Integrated Battery Service System

Patent Application United States Patent and Trademark Office, Patent Application No. 11060323
Examiner Edward Raymond, presiding
Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Examiner Edward Raymond
Update UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert AlertsSpaceJump Jump
Summary

No one has written a summary of this case yet. Sign up or sign in to contribute one.

Parties
No Logo Dennis G. Thibedeau, Franklin, WI, Applicant

Represented by Hershikovitz & Associates

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Jared Barsky +1 703 370 4800
Space Eduardo Garcia-Otero +1 703 370 4800
Space Brian Hearn +1 540 899 6218
Space ABRAHAM HERSHKOVITZ +1 703 370 4800
Space Jae Youn Kim +1 703 370 4800
Space Dinh Nguyen +1 703 370 4800
Space Harold L. Novick docket@nkllaw.com
Space EUGENE RZUCIDLO +1 703 370 4800
Attributes
Patent Type Utility
First Named Inventor Dennis G. Thibedeau, Franklin, WI, ()
Filing Date February 18, 2005
Status Patented Case
Status Date Unknown
Location Electronic
USPTO Customer Number Unknown
Attorney Docket Number P68393DIV
Confirmation Number 5094
Group Art Unit 2857
Class / Sub-Class 702 / 63
Timeline
  Entries (162) Tab Overlap Assignments (3) Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 11/30/2010, Entered: None 1 - COCOUT
Certificate of Correction - Post Issue Communication (1 Page)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Blank  Filed: 7/13/2010, Entered: None Transaction History
Application Is Considered for C of C
LREF
Blank  Filed: 4/30/2010, Entered: None Transaction History
Mail Post Card
LREF
Blank  Filed: 4/22/2010, Entered: None Transaction History
Email Notification
LREF
Blank  Filed: 4/20/2010, Entered: None Transaction History
Mail-Petition Decision - Granted
LREF
Blank  Filed: 4/20/2010, Entered: None Transaction History
Petition Decision - Granted
LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 4/20/2010, Entered: None Prosecution - PETDEC
Petition Decision (1 Page)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Blank  Filed: 2/25/2010, Entered: None Transaction History
Petition Entered
LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 2/25/2010, Entered: None Prosecution - PET.PTA.RCAL
Request for PTA recalculation in view of Wyeth (1 Page)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 2/25/2010, Entered: None Prosecution - TRAN.LET
Transmittal Letter (1 Page)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 2/25/2010, Entered: None Prosecution - N417
EFS Acknowledgment Receipt (2 Pages)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 2/25/2010, Entered: None Prosecution - PET.PTA.RCAL
Request for PTA recalculation in view of Wyeth (2 Pages)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Blank  Filed: 2/2/2010, Entered: None Transaction History
Recordation of Patent Grant Mailed
LREF
Blank  Filed: 2/2/2010, Entered: None Transaction History
Patent Issue Date Used in PTA Calculation
LREF
Blank  Filed: 1/15/2010, Entered: None Transaction History
Email Notification
LREF
Blank  Filed: 1/13/2010, Entered: None Transaction History
Issue Notification Mailed
LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 1/13/2010, Entered: None Prosecution - ISSUE.NTF
Issue Notification (1 Page)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Blank  Filed: 12/29/2009, Entered: None Transaction History
Dispatch to FDC
LREF
Blank  Filed: 12/17/2009, Entered: None Transaction History
Application Is Considered Ready for Issue
LREF
Blank  Filed: 12/14/2009, Entered: None Transaction History
Miscellaneous Incoming Letter
LREF
Blank  Filed: 12/14/2009, Entered: None Transaction History
Issue Fee Payment Verified
LREF
Blank  Filed: 12/14/2009, Entered: None Transaction History
Issue Fee Payment Received
LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 12/14/2009, Entered: None Prosecution - IFEE
Issue Fee Payment (PTO-85B) (1 Page)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 12/14/2009, Entered: None Prosecution - LET.
Miscellaneous Incoming Letter (2 Pages)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 12/14/2009, Entered: None Prosecution - TRAN.LET
Transmittal Letter (1 Page)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 12/14/2009, Entered: None Prosecution - N417
EFS Acknowledgment Receipt (2 Pages)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 12/14/2009, Entered: None Prosecution - LET.
Miscellaneous Incoming Letter (1 Page)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 12/14/2009, Entered: None Prosecution - IFEE
Issue Fee Payment (PTO-85B) (1 Page)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 12/14/2009, Entered: None Prosecution - TRAN.LET
Transmittal Letter (1 Page)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 12/14/2009, Entered: None Prosecution - N417
EFS Acknowledgment Receipt (2 Pages)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 12/14/2009, Entered: None Prosecution - WFEE
Fee Worksheet (SB06) (2 Pages)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 12/14/2009, Entered: None Prosecution - IFEE
Issue Fee Payment (PTO-85B) (1 Page)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 10/8/2009, Entered: None Prior Art - 1449
List of References cited by applicant and considered by examiner (1 Page)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Blank  Filed: 9/15/2009, Entered: None Transaction History
