Ester v. Bristol-Myers Squibb Company

Federal Civil Lawsuit New Jersey District Court, Case No. 3:13-cv-05414
Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated December 5, 2018 at 5:29 AM EST (6.4 years ago) Update UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert AlertsSpaceJump Jump
Summary

No one has written a summary of this case yet. Sign up or sign in to contribute one.

Parties
No Logo Bernice Fikes, Plaintiff
No Logo CHARLES WRIGHT, Plaintiff
No Logo Donnie Green, Plaintiff
No Logo Felicia Thomas, Plaintiff
No Logo Hayden Richardson, Plaintiff
No Logo Ike Morris, Plaintiff
No Logo Manda Williams, Plaintiff
No Logo Mary Joe Griffin, Plaintiff
No Logo Nader Ghaidi, Plaintiff
No Logo Patricia Hough, Plaintiff
No Logo Patrick Vigil, Plaintiff
No Logo Phyllis Miller, Plaintiff
No Logo Ray Whorton, Plaintiff
No Logo Rebecca Farr, Plaintiff
No Logo Ron Roberts, Plaintiff
No Logo Rosemarie Lowe, Plaintiff
No Logo Semetra Thomas, Plaintiff
No Logo Shirley Ester, Plaintiff

Represented by Audet & Partners, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space William M. Audet +1 415 568 2555 +1 415 568 2556 waudet@audetlaw.com
Space Joshua Caleb Ezrin +1 415 568 2555 +1 415 568 2556 jezrin@audetlaw.com
No Logo Tina Romero, Plaintiff
v.
Bristol-Myers Squibb Company Bristol-Myers Squibb Company, Defendant

Represented by Arnold & Porter, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Jeremy Michael McLaughlin +1 415 471 3297 +1 415 471 3400 jeremy.mclaughlin@aporter.com

Represented by COUNSEL NOT ADMITTED TO USDC-NJ BAR

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Maurice Abraham Leiter +1 213 243 4040 +1 213 243 4199
Space Sharon D. Mayo +1 415 471 3100 +1 415 471 3400

