USA v. Orlale
Federal Court Proceeding Massachusetts District Court, Case No. 1:03-mj-00468-RBC
Magistrate Judge Robert B. Collings, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

United States of America United States of America, Plaintiff
Officially listed as "USA"

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Victor A. Wild +1 617 748 3145 +1 617 748 3960 victor.wild@usdoj.gov
Office Boston
Filed 11/20/2003
County Suffolk
Terminated
Reopened
Other Court Case None
Citation
Offense Level 4
Def Custody Status
Flag CLOSED
  Entries (6) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank -- Filed: 6/15/2004, Entered: 6/15/2004 Terminate Criminal Case
Case Terminated as to Benjamin Orlale (Affsa, Gina)
    LREF
    Blank -- Filed: 6/15/2004, Entered: 6/15/2004 Add and Terminate Attorneys
    Attorney update in case as to Benjamin Orlale. Attorney Victor A. Wild for USA added. (Affsa, Gina)
      LREF
      Blank -- Filed: 6/10/2004, Entered: 6/15/2004 Order on Motion to Dismiss
      Judge Robert B. Collings: Electronic ORDER entered granting [2] Motion to Dismiss as to Benjamin Orlale (1) (Affsa, Gina)
        LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 6/9/2004, Entered: 6/15/2004 Motion to Dismiss
        MOTION to Dismiss as to Benjamin Orlale by USA. (Affsa, Gina)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 11/20/2003, Entered: 11/24/2003 Complaint
          COMPLAINT as to Benjamin Orlale (1). (Boyce, Kathy)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Blank -- Filed: 11/20/2003, Entered: 11/24/2003 Arrest Warrant Issued
            Arrest Warrant Issued as to Benjamin Orlale. (Boyce, Kathy)
              LREF

              Statistics

              This case has been viewed 165 times.

              No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
              Space
              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
               
              PlainSite
              Sign Up
              Need Password Help?