Werner Aero Services v. Champion Laboratories, Inc. et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit Illinois Northern District Court, Case No. 1:08-cv-04801
District Judge Robert W. Gettleman, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Werner Aero Services, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Barrett Law Office, PA

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Patrick Barrett +1 615 463 4000 +1 615 463 3717 pbarrett@barrettlawofficetn.com
Space Alfred H. Davidson, IV +1 615 463 4000 +1 615 463 3717 adavidson@barrettlawofficetn.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Bernstein Liebhard LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Ronald Judah Aranoff +1 212 779 1414 +1 212 779 3218 aranoff@bernlieb.com
Space MEL E. LIFSHITZ +1 212 779 1414 +1 212 779 3218

Toggle Switch Represented by Egleston Law Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Gregory Michael Egleston +1 212 683 3400 +1 212 683 3402 greg.egleston@gmail.com
v.
No Logo Arvinmeritor, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Jeffrey J Switzer +1 615 259 4685 +1 615 256 4448
No Logo Baldwin Filters, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Coudert Brothers LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Darrell Prescott +1 212 626 4400

Toggle Switch Represented by Waller Lanseden Dortch & Davis LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Robert Earl Boston +1 615 244 6380 +1 615 244 6804 bob.boston@wallerlaw.com
No Logo Bosch U.S.A., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Joshua Ray Denton +1 615 742 7761
No Logo Champion Laboratories, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Benjamin, Weill & Mazer, APC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space David L Johnson +1 217 423 3614
No Logo Cummins Filtration Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Milton S. McGee, III

Toggle Switch Represented by Riley Warnock & Jacobson PLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Steven Allen Riley +1 615 320 3700 +1 615 320 3737 sriley@rwjplc.com
No Logo Donaldson Company,, Defendant
Officially listed as "Donaldson Company, The"

Toggle Switch Represented by Gentry, Tipton & McLemore PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space E Jerome Melson +1 865 525 5300 +1 865 523 7315
Honeywell International, Inc. Honeywell International, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Benjamin, Weill & Mazer, APC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space David L Johnson +1 217 423 3614
No Logo Mann + Hummell U.S.A., Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Courtney L. Wilbert +1 615 321 0555
No Logo Purolator Filters Na LLC, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Joshua Ray Denton +1 615 742 7761
Space Robert Dale Grimes +1 615 742 7708
No Logo United Components, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Benjamin, Weill & Mazer, APC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space David L Johnson +1 217 423 3614
No Logo Wix Filtration Products, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Baker Donelson Bearman Caldwell & Berkowitz, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Melissa L Stevens +1 865 971 5171 +1 865 525 8569 mstevens@bakerdonelson.com
Office Chicago
Filed 8/29/2008
Jury Demand Plaintiff
Demand
Nature of Suit 410 - Anti-Trust
Cause Section 15 U.S.C. § 15 Antitrust Litigation
Jurisdiction Federal Question
Disposition
County XX US, Outside the State of IL
Terminated
Origin 6
Reopened
Lead Case
108-cv-04883 None
Related Case
Other Court Case 3:08-cv-00474[Tennessee Middle]
Def Custody Status
Flag MDL1957
  Entries (50) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document 50 Filed: 8/29/2008, Entered: 8/29/2008 Case Transferred In - District Transfer
RECEIVED from Tennessee Middle; Case Number 3:08-cv-00474 electronic case/documents numbered 1 - 49. (lcw)
    LREF
    Legal Document 49 Filed: 8/28/2008, Entered: 8/28/2008 Order Dismissing CaseCourt Filing
    ORDER: Pursuant to the order of the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation, Docket No. 1957, this case is hereby transferred to the United States District Court for the Northern District of Illinois for coordinated or consolidated pretrial proceedings. The Clerk of Court is directed to close the case on the records of this Court and transmit the record to the United States District Court for the Northern District of Illinois. Signed by Senior Judge Robert Echols on 8/28/08. (dt)[Transferred from Tennessee Middle on 8/29/2008.]
      LREF
      Legal Document 48 Filed: 8/26/2008, Entered: 8/26/2008 OrderCourt Filing
      ORDER: The Clerk is directed to forward the file in this case to the Honorable Robert L. Echols for entry of a transfer order upon receipt by the Clerk of this District of a certified copy of the MDL order from the Northern District of Illinois. Unless otherwise directed by the Court or upon motion of the parties, there will be no further proceedings before the Magistrate Judge in this case. Judge Magistrate Judge Juliet E. Griffin no longer assigned to case. Signed by Magistrate Judge Juliet E. Griffin on 8/25/08. (dt) [Transferred from Tennessee Middle on 8/29/2008.]
