Aquino v. Pacesetter Adjustment Company
Federal Civil Lawsuit Massachusetts District Court, Case No. 4:03-cv-40285-FDS

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated January 6, 2019 at 4:46 AM EST (2.9 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Space Space

No Logo Paul T. Aquino, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space John F. Keenan +1 508 791 8181

Toggle Switch Represented by Fletcher Tilton & Whipple, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Douglas Q. Meystre +1 508 798 8621 +1 508 791 1201 dmeystre@ftwlaw.com
v.
No Logo Pacesetter Adjustment Company, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Wilson Elser Moskowitz Edelman & Dicker LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Geoffrey M. Coan +1 617 422 5300 +1 617 423 6917 geoffrey.coan@wilsonelser.com
Space Maynard M. Kirpalani +1 617 422 5300 +1 617 423 6917 maynard.kirpalani@wilsonelser.com
No Logo Ace Fire Underwriters Insurance Company, Consolidated Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Wilson Elser Moskowitz Edelman & Dicker LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Geoffrey M. Coan +1 617 422 5300 +1 617 423 6917 geoffrey.coan@wilsonelser.com
Space Maynard M. Kirpalani +1 617 422 5300 +1 617 423 6917 maynard.kirpalani@wilsonelser.com
Office Worcester
Filed 12/16/2003
Jury Demand Plaintiff
Demand
Nature of Suit 110 - Contract - Insurance
Cause Section 28 U.S.C. § 1332 Diversity-(Citizenship)
Jurisdiction Diversity
Disposition Judgment - Motion Before Trial
County Worcester
Terminated 11/8/2005
Origin 2
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flags CLOSED, CONSOLIDATED, LEAD
  Entries (41) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document 32 Filed: 11/8/2005, Entered: 11/8/2005 Judgment*Court Filing
Judge F. Dennis Saylor IV: ORDER entered. JUDGMENT in favor of Defendants against Plaintiff.(Castles, Martin)
    LREF
    Legal Document 31 Filed: 11/7/2005, Entered: 11/8/2005 Order on Motion for Summary JudgmentCourt Filing
    Judge F. Dennis Saylor IV: MEMORANDUM AND ORDER entered granting [22] Motion for Summary Judgment. (Castles, Martin)
      LREF
      Blank -- Filed: 7/20/2005, Entered: 7/20/2005 Notice Resetting/Cancelling Deadline
      Notice cancelling Hearing. Hearing cancelled: Pretrial conference set for 7/25/05 is hereby cancelled and will be rescheduled by the court. (Castles, Martin)
        LREF
        Blank -- Filed: 5/16/2005, Entered: 5/16/2005 Motion Hearing
        Electronic Clerk's Notes for proceedings held before Judge F. Dennis Saylor IV: Motion Hearing held on 5/16/2005 re [22] MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Pacesetter Adjustment Company,, Ace Fire Underwriters Insurance Company, Case called, Counsel (Meystre/Kirpalani/Coan) appear for hearing on s/j motion, Court hears arguments of counsel, Court takes motion under advisement. (Court Reporter Kusa-Ryll.) (Castles, Martin)
          LREF
          Blank -- Filed: 5/9/2005, Entered: 5/9/2005 set/reset motion and R&R; deadlines/hearings
          NOTICE OF HEARING: Reset hearing as to [22] MOTION for Summary Judgment. Motion Hearing reset for Monday 5/16/2005 at 2:00PM in Courtroom 2 before Judge F. Dennis Saylor IV. (Castles, Martin)
            LREF
            Blank -- Filed: 5/5/2005, Entered: 5/5/2005 set/reset motion and R&R; deadlines/hearings
            NOTICE OF HEARING: Set hearing as to [22] MOTION for Summary Judgment. Motion Hearing set for Thursday 5/12/2005 at 2:30PM in Courtroom 2 before Judge F. Dennis Saylor IV. (Castles, Martin)
              LREF
              Blank -- Filed: 5/5/2005, Entered: 5/5/2005 Order on Motion for Hearing
              Judge F. Dennis Saylor IV: Electronic ORDER entered granting [29] Motion for Hearing. (Castles, Martin)
                LREF
                Blank -- Filed: 5/5/2005, Entered: 5/5/2005 Order on Motion for Hearing
                Judge F. Dennis Saylor IV: Electronic ORDER entered granting [24] Motion for Hearing. (Castles, Martin)
                  LREF
                  Legal Document 30 Filed: 4/14/2005, Entered: 4/14/2005 Statement of Facts
                  PLAINTIFF'S CONCISE STATEMENT of Material Facts, c/s. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibits 1-49)(Hassett, Kathy)
                    LREF
                    Legal Document 29 Filed: 4/14/2005, Entered: 4/14/2005, Terminated: 5/5/2005 Motion for Hearing
                    REQUEST for Hearing and Oral Argument re [26] Opposition to Motion by Paul T. Aquino, c/s.(Hassett, Kathy)
                      LREF
                      Legal Document 28 Filed: 4/14/2005, Entered: 4/14/2005 Response
                      Response by Paul T. Aquino to [25] Statement of facts, c/s. (Hassett, Kathy)
                        LREF
                        Legal Document 27 Filed: 4/14/2005, Entered: 4/14/2005 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion
                        MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re [22] MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Paul T. Aquino, c/s. (Hassett, Kathy)
                          LREF
                          Legal Document 26 Filed: 4/14/2005, Entered: 4/14/2005 Opposition to Motion
                          Opposition re [22] MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Paul T. Aquino, c/s. (Hassett, Kathy)
                            LREF
                            Legal Document 25 Filed: 4/4/2005, Entered: 4/4/2005 Statement of Facts
                            STATEMENT of facts re [22] MOTION for Summary Judgment. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit)(Coan, Geoffrey)
                              LREF
                              Legal Document 24 Filed: 4/4/2005, Entered: 4/4/2005, Terminated: 5/5/2005 Motion for Hearing
