USA v. Robinson
Criminal Case Illinois Northern District Court, Case No. 1:08-cr-00575

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

United States of America United States of America, Plaintiff
Officially listed as "USA"

Represented by United States Department of Justice

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Entity DB

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Pretrial Services +4355 435 435 5545 ilnptdb_Court_Action_Notice@ilnpt.uscourts.gov
v.
No Logo Joseph Robinson, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Office of Defender Services

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Daniel Patrick McLaughlin +1 312 621 8348 daniel_mclaughlin@fd.org

Note: Criminal cases with multiple defendants may have several records with the same case number: one record for the master file (all defendants), as well as one record per defendant. It can often be difficult to tell which record is which. Other likely matches for this case include:

Office Chicago
Filed 8/13/2008
County Cook
Terminated
Reopened
Other Court Case None
Count 1-4
Citation Section 18 U.S.C. § 2113A.F
Offense Level 4
Def Custody Status Custody This Court
Flag DENLOW
  Entries (15) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document 14 Filed: 8/19/2008, Entered: 8/20/2008 Arraignment
MINUTE entry before the Honorable James B. Moran as to Joseph Robinson: Arraignment held. Defendant enters plea of not guilty to all counts of the indictment. 16.1(A) conference to be held by 8/25/2008. Pretrial motions to be filed by 9/9/2008. Government's answer to pretrial motions to be filed by 9/16/2008. Reply to answer to be filed by 9/23/2008. Status hearing is set for 9/30/2008 at 9:15 a.m. Time is excluded in the interest of justice pursuant to 18:3161 (h)(8)(A)(B) beginning on 8/19/2008 and ending on 9/30/2008. Mailed notice (las, )
    LREF
    Legal Document 13 Filed: 8/14/2008, Entered: 8/14/2008 notice of arraignment
    NOTICE of Arraignment as to Joseph Robinson before Honorable James B. Moran on 8/19/2008 at 09:00 AM. in courtroom 1843. (yap, )
      LREF
      Legal Document 12 Filed: 8/13/2008, Entered: 8/14/2008 Description not available
      MINUTE entry before the Honorable Michael T. Mason as to Joseph Robinson: No bond set, detained by Magistrate. (yap, )
        LREF
        Legal Document 11 Filed: 8/13/2008, Entered: 8/14/2008 designation form
        DESIGNATION Sheet: FELONY (Category 3). (yap, )
          LREF
          Legal Document 10 Filed: 8/13/2008, Entered: 8/14/2008 Indictment
          INDICTMENT as to Joseph Robinson (1) count(s) 1-4 (yap, )
            LREF
            Legal Document 9 Filed: 8/13/2008, Entered: 8/13/2008 Notice of Motion
            NOTICE of Motion by Daniel Patrick McLaughlin for presentment of motion for reconsideration[8] before Honorable Morton Denlow on 8/14/2008 at 02:00 PM. (McLaughlin, Daniel)
              LREF
              Legal Document 8 Filed: 8/13/2008, Entered: 8/13/2008 Motion for Reconsideration
              MOTION by Joseph Robinson for reconsideration of bond (McLaughlin, Daniel)
                LREF
                Legal Document 6 Filed: 7/22/2008, Entered: 7/23/2008 Description not available
                MINUTE entry before the Honorable Morton Denlow as to Joseph Robinson: Preliminary examination hearing held. Enter a finding of probable cause. Detention hearing held.Defendant ordered detained as a danger to the community. Defendant ordered bound to the District Courtfor further proceedings in the custody of the U.S. Marshal.Mailed notice (yap, )
                  LREF
                  Blank 7 Filed: 7/19/2008, Entered: 7/24/2008 Affidavit
                  FINANCIAL AFFIDAVIT as to Joseph Robinson. (kmt, )
                    LREF
                    Legal Document 5 Filed: 7/19/2008, Entered: 7/22/2008 Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant
                    ATTORNEY Appearance for defendant Joseph Robinson by Daniel Patrick McLaughlin. (td, )
                      LREF
                      Legal Document 4 Filed: 7/19/2008, Entered: 7/22/2008 Order Appointing Counsel
                      ORDER Appointing Counsel Signed by the Honorable Morton Denlow on 7/19/2008. (td, )
                        LREF
                        Legal Document 3 Filed: 7/19/2008, Entered: 7/22/2008 Initial Appearance
                        MINUTE entry before the Honorable Morton Denlow: Initial appearance proceedings held. Defendant appears in response to arrest on 7/18/08. Defendant informed of rights. Enter order appointing Dan McLaughlin to represent defendant. Defendant to remain in custody pending preliminary examination and detention hearing set for 7/22/08 at 2:00 p.m. (td, )
                          LREF
                          Legal Document 2 Filed: 7/18/2008, Entered: 7/22/2008 Description not available
                          MINUTE entry before the Honorable Morton Denlow: Arrest warrant issued as to Joseph Robinson. (td, )
                            LREF
                            Legal Document 1 Filed: 7/18/2008, Entered: 7/22/2008 ComplaintCourt Filing
                            COMPLAINT signed by Judge Honorable Morton Denlow as to Joseph Robinson (1). (td, ) Modified on 7/22/2008 (kmt, ).
                              LREF
                              Blank -- Filed: 7/18/2008, Entered: 7/22/2008 arrest2
                              ARREST of defendant Joseph Robinson. (td, )
                                LREF

                                Statistics

                                This case has been viewed 86 times.

                                No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                Space
                                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                 
                                PlainSite
                                Sign Up
                                Need Password Help?