        LREF
        Legal Document 47 Filed: 8/25/2008, Entered: 8/25/2008 notice of filing
        CERTIFIED COPY OF MDL TRANSFER ORDER rec'd this date from the Northern District of Illinois (MDL 1957 In Re Aftermarket Filters Antitrust Litigation). This case is ready for closing/transfer. Proposed order forwarded to chambers for consideration. (af) [Transferred from Tennessee Middle on 8/29/2008.]
          LREF
          Legal Document 46 Filed: 8/25/2008, Entered: 8/25/2008 notice of filing
          STATUS REPORT AND NOTICE OF ENTRY OF TRANSFER ORDER by Purolator Filters N.A. L.L.C., Bosch U.S.A. re [44] Order on Motion to Stay. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit Exhibit A: August 18, 2008, Transfer Order)(Denton, Joshua) Modified Text on 8/26/2008 (dt). [Transferred from Tennessee Middle on 8/29/2008.]
            LREF
            Legal Document 45 Filed: 8/19/2008, Entered: 8/19/2008 Letter
            Letter from Clerk to Atty Darrell Prescott re compliance with Local Rule 83.01. (dt) [Transferred from Tennessee Middle on 8/29/2008.]
              LREF
              Legal Document 44 Filed: 8/18/2008, Entered: 8/19/2008 Order on Motion to StayCourt Filing
              ORDER: Pursuant to the order entered 6/12/08 [37], defendants Purolator Filters N.A. L.L.C. and Robert Bosch LLC filed a status report [43]. By 9/2/08, defendants Purolator Filters N.A. L.L.C. and Robert Bosch LLC shall file another status report. Although no formal notice of appearance has been entered by counsel for defendants Wix Filtration Products, The Donaldson Company, or Baldwin Filters, Inc., in accord with Local Rule 83.01(f)(1), the Clerk shall enter the following counsel: For defendant Baldwin Filters, Inc.: Robert E. Boston and Darrell Prescott. For defendant Wix Filtration Products: Melissa Loney Stevens. For defendant The Donaldson Company: E. Jerome Melson. The Clerk is directed to send a copy of this order to the above attorneys. Defendants' Motion to Stay [25] was effectively Granted by order entered 6/12/08 [37], and thus the Clerk is directed to terminate the motion to stay [25] as pending. Signed by Magistrate Judge Juliet E. Griffin on 8/18/08. (dt)[Transferred from Tennessee Middle on 8/29/2008.]
                LREF
                Legal Document 43 Filed: 8/15/2008, Entered: 8/15/2008 notice of filing
                STATUS REPORT regarding Motion to Transfer by Purolator Filters N.A. L.L.C., Bosch U.S.A. re [37] Order. (Denton, Joshua) Modified Text on 8/18/2008 (dt). [Transferred from Tennessee Middle on 8/29/2008.]
                  LREF
                  Legal Document 42 Filed: 7/30/2008, Entered: 7/30/2008 Attorney Appearance
                  NOTICE of Appearance by Alfred H. Davidson, IV on behalf of Werner Aero Services (Davidson, Alfred) [Transferred from Tennessee Middle on 8/29/2008.]
                    LREF
                    Legal Document 41 Filed: 7/3/2008, Entered: 7/3/2008 Order on Motion to Substitute AttorneyCourt Filing
                    ORDER: Plaintiff's Motion to Substitute Attorney [39] is Granted. The Clerk is directed to terminate Kevin H. Sharp as counsel for the plaintiff, and to sendhim a copy of this order. Attorney Kevin H. Sharp terminated. Signed by Magistrate Judge Juliet E. Griffin on 7/3/08. (dt) [Transferred from Tennessee Middle on 8/29/2008.]
                      LREF
                      Legal Document 40 Filed: 6/27/2008, Entered: 6/27/2008 Attorney Appearance
                      NOTICE of Appearance by Robert Dale Grimes on behalf of Purolator Filters N.A. L.L.C. (Grimes, Robert) [Transferred from Tennessee Middle on 8/29/2008.]
                        LREF
                        Legal Document 39 Filed: 6/25/2008, Entered: 6/25/2008, Terminated: 7/3/2008 Motion to Substitute Attorney
                        MOTION to Substitute Attorney by Werner Aero Services. (Sharp, Kevin) [Transferred from Tennessee Middle on 8/29/2008.]
