Great Oak NC Lender v. Marshall Cornblum
Appeal Court of Appeals for the Fourth Circuit, Case No. 14-2039

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated December 21, 2016 at 8:58 AM EST (5 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Space Space

Nature of Suit 4896 - Other Statutes
  Entries (15) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17
    Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16
      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15
        Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14
          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13
            Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 11/7/2014, Entered: None
            FULL ELECTRONIC APPENDIX and full paper appendix by Appellants Carolyn Cornblum, Madeline H. Cornblum, Marshall E. Cornblum, Michael Cornblum and Longbranch Properties, LLC. Method of Filing Paper Copies: hand delivery. Date paper copies mailed dispatched or delivered to court: 11/07/2014. Has district court 90-day restriction expired for all transcripts included in appendix? Not applicable. The electronic appendix is initially restricted to case participants only. Case participants must be logged into CM/ECF to view the appendix prior to public release. Appendices in Immigration and Social Security cases will remain restricted.[999471625] [14-2039] John Branch
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 11/7/2014, Entered: None
              BRIEF by Appellants Carolyn Cornblum, Madeline H. Cornblum, Marshall E. Cornblum, Michael Cornblum and Longbranch Properties, LLC in electronic and paper format. Type of Brief: OPENING. Method of Filing Paper Copies: hand delivery. Date Paper Copies Mailed, Dispatched, or Delivered to Court: 11/07/2014. [999471611] [14-2039] John Branch
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 10/15/2014, Entered: None
                DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS (Local Rule 26.1) by Appellee Great Oak NC Lender, LLC. Was any question on Disclosure Form answered yes? No [999455583] [14-2039] Lynn Moffa
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 10/15/2014, Entered: None
                  APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL (Local Rule 46(c)) by Lynn Dee Moffa for Great Oak NC Lender, LLC.[999455581] [14-2039] Lynn Moffa
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 10/15/2014, Entered: None
                    DOCKETING STATEMENT by Appellants Carolyn Cornblum, Madeline H. Cornblum, Marshall E. Cornblum, Michael Cornblum and Longbranch Properties, LLC. [14-2039] John Branch
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 10/15/2014, Entered: None
                      DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS (Local Rule 26.1) by Appellants Carolyn Cornblum, Madeline H. Cornblum, Marshall E. Cornblum, Michael Cornblum and Longbranch Properties, LLC. Was any question on Disclosure Form answered yes? No [999454968] [14-2039] John Branch
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 10/15/2014, Entered: None
                        APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL (Local Rule 46(c)) by John E. Branch, III for Carolyn Cornblum, Madeline H. Cornblum, Marshall E. Cornblum, Michael Cornblum and Longbranch Properties, LLC.[999454966] [14-2039] John Branch
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 10/1/2014, Entered: None
                          BRIEFING ORDER filed. Opening Brief and Appendix due 11/10/2014. Response Brief due 12/15/2014 [14-2039] (SAW)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 10/1/2014, Entered: None
                            DOCKETING NOTICE issued Re: [1] case docketed Initial forms due within 14 days. Originating case number: 2:12-cv-00069-MR. [14-2039] (SAW)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 10/1/2014, Entered: None
                              Case docketed. Originating case number: 2:12-cv-00069-MR. Case manager: SWiley. [14-2039] (SAW)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF

                                Statistics

                                This case has been viewed 108 times.

                                No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                Space
                                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                 
                                PlainSite
                                Sign Up
                                Need Password Help?