Burhans v. Yale University
Federal Civil Lawsuit Connecticut District Court, Case No. 3:12-cv-01462

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated January 28, 2017 at 9:32 AM ST (4.7 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Susan Burhans, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Furniss & Quinn

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Rose Longo-McLean +1 203 562 9931 r.l.mclean@snet.net

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of John R. Williams

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED John R. Williams +1 203 562 9931 +1 203 776 9494 jrw@johnrwilliams.com

Toggle Switch Represented by McAllister Olivarius

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Johnna G. Sack +1 518 633 4775 +1 781 658 2480 jsack@mcolaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by The Kaplan Law Office

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Susan Robin Kaplan +1 347 683 2505 skaplan@lawkaplan.com
v.
Yale University Yale University, Defendant
Officer/Director, Mark Centers Trust
Officer/Director, JBG SMITH Properties
Officer/Director, Douglas Emmett Inc

Toggle Switch Represented by Donahue, Durham & Noonan

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Patrick M. Noonan +1 203 458 9168 +1 203 458 4424 pnoonan@ddnctlaw.com
  Entries (100) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 119 Filed: 1/27/2017, Entered: None Stipulation of Dismissal
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 116 Filed: 1/12/2017, Entered: None Set Deadlines/Hearings
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 114 Filed: 10/25/2016, Entered: None Settlement Conference
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 111 Filed: 10/7/2016, Entered: None Withdraw
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 110 Filed: 10/7/2016, Entered: None Withdraw
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 98 Filed: 3/14/2016, Entered: None Appearance Pro Se
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 96 Filed: 3/4/2016, Entered: None Withdraw as Attorney
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 93 Filed: 3/2/2016, Entered: None Order
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 92 Filed: 3/2/2016, Entered: None Hearing
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 90 Filed: 2/26/2016, Entered: None Stay
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 89 Filed: 2/24/2016, Entered: None Withdraw as Attorney
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 88 Filed: 2/22/2016, Entered: None Withdraw as Attorney
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 87 Filed: 2/18/2016, Entered: None Preclude
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 86 Filed: 2/16/2016, Entered: None Notice of Appearance
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 85 Filed: 2/16/2016, Entered: None Court Filing
                              ORDER granting 84 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney John R. Williams terminated. Signed by Judge Warren W. Eginton on 2/16/2016. (Welles, T.) (Entered: 02/16/2016)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 84 Filed: 2/9/2016, Entered: None Withdraw as Attorney
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 83 Filed: 2/9/2016, Entered: None Court Filing
                                  NOTICE OF E-FILED CALENDAR: THIS IS THE ONLY NOTICE COUNSEL/THE PARTIES WILL RECEIVE.ALL PERSONS ENTERING THE COURTHOUSE MUST PRESENT PHOTO IDENTIFICATION. RESET FROM 03/22/16 Jury Selection set for 5/2/2016 10:00 AM in Courtroom Three-Annex, 915 Lafayette Blvd., Bridgeport, CT before Judge Warren W. Eginton (Gould, K.) (Entered: 02/09/2016)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 82 Filed: 2/9/2016, Entered: None Court Filing
                                    ORDER denying 80 Motion for Extension of Time ; denying 81 Motion for Extension of Time. Plaintiff has not shown good cause for another six month extension, particularly in light of the age of this case. However, the Court will afford plaintiff one month extension to April 1, 2016 with jury selection extended to May 2, 2016.. Signed by Judge Warren W. Eginton on 02/09/16. (Gould, K.) (Entered: 02/09/2016)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 81 Filed: 2/1/2016, Entered: None extension of time
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 80 Filed: 2/1/2016, Entered: None extension of time
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 79 Filed: 1/15/2016, Entered: None Order
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 78 Filed: 1/11/2016, Entered: None Court Filing
                                            ORDER OF TRANSFER. In light of the status conference (DOC 77) of 1/11/2016 I am recusing myself from this case. Case reassigned to Judge Donna F. Martinez for all further proceedings Signed by Judge William I. Garfinkel on 1/11/2016.(Torres, K.) (Entered: 01/11/2016)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 77 Filed: 1/8/2016, Entered: None Court Filing
                                              Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge William I. Garfinkel: Telephone Pre-Settlement Conference held on 1/8/2016. Due to conflict looking to refer mediation to another Magistrate Judge. 30 minutes (Sanders, C.) (Entered: 01/08/2016)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 76 Filed: 1/4/2016, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                NOTICE OF E-FILED CALENDAR: THIS IS THE ONLY NOTICE COUNSEL/THE PARTIES WILL RECEIVE. Telephone Pre-Settlement Conference is rescheduled to 1/8/2016 @ 2:30 PM before Judge William I. Garfinkel. The previously issued scheduling calendar remains in effect in all other respects. (Sanders, C.) (Entered: 01/04/2016)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 75 Filed: 12/23/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                  NOTICE OF E-FILED CALENDAR: THIS IS THE ONLY NOTICE COUNSEL/THE PARTIES WILL RECEIVE. Telephone Pre-Settlement Conference set for 1/6/2016 @ 11:00 AM before Judge William I. Garfinkel. Counsel for the plaintiff shall initiate this call. Once all parties are on the line, please contact Chambers at (203)579-5593. A date for the settlement conference will be set during the telephone call. As the Court requires parties or their representatives with settlement authority to attend the settlement conference, counsel should obtain dates of unavailability from their clients over the next 190 days and have their own calendars available to aid in the scheduling. During the telephone call, counsel should be prepared to discuss what information needs to be exchanged and anything else that needs to be accomplished prior to the settlement conference for the discussions to be productive. This telephone conference will not be rescheduled based on requests from counsel. If counsel is not available at the scheduled time, please arrange for coverage by another lawyer who will have the necessary background knowledge to participate. (Sanders, C.) (Entered: 12/23/2015)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 74 Filed: 12/14/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                    ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge William I. Garfinkel for Settlement Conference Signed by Judge Warren W. Eginton on 12/14/15.