USA v. Mitchell et al
Criminal Case Illinois Northern District Court, Case No. 3:08-cr-50039

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated July 21, 2017 at 11:19 AM DT (4 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

United States of America United States of America, Plaintiff
Officially listed as "USA"

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space MARS +1 323 651 4447
Space PTS +ilnptdbCourt Act ionNoti

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Joseph Carlyle Pedersen +1 815 987 4444 joseph.pedersen@usdoj.gov

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Entity DB

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Probation Department +4085 408 408 5197 Intake_Docket_ILNP@ilnp.uscourts.gov
v.
No Logo Tremain R Gordon, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Dennis J Ryan +1 608 277 1771 djeryan@sbcglobal.net

Note: Criminal cases with multiple defendants may have several records with the same case number: one record for the master file (all defendants), as well as one record per defendant. It can often be difficult to tell which record is which. Other likely matches for this case include:

Office Rockford
Filed 8/26/2008
County Winnebago
Terminated
Reopened
Other Court Case None
Count 1
Citation Section 18 U.S.C. § 2113A.F
Offense Level 4
Def Custody Status Released
  Entries (13) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document 25 Filed: 8/27/2008, Entered: 8/27/2008 Order on Motion for Extension of Time
MINUTE entry before the Honorable P. Michael Mahoney as to Tremain R Gordon and Emily M Jones : Status hearing/arraignment held. Defendants enter pleas of not guilty to indictment. 16.1 conference to be held by 9/03/08. Defendant's oral motion for time to 10/10/08 to file pretrial motions is granted. USA's oral motion for the time of 8/27/08 to and including 10/10/08 to be deemed excludable under 18 USC 3161(h)(1) is granted. Status hearing set for 10/10/08 at 11:30 a.m. Notices mailed by Judicial staff. (jmm-r, )
    LREF
    Blank -- Filed: 8/27/2008, Entered: 8/27/2008, Terminated: 8/27/2008 Motion to Exclude
    MOTION (Oral) by USA for the time of 8/27/08 to and including 10/10/08 to be deemed excludable under 18 USC 3161(h)(1) as to Tremain R Gordon, Emily M Jones (jmm-r, )
      LREF
      Blank -- Filed: 8/27/2008, Entered: 8/27/2008, Terminated: 8/27/2008 Motion for Extension of Time
      MOTION (Oral) by Tremain R Gordon, Emily M Jones for time to 10/10/08 to file pretrial motions (jmm-r, )
        LREF
        Legal Document 23 Filed: 8/26/2008, Entered: 8/26/2008 Set/Reset HearingsCourt Filing
        MINUTE entry before the Honorable P. Michael Mahoney as to all defendants : The Grand Jury for the February 2008 Session, a quorum being present, returns the above-entitled indictment in open Court this date before Honorable Judge P. Michael Mahoney. Arraignment and pleas set for 8/27/08 at 10:30 a.m. and 11:00 a.m. Electronic notices. (jmm-r, )
          LREF
          Legal Document 22 Filed: 8/26/2008, Entered: 8/26/2008 designation form
          DESIGNATION Sheet: FELONY (Category II). (jmm-r, )
            LREF
            Legal Document 21 Filed: 8/26/2008, Entered: 8/26/2008 Indictment
            INDICTMENT as to Ramon V Mitchell (1) count(s) 1, Eric D Carter (2) count(s) 1, Tremain R Gordon (3) count(s) 1, Emily M Jones (4) count(s) 1 (jmm-r, )
              LREF
              Legal Document 20 Filed: 8/20/2008, Entered: 8/20/2008 Bond
              OWN RECOGNIZANCE Bond as to Tremain Gordon in amount of $10,000.00 (SEALED DOCUMENT) (jmm-r, )
                LREF
                Legal Document 19 Filed: 8/20/2008, Entered: 8/20/2008 Order Setting Conditions of Release
                ORDER Setting Conditions of Release as to Tremain Gordon (3) $10,000.00 OWN RECOGNIZANCE (For further details see order.) Signed by the Honorable P. Michael Mahoney on 8/20/2008. (REDACTED IMAGE) Mailed notices. (jmm-r, )
                  LREF
                  Legal Document 18 Filed: 8/20/2008, Entered: 8/20/2008 Terminate Hearings
                  MINUTE entry before the Honorable P. Michael Mahoney as to Tremain Gordon : Defendant waives right to a preliminary hearing. Court enters finding of probable cause. Detention hearing held. Enter order setting conditions of release. Status hearing set for 8/27/08 at 10:30 a.m. Notices mailed by Judicial staff. (jmm-r, )
                    LREF
                    Legal Document 8 Filed: 8/19/2008, Entered: 8/19/2008 Order of Detention
                    ORDER of Temporary Detention as to Tremain Gordon signed by the Honorable P. Michael Mahoney on 8/19/2008. (jmm-r, )
                      LREF
                      Legal Document 7 Filed: 8/19/2008, Entered: 8/19/2008 Initial Appearance
                      MINUTE entry before the Honorable P. Michael Mahoney as to Tremain Gordon : Initial Appearance proceedings held. Defendant appears in response to arrest. Court appoints Dennis Ryan as counsel. Defendant informed of rights. Financial affidavit due 8/26/08. USA moves for detention. Detention hearing/preliminary hearing set for 8/20/08 at 10:00 a.m. Enter order of temporary detention. Electronic notices. (jmm-r, )
                        LREF
                        Legal Document 6 Filed: 8/19/2008, Entered: 8/19/2008 ComplaintCourt Filing
                        AMENDED COMPLAINT signed by Judge P. Michael Mahoney adding defendants Tremain Gordon (3), Emily Jones (4) (jmm-r, )
                          LREF
                          Blank -- Filed: 8/18/2008, Entered: 8/19/2008 arrest2
                          ARREST of defendant Tremain Gordon (jmm-r, )
                            LREF

                            Statistics

                            This case has been viewed 95 times.

                            No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                            Space
                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                             
                            PlainSite
                            Sign Up
                            Need Password Help?