El v. Mayor of the City of New York
Federal Civil Lawsuit New York Eastern District Court, Case No. 1:13-cv-04079

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated January 14, 2019 at 12:58 PM ST (2.3 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Aneb Senkita El, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED TTAB Attorney Placeholder janwaresq@yahoo.com
v.
No Logo Captain of the 88th Precinct, Defendant
No Logo G. Grasso, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Office of the New York Attorney General

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 04/16/2015, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Anthony John Tomari +1 212 416 8553 +1 212 416 6075 anthony.tomari@oag.state.ny.us
No Logo J, S C., Defendant
No Logo Jane Doe, Defendant
No Logo John Doe, Defendant
No Logo Lt. Winston Faison, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by City of New York

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Omar Javed Siddiqi +1 212 356 2381 osiddiqi@law.nyc.gov
No Logo M. Gerstein, Defendant
No Logo M. Sciarrino, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Office of the New York Attorney General

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 04/16/2015, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Anthony John Tomari +1 212 416 8553 +1 212 416 6075 anthony.tomari@oag.state.ny.us
Bloomberg, Michael Rubens Bloomberg, Michael Rubens, Defendant
Officially listed as "Mayor Michael Bloomberg"

Toggle Switch Represented by City of New York

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Omar Javed Siddiqi +1 212 356 2381 osiddiqi@law.nyc.gov

Toggle Switch Represented by New York Law Dept.

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Ryan Glenn Shaffer +1 212 788 1041 +1 212 788 9776 rshaffer@law.nyc.gov
No Logo Officer Kinny, Defendant
No Logo Officer Morrison, Defendant
No Logo Officer Jerry Thompson, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by City of New York

