United States v. Callerio
Criminal Case Illinois Northern District Court, Case No. 1:08-cr-00545

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated January 6, 2019 at 12:28 PM ST (2.6 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

United States of America United States of America, Plaintiff
Officially listed as "USA"

Represented by United States Department of Justice

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Entity DB

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Pretrial Services +4355 435 435 5545 ilnptdb_Court_Action_Notice@ilnpt.uscourts.gov
v.
No Logo Roberto Callerio, Defendant

Note: Criminal cases with multiple defendants may have several records with the same case number: one record for the master file (all defendants), as well as one record per defendant. It can often be difficult to tell which record is which. Other likely matches for this case include:

Office Chicago
Filed 7/10/2008
County Cook
Terminated
Reopened
Other Court Case None
Count 1-6
Citation Section 26 U.S.C. § 7206A.F
Offense Level 4
Def Custody Status
Flag KEYS
  Entries (13) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 1/13/2016, Entered: None Judgment (Sentencing Order)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 1/5/2016, Entered: None 1 - Sentencing Held
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 9/11/2015, Entered: None Order Setting Conditions of Release
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 9/11/2015, Entered: None Change of Plea Hearing Held
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 9/10/2015, Entered: None Order
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 9/9/2015, Entered: None Order
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 9/8/2015, Entered: None Quash
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document 5 Filed: 7/23/2008, Entered: 7/23/2008 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
                MINUTE entry before the Honorable Jeffrey Cole as to Roberto Callerio (1); Defendant fails to appear for arraignment. The Government's oral motion to place the case on the FugitiveCalendar is granted. Mailed notice (yap, )
                  LREF
                  Blank -- Filed: 7/23/2008, Entered: 7/23/2008, Terminated: 7/23/2008 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
                  ORAL MOTION by Roberto Callerio to place the case on the Fugitive Calendar (yap, )
                    LREF
                    Legal Document 4 Filed: 7/11/2008, Entered: 7/14/2008 Description not availableCourt Filing
                    MINUTE entry before the Honorable Jeffrey Cole as to Roberto Callerio: Arraignment is set for Wednesday, July 23, 2008 at 10:15 a.m. before Magistrate Judge Cole in courtroom 1838. Mailed notice (yap, )
                      LREF
                      Legal Document 3 Filed: 7/10/2008, Entered: 7/11/2008 Description not available
                      MINUTE entry before the Honorable Jeffrey Cole as to Roberto Callerio: To issue bench warrant, the Government will seek to have the defendant detained without bond pursuant to Title 18, United States Code Section 3142. (yap, )
                        LREF
                        Legal Document 2 Filed: 7/10/2008, Entered: 7/11/2008 designation form
                        DESIGNATION Sheet: FELONY (Category 2). (yap, )
                          LREF
                          Legal Document 1 Filed: 7/10/2008, Entered: 7/11/2008 Indictment
                          INDICTMENT as to Roberto Callerio (1) count(s) 1-6 (yap, )
                            LREF

                            Statistics

                            This case has been viewed 644 times.

                            No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                            Space
                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                             
                            PlainSite
                            Sign Up
                            Need Password Help?