Atlantic Container Line AB et al v. Volvo Car Corporation et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit New York Southern District Court, Case No. 1:14-cv-01811
District Judge Colleen McMahon, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated January 22, 2017 at 12:20 AM ST (4.8 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Atlantic Container Line Ab, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Lyons & Flood, L.L.P.

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Edward P. Flood +1 212 594 2400 +1 212 594 4589 eflood@lyons-flood.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED John Randolph Foster +1 212 594 2400 +1 212 594 4589 jfoster@lyons-flood.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jon Werner +1 212 594 2400 +1 212 594 4589 jwerner@lyons-flood.com
No Logo Norwegian Hull Club-Gjensidig Assuranseforening, Plaintiff
v.
No Logo Volvo Car Corporation, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Holland & Knight, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Lars Forsberg +1 212 513 3316 +1 212 385 9010 lars.forsberg@hklaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Reed Smith LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Oliver K. Beiersdorf +1 212 549 0415 +1 212 521 5450 obeiersdorf@reedsmith.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Shmuel Kadosh +1 212 549 0451 +1 212 521 5450 skadosh@reedsmith.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED SARA KENNEDY KORNBLUH +1 609 520 6027 skornbluh@reedsmith.com
No Logo Volvo Cars North America, L.L.C., Defendant
Citation Section 28 U.S.C. § 1333
Nature of Suit 120 - Contract: Marine
  Entries (12) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 63 Filed: 5/7/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER: it is hereby ORDERED as follows: Plaintiffs shall produce the All Incident Report for the vessel without restriction as to date. They shall also produce copies of any documents relating to any onboard fire to the extent such documents exist and have not been produced. Otherwise, defendants' request for documents relating to prior incidents involving the vessel is denied. Plaintiffs shall produce all documents relating to the installation of electrical cable and hardware during the lengthening of the vessel. Defendants' request for documents relating to the lengthening of the vessel is otherwise denied. Plaintiffs shall produce telephone records for the mobile telephone used by Grzegorz Kazmierczak for the month of May 2013. Defendants' request for telephone records is otherwise denied. To the extent they have not already done so, plaintiffs shall produce all submissions in the WWL arbitration subject to the conditions of confidentiality provided for in the protective order. (Signed by Magistrate Judge James C. Francis on 5/7/2015) Copies Sent By Chambers. (kko) (Entered: 05/07/2015)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 10/3/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
    ORDER: It is hereby ordered that the above-entitled actions be consolidated for all purposes. The caption shall be as above. All material shall be docketed under 13 Civ. 5227. (Signed by Judge Colleen McMahon on 10/3/2014) (kgo) (Entered: 10/03/2014)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 10/3/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
      CIVIL CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN: This case is not to be tried to a jury. Amended Pleadings due by 11/7/2014. Joinder of Parties w/o permission of court due by 10/31/2014. Expert Discovery due by 4/24/2015. Discovery due by 4/24/2015. Pretrial Order due by 6/19/2015. (Signed by Judge Colleen McMahon on 10/3/2014) (kgo) (Entered: 10/03/2014)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 4/16/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
        STIPULATION. IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED by the undersigned attorneys for the parties to the above-captioned matter, that the time for Defendant Volvo Cars of North America, LLC to answer or otherwise move with respect to Plaintiffs' Complaint in this action is hereby extended to June 16, 2014. So ordered. Volvo Cars North America, L.L.C. answer due 6/16/2014. (Signed by Judge Robert W. Sweet on 4/15/2014) (rjm) (Entered: 04/16/2014)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 10/1/2014, Entered: None
          NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Lars Forsberg on behalf of Volvo Car Corporation, Volvo Cars North America, L.L.C.. (Forsberg, Lars) (Entered: 10/01/2014)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 4/10/2014, Entered: None
            WAIVER OF SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED. Volvo Car Corporation waiver sent on 3/18/2014, answer due 6/16/2014. Document filed by Norwegian Hull Club-Gjensidig Assuranseforening; Atlantic Container Line AB. (Flood, Edward) (Entered: 04/10/2014)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 9/29/2014, Entered: None
              NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Sara Kennedy Kornbluh on behalf of Volvo Car Corporation, Volvo Cars North America, L.L.C.. (Kornbluh, Sara) (Entered: 09/29/2014)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 3/14/2014, Entered: None
                STATEMENT OF RELATEDNESS re: that this action be filed as related to 13cv5227. Document filed by Atlantic Container Line AB, Norwegian Hull Club-Gjensidig Assuranseforening.(laq) (laq). (Entered: 04/01/2014)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 9/25/2014, Entered: None
                  NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by John Randolph Foster on behalf of Atlantic Container Line AB, Norwegian Hull Club-Gjensidig Assuranseforening. (Foster, John) (Entered: 09/25/2014)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Blank 2 Filed: 3/14/2014, Entered: None
                    COMPLAINT against Volvo Car Corporation, Volvo Cars North America, L.L.C.. (Filing Fee $ 350.00, Receipt Number 1090080)Document filed by Norwegian Hull Club-Gjensidig Assuranseforening, Atlantic Container Line AB.(laq) (laq). (Entered: 04/01/2014)
                      LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 9/25/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                      ORDER denying 28 Letter Motion to Adjourn Conference. No-I will not adjourn the conference until November. Send another lawyer. (Signed by Judge Colleen McMahon on 9/24/2014) (mro) (Entered: 09/25/2014)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 3/14/2014, Entered: None
                        CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (laq) (laq). (Entered: 04/01/2014)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF

                          Space Space

                          Statistics

                          This case has been viewed 174 times.

                          No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                          Space
                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                           
                          PlainSite
                          Sign Up
                          Need Password Help?