Electronic Review
LREF
Blank  Filed: 9/15/2009, Entered: None Transaction History
Email Notification
LREF
Blank  Filed: 9/15/2009, Entered: None Transaction History
Mail Notice of Allowance
LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 9/15/2009, Entered: None Prosecution - SRFW
Search information including classification, databases and other search related notes (1 Page)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 9/15/2009, Entered: None Prosecution - IIFW
Issue Information including classification, examiner, name, claim, renumbering, etc. (1 Page)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 9/15/2009, Entered: None Prosecution - FWCLM
Index of Claims (2 Pages)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 9/15/2009, Entered: None Prosecution - NOA
Notice of Allowance and Fees Due (PTOL-85) (4 Pages)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Blank  Filed: 9/10/2009, Entered: None Transaction History
Notice of Allowance Data Verification Completed
LREF
Blank  Filed: 9/10/2009, Entered: None Transaction History
Document Verification
LREF
Blank  Filed: 9/1/2009, Entered: None Transaction History
Date Forwarded to Examiner
LREF
Blank  Filed: 8/27/2009, Entered: None Transaction History
Amendment after Final Rejection
LREF
Blank  Filed: 8/27/2009, Entered: None Transaction History
Request for Extension of Time - Granted
LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 8/27/2009, Entered: None Prosecution - WFEE
Fee Worksheet (SB06) (1 Page)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 8/27/2009, Entered: None Prosecution - TRAN.LET
Transmittal Letter (1 Page)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 8/27/2009, Entered: None Prosecution - N417
EFS Acknowledgment Receipt (2 Pages)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 8/27/2009, Entered: None Prosecution - WFEE
Fee Worksheet (SB06) (2 Pages)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 8/27/2009, Entered: None Prosecution - XT/
Extension of Time (1 Page)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 8/27/2009, Entered: None Prosecution - REM
Applicant Arguments/Remarks Made in an Amendment (3 Pages)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 8/27/2009, Entered: None Prosecution - CLM
Claims (6 Pages)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 8/27/2009, Entered: None Prosecution - A.NE
Amendment After Final (1 Page)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Blank  Filed: 6/5/2009, Entered: None Transaction History
Email Notification
LREF
Blank  Filed: 6/5/2009, Entered: None Transaction History
Change in Power of Attorney (May Include Associate POA)
LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 6/5/2009, Entered: None Prosecution - N570
Communication - Re: Power of Attorney (PTOL-308) (1 Page)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 6/5/2009, Entered: None Prosecution - N570
Communication - Re: Power of Attorney (PTOL-308) (1 Page)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Blank  Filed: 6/1/2009, Entered: None Transaction History
Correspondence Address Change
LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 5/5/2009, Entered: None Prosecution - PA..
Power of Attorney (1 Page)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 5/5/2009, Entered: None Prosecution - LET.
Miscellaneous Incoming Letter (1 Page)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 5/5/2009, Entered: None Prosecution - N417
EFS Acknowledgment Receipt (2 Pages)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Blank  Filed: 4/27/2009, Entered: None Transaction History
Mail Final Rejection (PTOL - 326)
LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 4/27/2009, Entered: None Prosecution - SRFW
Search information including classification, databases and other search related notes (1 Page)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 4/27/2009, Entered: None Prosecution - FWCLM
Index of Claims (2 Pages)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 4/27/2009, Entered: None Prosecution - CTFR
Final Rejection (8 Pages)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Blank  Filed: 4/24/2009, Entered: None Transaction History
Final Rejection
LREF
Blank  Filed: 3/25/2009, Entered: None Transaction History
Date Forwarded to Examiner
LREF
Blank  Filed: 2/24/2009, Entered: None Transaction History
Response after Non-Final Action
LREF
Blank  Filed: 2/24/2009, Entered: None Transaction History
Request for Extension of Time - Granted
LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 2/24/2009, Entered: None Prosecution - WFEE
Fee Worksheet (SB06) (1 Page)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 2/24/2009, Entered: None Prosecution - N417
EFS Acknowledgment Receipt (2 Pages)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 2/24/2009, Entered: None Prosecution - WFEE
Fee Worksheet (SB06) (2 Pages)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 2/24/2009, Entered: None Prosecution - REM
Applicant Arguments/Remarks Made in an Amendment (7 Pages)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 2/24/2009, Entered: None Prosecution - A...
Amendment/Req. Reconsideration-After Non-Final Reject (2 Pages)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 2/24/2009, Entered: None Prosecution - XT/
Extension of Time (1 Page)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 2/24/2009, Entered: None Prosecution - LET.