Represented by HEPWORTH JANIS & KLUKSDAL

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Michael J. Baker +1 415 471 3100 +1 415 471 3400
McKesson Corporation McKesson Corporation, Defendant
Other Parties
No Logo PLAVIX PRODUCT LIABILITY AND MARKETING LITIGATION, In Re
Attributes
Citation Section 28 U.S.C. § 1441
Nature of Suit Personal Injury: Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury Product Liability
Timeline
  Entries (36) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 5/1/2018, Entered: None Stipulation of Dismissal
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 4/30/2018, Entered: None Stipulation of Dismissal
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 4/30/2018, Entered: None Stipulation of Dismissal
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 4/30/2018, Entered: None Stipulation of Dismissal
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 4/30/2018, Entered: None Stipulation of Dismissal
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 4/30/2018, Entered: None Stipulation of Dismissal
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 4/27/2018, Entered: None Stipulation of Dismissal
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 4/27/2018, Entered: None Stipulation of Dismissal
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 4/27/2018, Entered: None Stipulation of Dismissal
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 3/13/2018, Entered: None Stipulation of Dismissal
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 2/28/2018, Entered: None Stipulation of Dismissal
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 7/20/2015, Entered: None Stipulation of Dismissal
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 7/20/2015, Entered: None Stipulation of Dismissal
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 7/15/2015, Entered: None Order
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 7/14/2015, Entered: None Order on Motion to Dismiss
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 7/6/2015, Entered: None Dismiss
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 5/18/2015, Entered: None Order
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 10/2/2014, Entered: None Order
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 10/1/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER granting in part and denying in part Plaintiff's motion for remand; Denying as to Civil Action No's. 13-1262, 13-1264 and 13-5414. Signed by Judge Freda L. Wolfson on 10/1/2014. (eaj) Modified on 10/1/2014 (eaj, ). (Entered: 10/01/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 10/1/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
OPINION filed. Signed by Judge Freda L. Wolfson on 10/1/2014. (eaj) (Entered: 10/01/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 10/21/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
STIPULATION AND ORDER that the Remand Motion and the Parties' briefing on the motion and any Order of this Court issued thereon, shall apply to the 19 recently transferred Plavix actions and to the additional Plavix cases filed by these Plaintiffs' counsel that are transferred from the Northern District of California to the MDL. Signed by Judge Freda L. Wolfson on 10/21/2013. (eaj) (Entered: 10/21/2013)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 10/17/2013, Entered: None
Letter from Monica N. Watson. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(KAMISON, MONICA) (Entered: 10/17/2013)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 9/11/2013, Entered: None
Clerk's Notification Letter. (dm ) (Entered: 09/11/2013)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 9/11/2013, Entered: None
Certified Copy of Transfer Order and docket received, Case transferred in from District of California Northern; Case Number 3:13-cv-03778. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. (Entered: 09/11/2013)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 9/10/2013, Entered: None
CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER by MDL Panel TRANSFERRING CASE to the District of New Jersey. (slhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/10/2013) (Entered: 09/10/2013)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 9/4/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
CLERKS NOTICE - Judge Chen's letter re: consent before magistrate judge (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/4/2013) (Entered: 09/04/2013)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 9/4/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
STANDING ORDER. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 9/4/13. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/4/2013) (Entered: 09/04/2013)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 9/4/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
CASE MANAGEMENT SCHEDULING ORDER: Case Management Statement due by 10/24/2013. Case Management Conference set for 10/31/2013 09:00 AM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco.. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 9/4/13. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/4/2013) (Entered: 09/04/2013)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 8/30/2013, Entered: None
MOTION to Stay the Proceedings Pending Transfer to the Plavix MDL filed by Bristol-Myers Squibb Company. Motion Hearing set for 10/10/2013 01:30 PM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Edward M. Chen. Responses due by 9/13/2013. Replies due by 9/20/2013. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G, # 8 Exhibit H, # 9 Exhibit I, # 10 Exhibit J, # 11 Exhibit K, # 12 Exhibit L, # 13 Proposed Order, # 14 Certificate/Proof of Service)(McLaughlin, Jeremy) (Filed on 8/30/2013) (Entered: 08/30/2013)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 8/27/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Hon. Edward M. Chen for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Kandis A. Westmore no longer assigned to the case. Signed by the Executive Committee on August 27, 2013. (cjl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/27/2013) (Entered: 08/27/2013)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 8/26/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
CLERK'S NOTICE of Impending Reassignment to U.S. District Judge (sisS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/26/2013) (Entered: 08/26/2013)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 8/22/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Bristol-Myers Squibb Company.. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate/Proof of Service)(McLaughlin, Jeremy) (Filed on 8/22/2013) (Entered: 08/22/2013)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 8/21/2013, Entered: None
ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) (with jury demand) by Bristol-Myers Squibb Company. (McLaughlin, Jeremy) (Filed on 8/21/2013) Modified on 8/22/2013 (cjlS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 08/21/2013)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 8/14/2013, Entered: None
ADR SCHEDULING ORDER: Case Management Statement due by 11/12/2013. Case Management Conference set for 11/19/2013 01:30 PM in Courtroom 4, 3rd Floor, Oakland. (Attachments: # 1 Standing Order)(cjl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/14/2013) (Entered: 08/16/2013)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 8/14/2013, Entered: None
Certificate of Interested Entities by Bristol-Myers Squibb Company. (cjl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/14/2013) (Entered: 08/16/2013)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 8/14/2013, Entered: None
NOTICE OF REMOVAL (No Process) (jury demand by Plaintiff) from San Francisco Superior Court. Their case number is CGC-13-533459. (Filing fee $400 receipt number 34611088900). Filed by Bristol-Myers Squibb Company. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit, # 2 Exhibit, # 3 Exhibit, # 4 Exhibit, # 5 Exhibit, # 6 Exhibit, # 7 Exhibit, # 8 Exhibit, # 9 Civil Cover Sheet)(cjl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/14/2013) Modified on 8/16/2013 (cjl, COURT STAFF). Modified on 8/22/2013 (cjlS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 08/16/2013)
Request RequestSpace LREF

Statistics

This case has been viewed 76 times.

Space
Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
 
PlainSite
Sign Up
Need Password Help?