                              MOTION for Hearing re [22] MOTION for Summary Judgment by Ace Fire Underwriters Insurance Company, Pacesetter Adjustment Company.(Coan, Geoffrey)
                                LREF
                                Legal Document 23 Filed: 4/1/2005, Entered: 4/1/2005 Memorandum in Support of Motion
                                MEMORANDUM in Support re [22] MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Ace Fire Underwriters Insurance Company, Pacesetter Adjustment Company. (Attachments: # (1) Concise Statement of Material Facts# (2) Exhibit)(Coan, Geoffrey)
                                  LREF
                                  Legal Document 22 Filed: 4/1/2005, Entered: 4/1/2005, Terminated: 11/7/2005 Motion for Summary Judgment
                                  MOTION for Summary Judgment by Ace Fire Underwriters Insurance Company, Pacesetter Adjustment Company.(Coan, Geoffrey)
                                    LREF
                                    Legal Document 21 Filed: 3/1/2005, Entered: 3/1/2005 Order on Motion for Protective OrderCourt Filing
                                    Judge Charles B. Swartwood : ORDER entered granting [15] Motion for Protective Order, cc/cl. (Roland, Lisa)
                                      LREF
                                      Blank -- Filed: 3/1/2005, Entered: 3/1/2005 Case No Longer Referred to Magistrate Judge
                                      Case no longer referred to Magistrate Judge Charles B. Swartwood. (Roland, Lisa)
                                        LREF
                                        Legal Document 20 Filed: 2/8/2005, Entered: 2/8/2005 Order Referring MotionCourt Filing
                                        Judge F. Dennis Saylor IV: Electronic ORDER entered. REFERRING MOTION [15] MOTION for Protective Order filed by Pacesetter Adjustment Company,, Ace Fire Underwriters Insurance Company, to Magistrate Judge Charles B. Swartwood(Castles, Martin)
                                          LREF
                                          Legal Document 19 Filed: 2/7/2005, Entered: 2/7/2005 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion
                                          MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re [15] MOTION for Protective Order filed by Paul T. Aquino, c/s. (Hassett, Kathy)
                                            LREF
                                            Legal Document 18 Filed: 2/7/2005, Entered: 2/7/2005 Opposition to Motion
                                            Opposition re [15] MOTION for Protective Order filed by Paul T. Aquino, c/s. (Hassett, Kathy)
                                              LREF
                                              Legal Document 17 Filed: 2/1/2005, Entered: 2/1/2005 Certificate of Consultation
                                              CERTIFICATE OF CONSULTATION re [15] MOTION for Protective Order, [16] Memorandum in Support of Motion by Geoffrey M. Coan on behalf of Ace Fire Underwriters Insurance Company, Pacesetter Adjustment Company. (Coan, Geoffrey)
                                                LREF
                                                Legal Document 16 Filed: 2/1/2005, Entered: 2/1/2005 Memorandum in Support of Motion
                                                MEMORANDUM in Support re [15] MOTION for Protective Order filed by Ace Fire Underwriters Insurance Company, Pacesetter Adjustment Company. (Attachments: # (1) # (2))(Coan, Geoffrey)
                                                LREF
                                                Legal Document 15 Filed: 2/1/2005, Entered: 2/1/2005, Terminated: 3/1/2005 Motion for Protective Order
                                                MOTION for Protective Order by Ace Fire Underwriters Insurance Company, Pacesetter Adjustment Company.(Coan, Geoffrey)
                                                  LREF
                                                  Legal Document 14 Filed: 12/6/2004, Entered: 12/6/2004 Notice of Appearance/
                                                  NOTICE of Appearance by Douglas Q. Meystre on behalf of Paul T. Aquino, c/s. (Jones, Sherry)
                                                    LREF
                                                    Legal Document 13 Filed: 10/5/2004, Entered: 10/5/2004 Report of Alternative Dispute Resolution Provider
                                                    REPORT of Alternative Dispute Resolution Provider (Roland, Lisa)
                                                      LREF
                                                      Legal Document 12 Filed: 9/22/2004, Entered: 9/22/2004 Notice of ADR ConferenceCourt Filing
                                                      NOTICE of ADR Conference; Alternate Dispute Resolution Hearing set for 10/8/2004 10:00 AM in Courtroom 1 before Magistrate Judge Charles B. Swartwood, cc/cl.(Roland, Lisa)
                                                        LREF
                                                        Legal Document 11 Filed: 9/9/2004, Entered: 9/9/2004 Certification pursuant to Local Rule 16.1
                                                        CERTIFICATION pursuant to Local Rule 16.1 by Paul T. Aquino, c/s.(Jones, Sherry)
                                                          LREF
                                                          Legal Document 10 Filed: 9/1/2004, Entered: 9/1/2004 Order Referring Case to ADRCourt Filing
                                                          Judge F. Dennis Saylor IV: ORDER entered REFERRING CASE to Alternative Dispute Resolution. Case referred to Magistrate Charles B. Swartwood for mediation. (Castles, Martin)
                                                            LREF
