Diercks et al v. Bristol-Myers Squibb Company et al

Federal Civil Lawsuit New Jersey District Court, Case No. 3:14-cv-01264
District Judge Freda L. Wolfson, presiding
Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
District Judge Freda L. Wolfson
Last Updated April 30, 2018 at 7:49 PM EDT (7 years ago) Update UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert AlertsSpaceJump Jump
Summary

No one has written a summary of this case yet. Sign up or sign in to contribute one.

Parties
No Logo Bernice Fikes, Plaintiff
No Logo CHARLES JOHNSON, Plaintiff
No Logo CHARLES WRIGHT, Plaintiff
No Logo Charlotte Morris, Plaintiff
No Logo DONALD GREEN, Plaintiff
No Logo Felicia Thomas, Plaintiff
No Logo Hayden Richardson, Plaintiff
No Logo Joseph Malancone, Plaintiff
No Logo Karen Kelley, Plaintiff
No Logo Manda Williams, Plaintiff
No Logo Michael Diercks, Plaintiff

Represented by Audet & Partners, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED William M. Audet +1 415 568 2555 +1 415 568 2556 waudet@audetlaw.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Joshua Caleb Ezrin +1 415 568 2555 +1 415 568 2556 jezrin@audetlaw.com
No Logo Nader Ghaidi, Plaintiff
No Logo Patricia Hough, Plaintiff
No Logo Patrick Vigil, Plaintiff
No Logo Phyllis Miller, Plaintiff
No Logo Ray Whorton, Plaintiff
No Logo Rick Cunningham, Plaintiff
No Logo Ron Roberts, Plaintiff
No Logo Rosemarie Lowe, Plaintiff
No Logo Semetra Thomas, Plaintiff
No Logo Shirley Ester, Plaintiff
No Logo Tina Romero, Plaintiff
v.
Bristol-Myers Squibb Company Bristol-Myers Squibb Company, Defendant

Represented by Arnold & Porter, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jeremy Michael McLaughlin +1 415 471 3297 +1 415 471 3400 jeremy.mclaughlin@aporter.com

Represented by COUNSEL NOT ADMITTED TO USDC-NJ BAR

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Maurice Abraham Leiter +1 213 243 4040 +1 213 243 4199
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Sharon D. Mayo +1 415 471 3100 +1 415 471 3400

