United States v. Smith
Criminal Case Illinois Northern District Court, Case No. 1:08-cr-00512

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated January 6, 2019 at 12:26 PM ST (2.5 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

United States of America United States of America, Plaintiff
Officially listed as "USA"

Represented by United States Department of Justice

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Entity DB

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Pretrial Services +4355 435 435 5545 ilnptdb_Court_Action_Notice@ilnpt.uscourts.gov
v.
No Logo Michael Charles May, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space J. Clifford Greene, Jr. +1 312 424 4002 jcliffordgreene@msn.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Office of Defender Services

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Mary Higgins Judge +1 312 621 8300 mary_judge@fd.org

Note: Criminal cases with multiple defendants may have several records with the same case number: one record for the master file (all defendants), as well as one record per defendant. It can often be difficult to tell which record is which. Other likely matches for this case include:

Office Chicago
Filed 8/21/2008
County Cook
Terminated
Reopened
Other Court Case None
Count 1
Citation Section 18 U.S.C. § 2113A.F
Offense Level 4
BANK ROBBERY BY FORCE OR VIOLENCE AND 182 AID AND ABET
Count 3
Citation Section 18 U.S.C. § 2113A.F
Offense Level 4
Def Custody Status Custody This Court
Flag KEYS
  Entries (18) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 63 Filed: 8/17/2016, Entered: None Request To Modify Conditions/Term of Supervision
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document 25 Filed: 8/26/2008, Entered: 8/26/2008 Description not availableCourt Filing
    MINUTE entry before the Honorable Arlander Keys as to Michael Charles May: Arraignment held. Defendant informed of his rights. Defendant waives formal reading of indictment.Defendant enters plea of not guilty to each charge and all counts of the Indictment. Rule 16.1(A) conferenceto be held on or before 09/02/08. Pretrial motions shall be filed on or before 09/12/08. Response to pretrialmotions shall be filed on or before 09/22/08. Status hearing before Judge Bucklo set for 09/19/08 at 10:00a.m. On the government's motion and the defendant not objecting, the court finds that the time until thestatus before the District Judge shall be excluded pursuant to 18 U.S.C. § 3161(h)(1) and U.S. v. Tibboel, 753F.2d 608 (7th Cir. 1985). (X-T). Defendant shall remain in custody pending trial or until further order of theCourt. Defendant May informs the Court that, notwithstanding the order of his own treating physician, themedical personnel at Kankakee County Jail are not allowing him to take his prescriptions and his health issuffering. Defendant May claims he is a diabetic. The medical personnel at Kankakee County Jail aredirected to confer (if they have not already done so) with Defendant May's treating professional regardinghis medical needs.Mailed notice (yap, )
      LREF
      Legal Document 23 Filed: 8/22/2008, Entered: 8/22/2008 notice of arraignment
      NOTICE of Arraignment as to Aaron T Smith, Michael Charles May before Honorable Arlander Keys on 8/27/2008 at 9:30 A.M. (Redacted image) (las, )
        LREF
        Legal Document 22 Filed: 8/21/2008, Entered: 8/22/2008 Description not available
        MINUTE entry before the Honorable Geraldine Soat Brown as to all defendants: Bond set by magistrate to stand as bond in this instance as to Aaron T. Smith. No bond set, detained by magistrate as to Michael Charles May. (las, )
          LREF
          Legal Document 21 Filed: 8/21/2008, Entered: 8/22/2008 designation form
          DESIGNATION Sheet: FELONY (Category 2). (las, )
            LREF
            Legal Document 20 Filed: 8/21/2008, Entered: 8/22/2008 Indictment
            INDICTMENT as to Aaron T Smith (1) count(s) 1-2, Michael Charles May (2) count(s) 1, 3 (las, )
              LREF
              Legal Document 15 Filed: 7/22/2008, Entered: 7/22/2008 Order
              ORDER as to Aaron T Smith, Michael Charles May Signed by the Honorable James F. Holderman on 7/22/08.Judicial staff mailed notice (gl, )
                LREF
                Legal Document 14 Filed: 7/22/2008, Entered: 7/22/2008 Order on Motion for Extension of Time
