White v. Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors
Federal Civil Lawsuit Massachusetts District Court, Case No. 4:03-cv-40279-NMG

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo John A. Burdick, Jr., Trustee

Toggle Switch Represented by cwg11.com Law Firm Placeholder

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Michael J. Goldberg +1 617 951 2505 +1 617 951 0679 goldberg@cwg11.com

Represented by Sherin & Lodgen LLP

No Logo Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors, Appellee

Toggle Switch Represented by cwg11.com Law Firm Placeholder

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Michael J. Goldberg +1 617 951 2505 +1 617 951 0679 goldberg@cwg11.com
No Logo Robert White, Appellant
Office Worcester
Filed 12/15/2003
Jury Demand None
Demand
Nature of Suit 422 - Bankruptcy Appeals, Rule 28 U.S.C. ยง 158
Cause Section 28 U.S.C. § 0158 Notice of Appeal re Bankruptcy Matter (BA
Jurisdiction Federal Question
Disposition Judgment - Other
County Worcester
Terminated 11/8/2004
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case
Related Case
403-cv-40229-NMG
Other Court Case '05-1060'['First Circuit']
Def Custody Status
Flag CLOSED
  Entries (39) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document 32 Filed: 10/5/2005, Entered: 10/5/2005, Terminated: 10/5/2005 USCA Mandate
MANDATE of USCA as to [27] Notice of Appeal, filed by Robert White. Having carefully reviewed the parties' briefs, the record on appeal, and the applicable law, we AFFIRM the judgment of the district court for essentially the same reasons as those given by the district court in the Memorandum and Order of November 4, 2004. AFFIRMED. (Ramos, Jeanette)
    LREF
    Blank -- Filed: 10/5/2005, Entered: 10/5/2005 Appeal Record Returned
    Appeal Record Returned: [27] Notice of Appeal, (Ramos, Jeanette)
      LREF
      Legal Document 31 Filed: 1/20/2005, Entered: 1/20/2005, Terminated: 10/5/2005 USCA Case Number
      USCA Case Number 05-1060 for [27] Notice of Appeal, filed by Robert White,. (Ramos, Jeanette)
        LREF
        Legal Document 30 Filed: 1/12/2005, Entered: 1/13/2005 Appeal Record Sent to USCA
        Certified and Transmitted Record on Appeal to US Court of Appeals re [27] Notice of Appeal, (Ramos, Jeanette)
          LREF
          Blank -- Filed: 1/10/2005, Entered: 1/10/2005 Notice of correction to docket made by Court staff.
          Notice of correction to docket made by Court staff. Correction: Docket # 28 deleted, corrected because: The Notice of Appeal was inadvertently duplicated. A new entry has been done just reflecting that the filing fee was paid. Counsel has been notified. cc/cl (Barrette, Mark)
            LREF
            Legal Document 29 Filed: 12/10/2004, Entered: 12/15/2004 Proposed Document(s) submitted
            Proposed Document(s) submitted by Robert White. Document received: Designation of the Record. (Barrette, Mark)
              LREF
              Blank -- Filed: 12/10/2004, Entered: 1/10/2005 Filing Fee/Payment Received
              Filing fee: $ 255, receipt number 60730 regarding Notice of Appeal Filing Fee (Barrette, Mark)
                LREF
                Legal Document 27 Filed: 12/3/2004, Entered: 12/10/2004 Notice of Appeal
                NOTICE OF APPEAL as to [26] Memorandum & ORDER by Robert White. NOTICE TO COUNSEL: A Transcript Report/Order Form, which can be downloaded from the First Circuit Court of Appeals web site at http://www.ca1.uscourts.gov/clerks/transcript.htm MUST be completed and submitted to the Court of Appeals. Appeal Record due by 12/23/2004. (Barrette, Mark)
                  LREF
                  Blank -- Filed: 11/8/2004, Entered: 11/8/2004 Terminated Case
                  Civil Case Terminated. (Barrette, Mark)
                    LREF
                    Legal Document 26 Filed: 11/4/2004, Entered: 11/5/2004 Memorandum and OrderCourt Filing
                    Judge Nathaniel M. Gorton : ORDER entered MEMORANDUM AND ORDER Affirming the Bankruptcy Court's Order ALLOWING Defendant's Motion to Sell.(Barrette, Mark)
                      LREF
                      Legal Document 25 Filed: 6/16/2004, Entered: 6/16/2004, Terminated: 11/8/2004 Motion for Leave to File
                      MOTION for Leave to File a Reply by Harold Bowers, c/s.(Hassett, Kathy)
                        LREF
                        Legal Document 24 Filed: 5/27/2004, Entered: 5/27/2004 Opposition to Motion
                        Opposition re [22] MOTION for Leave to File Affidavit by Harold L. Bowers - Pro Se filed by John A. Burdick Jr.. (DeProspo, Anthony)
                          LREF
                          Blank -- Filed: 5/27/2004, Entered: 5/27/2004 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
                          Judge Nathaniel M. Gorton : Electronic ORDER entered by the court granting [16] Motion for calendar preference. Motion allowed to the extent that the case is fully brief and the court will take the matter under advisement. (cc/cl) (Castles, Martin) Modified on 5/28/2004 (Jones, Sherry).
                            LREF
                            Legal Document 23 Filed: 5/19/2004, Entered: 5/19/2004 Certificate Of Service.
                            CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Harold Bowers re [21] Notice of Appearance, [22] MOTION for Leave to File. (Hassett, Kathy)
                              LREF
                              Legal Document 22 Filed: 5/19/2004, Entered: 5/19/2004, Terminated: 11/8/2004 Motion for Leave to File