                          LREF
                          Legal Document 38 Filed: 6/12/2008, Entered: 6/12/2008 OrderCourt Filing
                          AGREED ORDER TO EXTEND TIME FOR DEFENDANTS TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT AND TO STAY DISCOVERY: The Court's 6/5/08 Order is modified as follows: Defendant's answer shall be extended until the earliest of the following dates: 1) if this case is transferred to another district pursuant to the MDL Order, or 2) if this case is not transferred to another district pursuant to the MDL Order, thirty days after the Order, provided, however, that in the event that any undersigned defendant should answer, agree or be ordered to answer, move or otherwise respond to the complaint in any of the Filters Cases prior to the response date, then that defendant shall respond to the complaint in the Plaintiff's Action by that earlier date. All proceedings in this action are stayed until 1) this case is transferred pursuant to MDL Order or 2) if this case is not transferred to another district pursuant to MDL Order, thirty days after Defendants have answered complaint in Plaintiff's Action. Signed by Magistrate Judge Juliet E. Griffin on 6/12/08. (dt) [Transferred from Tennessee Middle on 8/29/2008.]
                            LREF
                            Legal Document 37 Filed: 6/12/2008, Entered: 6/12/2008 OrderCourt Filing
                            ORDER granting [34] Joint MOTION for Entry of Agreed Order to Extend of Time to File Answer to [1] Complaint and to Stay. Telephone conference set for 6/16/08 is Cancelled. Parties' agreed order submitted with the motion is contemporaneously entered. However, defendants Purolator Filters N.A. L.L.C. and Robert Bosch LLC shall file a status report by 8/15/08, advising the Court of the status of the motion to transfer. Signed by Magistrate Judge Juliet E. Griffin on 6/12/08. (dt)[Transferred from Tennessee Middle on 8/29/2008.]
                              LREF
                              Legal Document 36 Filed: 6/9/2008, Entered: 6/9/2008 Statement
                              CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Mann + Hummell U.S.A., Inc.. (Wilbert, Courtney) [Transferred from Tennessee Middle on 8/29/2008.]
                                LREF
                                Legal Document 35 Filed: 6/9/2008, Entered: 6/9/2008 Attorney Appearance
                                NOTICE of Appearance by Courtney L. Wilbert on behalf of Mann + Hummell U.S.A., Inc. (Wilbert, Courtney) [Transferred from Tennessee Middle on 8/29/2008.]
                                  LREF
                                  Legal Document 34 Filed: 6/9/2008, Entered: 6/9/2008, Terminated: 6/12/2008 Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer
                                  Joint MOTION for Entry of Agreed Order to Extend Time to File Answer [1] Complaint and to Stay Discovery by Purolator Filters N.A. L.L.C.. (Attachments: # (1) Proposed Order Agreed Order to Extend time to respond to Complaint and to Stay Discovery)(Denton, Joshua) Modified Text on 6/9/2008 (dt). [Transferred from Tennessee Middle on 8/29/2008.]
                                    LREF
                                    Legal Document 33 Filed: 6/6/2008, Entered: 6/6/2008 Attorney Appearance
                                    NOTICE of Appearance by Patrick M. Barrett, III on behalf of Werner Aero Services (Barrett, Patrick) [Transferred from Tennessee Middle on 8/29/2008.]
                                      LREF
                                      Legal Document 32 Filed: 6/6/2008, Entered: 6/6/2008 Statement
                                      CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by United Components, Inc., Champion Laboratories, Inc.. (Johnson, David) [Transferred from Tennessee Middle on 8/29/2008.]
                                        LREF
                                        Legal Document 31 Filed: 6/5/2008, Entered: 6/5/2008 Statement
                                        CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Mann + Hummell U.S.A., Inc., Arvinmeritor, Inc., United Components, Inc., Champion Laboratories, Inc., Purolator Filters N.A. L.L.C., Honeywell International, Inc., Wix Filtration Products, Cummins Filtration, Inc., Donaldson Company, The, Baldwin Filters, Inc., Bosch U.S.A.. (Boston, Robert) [Transferred from Tennessee Middle on 8/29/2008.]