                MINUTE entry before the Honorable James F. Holderman dated 7/22/08:Government's unopposed first Motion for an extension of time [13] to return indictment, from 7/25/08 to and including 8/22/08 is granted as to Aaron T Smith (1), and Michael Charles May (2). Motion terminated. Time is excluded in the interest of justice pursuant to 18:USC3161(h)(8)(A)&(B) from 7/25/08 to and including 8/22/08. Enter Order. Judicial staff mailed notice (gl, )
                  LREF
                  Legal Document 17 Filed: 7/21/2008, Entered: 7/24/2008 miscellaneous remark
                  ATTACHMENT by USA as to Aaron T Smith, Michael Charles May to unopposed first motion [13] to extend time to return indictment (Restricted). (yap, )
                    LREF
                    Legal Document 13 Filed: 7/21/2008, Entered: 7/21/2008, Terminated: 7/22/2008 Motion for Extension of Time
                    MOTION by USA for extension of time as to Aaron T Smith, Michael Charles May Government's Unopposed First Motion for an Extension of Time to Return Indictment Pursuant to 18 U.S.C. § 3161(h) (Biesenthal, Bethany)
                      LREF
                      Legal Document 11 Filed: 7/11/2008, Entered: 7/14/2008 Order Appointing Counsel
                      ORDER Appointing Counsel J. Clifford Greene, Jr for Michael Charles May. Signed by the Honorable Arlander Keys on 7/11/08. (yap, )
                        LREF
                        Legal Document 10 Filed: 7/7/2008, Entered: 7/10/2008 Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant
                        ATTORNEY Appearance for defendant Michael Charles May by J. Clifford Greene, Jr (yap, )
                          LREF
                          Legal Document 9 Filed: 7/7/2008, Entered: 7/10/2008 Affidavit
                          FINANCIAL AFFIDAVIT filed by Michael Charles May (Redacted Image). (yap, )
                            LREF
                            Legal Document 8 Filed: 7/7/2008, Entered: 7/10/2008 Description not available
                            MINUTE entry before the Honorable Arlander Keys as to Michael Charles May: The defendant waives his right to preliminary examination. Enter a finding of probable cause. The defendant is ordered bond to the District Court for further proceedings. Counsel for defendant informed that court that the defendant suffers from diabetes for which he needs to be able to be active. He states that he is not able to move around at the Kankakee facility at which he is being held. The court is informing the warden of the defendant's concern for informational purposes. The warden may take whatever actions he deems necessary. Mailed notice (yap, )
                              LREF
                              Legal Document 4 Filed: 6/26/2008, Entered: 6/27/2008 Notice of Attorney Appearance - DefendantCourt Filing
                              ATTORNEY Appearance for defendant Michael Charles May by Mary Higgins Judge (yap, )
                                LREF
                                Legal Document 3 Filed: 6/26/2008, Entered: 6/27/2008 Description not availableCourt Filing
                                MINUTE entry before the Honorable Arlander Keys as to Michael Charles May: Initial appearance proceedings held. Defendant appears in response to arrest on 6/25/08. The defendant is informed of his rights. Enter Order appointing Mary Judge as counsel for defendant for these proceedings only. Preliminary examination set for 7/7/08 at 10:30 a.m. The defendant waives his right to a detention hearing without prejudice to his right to address the issue of bond at a later date. The defendant is ordered detained until further order of court. Mailed notice (yap, )
                                  LREF
                                  Legal Document 1 Filed: 6/26/2008, Entered: 6/27/2008 ComplaintCourt Filing
                                  COMPLAINT signed by Judge Honorable Arlander Keys as to Aaron T Smith (1), Michael Charles May (2) (yap, )
                                    LREF
                                    Blank -- Filed: 6/25/2008, Entered: 6/27/2008 arrest2
                                    ARREST of defendant Michael Charles May (yap, )
                                      LREF

                                      Statistics

                                      This case has been viewed 53 times.

                                      No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                      Space
                                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                       
                                      PlainSite
                                      Sign Up
                                      Need Password Help?