J and J Sports Productions Inc v. Oscar Enrique Martinez
Federal Civil Lawsuit California Central District Court, Case No. 8:13-cv-00809

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated May 15, 2020 at 3:19 PM DT (1.1 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Citation Section 47 U.S.C. § 521
Nature of Suit Cable/Satellite TV
  Entries (9) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 5/15/2020, Entered: None Abstract of Judgment Issued
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 4/24/2015, Entered: None Judgment - Default by Judge
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 4/24/2015, Entered: None Default Judgment
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 11/5/2014, Entered: None Response By Court to Notice of Deficiencies (G-112B)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 10/30/2014, Entered: None Enforce
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 10/21/2014, Entered: None Declaration (Motion related)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 10/7/2014, Entered: None Default Judgment
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 10/3/2014, Entered: None Vacate
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 12/3/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                  ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by Judge William D. Keller Plaintiff(s) to show cause in writing no later than December 17, 2013 why this action should not be dismissed for lack of prosecution as to defendant. Response to Order to Show Cause due by 12/17/2013. (pg)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF

                    Statistics

                    This case has been viewed 0 times.

                    No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                    Space
                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                     
                    PlainSite
                    Sign Up
                    Need Password Help?