Lone Star Wifi LLC v. Omni Hotels Corporation et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit California Southern District Court, Case No. 3:14-cv-00804
District Judge Roger T. Benitez, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated January 25, 2017 at 3:01 AM ST (4.5 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Lone Star Wifi LLC, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Nelson Bumgardner Casto PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Brent Bumgardner +1 817 377 9111 +1 817 377 3485 bbumgardner@nbclaw.net
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Edward R. Nelson, III +1 817 377 9111 ed@nelbum.com
TERMINATED: 07/22/2014, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jaime Kate Olin +1 817 806 3816 +1 817 377 3485 jolin@nbclaw.net
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jonathan Hart Rastegar +1 817 377 9111 +1 817 377 3485 jrastegar@nbclaw.net
No Logo Omni Hotels Management Corporation, Counter-Claimant
v.
No Logo Omni Hotels Corporation, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Rose Walker, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Christopher M McDowell +1 214 752 8600 +1 214 752 8700 cmcdowell@rosewalker.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Martin Edward Rose +1 214 752 8600 +1 214 752 8700 mrose@rosewalker.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Michael J Terhar +1 626 765 3000 +1 626 765 3030 mterhar@rosewalker.com
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Thomas C. Wright +1 214 752 8600 +1 214 752 8700 twright@rosewalker.com
No Logo Omni Hotels Management Corporation, Defendant
No Logo Lone Star Wifi LLC, Counter-Defendant
Citation Section 35 U.S.C. § 271
Nature of Suit 830 - Property Rights: Patent
  Entries (34) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 12/11/2014, Entered: None
REPORT of Patent and Trademark Closing, regarding patent and/or trademark number(s) 7,490,398, 8,312,286, 8,583,935, re 32 Case Transferred Out to Another District. cc:USPTO (ag) (Entered: 12/11/2014)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 10/14/2014, Entered: None
    Transfer Letter Received from Northern District of Texas. Case number in other court is 3:14-cv-03674 (kas) (Entered: 10/14/2014)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 10/9/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
      Case transferred to Northern District of Texas. Files transferred electronically to: *District of Northern District of Texas*.*1100 Commerce Street, Room 1452**Dallas, TX 75242-1310*. Signed by Judge Roger T. Benitez on 10/9/2014. (Attachments: # 1 Transfer Order) (knb) (Entered: 10/10/2014)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 7/24/2014, Entered: None
        MOTION to Supplement Appendix to Reply in Support of Motion to Transfer to the Dallas Division of the Northern District of Texas by Omni Hotels Management Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 - Certified Copies of Records from Secretary of State)(Rose, Martin) (knb). (Entered: 07/24/2014)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 7/22/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
          ORDER Granting 29 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Jaime K. Olin is terminated as counsel of record for Lone Star Wifi. Signed by Judge Roger T. Benitez on 7/21/2014. (knb) (Entered: 07/22/2014)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 7/18/2014, Entered: None
            MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney Jaime K. Olin as Counsel for Lone Star Wifi LLC by Lone Star Wifi LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration)(Bumgardner, Brent) (knb). (Entered: 07/18/2014)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 7/9/2014, Entered: None
              Minute Order issued by the Honorable Roger T. Benitez: Submitting 15 MOTION for Attorney Fees , Costs and for Stay Pursuant to Rule 41(d), 14 MOTION to Change Venue to Dallas Division of Northern District of Texas. Court to issue written Order. Motion Hearing date of 7/14/2014 10:30AM is hereby vacated. (no document attached) (gxr) (Entered: 07/09/2014)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 7/7/2014, Entered: None
                REPLY to Response to Motion re 15 MOTION for Attorney Fees , Costs and for Stay Pursuant to Rule 41(d) filed by Omni Hotels Management Corporation. (Rose, Martin) (knb). (Entered: 07/07/2014)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 7/7/2014, Entered: None
