USA v. Malukaite
Criminal Case Illinois Northern District Court, Case No. 1:08-cr-00374

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

United States of America United States of America, Plaintiff
Officially listed as "USA"

Represented by United States Department of Justice

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Entity DB

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Pretrial Services +4355 435 435 5545 ilnptdb_Court_Action_Notice@ilnpt.uscourts.gov
v.
No Logo Nader Zeidan, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by ix.netcom.com Law Firm Placeholder

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Michael D. Ettinger +1 708 923 0368 craignor@ix.netcom.com

Note: Criminal cases with multiple defendants may have several records with the same case number: one record for the master file (all defendants), as well as one record per defendant. It can often be difficult to tell which record is which. Other likely matches for this case include:

Office Chicago
Filed 7/8/2008
County Cook
Terminated
Reopened
Other Court Case None
Count 1
Citation Section 18 U.S.C. § 2113A.F
Offense Level 4
BANK ROBBERY BY FORCE OR VIOLENCE; 182 AIDING & ABETTING
Def Custody Status
Flag NOLAN
  Entries (7) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document 41 Filed: 8/21/2008, Entered: 8/22/2008 status hearing
MINUTE entry before the Honorable Samuel Der-Yeghiayan as to all Defendants: Status hearing held and continued to 10/07/08 at 9:30 a.m. In the interest of justice, the Government's oral motion to exclude time through and including 10/07/08 is granted pursuant to 18 U.S.C. 3161(h)(8)(A)(B) without objection. Mailed notice (emd, )
    LREF
    Legal Document 34 Filed: 7/17/2008, Entered: 7/28/2008 Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant
    ATTORNEY Appearance for defendant Nader Zeidan by Michael D. Ettinger (meg, )
      LREF
      Legal Document 30 Filed: 7/17/2008, Entered: 7/21/2008 ArraignmentCourt Filing
      MINUTE entry before the Honorable Nan R. Nolan as to Viktorija Malukaite and Nader Zeidan:Arraignment proceedings held. Defendants informed of their rights. Defendants acknowledge receipt of the Indictment, waive formal reading and both enter pleas of not guilty. Rule 16 conference to be conducted no later than 07/24/08. Pre-trial motions are due by 07/31/08. Response to be filed by 08/07/08. Reply brief is due by 08/14/08. Status hearing before Judge Der-Yeghiayan is set for 08/21/08 at 10:30 a.m. Time is hereby excluded from 07/17/08 to and including 08/21/08 pursuant to 18 USC § 3161 (h)(8)(A)(B). Mailed notice (meg, )
        LREF
        Legal Document 29 Filed: 7/14/2008, Entered: 7/14/2008 notice of arraignment
        NOTICE of Arraignment as to Viktorija Malukaite, Ahmad Ali Ahmad, Nader Zeidan, Rami Jafilan before Honorable Nan R. Nolan on Thursday, 7/17/2008 at 10:00 a.m. (meg, )
          LREF
          Legal Document 28 Filed: 7/8/2008, Entered: 7/10/2008 Description not available
          MINUTE entry before the Honorable Samuel Der-Yeghiayan as to Viktorija Malukaite, et al.: Bond set in 08 CR 374 to stand as bond in this instance as to Viktorija Malukaite. Detention order previously issued in 08 CR 384 to stand as to Ahmad Ali Ahmad. Bond set in 08 CR 414 to stand as bond in this instance as to Nader Zeidan. Detention order previously issued in 08 CR 458 to stand as to Rami Jafilan. (meg, )
            LREF
            Legal Document 27 Filed: 7/8/2008, Entered: 7/10/2008 designation form
            DESIGNATION Sheet: FELONY (Category II). (meg, )
              LREF
              Legal Document 26 Filed: 7/8/2008, Entered: 7/10/2008 Indictment
              INDICTMENT as to Viktorija Malukaite (1) count(s) 1, Ahmad Ali Ahmad (2) count(s) 1, 2, Nader Zeidan (3) count(s) 1, Rami Jafilan (4) count(s) 1, 2 with Forfeiture Allegations (meg, )
                LREF

                Statistics

                This case has been viewed 378 times.

                No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                Space
                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                 
                PlainSite
                Sign Up
                Need Password Help?