                              MOTION for Leave to File Affidavit by Harold Bowers - Pro Se.(Hassett, Kathy)
                                LREF
                                Legal Document 21 Filed: 5/19/2004, Entered: 5/19/2004 Notice of Appearance/
                                NOTICE of Appearance by Harold Bowers (Hassett, Kathy)
                                  LREF
                                  Legal Document 20 Filed: 4/8/2004, Entered: 4/8/2004, Terminated: 10/5/2005 Appellants Reply Brief
                                  Appellant's response to Appellee's REPLY BRIEF by Robert White, c/s. (Jones, Sherry)
                                    LREF
                                    Legal Document 19 Filed: 3/31/2004, Entered: 3/31/2004, Terminated: 10/5/2005 Appellees Brief
                                    Appellee's BRIEF by Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors. (Attachments: # (1) Trustee's Appendix)(Jones, Sherry)
                                      LREF
                                      Blank -- Filed: 3/23/2004, Entered: 3/23/2004 Order on Motion for Extension of Time
                                      Judge Nathaniel M. Gorton : Electronic ORDER entered denying [18] Motion for Extension of Time. (see order on docket No. 15) (cc/cl) (Castles, Martin)
                                        LREF
                                        Legal Document 18 Filed: 3/22/2004, Entered: 3/22/2004, Terminated: 3/23/2004 Motion for Extension of Time
                                        MOTION for Extension of Time to 7 days after approval of Sherin and Lodgren as Trustee's Special Counsel to file Counter-Designation of the Appellate Record by John A. Burdick Jr., c/s.(Hassett, Kathy)
                                          LREF
                                          Blank -- Filed: 3/22/2004, Entered: 3/23/2004 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File
                                          Judge Nathaniel M. Gorton : Electronic ORDER entered denying [15] Motion for Extension of Time to File; the trustee will file appellee's brief and his response to appellant's "motion for calendar preference" on or before Wed., March 31, 2004. (cc/cl) (Castles, Martin)
                                            LREF
                                            Legal Document 17 Filed: 3/15/2004, Entered: 3/15/2004 Certificate Of Service.
                                            CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Robert White re [16] MOTION for Calendar Preference. (Hassett, Kathy)
                                              LREF
                                              Legal Document 16 Filed: 3/15/2004, Entered: 3/15/2004, Terminated: 5/27/2004 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
                                              MOTION for Calendar Preference.(Hassett, Kathy)
                                                LREF
                                                Legal Document 15 Filed: 3/12/2004, Entered: 3/12/2004, Terminated: 3/22/2004 Motion for Extension of Time to File
                                                MOTION for Extension of Time to file Appellee's Brief to 14 days after Bankruptcy Court's authorization to employ special counsel to File by John A. Burdick Jr., c/s.(Hassett, Kathy)
                                                  LREF
                                                  Blank 14 Filed: 3/2/2004, Entered: 3/3/2004 TranscriptCourt Filing
                                                  TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on November 6, 2003 before Judge Henry J. Boroff. Court Reporter: GCI Transcription. The original transcripts are maintained in the case file in the Clerk's Office. Copies may be obtained by contacting the court reporter or the Clerk's Office. (Jones, Sherry)
                                                    LREF
                                                    Blank 13 Filed: 3/2/2004, Entered: 3/3/2004 TranscriptCourt Filing
                                                    TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on October 30, 2003 before Judge Henry J. Boroff. Court Reporter: GCI Transcription. The original transcripts are maintained in the case file in the Clerk's Office. Copies may be obtained by contacting the court reporter or the Clerk's Office. (Jones, Sherry)
                                                      LREF
                                                      Blank 12 Filed: 3/2/2004, Entered: 3/3/2004 TranscriptCourt Filing
                                                      TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on October 27, 2003 before Judge Henry J. Boroff. Court Reporter: GCI Transcriptions. The original transcripts are maintained in the case file in the Clerk's Office. Copies may be obtained by contacting the court reporter or the Clerk's Office. (Jones, Sherry)
                                                        LREF
                                                        Blank 11 Filed: 3/2/2004, Entered: 3/3/2004 TranscriptCourt Filing
                                                        TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on October 20, 2003 before Judge Henry J. Boroff. Court Reporter: GCI Transcription Services. The original transcripts are maintained in the case file in the Clerk's Office. Copies may be obtained by contacting the court reporter or the Clerk's Office. (Jones, Sherry)