                  REPLY to Response to Motion re 14 MOTION to Change Venue to Dallas Division of Northern District of Texas filed by Omni Hotels Management Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Appendix)(Rose, Martin) (knb). (Entered: 07/07/2014)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 6/30/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                    ORDER Granting Joint Motion to Dismiss Defendant Omni Hotels Corporation (Docket. Nos. 10 , 22 ). Omni Hotels Corporation's motion to dismiss is denied as moot. Signed by Judge Roger T. Benitez on 6/30/2014. (knb) (Entered: 07/01/2014)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 6/30/2014, Entered: None
                      RESPONSE in Opposition re 14 MOTION to Change Venue to Dallas Division of Northern District of Texas filed by Lone Star Wifi LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Appendix)(Olin, Jaime) (knb). (Entered: 06/30/2014)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 6/30/2014, Entered: None
                        RESPONSE in Opposition re 15 MOTION for Attorney Fees , Costs and for Stay Pursuant to Rule 41(d) filed by Lone Star Wifi LLC. (Olin, Jaime) (knb). (Entered: 06/30/2014)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 6/30/2014, Entered: None
                          Joint MOTION to Dismiss Without Prejudice As To Defendant Omni Hotels Corporation by Lone Star Wifi LLC. (Olin, Jaime) (knb). (Entered: 06/30/2014)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 6/23/2014, Entered: None
                            PRO HAC VICE APPOINTED: Christopher McDowell appearing for Defendant Omni Hotels Corporation, Receipt # 63647. (jao) (Entered: 06/23/2014)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 6/23/2014, Entered: None
                              PRO HAC VICE APPOINTED: Thomas C. Wright appearing for Defendant Omni Hotels Corporation, Receipt # 63646. (jao) (Entered: 06/23/2014)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 6/4/2014, Entered: None
                                REPLY - Other re 11 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim filed by Lone Star Wifi LLC. (Olin, Jaime) (knb). (Entered: 06/04/2014)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 5/27/2014, Entered: None
                                  PRO HAC VICE APPOINTED: Jonathan H. Rastegar appearing for Plaintiff Lone Star Wifi LLC, Counter Defendant Lone Star Wifi LLC, Receipt # 62886. (jao) (Entered: 05/27/2014)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 5/21/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                    TRANSFER ORDER. It is hereby ordered that the following case be transferred from the calendar of the Honorable Nita L. Stormes, to the calendar of the Honorable Jill L. Burkhardt, for all further proceedings. All pending dates including discovery deadlines, hearings, and conferences before Magistrate Judge Stormes, if any, remain unchanged until further order and are now SET before Magistrate Judge Burkhardt. For cases with conferences or hearing dates set to occur in June, 2014, counsel shall call Judge Burkhardt's chambers within seven calendar days of this transfer order to confirm those conferences or hearing dates are going forward as scheduled. Any dates set before any district judge remain unchanged. The new case number is 14cv804 BEN (JLB). Signed by Magistrate Judge Nita L. Stormes on 05/21/14.(jcj) (Entered: 05/21/2014)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 5/20/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                      ORDER Vacating Early Neutral Evaluation Conference. The court vacates the Early Neutral Evaluation (ENE) set in this case for July 10, 2014. Counsel shall contact chambers within three days of a ruling on the motion to stay and/or transfer venue to reschedule the ENE, if necessary. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nita L. Stormes on 5/20/2014.(jao) (Entered: 05/20/2014)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 5/16/2014, Entered: None
                                        MOTION for Attorney Fees , Costs and for Stay Pursuant to Rule 41(d) by Omni Hotels Management Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Memo of Points and Authorities, # 2 Appendix)(Rose, Martin) (jao). (Entered: 05/16/2014)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 5/16/2014, Entered: None
                                          MOTION to Change Venue to Dallas Division of Northern District of Texas by Omni Hotels Management Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Memo of Points and Authorities, # 2 Appendix)(Rose, Martin) (jao). (Entered: 05/16/2014)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 5/16/2014, Entered: None
                                            Corporate Disclosure Statement by Omni Hotels Corporation. (Rose, Martin) (jao). (Entered: 05/16/2014)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 5/16/2014, Entered: None
                                              Corporate Disclosure Statement by Omni Hotels Management Corporation identifying Corporate Parent Omni Hotels Corporation for Omni Hotels Management Corporation, Omni Hotels Management Corporation.. (Rose, Martin) (jao). (Entered: 05/16/2014)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 5/16/2014, Entered: None
