USA v. Washington
Criminal Case Illinois Northern District Court, Case No. 1:08-cr-00548

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

United States of America United States of America, Plaintiff
Officially listed as "USA"

Represented by United States Department of Justice

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Entity DB

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Pretrial Services +4355 435 435 5545 ilnptdb_Court_Action_Notice@ilnpt.uscourts.gov
v.
No Logo Vaughn Washington, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Office of Defender Services

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Paul Flynn +1 312 621 8300 paul_flynn@fd.org

Note: Criminal cases with multiple defendants may have several records with the same case number: one record for the master file (all defendants), as well as one record per defendant. It can often be difficult to tell which record is which. Other likely matches for this case include:

Office Chicago
Filed 8/7/2008
County Cook
Terminated
Reopened
Other Court Case None
Count 1
Citation Section 18 U.S.C. § 2113A.F
Offense Level 4
Def Custody Status Custody This Court
Flag COLE
  Entries (13) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document 12 Filed: 8/14/2008, Entered: 8/14/2008 Description not availableCourt Filing
MINUTE entry before the Honorable Michael T. Mason as to Vaughn Washington: Arraignment and plea held on 8/14/08. Defendant waives formal reading of Indictment and enters a plea ofnot guilty to all counts of the Indictment. Rule 16.1(a) Conference to be held by 8/21/008. Pretrial motions tobe filed by 8/28/08. Response to be filed by 9/4/08. Status hearing set before Judge Guzman for 9/10/08 at10:30 a.m. Enter excludable time from 8/14/08 to and including 9/10/08 pursuant to 18 USC § 3161(h)(1)(F). Mailed notice (yap, )
    LREF
    Legal Document 11 Filed: 8/13/2008, Entered: 8/13/2008 Terminate Deadlines
    MINUTE entry before the Honorable Michael T. Mason:Arraignment as to Vaughn Washington set for 8/14/2008 at 03:00 p.m. in courtroom 2214. (rbf, )
      LREF
      Legal Document 10 Filed: 8/11/2008, Entered: 8/11/2008 notice of arraignmentCourt Filing
      NOTICE of Arraignment as to Vaughn Washington before Honorable Michael T. Mason for the Honorable Judge Ronald Guzman on 8/12/2008 at 03:00 PM. in courtroom 1843. (yap, )
        LREF
        Legal Document 9 Filed: 8/7/2008, Entered: 8/8/2008 Description not available
        MINUTE entry before the Honorable Jeffrey Cole as to Vaughn Washington: No bond set, detained by Magistrate. (yap, )
          LREF
          Legal Document 8 Filed: 8/7/2008, Entered: 8/8/2008 designation form
          DESIGNATION Sheet: FELONY (Category 2). (yap, )
            LREF
            Legal Document 7 Filed: 8/7/2008, Entered: 8/8/2008 Indictment
            INDICTMENT as to Vaughn Washington (1) count(s) 1 (yap, )
              LREF
              Legal Document 6 Filed: 7/15/2008, Entered: 7/23/2008 Description not available
              MINUTE entry before the Honorable Jeffrey Cole as to Von Washington: Bond hearing held. Defendant waives detention hearing without prejudice. Defendant ordered detained until further order of court. Preliminary examination hearing held. Enter a finding of probable cause; order defendant bound to the District Court for further proceedings. Mailed notice (yap, )
                LREF
                Legal Document 5 Filed: 7/11/2008, Entered: 7/15/2008 Affidavit
                FINANCIAL AFFIDAVIT filed by Von Washington (Redacted Image). (yap, )
                  LREF
                  Legal Document 4 Filed: 7/11/2008, Entered: 7/15/2008 Order Appointing Counsel
                  ORDER Appointing Counsel Paul Flynn for Von Washington. Signed by the Honorable Jeffrey Cole on 7/11/08. (yap, )
                    LREF
                    Legal Document 3 Filed: 7/11/2008, Entered: 7/15/2008 Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant
                    ATTORNEY Appearance for defendant Von Washington by Paul Flynn (yap, )
                      LREF
                      Legal Document 2 Filed: 7/11/2008, Entered: 7/15/2008 Description not available
                      MINUTE entry before the Honorable Jeffrey Cole as to Von Washington: Initial appearance proceedings held. Defendant Von Washington appears in response to arrest on 7/11/08. Paul Flynn is appointed as counsel for defendant. Defendant informed of the charges against him and the maximum penalty, his right to remain silent, his right to represent himself, his right to hire his own attorney, his right to appointed counsel and his right to a preliminary hearing. Government seeks detention. Bond hearing is set for Tuesday, July 15, 2008 at 2:30 p.m. at which time a preliminary examination hearing shall be set. Defendant shall be detained until further order of court. Mailed notice (yap, )
                        LREF
                        Legal Document 1 Filed: 7/11/2008, Entered: 7/15/2008 ComplaintCourt Filing
                        COMPLAINT signed by Judge Honorable Jeffrey Cole as to Von Washington (1) (yap, )
                          LREF
                          Blank -- Filed: 7/11/2008, Entered: 7/15/2008 arrest2
                          ARREST of defendant Von Washington (yap, )
                            LREF

                            Statistics

                            This case has been viewed 67 times.

                            No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                            Space
                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                             
                            PlainSite
                            Sign Up
                            Need Password Help?