Represented by HEPWORTH JANIS & KLUKSDAL

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Michael J. Baker +1 415 471 3100 +1 415 471 3400
McKesson Corporation McKesson Corporation, Defendant
Attributes
Citation Section 28 U.S.C. § 1332
Nature of Suit 367 - Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury Product Liability
Timeline
  Entries (31) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 4/30/2018, Entered: None Stipulation of Dismissal
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 4/30/2018, Entered: None Stipulation of Dismissal
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 4/20/2018, Entered: None Stipulation and Order
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 4/18/2018, Entered: None Stipulation of Dismissal
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 7/20/2015, Entered: None Stipulation of Dismissal
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 7/14/2015, Entered: None Order on Motion to Dismiss
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 7/6/2015, Entered: None Dismiss
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 10/1/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER granting in part and denying in part Plaintiff's motion for remand; Denying as to Civil Action No's. 13-1262, 13-1264 and 13-5414. Signed by Judge Freda L. Wolfson on 10/1/2014. (eaj) (Entered: 10/01/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 10/1/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
OPINION filed. Signed by Judge Freda L. Wolfson on 10/1/2014. (eaj) (Entered: 10/01/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 9/12/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER Vacating the Remand Order and Opinion filed 9/12/2014. Signed by Judge Freda L. Wolfson on 9/12/2014. (eaj) (Entered: 09/12/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 9/12/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER granting the Motion to Remand in Civil Action No. 13-2418; Ordering that the above listed cases are remanded to the United States District Court for the Northern District of California for the purpose of remanding the cases to the California State Superior Court, San Francisco Division. Signed by Judge Freda L. Wolfson on 9/12/2014. (eaj) (Entered: 09/12/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 9/12/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
OPINION filed. Signed by Judge Freda L. Wolfson on 9/12/2014. (eaj) (Entered: 09/12/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 2/27/2014, Entered: None
Clerk's Notice to Counsel. (dm ) (Entered: 02/27/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 2/27/2014, Entered: None
Certified Copy of Transfer Order and docket received, Case transferred in from District of California Northern; Case Number 3:14-cv-00572. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. (Entered: 02/27/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 2/26/2014, Entered: None
CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-22) by The United States Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation TRANSFERRING CASE to the United States District Court for the District of New Jersey, MDL No. 2418. (tnS) (Filed on 2/26/2014) (Entered: 02/26/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 2/14/2014, Entered: None
Certificate of Interested Entities filed by McKesson Corporation -Defendant McKesson Corporation's Certification of Interested Entities of Persons (Attachments: # 1 Certificate/Proof of Service)(McLaughlin, Jeremy) (Filed on 2/14/2014) (Entered: 02/14/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 2/14/2014, Entered: None
CLERK'S NOTICE VACATING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Due to the stay in this case the Case Management Conference set for 6/4/2014 is VACATED. This is a text only entry. There is no document associated with this notice. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/14/2014) (Entered: 02/14/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 2/14/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
STIPULATION AND ORDER re 11 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER - Joint Stipulation and [Proposed] Order to Stay Litigation Pending Transfer to The Plavix MDL filed by Bristol-Myers Squibb Company. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on February 14, 2014. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/14/2014) (Entered: 02/14/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 2/13/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
CLERK'S NOTICE SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Case Management Statement due by 5/21/2014. Initial Case Management Conference set for 6/4/2014 at 2:00 PM in Courtroom 9, 19th Floor, San Francisco. (Attachments: # 1 Standing Order, # 2 Standing Order for All Judges of the Northern District) (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/13/2014) (Entered: 02/13/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 2/13/2014, Entered: None
ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand filed by McKesson Corporation. (McLaughlin, Jeremy) (Filed on 2/13/2014) (Entered: 02/13/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 2/13/2014, Entered: None
STIPULATION WITH [PROPOSED] ORDER; -Joint Stipulation and [Proposed] Order to Stay Litigation Pending Transfer to The Plavix MDL filed by Bristol-Myers Squibb Company. (Attachments: #(1) Certificate/Proof of Service)(McLaughlin, Jeremy) (Filed on 2/13/2014) (Entered: 02/13/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 2/13/2014, Entered: None
ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand filed by Bristol-Myers Squibb Company. (McLaughlin, Jeremy) (Filed on 2/13/2014) (Entered: 02/13/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 2/12/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Hon. Jon S. Tigar for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte no longer assigned to the case.. Signed by Executive Committee on 2/12/14. (as, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/12/2014) (Entered: 02/12/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 2/11/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Bristol-Myers Squibb Company Standing Order for all Judges of the Northern District of California; Standing Order for Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. LaPorte; U.S.D.C. N. District of California ECF Registration information; U.S.D.C. N. District of California Filing Procedures (San Francisco) (McLaughlin, Jeremy) (Filed on 2/11/2014) (Entered: 02/11/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 2/11/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
CLERK'S NOTICE of Impending Reassignment to U.S. District Judge (knm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/11/2014) (Entered: 02/11/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 2/10/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge filed by Bristol-Myers Squibb Company. (Attachments: #(1) Certificate/Proof of Service)(McLaughlin, Jeremy) (Filed on 2/10/2014) (Entered: 02/10/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 2/7/2014, Entered: None
Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 4/29/2014. Case Management Conference set for 5/6/2014 10:00 AM. (Attachments: # 1 Standing Order)(mclS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/7/2014) (Entered: 02/07/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 2/6/2014, Entered: None
Certificate of Interested Entities filed by Bristol-Myers Squibb Company (McLaughlin, Jeremy) (Filed on 2/6/2014) (Entered: 02/06/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 2/6/2014, Entered: None
*** DUPLICATE ENTRY *** NOTICE OF REMOVAL -Defendant BRISTOL-MYERS SQUBB COMPANY'S Notice of Removal of Action Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Sections 1332, 1441 & 1446 from S.F. Superior Court. Their case number is CGC-14-537178. (). Filed byBristol Myers Squibb Company. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G, # 8 Exhibit H, # 9 Civil Cover Sheet, # 10 Civil Cover Sheet Attachment with LIST OF ALL PLAINTIFFS)(McLaughlin, Jeremy) (Filed on 2/6/2014) Modified on 2/7/2014 (mclS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 02/06/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 2/6/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. (cjl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/6/2014) (Entered: 02/06/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 2/6/2014, Entered: None
NOTICE OF REMOVAL; -Defendant Bristol-Myers Squibb Company's Notice of Removal of Action Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Sections 1332, 1441, and 1446 from San Francisco Superior Court. Their case number is CGC-14-537178. (Filing Fee: $400.00, receipt number 0971-8356596). Filed by Bristol Myers Squibb Company. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit E, # 5 Exhibit D, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G, # 8 Exhibit H, # 9 Civil Cover Sheet, # 10 Civil Cover Sheet Attachment to Civil Cover Sheet LISTING ALL PLAINTIFFS: Michael Diercks, Shirley Ester, Bernice Fikes, Nader Ghaidi, Donald Green, Patricia Hough, Charles Johnson, Karen Kelley, Rosemarie Lowe, Joseph Malancone, Phyllis Miller, Charlotte Morris, Hayden Richardson, Ron Roberts Felicia Thomas, Semetra Thomas, Patrick Vigil, Ray Whorton, Manda Williams, Charles Wright, Tina Romero, Rick Cunningham)(McLaughlin, Jeremy) (Filed on 2/6/2014) (Entered: 02/06/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF

Statistics

This case has been viewed 201 times.

Space
Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
 
PlainSite
Sign Up
Need Password Help?