                                                          LREF
                                                          Blank 10 Filed: 3/2/2004, Entered: 3/3/2004 TranscriptCourt Filing
                                                          TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on September 12, 2003 before Judge Henry J. Boroff. Court Reporter: GCI Transcripts. The original transcripts are maintained in the case file in the Clerk's Office. Copies may be obtained by contacting the court reporter or the Clerk's Office. (Jones, Sherry)
                                                            LREF
                                                            Legal Document 9 Filed: 3/2/2004, Entered: 3/3/2004 ~Notice (other)
                                                            NOTICE of addendum to record on appeal by Robert White. (Jones, Sherry)
                                                              LREF
                                                              Legal Document 8 Filed: 3/1/2004, Entered: 3/1/2004 Certificate Of Service.
                                                              CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Robert White re [6] Brief, [7] Appendix. (Hassett, Kathy)
                                                                LREF
                                                                Legal Document 7 Filed: 3/1/2004, Entered: 3/1/2004 Appendix/Exhibit
                                                                APPELLANT'S APPENDIX by Robert White. (Hassett, Kathy)
                                                                  LREF
                                                                  Legal Document 6 Filed: 3/1/2004, Entered: 3/1/2004 Brief
                                                                  APPELLANT'S OPENING BRIEF by Robert White. (Hassett, Kathy)
                                                                    LREF
                                                                    Blank -- Filed: 1/15/2004, Entered: 1/15/2004 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File
                                                                    Judge Nathaniel M. Gorton : Electronic ORDER entered by the court granting [4] Motion for Extension of Time to File briefs. (cc/cl) (Castles, Martin) Modified on 1/16/2004 (Jones, Sherry).
                                                                      LREF
                                                                      Legal Document 5 Filed: 1/8/2004, Entered: 1/8/2004 Certificate Of Service.
                                                                      CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Robert White re [4] MOTION for Extension of Time to March 1, 2004 to File Brief. (Hassett, Kathy)
                                                                        LREF
                                                                        Legal Document 4 Filed: 1/8/2004, Entered: 1/8/2004, Terminated: 1/15/2004 Motion for Extension of Time to File
                                                                        MOTION for Extension of Time to March 1, 2004 to File Brief by Robert White.(Hassett, Kathy)
                                                                          LREF
                                                                          Legal Document 3 Filed: 12/18/2003, Entered: 12/18/2003 Notice of Appearance/
                                                                          NOTICE of Appearance by Livingston Davies on behalf of Micro Control Systems, Inc. (Hassett, Kathy)
                                                                            LREF
                                                                            Legal Document 2 Filed: 12/17/2003, Entered: 12/17/2003, Terminated: 10/5/2005 Bankruptcy Scheduling Order
                                                                            Bankruptcy Scheduling Order Appellant Brief due by 1/2/2004. Appellee Brief due by 1/17/2004. Appellant Reply Brief due by 1/27/2004. (cc/cl)(Castles, Martin)
                                                                              LREF
                                                                              Legal Document 1 Filed: 12/15/2003, Entered: 12/15/2003, Terminated: 10/5/2005 Bankruptcy Appeal
                                                                              Notice of APPEAL FROM BANKRUPTCY COURT. Bankruptcy Court case number 03-44906. File received, filed by Robert White. (Attachments: # (1) # (2) # (3))(Hassett, Kathy)
                                                                              LREF

                                                                              Statistics

                                                                              This case has been viewed 42 times.

                                                                              No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                              Space
                                                                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                               
                                                                              PlainSite
                                                                              Sign Up
                                                                              Need Password Help?