Miscellaneous Incoming Letter (1 Page)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Blank  Filed: 11/14/2008, Entered: None Transaction History
Mail Non-Final Rejection
LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 11/14/2008, Entered: None Prosecution - SRFW
Search information including classification, databases and other search related notes (1 Page)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 11/14/2008, Entered: None Prosecution - FWCLM
Index of Claims (2 Pages)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 11/14/2008, Entered: None Prosecution - BIB
Bibliographic Data Sheet (1 Page)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 11/14/2008, Entered: None Prior Art - 892
List of references cited by examiner (1 Page)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 11/14/2008, Entered: None Prosecution - CTNF
Non-Final Rejection (7 Pages)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Blank  Filed: 11/10/2008, Entered: None Transaction History
Non-Final Rejection
LREF
Blank  Filed: 10/21/2008, Entered: None Transaction History
Date Forwarded to Examiner
LREF
Blank  Filed: 10/17/2008, Entered: None Transaction History
Amendment after Final Rejection
LREF
Blank  Filed: 10/17/2008, Entered: None Transaction History
Request for Extension of Time - Granted
LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 10/17/2008, Entered: None Prosecution - XT/
Extension of Time (2 Pages)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 10/17/2008, Entered: None Prosecution - LET.
Miscellaneous Incoming Letter (1 Page)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 10/17/2008, Entered: None Prosecution - N417
EFS Acknowledgment Receipt (2 Pages)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 10/17/2008, Entered: None Prosecution - REM
Applicant Arguments/Remarks Made in an Amendment (9 Pages)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 10/17/2008, Entered: None Prosecution - CLM
Claims (6 Pages)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 10/17/2008, Entered: None Prosecution - A.NE
Amendment After Final (1 Page)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Blank  Filed: 4/17/2008, Entered: None Transaction History
Mail Final Rejection (PTOL - 326)
LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 4/17/2008, Entered: None Prosecution - SRFW
Search information including classification, databases and other search related notes (1 Page)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 4/17/2008, Entered: None Prosecution - FWCLM
Index of Claims (2 Pages)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 4/17/2008, Entered: None Prosecution - CTFR
Final Rejection (1 Page)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 4/17/2008, Entered: None Prosecution - BIB
Bibliographic Data Sheet (1 Page)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 4/17/2008, Entered: None Prosecution - CTFR
Final Rejection (5 Pages)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 4/17/2008, Entered: None Prosecution - CTFR
Final Rejection (2 Pages)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Blank  Filed: 4/14/2008, Entered: None Transaction History
Final Rejection
LREF
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank  Filed: 3/28/2008, Entered: None Transaction History
Date Forwarded to Examiner
LREF
Blank  Filed: 3/4/2008, Entered: None Transaction History
Response after Non-Final Action
LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 3/4/2008, Entered: None Prosecution - WFEE
Fee Worksheet (SB06) (1 Page)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 3/4/2008, Entered: None Prosecution - REM
Applicant Arguments/Remarks Made in an Amendment (3 Pages)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 3/4/2008, Entered: None Prosecution - CLM
Claims (4 Pages)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 3/4/2008, Entered: None Prosecution - A...
Amendment/Req. Reconsideration-After Non-Final Reject (2 Pages)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Blank  Filed: 12/4/2007, Entered: None Transaction History
Mail Non-Final Rejection
LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 12/4/2007, Entered: None Prosecution - BIB
Bibliographic Data Sheet (1 Page)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 12/4/2007, Entered: None Prosecution - SRFW
Search information including classification, databases and other search related notes (1 Page)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 12/4/2007, Entered: None Prosecution - FWCLM
Index of Claims (1 Page)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 12/4/2007, Entered: None Prior Art - 1449
List of References cited by applicant and considered by examiner (2 Pages)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 12/4/2007, Entered: None Prior Art - 892
List of references cited by examiner (1 Page)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 12/4/2007, Entered: None Prosecution - CTNF
Non-Final Rejection (6 Pages)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Blank  Filed: 11/13/2007, Entered: None Transaction History
Non-Final Rejection
LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 11/13/2007, Entered: None 1 - SRNT
Examiner's search strategy and results (7 Pages)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Blank  Filed: 9/24/2007, Entered: None Transaction History
