USA v. Mitchell et al
Criminal Case Illinois Northern District Court, Case No. 3:08-cr-50039

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated July 21, 2017 at 8:15 AM DT (4 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

United States of America United States of America, Plaintiff
Officially listed as "USA"

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space MARS +1 323 651 4447
Space PTS +ilnptdbCourt Act ionNoti

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Joseph Carlyle Pedersen +1 815 987 4444 joseph.pedersen@usdoj.gov

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Entity DB

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Probation Department +4085 408 408 5197 Intake_Docket_ILNP@ilnp.uscourts.gov
v.
No Logo Eric D Carter, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Office of Roger Albright

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Robert M. Fagan +1 815 233 5800 fagan@prodigy.net

Note: Criminal cases with multiple defendants may have several records with the same case number: one record for the master file (all defendants), as well as one record per defendant. It can often be difficult to tell which record is which. Other likely matches for this case include:

Office Rockford
Filed 8/26/2008
County Winnebago
Terminated
Reopened
Other Court Case None
Count 1
Citation Section 18 U.S.C. § 2113A.F
Offense Level 4
Def Custody Status Custody This Court
  Entries (14) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document 24 Filed: 8/27/2008, Entered: 8/27/2008 Order on Motion for Extension of Time
MINUTE entry before the Honorable P. Michael Mahoney as to Ramon V Mitchell and Eric D Carter : Status hearing/arraignment held. Defendants enter pleas of not guilty to indictment. 16.1 conference to be held by 9/03/08. Defendant's oral motion for time to 10/10/08 to file pretrial motions is granted. USA's oral motion for the time of 8/27/08 to and including 10/10/08 to be deemed excludable under 18 USC 3161(h)(1) is granted. Status hearing set for 10/10/08 at 11:00 a.m. Notices mailed by Judicial staff. (jmm-r, )
    LREF
    Blank -- Filed: 8/27/2008, Entered: 8/27/2008, Terminated: 8/27/2008 Motion to Exclude
    MOTION (Oral) by USA for the time of 8/27/08 to and including 10/10/08 to be deemed excludable under 18 USC 3161(h)(1) as to Ramon V Mitchell, Eric D Carter (jmm-r, )
      LREF
      Blank -- Filed: 8/27/2008, Entered: 8/27/2008, Terminated: 8/27/2008 Motion for Extension of Time
      MOTION (Oral) by Ramon V Mitchell, Eric D Carter for time to 10/10/08 to file pretrial motions (jmm-r, )
        LREF
        Legal Document 23 Filed: 8/26/2008, Entered: 8/26/2008 Set/Reset HearingsCourt Filing
        MINUTE entry before the Honorable P. Michael Mahoney as to all defendants : The Grand Jury for the February 2008 Session, a quorum being present, returns the above-entitled indictment in open Court this date before Honorable Judge P. Michael Mahoney. Arraignment and pleas set for 8/27/08 at 10:30 a.m. and 11:00 a.m. Electronic notices. (jmm-r, )
          LREF
          Legal Document 22 Filed: 8/26/2008, Entered: 8/26/2008 designation form
          DESIGNATION Sheet: FELONY (Category II). (jmm-r, )
            LREF
            Legal Document 21 Filed: 8/26/2008, Entered: 8/26/2008 Indictment
            INDICTMENT as to Ramon V Mitchell (1) count(s) 1, Eric D Carter (2) count(s) 1, Tremain R Gordon (3) count(s) 1, Emily M Jones (4) count(s) 1 (jmm-r, )
              LREF
              Legal Document 17 Filed: 8/20/2008, Entered: 8/20/2008 Affidavit
              AFFIDAVIT Financial of Eric Carter (jmm-r, )
                LREF
                Legal Document 16 Filed: 8/20/2008, Entered: 8/20/2008 Order of Detention
                ORDER of Detention as to Eric Carter signed by the Honorable P. Michael Mahoney on 8/20/2008. (jmm-r, )
                  LREF
                  Legal Document 15 Filed: 8/20/2008, Entered: 8/20/2008 Detention Hearing
                  MINUTE entry before the Honorable P. Michael Mahoney as to Eric Carter : Preliminary hearing held. Court enters finding of probable cause. Detention hearing held. Enter order of detention pending trial. Status hearing set for 8/27/08 at 11:00 a.m. Notices mailed by Judicial staff. (jmm-r, )
                    LREF
                    Legal Document 6 Filed: 8/19/2008, Entered: 8/19/2008 ComplaintCourt Filing
                    AMENDED COMPLAINT signed by Judge P. Michael Mahoney adding defendants Tremain Gordon (3), Emily Jones (4) (jmm-r, )
                      LREF
                      Legal Document 5 Filed: 8/16/2008, Entered: 8/18/2008 Order of Detention
                      ORDER of Temporary Detention as to Eric Carter signed by the Honorable P. Michael Mahoney on 8/16/2008. (jmm-r, )
                        LREF
                        Legal Document 4 Filed: 8/16/2008, Entered: 8/18/2008 Initial Appearance
                        MINUTE entry before the Honorable P. Michael Mahoney as to Eric Carter : Initial appearance proceedings held. Defendant appears in response to arrest. Court appoints Robert Fagan as counsel. Defendant informed of rights. Financial affidavit due 8/25/08. USA moves for detention. Detention hearing/Preliminary hearing set for 8/20/08 at 10:00 a.m. Electronic notices. (jmm-r, )
                          LREF
                          Legal Document 1 Filed: 8/16/2008, Entered: 8/18/2008 ComplaintCourt Filing
                          COMPLAINT signed by Judge P. Michael Mahoney as to Ramon Mitchell (1), Eric Carter (2) (jmm-r, ) Modified on 8/19/2008 (jmm-r, ).
                            LREF
                            Blank -- Filed: 8/16/2008, Entered: 8/18/2008 arrest2
                            ARREST of defendants Ramon Mitchell, Eric Carter (jmm-r, )
                              LREF

                              Statistics

                              This case has been viewed 123 times.

                              No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                              Space
                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                               
                              PlainSite
                              Sign Up
                              Need Password Help?