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Omar Javed Siddiqi +1 212 356 2381 osiddiqi@law.nyc.gov
No Logo Paul Mysliwiec, Defendant
No Logo Sergeant Davis, Defendant
Citation Section 28 U.S.C. § 1331
Nature of Suit Civil Rights: Other
  Entries (87) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 83 Filed: 11/8/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS, No party has filed an objection to the R&R, and the time to do so has passed. For the foregoing reasons. Magistrate Judge Tiscione's R&R is adopted, in its entirety, as the opinion of the Court. Defenda nts' motion is granted, and this action is dismissed with prejudice for failure to prosecute. Regardless of whether and by whom filing fees may have been paid to commence this action, the Court certifies, pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 1915(a)(3), that any appeal from this Order would not be taken in good faith and, therefore, in forma pauperis status is denied for the purpose of any appeal. Coppedge v. United States, 369 U.S. 438,444-45, 82 S. Ct. 917, 8 L. Ed.2d 21 (1962). The Clerk of Court is directed to enter judgment accordingly and to close this case. (Ordered by Judge Eric N. Vitaliano on 11/6/2018) c/m Fwd. for Judgment. (Galeano, Sonia)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 78 Filed: 3/16/2017, Entered: None Dismiss/Lack of Prosecution
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 77 Filed: 1/30/2017, Entered: None Telephone Conference
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 76 Filed: 12/15/2016, Entered: None Status Report
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 75 Filed: 10/18/2016, Entered: None Settlement Conference
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 74 Filed: 10/17/2016, Entered: None Letter
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 73 Filed: 10/10/2016, Entered: None Adjourn Conference
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 70 Filed: 9/23/2016, Entered: None Adjourn Conference
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 69 Filed: 8/23/2016, Entered: None Letter
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 66 Filed: 3/16/2016, Entered: None Answer to Amended Complaint
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 65 Filed: 2/12/2016, Entered: None Extension of Time to File Answer
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 64 Filed: 2/2/2016, Entered: None Affidavit of Service
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document 63 Filed: 1/30/2016, Entered: None Amended Complaint
                            LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 62 Filed: 1/8/2016, Entered: None Status Report
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 62 Filed: 1/7/2016, Entered: None
                              STATUS REPORT by Aneb Senkita El (Anwar, Amer) (Entered: 01/07/2016)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 61 Filed: 11/12/2015, Entered: None Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Amend
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 60 Filed: 11/10/2015, Entered: None Extension of Time to Amend
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 60 Filed: 11/9/2015, Entered: None
                                    Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to Amend 39 Amended Complaint by Aneb Senkita El. (Barrett, C) (Entered: 11/10/2015)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 59 Filed: 10/5/2015, Entered: None Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Amend
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 58 Filed: 10/5/2015, Entered: None Extension of Time to Amend
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 57 Filed: 9/21/2015, Entered: None Extension of Time to File Document
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 56 Filed: 9/9/2015, Entered: None NOTICE of Change of Address/Firm/Email
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 56 Filed: 9/4/2015, Entered: None
                                              NOTICE of Change of Email by Amer J Anwar. (Email on docket sheet updated accordingly.) (Barrett, C) (Entered: 09/09/2015)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 55 Filed: 9/4/2015, Entered: None Settlement Conference
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 54 Filed: 8/19/2015, Entered: None Docket Call
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 54 Filed: 8/18/2015, Entered: None
                                                    DOCKET CALL for Telephone Conference scheduled to proceed before MJ Pollak on 8/17/2015. Plaintiff's counsel appears late. Settlement conference scheduled for 9/4/15 at 9:30 a.m. (Wiener, Benjamin) (Wiener, Benjamin) (Entered: 08/18/2015)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 53 Filed: 8/13/2015, Entered: None Adjourn Conference
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 52 Filed: 6/24/2015, Entered: None Status Conference
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 51 Filed: 6/24/2015, Entered: None Notice of Appearance
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 6/17/2015, Entered: None Letter
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 6/16/2015, Entered: None
                                                              Letter dated 6/16/2015 from Aneb Senkita El to the Honorable Sandra L. Townes, re several date errors in the 39 Amended Complaint. (Barrett, C) (Entered: 06/17/2015)
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 6/12/2015, Entered: None Compel
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 5/29/2015, Entered: None
                                                                  Notice of MOTION to Compel Mandatory Disclosure FRCP R37 by Aneb Senkita El. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit in Support, # 2 Envelope) (Barrett, C) (Entered: 06/12/2015)
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 4/22/2015, Entered: None Letter
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 4/21/2015, Entered: None
                                                                      Letter dated 4/20/2015 from Aneb Senkita El to Mr. Siddiqi, seeking all documents related to the release forms he (Aneb Senkita El) signed and contact information for the remaining 3 defendants who were not listed in the "Answer to the first amended "verified" complaint by Defendants Michael Bloomberg, Winston Faison and Jerry Thompson." (Barrett, C) (Entered: 04/22/2015)
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 4/10/2015, Entered: None Answer to Amended Complaint
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 3/26/2015, Entered: None Scheduling Order
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 3/25/2015, Entered: None Status Conference
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 2/5/2015, Entered: None Scheduling Order
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 2/4/2015, Entered: None Status Conference
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 1/28/2015, Entered: None Certificate of Service
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 1/21/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                    AFFIRMATION OF SERVICE by Deponent Messiah A. Bey, on behalf of Aneb Senkita El, re 39 Amended Complaint. Amended Complaint served upon Anthony Tasso, received by agent at "1 Police Plaza on the 9th Fl. 12/30/2014 New York, N.Y. 10007." (Barrett, C) (Entered: 01/28/2015)
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 1/21/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                      ANSWER to 39 Amended Complaint by Michael Bloomberg. (Siddiqi, Omar) (Entered: 01/21/2015)
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 1/13/2015, Entered: None Summons Issued
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 1/6/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                          Amended Summons Issued as to Davis, Kinny, Morrison. (Barrett, C) (Entered: 01/13/2015)
