Landmark Technology LLC v. Boyd Gaming Corp.
Federal Civil Lawsuit Texas Eastern District Court, Case No. 6:14-cv-00244

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated January 14, 2017 at 3:51 AM ST (4.4 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Landmark Technology, LLC, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Jeffer, Mangels, Butler & Marmaro LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Stanley Martin Gibson +1 310 201 3548 +1 310 203 0567 sgibson@jmbm.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Parker, Bunt & Ainsworth, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Charles Ainsworth +1 903 531 3535 +1 903 533 9687 charley@pbatyler.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Robert Christopher Bunt +1 903 531 3535 +1 903 533 9687 rcbunt@pbatyler.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Russ August & Kabat

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Reza Mirzaie +1 310 826 7474 +1 310 826 6991 rmirzaie@raklaw.com
v.
No Logo Boyd Gaming Corp., Defendant
  Entries (11) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 10/8/2014, Entered: None Order
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 4/24/2014, Entered: None
    SUMMONS Returned Executed by Landmark Technology LLC. Boyd Gaming Corp. served on 4/18/2014, answer due 5/9/2014. (mjc, ) (Entered: 04/28/2014)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 4/25/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
      ORDER OF CONSOLIDATION. The above listed cases are hereby consolidated into cause number 6:14cv243, for all pretrial purposes, including discovery and claim construction. The Clerk of the Court shall add the consolidated defendants to the lead case. The Clerk shall close all cases listed above other than the lead case. All future filings should be made in Lead Case 6:14cv243. The Court ORDERS Plaintiff to file a notice of readiness for scheduling conference in the lead case when all Defendants have either answered or filed a motion to transfer or dismiss. The notice must be filed within 5 days of the last remaining Defendants answer or motion. Within 5 days of this order, the Plaintiff also must file a notice indicating whether Plaintiff anticipates filing any additional related cases in this district. If the cases are not ready for scheduling conference within 90 days of this order, Plaintiff must file a detailed status report explaining the reason for the delay. Signed by Judge Michael H. Schneider on 04/25/14. (mll, ) (Entered: 04/26/2014)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 4/10/2014, Entered: None
        SUMMONS Issued as to Boyd Gaming Corp. and emailed to pltf for service. (klb) (Entered: 04/10/2014)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 4/8/2014, Entered: None
          NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Reza Mirzaie on behalf of Landmark Technology LLC (Mirzaie, Reza) (Entered: 04/08/2014)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 4/8/2014, Entered: None
            NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Stanley M Gibson on behalf of Landmark Technology LLC (Gibson, Stanley) (Entered: 04/08/2014)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 4/8/2014, Entered: None
              NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Robert Christopher Bunt on behalf of Landmark Technology LLC (Bunt, Robert) (Entered: 04/08/2014)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 4/7/2014, Entered: None
                CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Landmark Technology LLC (Ainsworth, Charles) (Entered: 04/07/2014)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 4/7/2014, Entered: None
                  Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120). AO 120 mailed to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (Ainsworth, Charles) (Entered: 04/07/2014)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 4/7/2014, Entered: None
                    DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Landmark Technology LLC. (Ainsworth, Charles) (Entered: 04/07/2014)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 4/4/2014, Entered: None
                      COMPLAINT against Boyd Gaming Corp. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0540-4598264.), filed by Landmark Technology LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Exhibit A - '319 Patent, # 3 Exhibit B - '319 C1, # 4 Exhibit C - '319 C2)(Ainsworth, Charles) (Entered: 04/04/2014)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF

                        Statistics

                        This case has been viewed 11 times.

                        No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                        Space
                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                         
                        PlainSite
                        Sign Up
                        Need Password Help?