Ryan v. Rasetta
Federal Civil Lawsuit Massachusetts District Court, Case No. 1:03-cv-12323-RGS

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated January 6, 2019 at 4:39 AM EST (2.9 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Space Space

No Logo Christopher Barletta, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Segal Roitman LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Gregory A Geiman +1 617 742 0208 +1 617 742 2187 ggeiman@segalroitman.com
Space Anne R. Sills +1 617 742 0208 +1 617 742 2187 asills@segalroitman.com
No Logo International Union of Operating Engineers, Local 4, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Segal Roitman LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Gregory A Geiman +1 617 742 0208 +1 617 742 2187 ggeiman@segalroitman.com
Space Anne R. Sills +1 617 742 0208 +1 617 742 2187 asills@segalroitman.com
No Logo John J. Shaughnessy, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Segal Roitman LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Gregory A Geiman +1 617 742 0208 +1 617 742 2187 ggeiman@segalroitman.com
Space Anne R. Sills +1 617 742 0208 +1 617 742 2187 asills@segalroitman.com
No Logo Louis Rasetta, Jr., Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Segal Roitman LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Gregory A Geiman +1 617 742 0208 +1 617 742 2187 ggeiman@segalroitman.com
No Logo William Ryan, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Segal Roitman LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Gregory A Geiman +1 617 742 0208 +1 617 742 2187 ggeiman@segalroitman.com
Space Anne R. Sills +1 617 742 0208 +1 617 742 2187 asills@segalroitman.com
v.
No Logo Walton Systems International, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Edmund M. Hurley +1 617 248 0240 +1 617 227 5731
Office Boston
Filed 11/20/2003
Jury Demand None
Demand
Nature of Suit 791 - Labor: Employee Retirement Income Security Act (ERISA)
Cause Section 29 U.S.C. § 1132 E.R.I.S.A.-Employee Benefits
Jurisdiction Federal Question
Disposition Judgment - Motion Before Trial
County Suffolk
Terminated 6/28/2005
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flag CLOSED
  Entries (27) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document 19 Filed: 7/20/2005, Entered: 7/25/2005 Writ Issued
WRIT of First Execution issued. (Johnson, Mary)
    LREF
    Legal Document 18 Filed: 6/29/2005, Entered: 6/29/2005 Judgment*Court Filing
    Judge Richard G. Stearns : Electronic ORDER entered. JUDGMENT in favor of plaintiffs against defendant in the amountof $39,907.05.(Johnson, Mary)
      LREF
      Blank -- Filed: 6/28/2005, Entered: 6/29/2005 Order on Motion for Summary Judgment
      Judge Richard G. Stearns : Electronic ORDER entered granting [14] Motion for Summary Judgment (Flaherty, Elaine)
        LREF
        Blank -- Filed: 6/28/2005, Entered: 6/28/2005 Notice of correction to docket made by Court staff.
        Notice of correction to docket made by Court staff. Correction: endorsed order of 6/28/05 corrected because: wrong case (Flaherty, Elaine)
          LREF
          Legal Document 17 Filed: 5/13/2005, Entered: 5/13/2005 Affidavit
          AFFIDAVIT of Anne R. Sills re [15] Memorandum in Support of Motion by William Ryan, John J. Shaughnessy, Louis Rasetta, Jr, Christopher Barletta, International Union of Operating Engineers, Local 4. (Geiman, Gregory)
            LREF
            Legal Document 16 Filed: 5/13/2005, Entered: 5/13/2005 Affidavit
            AFFIDAVIT of James Bucci re [15] Memorandum in Support of Motion by William Ryan, John J. Shaughnessy, Louis Rasetta, Jr, Christopher Barletta, International Union of Operating Engineers, Local 4. (Geiman, Gregory)
              LREF
              Legal Document 15 Filed: 5/13/2005, Entered: 5/13/2005 Memorandum in Support of Motion
              MEMORANDUM in Support re [14] MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by William Ryan, John J. Shaughnessy, Louis Rasetta, Jr, Christopher Barletta, International Union of Operating Engineers, Local 4. (Geiman, Gregory)
                LREF
                Legal Document 14 Filed: 5/13/2005, Entered: 5/13/2005, Terminated: 6/28/2005 Motion for Summary Judgment
                MOTION for Summary Judgment by William Ryan, John J. Shaughnessy, Louis Rasetta, Jr, Christopher Barletta, International Union of Operating Engineers, Local 4.(Geiman, Gregory)
                  LREF
                  Legal Document 13 Filed: 3/3/2005, Entered: 3/3/2005 Scheduling OrderCourt Filing
                  Judge Richard G. Stearns : Electronic ORDER entered. AMENDED SCHEDULING ORDER: " 1. Amendments to pleadings (if any) shall be filed by May 2, 2005; 2. All fact discovery shall be completed by June 3, 2005; 3. Expert discovery shall be completed by August 5, 2005; 4. Dispositive motions shall be filed by September 12, 2005 with responses due by September 26, 2005. NO extensions will be granted by the Court except for good cause shown. SO ORDERED." (Johnson, Mary) .
                    LREF
                    Legal Document 12 Filed: 2/28/2005, Entered: 2/28/2005 Status Report
                    STATUS REPORT by William Ryan, John J. Shaughnessy, Louis Rasetta, Jr, Christopher Barletta, International Union of Operating Engineers, Local 4. (Geiman, Gregory)
                      LREF
                      Blank -- Filed: 1/6/2005, Entered: 1/7/2005 Electronic Endorsement (non-order)
                      Judge Richard G. Stearns : Electronic ORDER entered. ELECTRONIC ENDORSEMENT re [11] Status Report filed by John J. Shaughnessy,, William Ryan,, Louis Rasetta, Jr., Christopher Barletta,, International Union of Operating Engineers, Local 4, "The motion to stay proceedings to 2/28/05 is Allowed."(Flaherty, Elaine)
                        LREF
                        Legal Document 11 Filed: 12/30/2004, Entered: 12/30/2004 Status Report
                        STATUS REPORT by Christopher Barletta, International Union of Operating Engineers, Local 4, Louis Rasetta Jr., William Ryan, John J. Shaughnessy. (Geiman, Gregory)