(Gould, K.) (Entered: 12/15/2015)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 73 Filed: 12/14/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                      ORDER granting in part and denying in part 72 Motion for Extension of Time. The court will extend the discovery deadline to March 1, 2016; jury selection is scheduled for March 22, 2016 with trial to commence by April 22, 2016. Signed by Judge Warren W. Eginton on 12/14/15. (Gould, K.) . (Entered: 12/15/2015)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 72 Filed: 12/9/2015, Entered: None extension of time
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 71 Filed: 9/21/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                          ORDER granting in part 70 Motion for Extension of Time. The parties are afforded a four month extension of discovery until February 1, 2016. Signed by Judge Warren W. Eginton on 9/22/2015. (Falcone, K.) (Entered: 09/22/2015)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 70 Filed: 9/18/2015, Entered: None extension of time
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 69 Filed: 7/2/2015, Entered: None Notice of Appearance
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 68 Filed: 6/30/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                ORDER granting 65 Motion for Extension of Time. Signed by Judge Warren W. Eginton on 6/30/2015. (Falcone, K.) (Entered: 06/30/2015)
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 67 Filed: 6/29/2015, Entered: None
                                                                  ORDER granting 66 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Susan R. Kaplan.. Signed by Clerk on 6/29/2015. (Fazekas, J.) (Entered: 06/29/2015)
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 66 Filed: 6/26/2015, Entered: None Admission Pro Hac Vice
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 65 Filed: 6/26/2015, Entered: None extension of time
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 64 Filed: 4/30/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                        ELECTRONIC ORDER withdrawing 53 Motion for Reconsideration, to the extent set forth in plaintiff's Response, filed today. (Dkt. #63). Signed by Judge Joan G. Margolis on 4/30/15. (Margolis, Joan) (Entered: 04/30/2015)
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 63 Filed: 4/30/2015, Entered: None Response
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 62 Filed: 4/15/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                            ELECTRONIC ORDER granting 60 Motion for Extension of Time until 4/29/15, absent objection. Signed by Judge Joan G. Margolis on 4/15/15.(Margolis, Joan) (Entered: 04/15/2015)
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 61 Filed: 4/15/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                              ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Joan G. Margolis re 60 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time until April 29, 2015 to File a Reply Brief in Support of Motion for Reconsideration 58 Objection, 53 MOTION for Reconsideration re 52 Order on Motion for Protective Order Signed by Judge Warren W. Eginton on 4/15/2015.Motion referred to Joan G. Margolis(Falcone, K.) (Entered: 04/15/2015)
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 60 Filed: 4/15/2015, Entered: None extension of time
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 59 Filed: 4/8/2015, Entered: None Response
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 58 Filed: 4/1/2015, Entered: None Objection
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 57 Filed: 3/25/2015, Entered: None Response
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 56 Filed: 3/23/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                        ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Joan G. Margolis 53 MOTION for Reconsideration re 52 Order on Motion for Protective Order Signed by Judge Warren W. Eginton on 3/23/2015.Motion referred to Joan G. Margolis(Falcone, K.) (Entered: 03/23/2015)
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 55 Filed: 3/13/2015, Entered: None Order Returning Submission
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 54 Filed: 3/12/2015, Entered: None Objection
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 53 Filed: 3/11/2015, Entered: None Reconsideration
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 52 Filed: 2/26/2015, Entered: None Order on Motion for Protective Order
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 51 Filed: 2/25/2015, Entered: None Amended Complaint
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 51 Filed: 4/7/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                    AMENDED COMPLAINT against Yale University, filed by Susan Burhans.(Perez, J.) (Entered: 02/25/2015)
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                      Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 2/18/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                      ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Joan G. Margolis for Motion for 38 MOTION for Protective Order Signed by Judge Warren W. Eginton on 2/18/2015.Motion referred to Joan G. Margolis(Falcone, K.) (Entered: 02/18/2015)
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 2/11/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                        ORDER vacating re 48 Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge Signed by Judge Warren W. Eginton on 2/11/2015.(Falcone, K.) (Entered: 02/17/2015)
                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 2/11/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                          ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge William I. Garfinkel re: 38 MOTION for Protective Order Signed by Judge Warren W. Eginton on 2/11/2015.Motion referred to William I. Garfinkel(Falcone, K.) (Entered: 02/11/2015)
