REMBRANDT WIRELESS TECHNOLOGIES, LP v. SAMSUNG ELECTRONIC CO., LTD. et al
Federal Court Proceeding Pennsylvania Eastern District Court, Case No. 2:14-mc-00251

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated January 10, 2017 at 11:48 PM ST (4.5 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Rembrandt Wireless Technologies, LP, Plaintiff
v.
No Logo Research In Motion Corporation, Defendant
Officially listed as "RESEARCH IN MOTION CORP. "

Toggle Switch Represented by Morgan, Lewis & Bockius, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space JOHN V. GORMAN jgorman@morganlewis.com
Research In Motion Ltd. Research In Motion Ltd., Defendant
Samsung Austin Semiconductor, LLC Samsung Austin Semiconductor, LLC, Defendant
Samsung Electronics Company, Ltd. Samsung Electronics Company, Ltd., Defendant
Officially listed as "SAMSUNG ELECTRONIC CO., LTD."
Samsung Electronics America, Inc. Samsung Electronics America, Inc., Defendant
Samsung Telecommunications America, LLC Samsung Telecommunications America, LLC, Defendant
No Logo MICHAEL A KOPTIW, Movant

Toggle Switch Represented by Condo Roccia LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Michael J. Bonella +1 215 599 2784 +1 215 558 5676 mbonella@condoroccia.com
  Entries (7) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 11/19/2014, Entered: None Order Dismissing Case
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 11/14/2014, Entered: None Dismiss
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 11/3/2014, Entered: None Memorandum
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 11/3/2014, Entered: None Order
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 10/30/2014, Entered: None Leave to File Document
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 10/23/2014, Entered: None Response in Opposition to Motion
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 10/6/2014, Entered: None Protective Order
                Request RequestSpace LREF

                Statistics

                This case has been viewed 61 times.

                No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                Space
                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                 
                PlainSite
                Sign Up
                Need Password Help?