Legal Document 13 Filed: 6/27/2008, Entered: 6/30/2008 Description not available
              MINUTE entry before the Honorable Sidney I. Schenkier as to Danyale L Simmons: Enter Order of detention pursuant to the minute order of 6/17/08 [8]. Mailed notice (yap, )
                LREF
                Legal Document 12 Filed: 6/26/2008, Entered: 6/27/2008 Declaration
                DECLARATION regarding Grand Jury subpoenas pursuant to Local Criminal Rule 1.04(d) by USA as to Danyale L Simmons (yap, )
                  LREF
                  Legal Document 11 Filed: 6/26/2008, Entered: 6/27/2008 Description not available
                  MINUTE entry before the Honorable Arlander Keys as to Danyale L Simmons: No bond set, detained by Magistrate. (yap, )
                    LREF
                    Legal Document 10 Filed: 6/26/2008, Entered: 6/27/2008 designation form
                    DESIGNATION Sheet: FELONY (Category 2). (yap, )
                      LREF
                      Legal Document 9 Filed: 6/26/2008, Entered: 6/27/2008 Indictment
                      INDICTMENT as to Danyale L Simmons (1) count(s) 1 (yap, )
                        LREF
                        Legal Document 14 Filed: 6/25/2008, Entered: 6/30/2008 Order
                        ORDER as to Danyale L Simmons [13] Signed by the Honorable Sidney I. Schenkier on 6/25/08. (yap, )
                          LREF
                          Legal Document 8 Filed: 6/17/2008, Entered: 6/20/2008 order on motion for detention
                          MINUTE entry before the Honorable Sidney I. Schenkier as to Danyale L. Simmons:Detention hearing held. Government's oral motion for detention is granted. Defendant waives preliminaryexamination. The Court enters a finding of probable cause. The defendant is ordered bound to the districtcourt.Mailed notice (yap, )
                            LREF
                            Blank -- Filed: 6/17/2008, Entered: 6/20/2008 motion for detention
                            ORAL MOTION by USA for detention as to Danyale L Simmons (yap, )
                              LREF
                              Legal Document 7 Filed: 6/12/2008, Entered: 6/20/2008 Affidavit
                              FINANCIAL AFFIDAVIT filed by Danyale L Simmons (yap, )
                                LREF
                                Legal Document 6 Filed: 6/12/2008, Entered: 6/20/2008 Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant
                                ATTORNEY Appearance for defendant Danyale L Simmons by Michael F. Clancy (yap, )
                                  LREF
                                  Legal Document 5 Filed: 6/12/2008, Entered: 6/20/2008 Description not available
                                  MINUTE entry before the Honorable Sidney I. Schenkier as to Danyale L Simmons: Initial appearance held. Defendant appears in response to arrest on 6/12/08. Defendant informed of rights. The court finds that the defendant is unable to afford counsel. The court appoints Michael Clancy as counsel for the defendant. Enter Order appointing Michael Clancy as counsel for the defendant. Government moves for detention. Detention hearing is set for 6/17/08 at 12:45 p.m. The defendant will be detained in custody pending detention hearing. Status hearing on preliminary examination set for 6/17/08 at 12:45 p.m. Mailed notice (yap, )
                                    LREF
                                    Blank -- Filed: 6/12/2008, Entered: 6/20/2008 arrest2
                                    ARREST of defendant Danyale L Simmons (yap, )
                                      LREF
                                      Legal Document 4 Filed: 6/10/2008, Entered: 6/20/2008 Order
                                      ORDER as to Danyale L Simmons [3] Signed by the Honorable Sidney I. Schenkier on 6/10/08. (yap, )
                                        LREF
                                        Legal Document 3 Filed: 6/10/2008, Entered: 6/20/2008 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
                                        MINUTE entry before the Honorable Sidney I. Schenkier as to Danyale L. Simmons: Arrest warrant issued as to Danyale Simmons pursuant to complaint. Government's motion to seal complaint, affidavit and arrest warrant [2] is granted. Enter Order to seal complaint, affidavit and arrest warrant for sixty days, or until the execution of arrest warrant. Mailed notice (yap, )
                                          LREF
                                          Legal Document 2 Filed: 6/10/2008, Entered: 6/20/2008 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
                                          MOTION by USA to seal complaint, affidavit, arrest warrant as to Danyale L Simmons (yap, )
                                            LREF
                                            Legal Document 1 Filed: 6/10/2008, Entered: 6/20/2008 ComplaintCourt Filing
                                            COMPLAINT signed by Judge Honorable Sidney I. Schenkier as to Danyale L Simmons (1) (yap, )
                                              LREF

                                              Statistics

                                              This case has been viewed 127 times.

                                              No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                              Space
                                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                               
                                              PlainSite
                                              Sign Up
                                              Need Password Help?