                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 2/4/2015, Entered: None Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 1/28/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                              ORDER granting 45 Motion for Extension of Time. Signed by Judge Warren W. Eginton on 1/28/2015. (Welles, T.) (Entered: 01/28/2015)
                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 1/26/2015, Entered: None extension of time
                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 1/26/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                  ORDER granting 43 Motion to Seal. Signed by Judge Warren W. Eginton on 1/26/2015. (Welles, T.) (Entered: 01/26/2015)
                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 1/17/2015, Entered: None Seal
                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 1/14/2015, Entered: None Memorandum in Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 1/14/2015, Entered: None Answer
                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 12/29/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                          ORDER granting 39 Motion for Extension of Time. Signed by Judge Warren W. Eginton on 12/29/2014. (Welles, T.) (Entered: 12/29/2014)
                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 12/24/2014, Entered: None extension of time
                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 12/23/2014, Entered: None Protective Order
                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 12/19/2014, Entered: None Order on Motion to Dismiss
                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 10/21/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                  ORDER granting 35 MOTION for Extension of Time until February 1, 2015, to Complete Discovery 21 Order, Set Deadlines/Hearings. Signed by Judge Warren W. Eginton on 10/21/2014. (Ghilardi, K.) (Entered: 10/21/2014)
                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 10/21/2014, Entered: None extension of time
                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 10/7/2014, Entered: None Certificate of Good Standing
                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 10/7/2014, Entered: None Certificate of Good Standing
                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 10/7/2014, Entered: None Notice of Appearance
                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 10/6/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                            ORDER granting 30 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Johanna G. Sack Certificate of Good Standing due by 12/5/2014. Signed by Clerk on 10/6/2014. (Payton, R.) (Entered: 10/06/2014)
                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 10/4/2014, Entered: None Admission Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 6/15/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                RESPONSE re 28 Reply to Response to Motion filed by Susan Burhans. (Williams, John) (Entered: 06/15/2014)
                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 6/13/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                  REPLY to Response to 26 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Yale University. (Noonan, Patrick) (Entered: 06/13/2014)
                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 6/2/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                    Memorandum in Opposition re 26 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Susan Burhans. (Williams, John) (Entered: 06/02/2014)
                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 5/15/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                      MOTION to Dismiss by Yale University.Responses due by 6/5/2014 (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum in Support Memo in Support of Motion to Dismiss)(Noonan, Patrick) (Entered: 05/15/2014)
                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 4/7/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                        ORDER granting 24 Motion to Amend/Correct Complaint. Signed by Judge Warren W. Eginton on 4/7/2014. (Ghilardi, K.) (Entered: 04/07/2014)
                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 4/7/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                          Consent MOTION to Amend/Correct 1 Complaint by Susan Burhans.Responses due by 4/28/2014 (Attachments: # 1 Amended Complaint)(Williams, John) (Entered: 04/07/2014)
                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 12/5/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                            ORDER granting 22 MOTION for Extension of Time TO RESPOND TO REQUESTS FOR PRODUCTION. Signed by Judge Warren W. Eginton on 12/5/2013. (Ghilardi, K.) (Entered: 12/05/2013)
                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 12/3/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                              MOTION for Extension of Time TO RESPOND TO REQUESTS FOR PRODUCTION by Yale University. (Noonan, Patrick) (Entered: 12/03/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 6/26/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                ORDER Approving re 19 Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting, ( Discovery due by 4/1/2014, Dispositive Motions due by 6/15/2014) Signed by Judge Warren W. Eginton on 6/26/2013.(Ghilardi, K.) (Entered: 06/26/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 6/25/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                  RESPONSE re 18 Notice,,,, filed by Yale University. (Noonan, Patrick) (Entered: 06/25/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 6/25/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                    REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Noonan, Patrick) (Entered: 06/25/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 6/10/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                      26(f) NOTICE The Court has reviewed the file in this case to monitor the parties compliance with Local Rule 26(f). Local Rule 26(f) provides that, within 30 days after the appearance of any defendant, the attorneys of record and any unrepresented parties must confer for purposes described in Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(f). Local Rule 26(f) further provides that, within 14 days after the conference, the participants must jointly file a report of the conference using Form 26(f). It appears that more than forty four days have passed since the appearance of a defendant in this case but no report has been filed. Accordingly, it is hereby ordered that the parties must file on or before June 24, 2013: (1) a written statement signed by all counsel of record demonstrating that this case is exempt from the requirement of filing a form 26f report; or (2) a form 26f report along with a written statement signed by all counsel of record explaining why sanctions should not be imposed for the parties failure to comply with Local Rule 26(f). Failure to comply with this order will result in dismissal of the complaint Signed by Judge Warren W. Eginton on 6/10/2013.