USA v. Solow
Criminal Case Louisiana Eastern District Court, Case No. 2:00-cr-00288-HGB

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

United States of America United States of America, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Gaven T. Kammer +1 504 680 3000

Note: Criminal cases with multiple defendants may have several records with the same case number: one record for the master file (all defendants), as well as one record per defendant. It can often be difficult to tell which record is which. Other likely matches for this case include:

Office New Orleans
Filed 9/15/2000
County Orleans
Terminated 3/14/2001
Reopened
Other Court Case None
Count 1
Citation Section 18 U.S.C. § 2113B.F
Offense Level 4
182113(b) Did knowingly take and carry away with intent to steal and purloin approximately $64,000.00 of money belonging to and in the care, custody, control, management and possession of Bank One, Louisiana, N.A.
Def Custody Status Released
Flags CLOSED, MAG-3, SINGLE
  Entries (17) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 3/15/2001, Entered: 3/15/2001 Sealed Document +Court Filing
STATEMENT of Reasons for Imposing Sentence as to dft Rod M Solow. by Judge Helen G. Berrigan Date Signed: 3/14/01 (dno)
    Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 3/14/2001, Entered: 3/15/2001 Judgment*Court Filing
    (Filed 3/15/01) JUDGMENT & Commitment as to dft Rod M Solow Reported by O.J. Robert. Sentencing held 3/14/01 as to Ct 1 of the bill of information. Dft placed on probation for 1 year w/standard & special conditions as imposed. Dft fined $5,000.00. Special Assessment fee of $ 100.00. by Judge Helen G. Berrigan Date Signed: 3/14/01 ****CLOSED**** (dno)
      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
      Blank 15 Filed: 3/6/2001, Entered: 3/6/2001 Memorandum
      Sentencing MEMORANDUM filed by defendant Rod M Solow (gw)
        LREF
        Blank 14 Filed: 11/28/2000, Entered: 11/28/2000 Notice of Hearing.Court Filing
        NOTICE of sentencing set for 9:00 3/14/01 for Rod M Solow bfr Judge Helen G. Berrigan (ck)
          LREF
          Blank 13 Filed: 11/28/2000, Entered: 11/28/2000 Plea Agreement
          PLEA Agreement as to Rod M Solow (ck)
            LREF
            Blank 12 Filed: 11/28/2000, Entered: 11/28/2000 Factual Basis
            FACTUAL BASIS by plaintiff USA as to defendant Rod M Solow (ck)
              LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 11/28/2000, Entered: 11/28/2000 Minutes-MiscellaneousCourt Filing
              SMOOTH Minutes: Re-arraignment held as to defendant Rod M Solow; Reported/Recorded by Patricia Ralph; guilty plea entered as to Count 1 of the bill of information by Rod M Solow ; plea agreement filed; court accepts plea conditionally in light of the waiver of appellate rights contained in the plea bargaining agreement letter; dft conditionally adjudged guilty on plea; PSI ordered; trial and pre-trial dates are canceled; sentencing set for 9:00 3/14/01 for Rod M Solow dft released by Judge Helen G. Berrigan (ck) Modified on 11/29/2000
                Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 10/25/2000, Entered: 10/25/2000 Minutes-MiscellaneousCourt Filing
                MINUTE ENTRY (10/24/00) ORDERED that a re-arraignment will be held in lieu of the pre-trial conf on 11/28/00 at 9:00am for dft Rod M Solow. FURTHER ORDERED that if the rearraignment does not proceed, the pre-trial conf will go forward as scheduled. by Judge Helen G. Berrigan (dno)
                  Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                  Blank 10 Filed: 10/24/2000, Entered: 10/25/2000 ~Notice (other)Court Filing
                  NOTICE of rearraignment set for 11/28/00 at 9:00am bfr Judge as to dft Rod M Solow. (dno)
                    LREF
                    Blank 8 Filed: 9/28/2000, Entered: 9/29/2000 Summons Returned Executed
                    SUMMONS executed on 9/25/00 as to Rod M Solow (ijg)
                      LREF
                      Blank 7 Filed: 9/28/2000, Entered: 9/29/2000 Notice of Hearing.Court Filing
                      NOTICE of pretrial conference set for 9:00 11/28/00, & jury trial set for 10:00 12/4/00 bfr Judge Berrigan for Rod M Solow (ijg)
                        LREF
                        Blank 6 Filed: 9/27/2000, Entered: 9/28/2000 Waiver of Indictment
                        WAIVER of Indictment filed by dft Rod M. Solow. (dno)
                          LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 9/27/2000, Entered: 9/28/2000 Minutes-MiscellaneousCourt Filing
                          (Filed 9/28/00) MINUTE ENTRY (9/27/00) Dft Rod M Solow arraigned & not guilty plea entered. Atty Provino Mosca present & dft released on original bond. Waiver of indictment executed. Ntc of pretrial conf set for 9:00 11/28/00 & jury trial set for 10:00 12/4/00 bfr Judge. by Magistrate Louis Moore Jr. (dno)
                            Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 9/27/2000, Entered: 9/28/2000 Minutes-Miscellaneous
                            (Filed 9/28/00) MINUTE ENTRY (9/27/00) Initial appearance of dft Rod M Solow held this date. Dft informed Court that counsel would be retained & atty Provino C. Mosca was present. Unsecured Bond set for $ 10,000.00 & dft released on bond. Arraignment held. by Magistrate Louis Moore Jr. (dno)
                              Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 9/15/2000, Entered: 9/20/2000 Order
                              MTN by pla USA nd ORDER for issuance of a sms for dft Rod M Solow to appear on 9/27/00 at 2:00pm bfr Mag Moore for his initial appearance & arraignment. by Magistrate Lance M. Africk Date Signed: 9/19/00; 1 summons issued (dno)
                                Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                Blank 2 Filed: 9/15/2000, Entered: 9/18/2000 Notice of Hearing.
                                NOTICE of initial appearance & arraignment set for 2:00 9/27/00 bfr Mag Moore for dft Rod M Solow. (dno)
                                  LREF
                                  Blank 1 Filed: 9/15/2000, Entered: 9/18/2000 Information - Felony
                                  BILL OF INFORMATION by USA against dft Rod M Solow (1) count 1. (dno)
                                    LREF

                                    Statistics

                                    This case has been viewed 2,296 times.

                                    No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                    Space
                                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                     
                                    PlainSite
                                    Sign Up
                                    Need Password Help?