USA v. Hyatt
Criminal Case Illinois Northern District Court, Case No. 1:08-cr-00469

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

United States of America United States of America, Plaintiff
Officially listed as "USA"

Represented by United States Department of Justice

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Entity DB

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Pretrial Services +4355 435 435 5545 ilnptdb_Court_Action_Notice@ilnpt.uscourts.gov
v.
No Logo Jason R. Hyatt, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Leinenweber Baroni & Daffada, LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Thomas More Leinenweber +1 312 663 3003 +1 800 896 2193 thomas@landb.us

Note: Criminal cases with multiple defendants may have several records with the same case number: one record for the master file (all defendants), as well as one record per defendant. It can often be difficult to tell which record is which. Other likely matches for this case include:

Office Chicago
Filed 6/12/2008
County Cook
Terminated
Reopened
Other Court Case None
Count 1-4
Citation Section 18 U.S.C. § 1343.F
Offense Level 4
Count 11
Citation Section 26 U.S.C. § 7201.F
Offense Level 4
Count 5
Citation Section 18 U.S.C. § 1014.F
Offense Level 4
Count 6-7
Citation Section 18 U.S.C. § 1957-3300.F
Offense Level 4
Count 8
Citation Section 26 U.S.C. § 7206A.F
Offense Level 4
Count 9-10
Citation Section 26 U.S.C. § 7203D.F
Offense Level 4
Def Custody Status Released
Flags PROTO, VALDEZ
  Entries (14) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document 14 Filed: 9/5/2008, Entered: 9/5/2008 Notice of Motion
NOTICE of Motion by Thomas More Leinenweber for presentment of motion to modify conditions of release[13] before Honorable Charles P. Kocoras on 9/11/2008 at 09:30 AM. (Leinenweber, Thomas)
    LREF
    Legal Document 13 Filed: 9/5/2008, Entered: 9/5/2008 Motion to Modify Conditions of Release
    MOTION by Jason R. Hyatt to modify conditions of release (Leinenweber, Thomas)
      LREF
      Legal Document 12 Filed: 8/21/2008, Entered: 8/21/2008 Terminate Hearings
      MINUTE entry before the Honorable Charles P. Kocoras:Status hearing held on 8/21/2008. Status hearing set for 9/18/2008 at 9:45 a.m. In the interest of justice, 8/21/2008 to 9/18/2008 is excludable time under 18:3161(h)(8)(A)(B). Mailed notice (sct, )
        LREF
        Legal Document 11 Filed: 6/20/2008, Entered: 6/24/2008 Case Referred to Magistrate JudgeCourt Filing
        EXECUTIVE COMMITTEE ORDER: Case as to Jason R. Hyatt referred to Magistrate Judge Honorable Maria Valdez for any modifications of defendant's bond. (emd, )
          LREF
          Legal Document 7 Filed: 6/20/2008, Entered: 6/20/2008 notice of attorney designation - USA
          ATTORNEY Designation for USA of Kenneth Edward Yeadon (Yeadon, Kenneth)
            LREF
            Legal Document 10 Filed: 6/19/2008, Entered: 6/23/2008 Protective Order
            PROTECTIVE Order as to Jason R. Hyatt Signed by the Honorable Charles P. Kocoras on 6/19/08. (las, )
              LREF
              Legal Document 9 Filed: 6/19/2008, Entered: 6/23/2008 Description not available
              MINUTE entry before the Honorable Charles P. Kocoras as to Jason R. Hyatt: Enter protective order. Mailed notice (las, )
                LREF
                Legal Document 8 Filed: 6/19/2008, Entered: 6/20/2008 ArraignmentCourt Filing
                MINUTE entry before the Honorable Charles P. Kocoras: Arraignment held on 6/19/2008. Defendant enters plea of not guilty to all counts. Rule 16 Conference to be completed by 7/17/2008. Defendant is given to 7/31/2008 to file pretrial motions. Government is given to 8/14/2008 to answer. Status hearing set for 8/21/2008 at 9:30 a.m. The Court enters Order Setting Conditions of Release, and will refer the matter to Magistrate Judge Valdez for any modifications of defendant's bond. In the interest of justice, 6/12/2008 to 8/21/2008 is excludable time under 18:3161(h)(8)(A)(B). Mailed notice (emd, )
                  LREF
                  Legal Document 6 Filed: 6/19/2008, Entered: 6/20/2008 Order Setting Conditions of Release
                  ORDER Setting Conditions of Release as to Jason R. Hyatt (1) $50,000.00 Signed by the Honorable Charles P. Kocoras on 6/19/08. (Redacted image) (emd, )
                    LREF
                    Legal Document 5 Filed: 6/19/2008, Entered: 6/20/2008 Bond
                    OWN Recognizance Bond as to Jason R. Hyatt in amount of $ 50,000.00, (Redacted image) (emd, )
                      LREF
                      Legal Document 2 Filed: 6/16/2008, Entered: 6/16/2008 notice of arraignment
                      NOTICE of Arraignment as to Jason R. Hyatt before Honorable Charles P. Kocoras on 6/19/2008 at 09:30AM. (Redacted image) (emd, )
                        LREF
                        Legal Document 4 Filed: 6/12/2008, Entered: 6/16/2008 designation form
                        DESIGNATION Sheet: FELONY (Category 3). (emd, )
                          LREF
                          Legal Document 3 Filed: 6/12/2008, Entered: 6/16/2008 Description not available
                          MINUTE entry before the Honorable Sidney I. Schenkier: To set preliminary bail at $500,000.00 (Secured). (emd, )
                            LREF
                            Legal Document 1 Filed: 6/12/2008, Entered: 6/13/2008 Indictment
                            INDICTMENT as to Jason R. Hyatt (1) count(s) 1-4, 5, 6-7, 8, 9-10, 11 (Redacted image) (emd, )
                              LREF

                              Statistics

                              This case has been viewed 273 times.

                              No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                              Space
                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                               
                              PlainSite
                              Sign Up
                              Need Password Help?