United States v. Staadt
Criminal Case Illinois Northern District Court, Case No. 1:08-cr-00560

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated January 6, 2019 at 12:29 PM ST (2.6 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

United States of America United States of America, Plaintiff
Officially listed as "USA"

Represented by United States Department of Justice

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Entity DB

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Pretrial Services +4355 435 435 5545 ilnptdb_Court_Action_Notice@ilnpt.uscourts.gov
v.
No Logo Michael Staadt, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Durkin and Roberts

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Thomas Anthony Durkin +1 312 981 0123 +1 312 913 9235 tdurkin@durkinroberts.com
Space Janis D. Roberts +1 312 981 0125 jdroberts@durkinroberts.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Office of Defender Services

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Daniel George Martin +1 312 621 8300 daniel_martin@fd.org

Note: Criminal cases with multiple defendants may have several records with the same case number: one record for the master file (all defendants), as well as one record per defendant. It can often be difficult to tell which record is which. Other likely matches for this case include:

Office Chicago
Filed 8/6/2008
County Cook
Terminated
Reopened
Other Court Case None
Count 1-3
Citation Section 18 U.S.C. § 2113A.F
Offense Level 4
Def Custody Status Released
Flag DENLOW
  Entries (24) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document 21 Filed: 9/3/2008, Entered: 9/3/2008 Terminate Hearings
MINUTE entry before the Honorable Morton Denlow: Status hearing set for 9/4/08 is stricken on request of Defendant's counsel. Mailed notice (dmk, )
    LREF
    Legal Document 20 Filed: 8/20/2008, Entered: 8/25/2008 Case Referred to Magistrate JudgeCourt Filing
    EXECUTIVE COMMITTEE ORDER: Case as to Michael Staadt referred to Magistrate Judge Morton Denlow to hear and enters orders on bail review/reconsideration of detention.(emd, )
      LREF
      Legal Document 19 Filed: 8/20/2008, Entered: 8/21/2008 ArraignmentCourt Filing
      MINUTE entry before the Honorable Samuel Der-Yeghiayan: Arraignment held. Defendant pleads not guilty to each charge of each count of the Indictment. Rule 16.1 conference to be held by 08/27/08. Pretrial motions to be filed by 10/03/08. Status hearing set for 10/15/08 at 9:00a.m. to set a date for responses to pretrial motions. In the interest of justice, the Government's oral motion to exclude time through and including 10/15/08 is granted pursuant to 18 U.S.C. 3161(h)(8)(A)(B) without objection. Conditions of release previously set by the Magistrate Judge are to stand. Mailed notice (emd, )
        LREF
        Legal Document 18 Filed: 8/8/2008, Entered: 8/8/2008 Description not available
        MINUTE entry before the Honorable Samuel Der-Yeghiayan as to Defendant Michael Staadt: Defendant's request to continue arraignment and plea is granted without objection. Arraignment and plea reset to 08/20/08 at 9:30 a.m. Arraignment and Plea set for 08/13/08 is stricken. Mailed notice (mw, )
          LREF
          Legal Document 17 Filed: 8/8/2008, Entered: 8/8/2008 notice of arraignment
          NOTICE of Arraignment as to Michael Staadt before Honorable Samuel Der-Yeghiayan on 8/13/2008 at 09:30 AM. (emd, )
            LREF
            Legal Document 16 Filed: 8/6/2008, Entered: 8/8/2008 Description not available
            MINUTE entry before the Honorable Jeffrey Cole: No bond set, detained by magistrate. (emd, ) Modified on 8/8/2008 (emd, ).
              LREF
              Legal Document 15 Filed: 8/6/2008, Entered: 8/8/2008 designation form
              DESIGNATION Sheet: FELONY (Category 2). (emd, )
                LREF
                Legal Document 14 Filed: 8/6/2008, Entered: 8/8/2008 Indictment
                INDICTMENT as to Michael Staadt (1) count(s) 1-3 (Redacted image) (emd, )
                  LREF
                  Blank -- Filed: 8/6/2008, Entered: 8/8/2008 Add and Terminate Judges
                  Judge update in case as to Michael Staadt. Judge Honorable Samuel Der-Yeghiayan added. (emd, )
                    LREF
                    Blank -- Filed: 8/6/2008, Entered: 8/8/2008 Add and Terminate Judges
                    Judge update in case as to Michael Staadt. Judge Honorable Ronald A. Guzman added. Judge Honorable Morton Denlow no longer assigned to case. (Judge assigned was entered in error) Modified on 8/8/2008 (emd, ).
                      LREF
                      Legal Document 13 Filed: 8/5/2008, Entered: 8/7/2008 Detention Hearing
                      MINUTE entry before the Honorable Morton Denlow: Defendant waives his right to a preliminary examination hearing. Defendant ordered bound to the District Court for further proceedings. Detention hearing held. Defendant is released on a $4500.00 own recognizance bond. The court orders the defendant to report to the Gateway Foundation's in-patient program until further order of Court. The court orders that the defendant is to be released from custody on 8/7/08, in the morning, to his brother, Matthew Staadt, who will transfer the defendant to the custody of The Gateway Foundation Facility. Upon the defendant's release, the court orders McHenry County to provide defendant with at least a 2-day supply of the medication that he was receiving during his stay. (Halidol, Rimron, Centrograde and/or any medication prescribe during his stay). Status hearing set for 9/4/08 at 2:00pm. Mailed notice (emd, )
