USA v. Smith et al
Criminal Case Illinois Northern District Court, Case No. 1:08-cr-00512

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

United States of America United States of America, Plaintiff
Officially listed as "USA"

Represented by United States Department of Justice

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Entity DB

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Pretrial Services +4355 435 435 5545 ilnptdb_Court_Action_Notice@ilnpt.uscourts.gov
v.
No Logo Aaron T Smith, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Office of Defender Services

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Mary Higgins Judge +1 312 621 8300 mary_judge@fd.org

Note: Criminal cases with multiple defendants may have several records with the same case number: one record for the master file (all defendants), as well as one record per defendant. It can often be difficult to tell which record is which. Other likely matches for this case include:

Office Chicago
Filed 8/21/2008
County Cook
Terminated
Reopened
Other Court Case None
Count 1-2
Citation Section 18 U.S.C. § 2113A.F
Offense Level 4
BANK ROBBERY BY FORCE OR VIOLENCE AND 182 AID AND ABET
Def Custody Status Custody This Court
Flag KEYS
  Entries (19) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document 24 Filed: 8/26/2008, Entered: 8/26/2008 Description not availableCourt Filing
MINUTE entry before the Honorable Arlander Keys as to Aaron T Smith: Arraignment held. Defendant informed of his rights. Defendant waives formal reading of indictment.Defendant enters plea of not guilty to each charge and all counts of the Indictment. Rule 16.1(A) conferenceto be held on or before 09/02/08. Pretrial motions shall be filed on or before 09/12/08. Response to pretrialmotions shall be filed on or before 09/22/08. Status hearing before Judge Bucklo set for 09/19/08 at 10:00a.m. On the governments motion and the defendant not objecting, the court finds that the time until thestatus before the District Judge shall be excluded pursuant to 18 U.S.C. § 3161(h)(1) and U.S. v. Tibboel, 753F.2d 608 (7th Cir. 1985).Mailed notice (yap, )
    LREF
    Legal Document 23 Filed: 8/22/2008, Entered: 8/22/2008 notice of arraignment
    NOTICE of Arraignment as to Aaron T Smith, Michael Charles May before Honorable Arlander Keys on 8/27/2008 at 9:30 A.M. (Redacted image) (las, )
      LREF
      Legal Document 22 Filed: 8/21/2008, Entered: 8/22/2008 Description not available
      MINUTE entry before the Honorable Geraldine Soat Brown as to all defendants: Bond set by magistrate to stand as bond in this instance as to Aaron T. Smith. No bond set, detained by magistrate as to Michael Charles May. (las, )
        LREF
        Legal Document 21 Filed: 8/21/2008, Entered: 8/22/2008 designation form
        DESIGNATION Sheet: FELONY (Category 2). (las, )
          LREF
          Legal Document 20 Filed: 8/21/2008, Entered: 8/22/2008 Indictment
          INDICTMENT as to Aaron T Smith (1) count(s) 1-2, Michael Charles May (2) count(s) 1, 3 (las, )
            LREF
            Legal Document 19 Filed: 7/28/2008, Entered: 8/8/2008 consent to modify conditions of release
            CONSENT to Modify Conditions of Release as to Aaron T Smith Signed by the Honorable Arlander Keys on 7/28/08. (yap, )
              LREF
              Legal Document 15 Filed: 7/22/2008, Entered: 7/22/2008 Order
              ORDER as to Aaron T Smith, Michael Charles May Signed by the Honorable James F. Holderman on 7/22/08.Judicial staff mailed notice (gl, )
                LREF
                Legal Document 14 Filed: 7/22/2008, Entered: 7/22/2008 Order on Motion for Extension of Time
                MINUTE entry before the Honorable James F. Holderman dated 7/22/08:Government's unopposed first Motion for an extension of time [13] to return indictment, from 7/25/08 to and including 8/22/08 is granted as to Aaron T Smith (1), and Michael Charles May (2). Motion terminated. Time is excluded in the interest of justice pursuant to 18:USC3161(h)(8)(A)&(B) from 7/25/08 to and including 8/22/08. Enter Order. Judicial staff mailed notice (gl, )
                  LREF
                  Legal Document 18 Filed: 7/21/2008, Entered: 8/7/2008 Order
                  AGREED ORDER as to Aaron T Smith [16] Signed by the Honorable Arlander Keys on 7/21/08. (yap, )