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 12/24/2014, Entered: None Amended Complaint
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 12/21/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                              AMENDED COMPLAINT , with Jury Demand, against Michael Bloomberg, Captain of the 88th Precinct, Davis, Winston Faison, M. Gerstein, John Doe, Kinny, Morrison, Jerry Thompson, filed by Aneb Senkita El. (Barrett, C) (Entered: 12/24/2014)
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 11/25/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                ORDER granting 37 On 11/21/14, plaintiff moved for an extension of time to amend his complaint. The motion is hereby GRANTED. Plaintiff is to file his amended complaint by 12/21/14. Defendant is to answer or otherwise respond by 1/21/15. The conference previously scheduled for 1/21/15 is rescheduled to 2/4/15 at 10:00 a.m. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl L. Pollak on 11/25/2014. (Caggiano, Diana) (Entered: 11/25/2014)
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 11/21/2014, Entered: None Extension of Time to Amend
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 11/21/2014, Entered: None Extension of Time to Amend
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                      Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 10/22/2014, Entered: None Order(Other)
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 10/21/2014, Entered: None Status Conference
                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 10/3/2014, Entered: None Scheduling Order
                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 10/2/2014, Entered: None Order on Motion to Dismiss
                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 9/30/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                              MEMORANDUM AND ORDER: State Defendants' motion to dismiss 26 is granted. Accordingly, Defendants Sciarrino and Grasso are dismissed from this action. Ordered by Judge Sandra L. Townes on 9/30/14. C/M by Chambers. (Frullo, Veronica) Modified on 10/3/2014 (Frullo, Veronica). (Entered: 10/02/2014)
                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 5/6/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                NOTICE of Change of address by Aneb Senkita El. (Guzzi, Roseann) (Entered: 05/08/2014)
                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 5/6/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                  AFFIDAVIT in Support by pro se petitioner Aneb Senkita El. (Guzzi, Roseann) (Entered: 05/08/2014)
                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 1/15/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                    NOTICE of Appearance by Omar Javed Siddiqi on behalf of Michael Bloomberg (aty to be noticed) (Siddiqi, Omar) (Entered: 01/15/2014)
                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 1/10/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                      AFFIDAVIT/DECLARATION in Opposition re 26 Notice of MOTION to Dismiss the Complaint, 28 MOTION to Dismiss -Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion to Dismiss-, 27 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction -Notice Pursuant to Local Rule 12.1 filed by Aneb Senkita El. (Tomari, Anthony) (Entered: 01/10/2014)
                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 1/10/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                        MOTION to Dismiss -Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion to Dismiss- by G. Grasso, M. Sciarrino. Responses due by 1/10/2014 (Tomari, Anthony) (Entered: 01/10/2014)
                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 1/10/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                          MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction -Notice Pursuant to Local Rule 12.1 by G. Grasso, M. Sciarrino. Responses due by 1/10/2014 (Tomari, Anthony) (Entered: 01/10/2014)
                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 1/10/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                            Notice of MOTION to Dismiss the Complaint by G. Grasso, M. Sciarrino. Responses due by 1/10/2014 (Tomari, Anthony) (Entered: 01/10/2014)
                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 11/7/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                              ORDER dated that the State Defendants' request for permission to move to dismiss is granted; Ordered that the State Defendants shall serve their motion papers on plaintiff on or before 11/20/13; that plaintiff shall serve his response to the motion on the State defendants by mailing a copy to Assistant Attorney General Anthony J. Tomari at 120 Broadway, New York, NY 10271, on or before December 20, 2013; and that the State defendants shall have until January 10, 2014, in which to serve their reply, if any, and to file the fully briefed motion with the Court. ( Ordered by Judge Sandra L. Townes on 11/1/2013 ) c/m to plaintiff (Guzzi, Roseann) (Entered: 11/07/2013)
                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 11/4/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                ORDER granting 19 Motion to Stay. The Court grants the City defendants' Motion to Stay discovery in the instant matter, pending the conclusion ofplaintiffs underlying criminal charges. Further, plaintiff is Ordered to provide the Court with his current address and phone number. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl L. Pollak on 11/4/2013. (Caggiano, Diana) (Entered: 11/04/2013)
                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 11/1/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                  MEMORANDUM AND ORDER: This Court declines to issue an order to show cause directing defendants to respond to plaintiff's motion for injunctive relief. The Court certifies pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 1915(a)(3) that any appeal from this order would not be taken in good faith. Coppedge v. United States, 369 U.S. 438, 444-45 (1962). Ordered by Judge Sandra L. Townes on 10/31/2013. (Frullo, Veronica) (Entered: 11/01/2013)
                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 10/30/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                    Proposed MOTION for Order to Show Cause Affidavit in support by Aneb Senkita El. (Guzzi, Roseann) (Entered: 10/30/2013)
                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 9/26/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                      MEMORANDUM AND ORDER dated 9/10/13 that the Court declines to issue the 18 Motion for Order to Show Cause. The Court grants plaintiff's motion to vacate this Court's order dated 8/28/13, which set a briefing schedule for the State defendants' motion to dismiss. Plaintiff shall have until 9/30/13, in which to file a response to the State defendants' 8/9/13, pre-motion conference request that complies with the requirements set forth in this Memorandum and Order. Finally, while this Court does not perceive any need to amend the complaint, plaintiff is free to pursue any remedies available to him under Rule 15(a) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. This Court certifies pursuant to 28:1915(a)(3) that any appeal from this order would not be taken in good faith. Coppedge v. United States, 369 U.S. 438, 444-45(1962). ( Ordered by Judge Sandra L. Townes on 9/10/2013 ) (Guzzi, Roseann) (Entered: 09/26/2013)
                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 9/13/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                        REPLY in Opposition re 19 MOTION to Stay filed by pro se plaintiff Aneb Senkita El. (Guzzi, Roseann) (Entered: 09/16/2013)