                                                            Legal Document 9 Filed: 9/1/2004, Entered: 9/1/2004 Scheduling OrderCourt Filing
                                                            Judge F. Dennis Saylor IV: ORDER entered SCHEDULING ORDER: Final Pretrial Conference set for 7/25/2005 03:00 PM in Courtroom 2 before F. Dennis Saylor IV. Amended Pleadings due by 3/1/2005. Discovery due by 3/1/2005. Joinder of Parties due by 3/1/2005. Motions due by 4/1/2005. (cc/cl)(Castles, Martin)
                                                              LREF
                                                              Legal Document 8 Filed: 8/27/2004, Entered: 8/30/2004 Certification pursuant to Local Rule 16.1
                                                              CERTIFICATION pursuant to Local Rule 16.1 by Pacesetter Adjustment Company, c/s.(Hassett, Kathy)
                                                                LREF
                                                                Blank -- Filed: 8/27/2004, Entered: 8/27/2004 Order consolidating cases
                                                                Judge F. Dennis Saylor IV: Oral ORDER entered in open court. ORDER consolidating cases 03cv40285 and 03cv40286.(Castles, Martin)
                                                                  LREF
                                                                  Blank -- Filed: 8/27/2004, Entered: 8/27/2004 Scheduling Conference
                                                                  Electronic Clerk's Notes for proceedings held before Judge F. Dennis Saylor IV: Scheduling Conference held on 8/27/2004. Case called, Counsel appear for scheduling conference, Court orders case consolidated with case 03cv40286 without objection of counsel, Scheduling order to issue. (Court Reporter None.) (Castles, Martin)
                                                                    LREF
                                                                    Legal Document 7 Filed: 8/23/2004, Entered: 8/23/2004 Joint statement re scheduling conference
                                                                    JOINT STATEMENT re scheduling conference. (Jones, Sherry)
                                                                      LREF
                                                                      Legal Document 6 Filed: 7/30/2004, Entered: 7/30/2004 Notice of Scheduling Conference
                                                                      NOTICE of Scheduling Conference Scheduling Conference set for 8/27/2004 11:00 AM in Courtroom 2 before F. Dennis Saylor IV. ((cc/cl)(Castles, Martin)
                                                                        LREF
                                                                        Legal Document 5 Filed: 6/18/2004, Entered: 6/21/2004 Notice of ReassignmentCourt Filing
                                                                        Notice of Reassignment. Case reassigned from Judge Gorton to Judge F. Dennis Saylor, IV upon appointment to the bench. Notice sent to counsel. (Shattuck, Deborah)
                                                                          LREF
                                                                          Legal Document 4 Filed: 12/29/2003, Entered: 12/29/2003 state court record
                                                                          STATE COURT Record Pacesetter Adjustment Company served on 7/3/2003, answer due 7/23/2003.. (Attachments: # (1) part 2)(Jones, Sherry)
                                                                            LREF
                                                                            Legal Document 3 Filed: 12/23/2003, Entered: 12/23/2003 Jury Demand
                                                                            DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Paul T. Aquino, c/s. (Hassett, Kathy)
                                                                              LREF
                                                                              Legal Document 2 Filed: 12/23/2003, Entered: 12/23/2003 Answer
                                                                              ANSWER to Complaint by Pacesetter Adjustment Company.(Coan, Geoffrey) Additional attachment(s) added on 12/24/2003 (Hassett, Kathy).
                                                                                LREF
                                                                                Legal Document 1 Filed: 12/16/2003, Entered: 12/16/2003 Notice of Removal
                                                                                NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Pacesetter Adjustment Company from Clinton District Court, case number 0368cv0577. $ 150, receipt number 404236, filed by Pacesetter Adjustment Company.(Hassett, Kathy)
                                                                                  LREF

                                                                                  Statistics

                                                                                  This case has been viewed 71 times.

                                                                                  No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                  Space
                                                                                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                   
                                                                                  PlainSite
                                                                                  Sign Up
                                                                                  Need Password Help?