                                          LREF
                                          Legal Document 30 Filed: 6/5/2008, Entered: 6/5/2008 OrderCourt Filing
                                          ORDER granting [22] Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re [1] Complaint. Defendants shall have until 7/9/08 to file a response to the complaint. Therefore, and as a result of the defendants' motion to stay, the 6/16/08, initial case management conference is CANCELLED, and a telephone conference call is scheduled in lieu thereof on Monday, 6/16/08, at 12:00 noon, central time, to be initiated by counsel defendants Purolator Filters and Robert Bosch, to address the defendants' motion to stay, the status of the request to transfer this case, whether the plaintiff will object to such transfer, to reschedule the initial case management conference, if appropriate, and any other appropriate matters. Signed by Magistrate Judge Juliet E. Griffin on 6/5/08. (dt) [Transferred from Tennessee Middle on 8/29/2008.]
                                            LREF
                                            Legal Document 29 Filed: 6/4/2008, Entered: 6/4/2008 Attorney Appearance
                                            NOTICE of Appearance by David L. Johnson on behalf of United Components, Inc., Champion Laboratories, Inc., Honeywell International, Inc. (Johnson, David) [Transferred from Tennessee Middle on 8/29/2008.]
                                              LREF
                                              Legal Document 28 Filed: 6/4/2008, Entered: 6/4/2008 Statement
                                              CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by United Components, Inc.. (Johnson, David) [Transferred from Tennessee Middle on 8/29/2008.]
                                                LREF
                                                Legal Document 27 Filed: 6/4/2008, Entered: 6/4/2008 Statement
                                                **DISREGARD THIS ENTRY-ATTY REFILED CORRECT DOCUMENT-SEE DE# 32** CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Champion Laboratories, Inc.. (Johnson, David) Modified Text on 6/6/2008 (dt). [Transferred from Tennessee Middle on 8/29/2008.]
                                                  LREF
                                                  Legal Document 26 Filed: 6/4/2008, Entered: 6/4/2008 Statement
                                                  CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Cummins Filtration, Inc.. (Riley, Steven) [Transferred from Tennessee Middle on 8/29/2008.]
                                                    LREF
                                                    Legal Document 25 Filed: 6/3/2008, Entered: 6/3/2008, Terminated: 8/18/2008 Motion to Stay
                                                    MOTION to Stay All Pretrial Proceedings pending the Multidistrict Litigation Motion to Consolidate and Transfer by Mann + Hummell U.S.A., Inc., Arvinmeritor, Inc., United Components, Inc., Champion Laboratories, Inc., Purolator Filters N.A. L.L.C., Honeywell International, Inc., Wix Filtration Products, Cummins Filtration, Inc., Donaldson Company, The, Baldwin Filters, Inc., Bosch U.S.A.. (Attachments: # (1) Memorandum of Law in Support of Defendants' Motion to Stay Pretrial Proceedings Pending the Multidistrict Litigation Motion to Consolidate and Transfer, # (2) Collective Exhibit 1 to Memorandum of Law: Motion Papers Submitted by Lovett Auto to the MDL Panel, # (3) Collective Exhibit 2 to Memorandum of Law: Motion Papers Submitted by S&E Quick Lube and others to the MDL Panel, # (4) Collective Exhibit 3 to Memorandum of Law: Joinder Papers Submitted by Neptune Warehouse Distributors, Inc. to the MDL Panel, # (5) Collective Exhibit 4 to Memorandum of Law: Motion Papers Submitted by Big T Inc. and Manasek Auto Parts, Inc. to the MDL Panel, # (6) Exhibit 5 to Memorandum of Law: Joint Memorandum Submitted by Worldwide Equipment, Inc. and Central Warehouse Sales Corp. to the MDL Panel, # (7) Proposed Order Granting Motion to Stay)(Denton, Joshua) [Transferred from Tennessee Middle on 8/29/2008.]
                                                      LREF
                                                      Legal Document 24 Filed: 6/3/2008, Entered: 6/3/2008 Statement
                                                      CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Arvinmeritor, Inc.. (Switzer, Jeffrey) [Transferred from Tennessee Middle on 8/29/2008.]
                                                        LREF
                                                        Legal Document 23 Filed: 6/2/2008, Entered: 6/2/2008 Statement
                                                        CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Purolator Filters N.A.L.L.C., Bosch U.S.A.. (Denton, Joshua) [Transferred from Tennessee Middle on 8/29/2008.]