                                                ANSWER to 1 Complaint, , COUNTERCLAIM against Lone Star Wifi LLC by Omni Hotels Management Corporation.(Rose, Martin)Attorney Martin E. Rose added to party Omni Hotels Management Corporation(pty:dft) (jao). (Entered: 05/16/2014)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 5/16/2014, Entered: None
                                                  MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and Improper Venue by Omni Hotels Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Memo of Points and Authorities)(Rose, Martin)Attorney Martin E. Rose added to party Omni Hotels Corporation(pty:dft) (jao). (Entered: 05/16/2014)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 5/2/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                    ORDER Granting Unopposed Motion to Extend Time to Respond to Complaint 8 . Defendants' deadline to file an answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's complaint 1 is extended to 5/16/2014. Signed by Judge Roger T. Benitez on 5/2/2014. (vam) (Entered: 05/02/2014)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 5/1/2014, Entered: None
                                                      MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer to Complaint by Omni Hotels Corporation, Omni Hotels Management Corporation. (Terhar, Michael)Attorney Michael John Terhar added to party Omni Hotels Corporation(pty:dft), Attorney Michael John Terhar added to party Omni Hotels Management Corporation(pty:dft) Contacted attorney re use of CM/ECF account and signature on Proof of Service on 5/5/2014 (knb). (Entered: 05/01/2014)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 4/28/2014, Entered: None
                                                        PRO HAC VICE APPOINTED: Edward R. Nelson, III appearing for Plaintiff Lone Star Wifi LLC, Receipt # 61980. (jao) (Entered: 04/28/2014)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 4/28/2014, Entered: None
                                                          PRO HAC VICE APPOINTED: Brent Bumgardner appearing for Plaintiff Lone Star Wifi LLC, Receipt # 61981. (jao) (Entered: 04/28/2014)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 4/4/2014, Entered: None
                                                            NOTICE OF RELATED CASE(S) by Lone Star Wifi LLC. Proposed Low Number Order not prepared - related case in another District. (knb) (Entered: 04/04/2014)
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 4/4/2014, Entered: None
                                                              Summons Issued. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should print this summons and serve it in accordance with Rule 4, Fed.R.Civ.P and LR 4.1. (dls) (cap). (Entered: 04/04/2014)
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 4/4/2014, Entered: None
                                                                REPORT on the filing or determination of an action regarding patent and/or trademark number(s) *7,490,398*, *8,312,286*, *8,583,935* cc: USPTO. (dls) (cap). (Entered: 04/04/2014)
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 4/4/2014, Entered: None
                                                                  Corporate Disclosure Statement by Lone Star Wifi LLC. (dls) (cap). (Entered: 04/04/2014)
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 4/4/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                    COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against Omni Hotels Corporation, Omni Hotels Management Corporation (Filing fee $400 receipt number 0974-6910871), filed by Lone Star Wifi LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A-C, # 2 Cover Sheet).The new case number is 3:14-cv-804-BEN-NLS. Judge Roger T. Benitez and Magistrate Judge Nita L. Stormes are assigned to the case. (Olin, Jaime)(dls) (ATTNY MAINT) (cap). (Entered: 04/04/2014)
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                      Statistics

                                                                      This case has been viewed 87 times.

                                                                      No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                      Space
                                                                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                       
                                                                      PlainSite
                                                                      Sign Up
                                                                      Need Password Help?