                          LREF
                          Blank -- Filed: 12/2/2004, Entered: 12/7/2004 Electronic Endorsement (non-order)
                          Judge Richard G. Stearns : ORDER entered ELECTRONIC ENDORSEMENT re [10] Status Report filed by John J. Shaughnessy, William Ryan, Louis Rasetta, Walton Systems International, Inc., International Union of Operating Engineers, Local 4 "Approved. The stay will be continued to 12/30/04." (Flaherty, Elaine)
                            LREF
                            Legal Document 10 Filed: 11/30/2004, Entered: 12/1/2004 Status Report
                            STATUS REPORT by International Union of Operating Engineers, Local 4, Louis Rasetta Jr., William Ryan, John J. Shaughnessy, Walton Systems International, Inc.. (Flaherty, Elaine)
                              LREF
                              Blank -- Filed: 9/1/2004, Entered: 9/16/2004 Scheduling Conference
                              Electronic Clerk's Notes for proceedings held before Judge Richard G. Stearns : Scheduling Conference held on 9/1/2004. Atty. Geiman present for the pltf. Atty. Hurley present for the deft. Case shall be stayed for 90 days to afford the defendant an opportunity to make efforts to settle the matter with the Fund. Counsel shall file a written Status Report with the Court in 90 days.(Court Reporter None.) (Johnson, Mary) Modified on 9/16/2004 (Johnson, Mary).
                                LREF
                                Legal Document 9 Filed: 8/31/2004, Entered: 9/7/2004 Certification pursuant to Local Rule 16.1
                                CERTIFICATION pursuant to Local Rule 16.1 by Christopher Barletta, International Union of Operating Engineers, Local 4, Louis Rasetta Jr., William Ryan, John J. Shaughnessy.(Flaherty, Elaine)
                                  LREF
                                  Legal Document 8 Filed: 8/26/2004, Entered: 8/31/2004 Joint statement re scheduling conference
                                  JOINT STATEMENT re scheduling conference. (Flaherty, Elaine)
                                    LREF
                                    Legal Document 7 Filed: 8/2/2004, Entered: 8/3/2004 Notice of Scheduling ConferenceCourt Filing
                                    NOTICE of Scheduling Conference. Scheduling Conference set for 9/1/2004 02:30 PM in Courtroom 21 before Judge Richard G. Stearns. (Johnson, Mary)
                                      LREF
                                      Legal Document 6 Filed: 7/29/2004, Entered: 7/30/2004 Answer
                                      ANSWER to Complaint by Walton Systems International, Inc..(Flaherty, Elaine)
                                        LREF
                                        Blank -- Filed: 7/29/2004, Entered: 7/30/2004 Order on Motion to Set Aside Default
                                        Judge Richard G. Stearns : Endorsed ORDER entered granting [5] Motion to Set Aside Default (Flaherty, Elaine)
                                          LREF
                                          Legal Document 5 Filed: 7/28/2004, Entered: 7/29/2004 Motion to Set Aside Default
                                          MOTION to Set Aside Default and answer late by Walton Systems International, Inc..(Flaherty, Elaine)
                                            LREF
                                            Legal Document 4 Filed: 7/20/2004, Entered: 7/23/2004 Notice: Clerk's Entry of Default
                                            NOTICE: Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to Walton Systems International, Inc. (Flaherty, Elaine)
                                              LREF
                                              Legal Document 3 Filed: 7/2/2004, Entered: 7/23/2004 Request for notice of default
                                              Request for notice of default. (Flaherty, Elaine)
                                                LREF
                                                Legal Document 2 Filed: 5/13/2004, Entered: 5/24/2004 Summons Returned Executed
                                                SUMMONS Returned Executed Walton Systems International, Inc. served on 5/3/2004, answer due 5/24/2004. (Flaherty, Elaine)
                                                  LREF
                                                  Legal Document 1 Filed: 11/20/2003, Entered: 11/24/2003 Complaint
                                                  COMPLAINT against Louis Rasetta Jr., Walton Systems International, Inc. Filing fee: $ 150, receipt number 51883, filed by Christopher Barletta, International Union of Operating Engineers, Local 4.(Flaherty, Elaine)
                                                    LREF
                                                    Blank -- Filed: 11/20/2003, Entered: 11/24/2003 Magistrate Judge Assignment
                                                    If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge Bowler. (Flaherty, Elaine)
                                                      LREF
                                                      Blank -- Filed: 11/20/2003, Entered: 11/24/2003 Summons Issued
                                                      Summons Issued as to Walton Systems International, Inc.. (Flaherty, Elaine)
                                                        LREF

                                                        Statistics

                                                        This case has been viewed 47 times.

                                                        No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                        Space
                                                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                         
                                                        PlainSite
                                                        Sign Up
                                                        Need Password Help?