Lone Star WIFI LLC v. Marriott International, Inc.
Federal Civil Lawsuit California Southern District Court, Case No. 3:14-cv-00821
District Judge Roger T. Benitez, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated January 25, 2017 at 3:41 AM ST (4.6 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Lone Star Wifi LLC, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Nelson Bumgardner Casto PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Brent Bumgardner +1 817 377 9111 +1 817 377 3485 bbumgardner@nbclaw.net
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Edward R. Nelson, III +1 817 377 9111 ed@nelbum.com
TERMINATED: 07/22/2014, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jaime Kate Olin +1 817 806 3816 +1 817 377 3485 jolin@nbclaw.net
Marriott International, Inc. Marriott International, Inc., Counter-Claimant
v.
Marriott International, Inc. Marriott International, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Duane Morris LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED S. Neil Anderson +1 404 253 6944 snanderson@duanemorris.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Rebecca Grace Church +1 619 744 2205 +1 619 923 2931 rchurch@duanemorris.com
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Alison Marie Haddock , +1 404 256 6900 +1 404 253 6901 amhaddock@duanemorris.com
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Louis Norwood Jameson +1 404 253 6900 +1 404 253 6901 wjameson@duanemorris.com
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Matthew S. Yungwirth +1 404 253 6900 +1 404 253 6901 msyungwirth@duanemorris.com
No Logo Lone Star Wifi LLC, Counter-Defendant
Citation Section 35 U.S.C. § 271
Nature of Suit 830 - Property Rights: Patent
  Entries (27) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 12/11/2014, Entered: None
REPORT of Patent and Trademark Closing, regarding patent and/or trademark number(s) 7,490,348, 8,312,286, 8,583,935, re 25 Case Transferred Out to Another District. cc:USPTO (ag) (Entered: 12/11/2014)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 10/15/2014, Entered: None
    Transfer Letter Received from District of Maryland. Case number in other court is 8:14-cv-03229 (kas) (Entered: 10/16/2014)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 10/9/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
      Case transferred to District of District of Maryland. Files transferred electronically to: *District of District of Maryland*.*101 West Lombard Street, Room 4415**Baltimore, MD 21201-2605*. Signed by Judge Roger T. Benitez on 10/9/2014. (Attachments: # 1 Transfer Order) (knb) (Entered: 10/10/2014)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 7/22/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
        ORDER Granting 23 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Jaime K. Olin is terminated as counsel of record for Lone Star Wifi. Signed by Judge Roger T. Benitez on 7/21/2014. (knb) (Entered: 07/22/2014)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 7/18/2014, Entered: None
          MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney Jaime K. Olin as Counsel for Lone Star Wifi LLC by Lone Star WIFI LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration)(Bumgardner, Brent) (knb). (Entered: 07/18/2014)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 7/9/2014, Entered: None
            Minute Order issued by the Honorable Roger T. Benitez: Submitting 19 MOTION to Change Venue to the District of Maryland. Court to issue written Order. Motion Hearing date of 7/14/2014 10:30AM is hereby vacated. (no document attached) (gxr) (Entered: 07/09/2014)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 7/7/2014, Entered: None
              REPLY to Response to Motion re 19 MOTION to Change Venue to the District of Maryland filed by Marriott International, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Matthew S. Yungwirth, # 2 Yungwirth Declaration Exhibits 1-8, # 3 Proof of Service)(Church, Rebecca) (knb). (Entered: 07/07/2014)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 6/30/2014, Entered: None
                RESPONSE in Opposition re 19 MOTION to Change Venue to the District of Maryland filed by Lone Star WIFI LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration)(Olin, Jaime) (knb). (Entered: 06/30/2014)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 6/4/2014, Entered: None
                  MOTION to Change Venue to the District of Maryland by Marriott International, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Memo of Points and Authorities, # 2 Declaration of Robert Galovic, # 3 Galovic Declaration Exhibit 1, # 4 Declaration of Alison H. Hutton, # 5 Hutton Declaration Exhibits 1-16, # 6 Hutton Declaration Exhibits 17-32, # 7 Proof of Service)(Hutton, Alison)(knb). (Entered: 06/04/2014)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 5/21/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                    TRANSFER ORDER. It is hereby ordered that the following case be transferred from the calendar of the Honorable Nita L. Stormes, to the calendar of the Honorable Jill L. Burkhardt, for all further proceedings. All pending dates including discovery deadlines, hearings, and conferences before Magistrate Judge Stormes, if any, remain unchanged until further order and are now SET before Magistrate Judge Burkhardt. For cases with conferences or hearing dates set to occur in June, 2014, counsel shall call Judge Burkhardt's chambers within seven calendar days of this transfer order to confirm those conferences or hearing dates are going forward as scheduled. Any dates set before any district judge remain unchanged. The new case number is 14cv821 BEN (JLB). Signed by Magistrate Judge Nita L. Stormes on 05/21/14.(jcj) (Entered: 05/21/2014)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 5/20/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                      ORDER Vacating Early Neutral Evaluation Conference. The court vacates the Early Neutral Evaluation (ENE) set in this case for July 10, 2014. Counsel shall contact chambers within three days of a ruling on the motion to stay and/or transfer venue to reschedule the ENE, if necessary. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nita L. Stormes on 5/20/2014.(jao) (Entered: 05/20/2014)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 5/15/2014, Entered: None