Case Docketed to Examiner in GAU
LREF
Blank  Filed: 8/1/2007, Entered: None Transaction History
Case Docketed to Examiner in GAU
LREF
Blank  Filed: 6/7/2007, Entered: None Transaction History
Information Disclosure Statement considered
LREF
Blank  Filed: 6/7/2007, Entered: None Transaction History
Reference capture on IDS
LREF
Blank  Filed: 6/7/2007, Entered: None Transaction History
Information Disclosure Statement (IDS) Filed
LREF
Blank  Filed: 6/7/2007, Entered: None Transaction History
Information Disclosure Statement (IDS) Filed
LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 6/7/2007, Entered: None Prosecution - N417
EFS Acknowledgment Receipt (2 Pages)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 6/7/2007, Entered: None Prior Art - IDS
Information Disclosure Statement (IDS) Form (SB08) (3 Pages)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 6/12/2006, Entered: None Prosecution - WCLM
Claims Worksheet (PTO-2022) (1 Page)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 6/12/2006, Entered: None Prosecution - WFEE
Fee Worksheet (SB06) (1 Page)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Blank  Filed: 6/6/2006, Entered: None Transaction History
IFW TSS Processing by Tech Center Complete
LREF
Blank  Filed: 4/13/2005, Entered: None Transaction History
Application Return from OIPE
LREF
Blank  Filed: 4/13/2005, Entered: None Transaction History
Application Is Now Complete
LREF
Blank  Filed: 4/13/2005, Entered: None Transaction History
Application Return TO OIPE
LREF
Blank  Filed: 4/13/2005, Entered: None Transaction History
Application Return from OIPE
LREF
Blank  Filed: 4/13/2005, Entered: None Transaction History
Application Is Now Complete
LREF
Blank  Filed: 4/13/2005, Entered: None Transaction History
Application Return TO OIPE
LREF
Blank  Filed: 4/13/2005, Entered: None Transaction History
Application Return from OIPE
LREF
Blank  Filed: 4/13/2005, Entered: None Transaction History
Application Is Now Complete
LREF
Blank  Filed: 4/13/2005, Entered: None Transaction History
Application Return TO OIPE
LREF
Blank  Filed: 4/12/2005, Entered: None Transaction History
Application Dispatched from OIPE
LREF
Blank  Filed: 4/12/2005, Entered: None Transaction History
Application Is Now Complete
LREF
Blank  Filed: 4/7/2005, Entered: None Transaction History
Cleared by L&R (LARS)
LREF
Blank  Filed: 3/18/2005, Entered: None Transaction History
Referred to Level 2 (LARS) by OIPE CSR
LREF
Blank  Filed: 3/4/2005, Entered: None Transaction History
IFW Scan & PACR Auto Security Review
LREF
Blank  Filed: 2/18/2005, Entered: None Transaction History
Information Disclosure Statement considered
LREF
Blank  Filed: 2/18/2005, Entered: None Transaction History
Reference capture on IDS
LREF
Blank  Filed: 2/18/2005, Entered: None Transaction History
Information Disclosure Statement (IDS) Filed
LREF
Blank  Filed: 2/18/2005, Entered: None Transaction History
Information Disclosure Statement (IDS) Filed
LREF
Blank  Filed: 2/18/2005, Entered: None Transaction History
Preliminary Amendment
LREF
Blank  Filed: 2/18/2005, Entered: None Transaction History
Initial Exam Team nn
LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 2/18/2005, Entered: None Prior Art - IDS
Information Disclosure Statement (IDS) Form (SB08) (3 Pages)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 2/18/2005, Entered: None Prosecution - REM
Applicant Arguments/Remarks Made in an Amendment (1 Page)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 2/18/2005, Entered: None Prosecution - CLM
Claims (3 Pages)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 2/18/2005, Entered: None Prosecution - SPEC
Specification (1 Page)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 2/18/2005, Entered: None Prosecution - A.PE
Preliminary Amendment (1 Page)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 2/18/2005, Entered: None Prosecution - WFEE
Fee Worksheet (SB06) (1 Page)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 2/18/2005, Entered: None Prosecution - WFEE
Fee Worksheet (SB06) (1 Page)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 2/18/2005, Entered: None Prosecution - WCLM
Claims Worksheet (PTO-2022) (1 Page)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 2/18/2005, Entered: None Prosecution - OATH
Oath or Declaration filed (9 Pages)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 2/18/2005, Entered: None Prosecution - DRW
Drawings-only black and white line drawings (9 Pages)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 2/18/2005, Entered: None Prosecution - DRW
Drawings-only black and white line drawings (8 Pages)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 2/18/2005, Entered: None Prosecution - ABST
Abstract (1 Page)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 2/18/2005, Entered: None Prosecution - CLM
Claims (12 Pages)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 2/18/2005, Entered: None Prosecution - SPEC
Specification (31 Pages)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 2/18/2005, Entered: None Prosecution - 136A
Authorization for Extension of Time all replies (4 Pages)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 2/18/2005, Entered: None Prosecution - TRNA
Transmittal of New Application (4 Pages)
Request RequestSpace LREF

Statistics

This case has been viewed 5 times.

Space
Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
 
PlainSite
Sign Up
Need Password Help?