v. Sakievich et al

Federal Civil Lawsuit District Of Columbia District Court, Case No. 1:14-cv-01671
Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated March 29, 2019 at 12:33 PM EDT (6.1 years ago) Update UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert AlertsSpaceJump Jump
Summary

No one has written a summary of this case yet. Sign up or sign in to contribute one.

Parties
No Logo THOMAS SAKIEVICH, Plaintiff

Represented by The Federal Practice Group

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Eric Sebastian Montalvo +1 202 862 4360 emontalvo@fedpractice.com
v.
United States of America United States of America, Defendant
Attributes
Timeline
  Entries (50) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 3/29/2019, Entered: None Memorandum & Opinion
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 3/29/2019, Entered: None Order on Motion for Summary Judgment
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 11/7/2018, Entered: None Affidavit
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 9/25/2018, Entered: None Reply to opposition to Motion
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 9/18/2018, Entered: None Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 9/4/2018, Entered: None Memorandum in Opposition to Motion
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 9/4/2018, Entered: None Reply to opposition to Motion
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 8/24/2018, Entered: None Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 8/24/2018, Entered: None Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 7/23/2018, Entered: None Extension of Time to
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 6/29/2018, Entered: None SUMMARY JUDGMENT
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 6/29/2018, Entered: None Response to Motion
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 6/20/2018, Entered: None Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 5/29/2018, Entered: None Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 5/10/2018, Entered: None SUMMARY JUDGMENT
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 5/10/2018, Entered: None Administrative Record
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 4/20/2018, Entered: None Answer to Amended Complaint
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 4/9/2018, Entered: None Amended Complaint
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 4/6/2018, Entered: None Leave to File Document
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 3/27/2018, Entered: None Status Report
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 3/14/2018, Entered: None Notice of Substitution of Counsel
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 3/13/2018, Entered: None USCA Mandate
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 4/6/2016, Entered: None Transmission of Notice of Appeal and Docket Sheet to USCA
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 4/5/2016, Entered: None Notice of Appeal to DC Circuit
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 4/4/2016, Entered: None Notice (Other)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 2/5/2016, Entered: None Memorandum & Opinion
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 2/5/2016, Entered: None Order on Motion to Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 9/11/2015, Entered: None Notice of Substitution of Counsel
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 8/13/2015, Entered: None Joint Appendix
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 7/30/2015, Entered: None Reply to opposition to Motion
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 7/16/2015, Entered: None Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 7/9/2015, Entered: None Reply to opposition to Motion
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 7/8/2015, Entered: None Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 6/24/2015, Entered: None Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 6/10/2015, Entered: None SUMMARY JUDGMENT
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 6/10/2015, Entered: None Memorandum in Opposition to Motion
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 6/10/2015, Entered: None Reply to opposition to Motion
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 5/15/2015, Entered: None Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 5/1/2015, Entered: None SUMMARY JUDGMENT
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 4/29/2015, Entered: None Response to Motion
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 4/13/2015, Entered: None Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 3/31/2015, Entered: None Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 3/13/2015, Entered: None Notice of Substitution of Counsel
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 3/11/2015, Entered: None Extension of Time to File Answer
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 2/19/2015, Entered: None Extension of Time to File Answer
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 1/9/2015, Entered: None Extension of Time to
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 12/2/2014, Entered: None Notice of Appearance
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 11/4/2014, Entered: None Request for Summons to Issue
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 10/7/2014, Entered: None Electronic Summons Issued as to AUSA,USAG
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 10/7/2014, Entered: None Complaint
Request RequestSpace LREF

Statistics

This case has been viewed 9 times.

Space
Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
 
PlainSite
Sign Up
Need Password Help?