                        LREF
                        Legal Document 12 Filed: 8/5/2008, Entered: 8/6/2008 Bond
                        OWN Recognizance Bond as to Michael Staadt in amount of $ 4500.00. (emd, )
                          LREF
                          Legal Document 11 Filed: 8/5/2008, Entered: 8/6/2008 Order Setting Conditions of Release
                          ORDER Setting Conditions of Release as to Michael Staadt (1) $4500.00 Signed by the Honorable Morton Denlow on 8/5/08. (Redacted image) (emd, )
                            LREF
                            Legal Document 10 Filed: 7/31/2008, Entered: 7/31/2008 Detention Hearing
                            MINUTE entry before the Honorable Morton Denlow:Detention hearing as to Michael Staadt held on 7/31/2008. Detention Hearing continued to 8/5/2008 at 10:15 AM. Mailed notice (dmk, )
                              LREF
                              Legal Document 9 Filed: 7/29/2008, Entered: 7/30/2008 Detention Hearing
                              MINUTE entry before the Honorable Morton Denlow as to Michael Staadt: Detention hearing held and continued to 7/31/08 at 1:45 p.m. The Marshal are directed to have defendant receive medical attention prior to 7/31/08. Mailed notice (las, )
                                LREF
                                Legal Document 8 Filed: 7/23/2008, Entered: 7/28/2008 Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant
                                ATTORNEY Appearance for defendant Michael Staadt by Thomas Anthony Durkin (las, )
                                  LREF
                                  Legal Document 7 Filed: 7/23/2008, Entered: 7/28/2008 Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant
                                  ATTORNEY Appearance for defendant Michael Staadt by Janis D. Roberts (las, )
                                    LREF
                                    Legal Document 6 Filed: 7/23/2008, Entered: 7/24/2008 Set/Reset Hearings
                                    MINUTE entry before the Honorable Morton Denlow: Oral motion of Daniel Martin to withdraw as counsel for the defendant is granted. Thomas Durkin and Janice Roberts are granted leave to file their appearance as counsel for the defendant. Defendant to remain in custody pending preliminary examination and detention hearing set for 7/29/08 at 1:30pm. Based on the pretrial service report and the representations of defense counsel, the Court request that the Marshals have a psychiatrist examine the defendant. Mailed notice (emd, )
                                      LREF
                                      Legal Document 5 Filed: 7/22/2008, Entered: 7/22/2008 Terminate Hearings
                                      MINUTE entry before the Honorable Morton Denlow as to Michael Staadt:Detention Hearing and Preliminary Examination is reset to 7/23/2009 at 02:30 PM. on request of the parties. Mailed notice (dmk, )
                                        LREF
                                        Legal Document 4 Filed: 7/16/2008, Entered: 7/17/2008 Order Appointing Counsel
                                        ORDER Appointing Counsel Signed by the Honorable Morton Denlow on 7/16/08. (emd, )
                                          LREF
                                          Legal Document 3 Filed: 7/16/2008, Entered: 7/17/2008 Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant
                                          ATTORNEY Appearance for defendant Michael Staadt by Daniel George Martin (emd, )
                                            LREF
                                            Legal Document 2 Filed: 7/16/2008, Entered: 7/17/2008 Initial Appearance
                                            MINUTE entry before the Honorable Morton Denlow:Initial Appearance proceedings held. Defendant appears in response to arrest on 7/15/08. Defendant informed of rights. Enter order appointing Daniel Martin to represent defendant. Defendant to remain in custody pending preliminary examination and detention hearing set for 7/23/2008 at 11:00a.m. Mailed notice (emd, )
                                              LREF
                                              Legal Document 1 Filed: 7/16/2008, Entered: 7/17/2008 ComplaintCourt Filing
                                              COMPLAINT signed by Judge Honorable Morton Denlow as to Michael Staadt (1) (emd, )
                                                LREF
                                                Blank -- Filed: 7/15/2008, Entered: 7/17/2008 arrest2
                                                ARREST of defendant Michael Staadt (emd, )
                                                  LREF

                                                  Statistics

                                                  This case has been viewed 365 times.

                                                  No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                  Space
                                                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                   
                                                  PlainSite
                                                  Sign Up
                                                  Need Password Help?