(Ghilardi, K.) (Entered: 06/10/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 1/25/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE of Appearance by Rose Longo-McLean on behalf of Susan Burhans (Longo-McLean, Rose) (Entered: 01/25/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 12/27/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                          ANSWER to 1 Complaint with Special Defenses by Yale University.(Noonan, Patrick) (Entered: 12/27/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 12/4/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER denying 10 Motion for Default Judgment; granting 13 Motion for Extension of Time ; granting 14 Motion to reopen entry of default. Signed by Judge Warren W. Eginton on 12/4/2012. (Welles, T.) (Entered: 12/04/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 11/30/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION to Reopen Case /Entry of Default by Yale University.Responses due by 12/21/2012 (Noonan, Patrick) (Entered: 11/30/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 11/30/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION for Extension of Time until 12/30/2012 to Plead 1 Complaint by Yale University. (Noonan, Patrick) (Entered: 11/30/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 11/30/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                  OBJECTION re 8 MOTION for Default Entry 55(a) as to Yale University filed by Yale University. (Noonan, Patrick) (Entered: 11/30/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 11/26/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE of Appearance by Patrick M. Noonan on behalf of Yale University (Noonan, Patrick) (Entered: 11/26/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 11/20/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION for Default Judgment as to Yale University by Susan Burhans. (Williams, John) (Entered: 11/20/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 11/19/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER granting 8 Motion for Default Entry 55(a). Motion for default judgment due by 12/19/2012. A Motion for Default Judgment pursuant to FRCP 55(b) shall be filed or this action will be dismissed by the Clerk pursuant to Rule 41(b) FRCP.. Signed by Judge Warren W. Eginton on 11/19/2012. (Welles, T.) (Entered: 11/19/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 11/16/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION for Default Entry 55(a) as to Yale University by Susan Burhans. (Williams, John) (Entered: 11/16/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 10/19/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                            SUMMONS Returned Executed by Susan Burhans. Yale University served on 10/18/2012, answer due 11/8/2012. (Attachments: # 1 Summons, # 2 Marshal's Return)(Williams, John) Modified on 10/22/2012 to correct date of service (Perez, J.). (Entered: 10/19/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 10/16/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                              ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 4 and LR 4 as to *Yale University* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *John R. Williams* *51 Elm St., Ste. 409* *New Haven, CT 06510*. (Fazekas, J.) (Entered: 10/16/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 10/16/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE TO COUNSEL: Counsel initiating or removing this action is responsible for serving all parties with attached documents and copies of 2 Notice of Appearance filed by John R. Williams on behalf of Susan Burhans, 3 Order on Pretrial Deadlines, 1 Complaint filed by Susan Burhans, 4 Electronic Filing Order. Signed by Clerk on 10/16/2012. (Fazekas, J.) (Entered: 10/16/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 10/12/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                  ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER. Signed by Judge Warren W. Eginton on 10/12/2012. (Fazekas, J.) (Entered: 10/16/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 10/12/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Order on Pretrial Deadlines: Motions to Dismiss due on 1/12/2013. Amended Pleadings due by 12/11/2012. Discovery due by 4/13/2013. Dispositive Motions due by 5/13/2013. Signed by Clerk on 10/12/2012. (Fazekas, J.) (Entered: 10/16/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 10/12/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE of Appearance by John R. Williams on behalf of Susan Burhans (Williams, John) (Entered: 10/12/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 10/12/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                        COMPLAINT against Yale University ( Filing fee $350 receipt number 0205-2655705.), filed by Susan Burhans.(Williams, John) (Entered: 10/12/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                                                                                                                                                          Statistics

                                                                                                                                                                                                          This case has been viewed 480 times.

                                                                                                                                                                                                          No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Space
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                           
                                                                                                                                                                                                          PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Need Password Help?