                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 9/9/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                          MOTION to Stay by Michael Bloomberg. (Shaffer, Ryan) (Entered: 09/09/2013)
                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 9/9/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                            MOTION for Order to Show Cause Proposed Order to Show Cause submitted by Pro Se plaintiff by Aneb Senkita El. (Attachments: # 1 Letter enclosing missing pages of complaint, # 2 Letter, # 3 Affidavit of Fact) (Guzzi, Roseann) (Entered: 09/09/2013)
                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 8/30/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                              MEMORANDUM AND ORDER dated 8/30/13 that the Court declines to issue the proposed 15 Motion for Order to Show Cause order to show cause directing defendants to respond to plaintiff's motion for injunctive relief. The Court certifies pursuant to 28:1915(a)(3) that any appeal from this order would not be taken in good faith. Coppedge v. United States, 369 U.S. 438,444-45(1962). ( Ordered by Judge Sandra L. Townes on 8/28/2013 ) (Guzzi, Roseann) (Entered: 08/30/2013)
                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 8/30/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                ORDER dated 8/28/13 re: defendants' 14 Motion for Pre Motion Conference; State defendants' request for permission to dismiss is granted. See Scheduling order. ( Ordered by Judge Sandra L. Townes on 8/28/2013 ) (Guzzi, Roseann) (Entered: 08/30/2013)
                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 8/27/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                  MOTION for Order to Show Cause by Aneb Senkita El. (Siegfried, Evan) (Entered: 08/27/2013)
                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 8/9/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                    Letter MOTION for pre motion conference re 1 Complaint by G. Grasso, M. Sciarrino. (Tomari, Anthony) (Entered: 08/09/2013)
                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 8/7/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                      SCHEDULING ORDER: An in-person initial conference will be held at 2:00 PM on OCTOBER 30, 2013 before United States Magistrate Judge Cheryl L. Pollak, in Courtroom 13-B South at 225 Cadman Plaza East, Brooklyn, New York. Parties must check in with chambers, Room 1230, upon arrival. Counsel for all parties as well as the pro se plaintiff must be present. Defendants' counsel is requested to confirm this conference date and time with the pro se plaintiff. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl L. Pollak on 8/7/2013. (Caggiano, Diana) (Entered: 08/07/2013)
                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 8/7/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                        ENDOSED LETTER ORDER granting 11 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply. (answer due 10/9/13) So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl L. Pollak on 8/7/2013. (Caggiano, Diana) (Entered: 08/07/2013)
                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 8/6/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                          MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 1 Complaint by Michael Bloomberg. (Shaffer, Ryan) (Entered: 08/06/2013)
                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 7/30/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                            SUMMONS Returned Executed by Aneb Senkita El.; M. Sciarrino served on 7/19/2013, answer due 8/9/2013. (Guzzi, Roseann) (Entered: 07/31/2013)
                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 7/30/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                              SUMMONS Returned Executed by Aneb Senkita El.; Thompson served on 7/23/2013, answer due 8/13/2013. (Guzzi, Roseann) (Entered: 07/31/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 7/30/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                SUMMONS Returned Executed by Aneb Senkita El.; G. Grasso served on 7/19/2013, answer due 8/9/2013. (Guzzi, Roseann) (Entered: 07/31/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 7/30/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                  SUMMONS Returned Executed by Aneb Senkita El.; Michael Bloomberg served on 7/19/2013, answer due 8/9/2013. (Guzzi, Roseann) (Entered: 07/31/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 7/30/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                    SUMMONS Returned Executed by Aneb Senkita El.; Lt. Faison served on 7/26/2013, answer due 8/16/2013. (Guzzi, Roseann) (Entered: 07/31/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 7/23/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER: The Court's records reflect that the complaint in this action was filed on July 17, 2013. If service is not made upon defendants by November 14, 2013, or plaintiff fails to show good cause why such service has not been effected, it will be recommended that the Court dismiss this action without prejudice. Plaintiff shall promptly advise the Court once defendants have been served. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl L. Pollak on 7/23/2013. (Caggiano, Diana) (Entered: 07/23/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 7/17/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                        FILING FEE: $ 400, receipt number 4653061634 (Bowens, Priscilla) (Barrett, C). (Entered: 07/18/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 7/18/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                          In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link:http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Bowens, Priscilla) (Entered: 07/18/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 7/17/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                            Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (Bowens, Priscilla) (Entered: 07/18/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 7/17/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                              COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Aneb Senkita El. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Bowens, Priscilla) (Entered: 07/18/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                                                                                                                                Statistics

                                                                                                                                                                                This case has been viewed 22 times.

                                                                                                                                                                                No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                                                Space
                                                                                                                                                                                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                 
                                                                                                                                                                                PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                                                Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                                                Need Password Help?