Bozzell et al v. Bristol-Myers Squibb Co. et al

Federal Civil Lawsuit New Jersey District Court, Case No. 3:14-cv-01262
Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated April 9, 2018 at 6:43 PM EDT (7.1 years ago) Update UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert AlertsSpaceJump Jump
Summary

No one has written a summary of this case yet. Sign up or sign in to contribute one.

Parties
No Logo Connie Good, Plaintiff
No Logo Joseph Bozzell, Plaintiff

Represented by Audet & Partners, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space William M. Audet +1 415 568 2555 +1 415 568 2556 waudet@audetlaw.com
Space Joshua Caleb Ezrin +1 415 568 2555 +1 415 568 2556 jezrin@audetlaw.com
v.
Bristol-Myers Squibb Company Bristol-Myers Squibb Company, Defendant

Represented by Arnold & Porter, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Jeremy Michael McLaughlin +1 415 471 3297 +1 415 471 3400 jeremy.mclaughlin@aporter.com

Represented by COUNSEL NOT ADMITTED TO USDC-NJ BAR

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Maurice Abraham Leiter +1 213 243 4040 +1 213 243 4199
Space Sharon D. Mayo +1 415 471 3100 +1 415 471 3400

Represented by HEPWORTH JANIS & KLUKSDAL

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Michael J. Baker +1 415 471 3100 +1 415 471 3400
McKesson Corporation McKesson Corporation, Defendant
Other Parties
No Logo PLAVIX PRODUCT LIABILITY AND MARKETING LITIGATION, In Re
Attributes
Timeline
  Entries (29) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 4/9/2018, Entered: None Dismiss
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 11/7/2017, Entered: None Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 9/27/2017, Entered: None Response to Motion
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 9/25/2017, Entered: None Withdraw as Attorney
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 6/15/2017, Entered: None Notice of Appearance
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 6/15/2017, Entered: None Notice of Appearance
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 7/17/2015, Entered: None Brief
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 7/14/2015, Entered: None Order on Motion to Dismiss
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 7/6/2015, Entered: None Dismiss
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 5/18/2015, Entered: None Order Dismissing Case
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 10/2/2014, Entered: None Order
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 10/1/2014, Entered: None Order
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 10/1/2014, Entered: None Opinion
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 2/27/2014, Entered: None
Clerk's Notice to Counsel. (dm ) (Entered: 02/27/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 2/27/2014, Entered: None
Certified Copy of Transfer Order and docket received, Case transferred in from District of California Northern; Case Number 3:14-cv-00658. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. (Entered: 02/27/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 2/26/2014, Entered: None
CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-22) to USDC for the District of New Jersey (MDL No. 2418). Signed by Jeffrey N. Nuthi for MDL Panel on 2/26/14. (ysS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/26/2014) (Entered: 02/26/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 2/25/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER by Judge Susan Illston granting 5 Stipulation to Stay Litigation Pending Transfer to the Plavik MDL (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/25/2014) (Entered: 02/25/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 2/21/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Hon. Susan Illston for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Nathanael M. Cousins no longer assigned to the case.. Signed by Executive Committee on 2/21/14. (as, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/21/2014) (Entered: 02/21/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 2/20/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
CLERK'S NOTICE of Impending Reassignment to U.S. District Judge. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/20/2014) (Entered: 02/20/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 2/20/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a Magistrate Judge by Bristol-Myers Squibb Company (Attachments: # 1 Certificate/Proof of Service)(McLaughlin, Jeremy) (Filed on 2/20/2014) Modified on 2/20/2014 (dtmS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 02/20/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 2/19/2014, Entered: None
CLERK'S NOTICE REGARDING Consent or Declination: Parties must file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge no later than 3/5/2014. (Attachments: # 1 Consent/Declination) (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/19/2014) (Entered: 02/19/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 2/19/2014, Entered: None
Certificate of Interested Entities by McKesson Corporation (Attachments: # 1 Certificate/Proof of Service)(McLaughlin, Jeremy) (Filed on 2/19/2014) Modified on 2/19/2014 (dtmS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 02/19/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 2/19/2014, Entered: None
ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand byMcKesson Corporation. (McLaughlin, Jeremy) (Filed on 2/19/2014) (Entered: 02/19/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 2/19/2014, Entered: None
ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand byBristol-Myers Squibb Company. (McLaughlin, Jeremy) (Filed on 2/19/2014) (Entered: 02/19/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 2/13/2014, Entered: None
STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER - Joint Stipulation and [Proposed] Order to Stay Litigation Pending Transfer to the Plavik MDL filed by Bristol-Myers Squibb Company. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate/Proof of Service)(McLaughlin, Jeremy) (Filed on 2/13/2014) (Entered: 02/13/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 2/12/2014, Entered: None
Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 5/7/2014. Case Management Conference set for 5/14/2014 10:00 AM in Courtroom A, 15th Floor, San Francisco. (dtmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/12/2014) (Entered: 02/12/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 2/12/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Nathanael M. Cousins. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. (as, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/12/2014) (Entered: 02/12/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 2/12/2014, Entered: None
Certificate of Interested Entities by Bristol-Myers Squibb Co. (McLaughlin, Jeremy) (Filed on 2/12/2014) (Entered: 02/12/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 2/12/2014, Entered: None
NOTICE OF REMOVAL from San Francisco Superior Court. Their case number is CGC-14-537382. (Filing fee $400 receipt number 0971-8372116). Filed by Bristol-Myers Squibb Co.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G, # 8 Exhibit H, # 9 Civil Cover Sheet, # 10 Civil Cover Sheet Attachment)(McLaughlin, Jeremy) (Filed on 2/12/2014) Modified on 2/12/2014 (dtmS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 02/12/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF

Statistics

This case has been viewed 81 times.

Space
Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
 
PlainSite
Sign Up
Need Password Help?