                    LREF
                    Legal Document 17 Filed: 7/21/2008, Entered: 7/24/2008 miscellaneous remark
                    ATTACHMENT by USA as to Aaron T Smith, Michael Charles May to unopposed first motion [13] to extend time to return indictment (Restricted). (yap, )
                      LREF
                      Legal Document 16 Filed: 7/21/2008, Entered: 7/23/2008 Description not available
                      MINUTE entry before the Honorable Arlander Keys as to Aaron T Smith: Pursuant to the oral motion of the defendant and the Government having no objection, the defendant has permission to leave the Northern District of Illinois on 7/23/08 and returning on 7/28/08, to attend a family reunion in Tennessee. Mr. Smith will be accompanied by this parents on this trip and they will continue as third party custodians. Mailed notice (yap, )
                        LREF
                        Legal Document 13 Filed: 7/21/2008, Entered: 7/21/2008, Terminated: 7/22/2008 Motion for Extension of Time
                        MOTION by USA for extension of time as to Aaron T Smith, Michael Charles May Government's Unopposed First Motion for an Extension of Time to Return Indictment Pursuant to 18 U.S.C. § 3161(h) (Biesenthal, Bethany)
                          LREF
                          Legal Document 12 Filed: 7/11/2008, Entered: 7/14/2008 Order Appointing CounselCourt Filing
                          ORDER Appointing Counsel Mary Higgins Judge for Aaron T Smith. Signed by the Honorable Arlander Keys on 7/11/08. (yap, )
                            LREF
                            Legal Document 7 Filed: 6/26/2008, Entered: 6/27/2008 Bond
                            OWN RECOGNIZANCE Bond as to Aaron T Smith in amount of $ 4,500.00, (Redacted Image). (yap, )
                              LREF
                              Legal Document 6 Filed: 6/26/2008, Entered: 6/27/2008 Order Setting Conditions of Release
                              ORDER Setting Conditions of Release as to Aaron T Smith (1) $4,500.00 OWN RECOGNIZANCE (Redacted Image). Signed by the Honorable Arlander Keys on 6/26/08. (yap, )
                                LREF
                                Legal Document 5 Filed: 6/26/2008, Entered: 6/27/2008 Notice of Attorney Appearance - DefendantCourt Filing
                                ATTORNEY Appearance for defendant Aaron T Smith by Mary Higgins Judge (yap, )
                                  LREF
                                  Legal Document 2 Filed: 6/26/2008, Entered: 6/27/2008 Description not availableCourt Filing
                                  MINUTE entry before the Honorable Arlander Keys as to Aaron T Smith: Initial appearance proceedings held. Defendant appears in response to arrest on 6/25/08. The defendant is informed of his rights. Enter Order appointing Mary Judge as counsel for defendant for these proceedings only. The defendant waives his right to preliminary examination. Enter a finding of probable cause, the defendant is ordered bound to the District Court for further proceedings. Detention hearing held. The defendant is ordered released. Mailed notice (yap, )
                                    LREF
                                    Legal Document 1 Filed: 6/26/2008, Entered: 6/27/2008 ComplaintCourt Filing
                                    COMPLAINT signed by Judge Honorable Arlander Keys as to Aaron T Smith (1), Michael Charles May (2) (yap, )
                                      LREF
                                      Blank -- Filed: 6/25/2008, Entered: 6/27/2008 arrest2
                                      ARREST of defendant Aaron T Smith (yap, )
                                        LREF

                                        Statistics

                                        This case has been viewed 142 times.

                                        No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                        Space
                                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                         
                                        PlainSite
                                        Sign Up
                                        Need Password Help?