Palermo v. Rice
Federal Civil Lawsuit Illinois Northern District Court, Case No. 1:08-cv-04623
District Judge Joan B. Gottschall, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated January 6, 2019 at 1:42 PM ST (2.4 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Anthony Palermo, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Goldman & Ehrlich

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Jonathan C. Goldman +1 312 332 6733 jon@goldmanehrlich.com
v.
Rice, Condoleezza Rice, Condoleezza, Defendant
Officially listed as "Condoleezza Rice"
Unknown Role, Kior, Inc.
Unknown Role, Evenflow, Inc.
Unknown Role, C3, Inc.

Represented by United States Department of Justice

Office Chicago
Filed 8/14/2008
Jury Demand Plaintiff
Demand
Nature of Suit 442 - Civil Rights: Employment
Cause Section 42 U.S.C. § 2000e Job Discrimination (Employment)
Jurisdiction U.S. Government Defendant
Disposition
County Cook
Terminated
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flag VALDEZ
  Entries (12) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 52 Filed: 3/31/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
MEMORANDUM Opinion and Order Signed by the Honorable Joan B. Gottschall on 3/31/2011: Mailed notice(hp, )
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document 12 Filed: 8/26/2008, Entered: 8/26/2008 attorney designation
    DESIGNATION of Ann L. Wallace as U.S. Attorney for Defendant Condoleezza Rice (Wallace, Ann)
      LREF
      Legal Document 11 Filed: 8/25/2008, Entered: 8/25/2008 Set/Reset HearingsCourt Filing
      MINUTE entry before the Honorable Joan B. Gottschall: Status hearing set for 10/22/2008 at 09:30 AM. Parties are directed to discuss settlement of case, consent to proceed before the Magistrate Judge and a proposed discovery plan. Mailed notice (rj, )
        LREF
        Legal Document 10 Filed: 8/22/2008, Entered: 8/22/2008 Notice of Correction
        NOTICE of Correction regarding summons returned executed as to USA[7], summons returned executed as to USA[9]; The wrong party was linked to the entries; The text of the entries has been edited. (gmr, )
          LREF
          Legal Document 9 Filed: 8/21/2008, Entered: 8/21/2008 Summons Returned Executed as to USA
          SUMMONS Returned Executed by Anthony Palermo as to Michael Mukasey served on 8/21/2008, answer due 10/20/2008 (Goldman, Jonathan) Modified on 8/22/2008 (gmr, ).
            LREF
            Legal Document 8 Filed: 8/21/2008, Entered: 8/21/2008 Summons Returned Executed as to USA
            SUMMONS Returned Executed by Anthony Palermo as to Condoleezza Rice served on 8/15/2008, answer due 10/20/2008 (Goldman, Jonathan)
              LREF
              Legal Document 7 Filed: 8/21/2008, Entered: 8/21/2008 Summons Returned Executed as to USA
              SUMMONS Returned Executed by Anthony Palermo as to Patrick Fitzgerald served on 8/20/2008, answer due 10/20/2008 (Goldman, Jonathan) Modified on 8/22/2008 (gmr, ).
                LREF
                Legal Document 6 Filed: 8/19/2008, Entered: 8/20/2008 Summons Issued as to USA
                SUMMONS Issued as to Patrick Fitzgerald and Michael Mukasey. (ep, )
                  LREF
                  Legal Document 5 Filed: 8/14/2008, Entered: 8/15/2008 Summons Issued
                  SUMMONS Issued as to Defendant Condoleezza Rice (jj, )
                    LREF
                    Legal Document 3 Filed: 8/14/2008, Entered: 8/15/2008 Attorney Appearance
                    ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Anthony Palermo by Jonathan C. Goldman. (jj, )
                      LREF
                      Legal Document 2 Filed: 8/14/2008, Entered: 8/15/2008 civil cover sheet
                      CIVIL Cover Sheet. (jj, )
                        LREF
                        Legal Document 1 Filed: 8/14/2008, Entered: 8/15/2008 Complaint
                        COMPLAINT filed by Anthony Palermo; Jury Demand. Filing fee $ 350.(jj, )
                          LREF

                          Statistics

                          This case has been viewed 88 times.

                          No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                          Space
                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                           
                          PlainSite
                          Sign Up
                          Need Password Help?