                                                          LREF
                                                          Legal Document 22 Filed: 6/2/2008, Entered: 6/2/2008, Terminated: 6/5/2008 Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer
                                                          Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer to [1] Complaint, and Memorandum in Support by Mann + Hummell U.S.A., Inc., Arvinmeritor, Inc., United Components, Inc., Champion Laboratories, Inc., Purolator Filters N.A.L.L.C., Honeywell International, Inc., Wix Filtration Products, Cummins Filtration, Inc., Donaldson Company, The, Baldwin Filters, Inc., Bosch U.S.A.. (Attachments: # (1) Proposed Order Granting Motion for Extension)(Denton, Joshua) Modified Text on 6/3/2008 (dt).[Transferred from Tennessee Middle on 8/29/2008.]
                                                            LREF
                                                            Legal Document 21 Filed: 6/2/2008, Entered: 6/2/2008 Attorney Appearance
                                                            NOTICE of Appearance by Steven Allen Riley and Milton S. McGee on behalf of Cummins Filtration, Inc. (Riley, Steven) Modified Text on 6/3/2008 (dt). [Transferred from Tennessee Middle on 8/29/2008.]
                                                              LREF
                                                              Legal Document 20 Filed: 6/2/2008, Entered: 6/2/2008 Attorney Appearance
                                                              NOTICE of Appearance by Jeffrey J. Switzer on behalf of Arvinmeritor, Inc. (Switzer, Jeffrey) [Transferred from Tennessee Middle on 8/29/2008.]
                                                                LREF
                                                                Legal Document 19 Filed: 5/28/2008, Entered: 5/28/2008 Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac ViceCourt Filing
                                                                ORDER granting [5] Motion for Ronald J. Aranoff to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Initial case management conference set for 6/16/08 at 12:00 noon. Stay of discovery is Lifted. Prior to the initial case management conference, counsel for the parties shall also confer and shall prepare a proposed, joint initial case management order. Counsel shall e-file the proposed order prior to the initial case management conference. Plaintiff's counsel shall serve a copy of this order upon the defendants or their counsel. Signed by Magistrate Judge Juliet E. Griffin on 5/28/08. (dt) [Transferred from Tennessee Middle on 8/29/2008.]
                                                                  LREF
                                                                  Legal Document 18 Filed: 5/28/2008, Entered: 5/28/2008 Summons Returned Unexecuted
                                                                  Summons Returned Unexecuted by Werner Aero Services as to Bosch U.S.A.. (Sharp, Kevin) [Transferred from Tennessee Middle on 8/29/2008.]
                                                                    LREF
                                                                    Legal Document 17 Filed: 5/28/2008, Entered: 5/28/2008 other
                                                                    RECEIPT #34675-2692 in the amount of $75.00 posted by Ronald J. Aranoff, atty for Werner Aero Services, re [5] Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (dt) [Transferred from Tennessee Middle on 8/29/2008.]
                                                                      LREF
                                                                      Legal Document 16 Filed: 5/23/2008, Entered: 5/23/2008 Summons Returned Executed
                                                                      SUMMONS returned executed by Werner Aero Services. Purolator Filters N.A.L.L.C. served on 5/19/2008. (Sharp, Kevin) [Transferred from Tennessee Middle on 8/29/2008.]
                                                                        LREF
                                                                        Legal Document 15 Filed: 5/23/2008, Entered: 5/23/2008 Summons Returned Executed
                                                                        SUMMONS returned executed by Werner Aero Services. Wix Filtration Products served on 5/19/2008. (Sharp, Kevin) [Transferred from Tennessee Middle on 8/29/2008.]
                                                                          LREF
                                                                          Legal Document 14 Filed: 5/23/2008, Entered: 5/23/2008 Summons Returned Executed
                                                                          SUMMONS returned executed by Werner Aero Services. Donaldson Company, The served on 5/20/2008. (Sharp, Kevin) [Transferred from Tennessee Middle on 8/29/2008.]
                                                                            LREF
                                                                            Legal Document 13 Filed: 5/23/2008, Entered: 5/23/2008 Summons Returned Executed
                                                                            SUMMONS returned executed by Werner Aero Services. Baldwin Filters, Inc. served on 5/19/2008. (Sharp, Kevin) [Transferred from Tennessee Middle on 8/29/2008.]
                                                                              LREF
                                                                              Legal Document 12 Filed: 5/23/2008, Entered: 5/23/2008 Summons Returned Executed
                                                                              SUMMONS returned executed by Werner Aero Services. Arvinmeritor, Inc. served on 5/20/2008. (Sharp, Kevin) [Transferred from Tennessee Middle on 8/29/2008.]