                        REPLY - Other re 13 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim filed by Lone Star WIFI LLC. (Olin, Jaime) (ag). (Entered: 05/15/2014)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 5/5/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                          NOTICE AND ORDER for Early Neutral Evaluation Conference. Early Neutral Evaluation set for 7/10/2014 02:30 PM before Magistrate Judge Nita L. Stormes. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nita L. Stormes on 5/5/2014.(knb) (Entered: 05/05/2014)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 5/2/2014, Entered: None
                            Corporate Disclosure Statement by Marriott International, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Proof of Service)(Yungwirth, Matthew) (knb). (Entered: 05/02/2014)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 5/2/2014, Entered: None
                              ANSWER to 1 Complaint, with Jury Demand and Affirmative Defenses, COUNTERCLAIM against Lone Star WIFI LLC by Marriott International, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Proof of Service)(Yungwirth, Matthew) (knb). (Entered: 05/02/2014)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 4/29/2014, Entered: None
                                PRO HAC VICE APPOINTED: Alison H. Hutton appearing for Defendant Marriott International, Inc., Receipt # 62248. (jao) (Entered: 04/29/2014)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 4/29/2014, Entered: None
                                  PRO HAC VICE APPOINTED: L. Norwood Jameson appearing for Defendant Marriott International, Inc., Receipt # 62247. (jao) (Entered: 04/29/2014)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 4/29/2014, Entered: None
                                    PRO HAC VICE APPOINTED: Matthew S. Yungwirth appearing for Defendant Marriott International, Inc., Receipt # 62246. (jao) (Entered: 04/29/2014)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 4/29/2014, Entered: None
                                      PRO HAC VICE APPOINTED: S. Neil Anderson appearing for Defendant Marriott International, Inc., Receipt # 62245. (jao) (Entered: 04/29/2014)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 4/28/2014, Entered: None
                                        PRO HAC VICE APPOINTED: Brent Bumgardner appearing for Plaintiff Lone Star WIFI LLC, Receipt # 61981. (jao) (Entered: 04/28/2014)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 4/28/2014, Entered: None
                                          PRO HAC VICE APPOINTED: Edward R. Nelson, III appearing for Plaintiff Lone Star WIFI LLC, Receipt # 61980. (jao) (Entered: 04/28/2014)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 4/23/2014, Entered: None
                                            NOTICE of Appearance by Rebecca Grace Church on behalf of Marriott International, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Proof of Service)(Church, Rebecca)Attorney Rebecca Grace Church added to party Marriott International, Inc.(pty:dft) (knb). (Entered: 04/23/2014)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 4/7/2014, Entered: None
                                              Summons Issued. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should print this summons and serve it in accordance with Rule 4, Fed.R.Civ.P and LR 4.1. (kcm) (av1). (Entered: 04/07/2014)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 4/4/2014, Entered: None
                                                Corporate Disclosure Statement by Lone Star WIFI LLC. (kcm)(av1). (Entered: 04/07/2014)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 4/4/2014, Entered: None
                                                  NOTICE OF RELATED CASE(S) by Lone Star WIFI LLC. Proposed Low Number Order not prepared - Out of District Case Asserted (kcm) (Entered: 04/07/2014)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 4/4/2014, Entered: None
                                                    REPORT on the filing or determination of an action regarding patent and/or trademark number(s) *7,490,348*, *8,312,286*, *8,583,935* cc:USPTO (kcm) (av1). (Entered: 04/07/2014)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 4/4/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                      COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against Marriott International, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0974-6910527) filed by Lone Star WIFI LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Case Cover Sheet, # 2 Exhibit A - "348" Patent, # 3 Exhibit B - "286" Patent, # 4 Exhibit C - "935" Patent)The new case number is 3:14-cv-821-BEN-NLS. Judge Roger T. Benitez and Magistrate Judge Nita L. Stormes are assigned to the case. (Olin, Jaime)(kcm) (av1). (Entered: 04/07/2014)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                        Statistics

                                                        This case has been viewed 156 times.

                                                        No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                        Space
                                                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                         
                                                        PlainSite
                                                        Sign Up
                                                        Need Password Help?