USA v. Littrice
Criminal Case Illinois Northern District Court, Case No. 1:08-cr-00513

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated September 22, 2016 at 11:10 PM DT (4.8 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

United States of America United States of America, Plaintiff
Officially listed as "USA"

Represented by United States Department of Justice

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Entity DB

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Pretrial Services +4355 435 435 5545 ilnptdb_Court_Action_Notice@ilnpt.uscourts.gov
v.
No Logo LaShawn Littrice, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Jennifer L. Scoliard, Esq.

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space William P. Murphy +1 312 697 0022 defendermurphy@gmail.com

Note: Criminal cases with multiple defendants may have several records with the same case number: one record for the master file (all defendants), as well as one record per defendant. It can often be difficult to tell which record is which. Other likely matches for this case include:

Office Chicago
Filed 6/25/2008
County Cook
Terminated
Reopened
Other Court Case None
Count 1-8
Citation Section 26 U.S.C. § 7206A.F
Offense Level 4
Count 11-16
Citation Section 26 U.S.C. § 7206B.F
Offense Level 4
Count 9-10
Citation Section 26 U.S.C. § 7206C.F
Offense Level 4
Def Custody Status Released
Flag MASON
  Entries (17) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document 17 Filed: 8/27/2008, Entered: 8/27/2008 Description not available
MINUTE entry before the Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer: as to LaShawn Littrice: By agreement, status hearing set for 8/28/2008 is stricken and reset to 10/2/2008 at 9:00. Excludable time to continue pursuant to 18:3161(h)(1)(F). Mailed notice (etv, )
    LREF
    Legal Document 16 Filed: 7/28/2008, Entered: 7/28/2008 order on motion to leave the jurisdiction
    MINUTE entry before the Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer: as to LaShawn Littrice: Defendant's motion for permission to travel [13] granted with respect to Indianapolis travel but denied without prejudice with respect to the trip to Las Vegas. Mailed notice (etv, )
      LREF
      Legal Document 13 Filed: 7/24/2008, Entered: 7/24/2008, Terminated: 7/28/2008 motion to leave the jurisdiction
      MOTION by LaShawn Littrice to leave the jurisdiction (Murphy, William)
        LREF
        Legal Document 12 Filed: 7/24/2008, Entered: 7/24/2008 Notice of Motion
        NOTICE of Motion by William P. Murphy for presentment of before Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on 7/28/2008 at 09:00 AM. (Murphy, William)
          LREF
          Legal Document 11 Filed: 7/22/2008, Entered: 7/22/2008 Notice of Motion
          NOTICE of Motion by Lela Darlene Johnson for presentment of before Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on 7/24/2008 at 08:45 AM. (Johnson, Lela)
            LREF
            Legal Document 15 Filed: 7/21/2008, Entered: 7/24/2008 Order
            ORDER as to LaShawn Littrice for disclosure of tax returns and return information at trial Signed by the Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on 7/21/08.Mailed notice (meg, )
              LREF
              Legal Document 14 Filed: 7/21/2008, Entered: 7/24/2008 Description not available
              MINUTE entry before the Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer as to LaShawn Littrice:It is hereby ordered that the Government may disclose such tax returns and return information of: individuals listed in Attachment A, which tax returns and return information are described as: Forms 1040 Tax Returns for Tax years 2002-2005, at the trial of this case or any related judicial proceeding. No disclosure shall be made to any other person except in accordance with the provisions of 26 U.S.C. 5103(h)(4). Enter Order For Disclosure of Tax Returns and Return Information at Trial. Mailed notice (meg, )
                LREF
                Legal Document 10 Filed: 7/21/2008, Entered: 7/21/2008 miscellaneous remark
                Application for Order to Disclose Tax Returns and Return Information at Trial by USA as to LaShawn Littrice (Attachments: # (1) Attachment A, # (2) Text of Proposed Order)(Johnson, Lela)
                  LREF
                  Legal Document 9 Filed: 7/10/2008, Entered: 7/15/2008 Bond
                  OWN RECOGNIZANCE Bond as to LaShawn Littrice in amount of $ 4,500.00, (REDACTED) (meg, )
                    LREF
                    Legal Document 8 Filed: 7/10/2008, Entered: 7/15/2008 Order Setting Conditions of Release
                    ORDER Setting Conditions of Release as to LaShawn Littrice (1) $4,500.00 (Own Recognizance) Signed by the Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on 7/10/08. (REDACTED)Mailed notice (meg, )
                      LREF
                      Legal Document 7 Filed: 7/10/2008, Entered: 7/15/2008 Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant
                      ATTORNEY Appearance for defendant LaShawn Littrice by William P. Murphy (meg, )
                        LREF
                        Legal Document 6 Filed: 7/10/2008, Entered: 7/11/2008 Arraignment
                        MINUTE entry before the Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer as to LaShawn Litrrice:Arraignment held. Defendant enters plea of not guilty to all counts. 16.1 conference to be held by or on 7/21/2008. Pretrial motions to be filed by or on 8/11/2008. Government's response to be filed by or on 8/18/2008. Status hearing set for 8/28/2008 at 9:00 a.m. Defendant released on $4500 OR Bond. Excludabletime to begin pursuant to 18:3161(h)(1)(F). Mailed notice (meg, )
                          LREF
                          Legal Document 5 Filed: 6/30/2008, Entered: 7/1/2008 Description not available
                          MINUTE entry before the Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer as to LaShawn Littrice: By agreement, arraignment set for 7/3/2008 is stricken and reset to 7/10/2008 at 10:00 p.m. Mailed notice (yap, )
                            LREF
                            Legal Document 4 Filed: 6/26/2008, Entered: 6/26/2008 notice of arraignment
                            NOTICE of Arraignment as to LaShawn Littrice before Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on 7/3/2008 at 10:00 AM. in courtroom 2119. (Redacted Image). (yap, )
                              LREF
                              Legal Document 3 Filed: 6/25/2008, Entered: 6/26/2008 Description not available
                              MINUTE entry before the Honorable Arlander Keys as to LaShawn Littrice: To set preliminary bail at $4,500.00 and that defendant be allowed to sign own recognizance bond. (yap, )
                                LREF
                                Legal Document 2 Filed: 6/25/2008, Entered: 6/26/2008 designation form
                                DESIGNATION Sheet: FELONY (Category 2). (yap, )
                                  LREF
                                  Legal Document 1 Filed: 6/25/2008, Entered: 6/26/2008 Indictment
                                  INDICTMENT as to LaShawn Littrice (1) count(s) 1-8, 9-10, 11-16 (yap, )
                                    LREF

                                    Statistics

                                    This case has been viewed 200 times.

                                    No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                    Space
                                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                     
                                    PlainSite
                                    Sign Up
                                    Need Password Help?