                                                                                LREF
                                                                                Legal Document 11 Filed: 5/23/2008, Entered: 5/23/2008 Summons Returned Executed
                                                                                SUMMONS returned executed by Werner Aero Services. United Components, Inc. served on 5/20/2008. (Sharp, Kevin) [Transferred from Tennessee Middle on 8/29/2008.]
                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document 10 Filed: 5/23/2008, Entered: 5/23/2008 other
                                                                                  CERTIFICATE OF GOOD STANDING of Attorney Ronald J. Aranoff from the United States District Court for the Southern of New York filed by Werner Aero Services. (Sharp, Kevin) [Transferred from Tennessee Middle on 8/29/2008.]
                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document 9 Filed: 5/22/2008, Entered: 5/22/2008 Summons Returned Executed
                                                                                    SUMMONS returned executed by Werner Aero Services. Mann + Hummell U.S.A., Inc. served on 5/19/2008. (Sharp, Kevin) [Transferred from Tennessee Middle on 8/29/2008.]
                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document 8 Filed: 5/22/2008, Entered: 5/22/2008 Summons Returned Executed
                                                                                      SUMMONS returned executed by Werner Aero Services. Honeywell International, Inc. served on 5/19/2008. (Sharp, Kevin) [Transferred from Tennessee Middle on 8/29/2008.]
                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document 7 Filed: 5/22/2008, Entered: 5/22/2008 Summons Returned Executed
                                                                                        SUMMONS returned executed by Werner Aero Services. Cummins Filtration, Inc. served on 5/19/2008. (Sharp, Kevin) [Transferred from Tennessee Middle on 8/29/2008.]
                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document 6 Filed: 5/15/2008, Entered: 5/15/2008 other
                                                                                          **DISREGARD THIS ENTRY-ATTY TO REFILE CORRECT CERTIFICATE OF GOOD STANDING** CERTIFICATE OF GOOD STANDING of Attorney Ronald J. Aranoff from the United States District Court for the Appellate Division of the Supreme Court of New York filed by Werner Aero Services. (Sharp, Kevin) Modified Text on 5/16/2008 (dt). [Transferred from Tennessee Middle on 8/29/2008.]
                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document 5 Filed: 5/15/2008, Entered: 5/15/2008, Terminated: 5/28/2008 motion to appear pro hac vice
                                                                                            MOTION for attorney Ronald J. Aranoff to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Werner Aero Services. **PHV FEE PAID ON 5/28/08** (Attachments: # (1) Certificate of Good Standing)(Sharp, Kevin) Modified Text on 5/16/2008 (dt). Modified Text on 5/28/2008 (dt).[Transferred from Tennessee Middle on 8/29/2008.]
                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document 4 Filed: 5/14/2008, Entered: 5/14/2008 Statement
                                                                                              CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Werner Aero Services. (Sharp, Kevin) [Transferred from Tennessee Middle on 8/29/2008.]
                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document 3 Filed: 5/9/2008, Entered: 5/12/2008 notice of filingCourt Filing
                                                                                                NOTICE of Initial Case Management Conference set for Monday, 6/16/2008 at 12:00 noon in Courtroom 764 before Magistrate Judge Juliet E. Griffin. (rm) [Transferred from Tennessee Middle on 8/29/2008.]
                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document 2 Filed: 5/9/2008, Entered: 5/12/2008 notice of filing
                                                                                                  NOTICE from USDC Clerk regarding Corporate Disclosure Statement requirement. (rm) [Transferred from Tennessee Middle on 8/29/2008.]
                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document 1 Filed: 5/9/2008, Entered: 5/12/2008 Complaint
                                                                                                    COMPLAINT against Mann + Hummell U.S.A., Inc., Arvinmeritor, Inc., United Components, Inc., Champion Laboratories, Inc., Purolator Filters N.A.L.L.C., Honeywell International, Inc., Wix Filtration Products, Cummins Filtration, Inc., Donaldson Company, The, Baldwin Filters, Inc., Bosch U.S.A., filed by Werner Aero Services. (filing fee paid $350.00) Summons issued. (Attachments: # (1) Civil Cover Sheet, # (2) Summons)(rm) [Transferred from Tennessee Middle on 8/29/2008.]
                                                                                                      LREF

                                                                                                      Statistics

                                                                                                      This case has been viewed 257 times.

                                                                                                      No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                      Space
                                                                                                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                       
                                                                                                      PlainSite
                                                                                                      Sign Up
                                                                                                      Need Password Help?