Erik Manning v. DynCorp International, LLC
Appeal Court of Appeals for the Fourth Circuit, Case No. 14-2031

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated December 21, 2016 at 6:13 AM EST (5 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Space Space

Nature of Suit 4896 - Other Statutes
  Entries (14) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19
    Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18
      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 10/28/2014, Entered: None
      ORDER filed [999464165] terminating Motion for writ of mandamus (FRAP 21) [999446801-2]; granting Motion to dismiss appeal [16], dismissing appeal pursuant to FRAP 42(b) [17] Copies to all parties.. [14-2035] (BB)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 10/28/2014, Entered: None
        CONSENT/STIPULATION by Appellant DynCorp International LLC in 14-2031, Petitioner DynCorp International LLC in 14-2035 to dismiss appeal [16] [14-2031, 14-2035] John Remy
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 10/27/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
          DISTRICT COURT UPDATE. ORDER denying [53] Motion to Stay. Signed by District Judge Claude M. Hilton on 10/27/14. (see order for further details) [14-2031, 14-2035] (JB)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 10/10/2014, Entered: None
            TRANSCRIPT ORDER ACKNOWLEDGMENT filed for Tracy Westfall. Identify by proceeding and date all transcript ordered from this court reporter: Motion Hearing 05/09/2014. Names of all parties ordering transcript from this reporter: DynCorp International LLC.. Originating case number: 1:13-cv-00661-CMH-TRJ. Transcript due from Tracy Westfall, Official Court Reporter on 12/16/2014. [14-2031, 14-2035] (BB)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 10/10/2014, Entered: None
              DOCKETING STATEMENT by Appellant DynCorp International LLC. [14-2031] John Remy
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 10/10/2014, Entered: None
                DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS (Local Rule 26.1) by Appellant DynCorp International LLC in 14-2031, Petitioner DynCorp International LLC in 14-2035. Was any question on Disclosure Form answered yes? Yes [999453753] [14-2031, 14-2035] John Remy
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 10/10/2014, Entered: None
                  APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL (Local Rule 46(c)) by Collin O'Connor Udell for DynCorp International LLC in 14-2031, 14-2035.[999453751] [14-2031, 14-2035] John Remy
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 10/10/2014, Entered: None
                    APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL (Local Rule 46(c)) by John M. Remy for DynCorp International LLC in 14-2031, 14-2035.[999453748] [14-2031, 14-2035] John Remy
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 9/30/2014, Entered: None
                      DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS (Local Rule 26.1) by Appellee Erik Manning. Was any question on Disclosure Form answered yes? No [999446589] [14-2031] Nicholas Hantzes
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 9/30/2014, Entered: None
                        APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL (Local Rule 46(c)) by Nicholas Hantzes for Erik Manning.[999446584] [14-2031] Nicholas Hantzes
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 9/30/2014, Entered: None
                          DOCKETING NOTICE issued Re: [1] case docketed Initial forms due within 14 days. Originating case number: 1:13-cv-00661-CMH-TRJ.. [14-2031] (BB)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 9/30/2014, Entered: None
                            Case docketed. Originating case number: 1:13-cv-00661-CMH-TRJ. Case manager: Brian Bain. [14-2031] (BB)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF

                              Statistics

                              This case has been viewed 165 times.

                              No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                              Space
                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                               
                              PlainSite
                              Sign Up
                              Need Password Help?