United States v. $20,000.00 In U.S. Currency
Federal Civil Lawsuit Indiana Northern District Court, Case No. 2:14-cv-00357

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated January 13, 2019 at 11:51 PM ST (2.8 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Citation Section 21 U.S.C. § 881
Nature of Suit Drug Related Seizure of Property
  Entries (14) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 3/13/2015, Entered: None Clerks Judgment
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 3/13/2015, Entered: None Order on Motion for Judgment of Forfeiture
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 3/12/2015, Entered: None Judgment of Forfeiture
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 11/24/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
        OPINION AND ORDER: Court DENIES 7 Motion to Dismiss Verified Complaint in Rem. Signed by Magistrate Judge Paul R Cherry on 11/24/2014. (tc)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 11/14/2014, Entered: None Notice of Full Consent to Magistrate Judge - Standard
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 11/10/2014, Entered: None Response to Motion
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 11/4/2014, Entered: None Mag Consent Forms Sent - Standard - pptc already held or no pptc - form will be generated
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 10/27/2014, Entered: None Dismiss
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 10/27/2014, Entered: None Affidavit
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 10/27/2014, Entered: None Notice of Appearance
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 10/27/2014, Entered: None Answer
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 10/2/2014, Entered: None Certificate of Service
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 10/2/2014, Entered: None Warrant Issued
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 10/2/2014, Entered: None Complaint
                              Request RequestSpace LREF

                              Statistics

                              This case has been viewed 1 time.

                              No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                              Space
                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                               
                              PlainSite
                              Sign Up
                              Need Password Help?