Solas v. Kikukawa Iron Workers, Inc. et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit Massachusetts District Court, Case No. 1:03-cv-12494-NMG

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Space Space

No Logo Blas Solas, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Aiken & Aiken PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Paul R. Aiken +1 508 771 2266 +1 508 778 4437 paul@aikenandaikenpc.com
v.
No Logo Abc Corporation, Defendant
No Logo Alliance Machinery, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Kikukawa Iron Workers, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Rosario M. Vignali

Toggle Switch Represented by Wilson Elser Moskowitz Edelman & Dicker LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Geoffrey M. Coan +1 617 422 5300 +1 617 423 6917 geoffrey.coan@wilsonelser.com
Space Maynard M. Kirpalani +1 617 422 5300 +1 617 423 6917 maynard.kirpalani@wilsonelser.com
No Logo Koch Machinery and Systems, Defendant
Office Boston
Filed 12/10/2003
Jury Demand Both
Demand $1000000
Nature of Suit 365 - Personal Injury: Product Liability
Cause Section 28 U.S.C. § 1332 Diversity-Product Liability
Jurisdiction Diversity
Disposition Dismissed - Settled
County XX US, Outside State
Terminated 2/9/2005
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flag CLOSED
  Entries (16) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank -- Filed: 2/9/2005, Entered: 2/9/2005 Terminated Case
Civil Case Terminated. (Nicewicz, Craig)
    LREF
    Legal Document 8 Filed: 2/8/2005, Entered: 2/8/2005 Stipulation of Dismissal
    STIPULATION of Dismissal by Blas Solas, Kikukawa Iron Workers, Inc., Koch Machinery and Systems, Alliance Machinery, Inc., ABC Corporation. (Coan, Geoffrey)
      LREF
      Blank -- Filed: 11/1/2004, Entered: 11/1/2004 Set Deadlines/Hearings:
      Set Deadlines/Hearings: Scheduling Conference set for 2/10/2005 03:30 PM in Courtroom 4 before Judge Nathaniel M. Gorton. (Nicewicz, Craig)
        LREF
        Legal Document 7 Filed: 9/16/2004, Entered: 9/16/2004 Notice of Scheduling ConferenceCourt Filing
        NOTICE of Scheduling Conference Scheduling Conference set for 11/10/2004 02:30 PM in Courtroom 4 before Judge Nathaniel M. Gorton. (Nicewicz, Craig)
          LREF
          Legal Document 6 Filed: 8/9/2004, Entered: 8/16/2004 Answer
          ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by Kikukawa Iron Workers, Inc..(Patch, Christine)
            LREF
            Legal Document 5 Filed: 7/12/2004, Entered: 7/13/2004 Case Assigned/ReassignedCourt Filing
            Case Reassigned to Judge Nathaniel M. Gorton. Judge Patti B. Saris no longer assigned to the case. Counsel are directed to the Court's Standing Orders re: Electronic Case Filing. (Patch, Christine)
              LREF
              Blank -- Filed: 5/24/2004, Entered: 5/26/2004 Order on Motion for Extension of Time
              Judge Patti B. Saris : Electronic ORDER entered granting [4] Motion for Extension of Time for Service of Process (Patch, Christine)
                LREF
                Legal Document 4 Filed: 5/13/2004, Entered: 5/17/2004 Motion for Extension of Time
                Renewed MOTION for Extension of Time to September 11, 2004 for Service of Process by Blas Solas.(Patch, Christine)
                  LREF
                  Blank -- Filed: 5/4/2004, Entered: 5/5/2004 Order on Motion for Extension of Time
                  Judge Patti B. Saris : Electronic ORDER entered denying [2] Motion for Extension of Time for Service of Process. "Counsel has an additional 30 days." (Patch, Christine)
                    LREF
                    Blank -- Filed: 5/4/2004, Entered: 5/5/2004 Order on Motion to Appoint Special Process Server
                    Judge Patti B. Saris : Electronic ORDER entered granting [3] Motion to Appoint Special Process Server. (Patch, Christine)
                      LREF
                      Legal Document 3 Filed: 4/28/2004, Entered: 4/30/2004 Motion to Appoint Special Process Server
                      MOTION to Appoint Special Process Server by Blas Solas.(Patch, Christine)
                        LREF
                        Legal Document 2 Filed: 4/28/2004, Entered: 4/30/2004 Motion for Extension of Time
                        MOTION for Extension of Time to October 1, 2004 For Service of Process Pursuant to F.R.C.P. 4(m) by Blas Solas.(Patch, Christine)
                          LREF
                          Blank -- Filed: 4/28/2004, Entered: 4/30/2004 Proposed Document(s) submitted
                          Proposed Document submitted by Blas Solas received for filing. Document received: Order to Appoint Special Process Server. (Patch, Christine)
                            LREF
                            Legal Document 1 Filed: 12/10/2003, Entered: 12/17/2003 Complaint
                            COMPLAINT against ABC Corporation, Alliance Machinery, Inc., Kikukawa Iron Workers, Inc., Koch Machinery and Systems Filing fee: $ 150, receipt number 52428, filed by Blas Solas.(Simeone, Maria)
                              LREF
                              Blank -- Filed: 12/10/2003, Entered: 12/17/2003 Magistrate Judge Assignment
                              If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge Bowler. (Simeone, Maria)
                                LREF
                                Blank -- Filed: 12/10/2003, Entered: 12/17/2003 Summons Issued
                                Summons Issued as to ABC Corporation, Alliance Machinery, Inc., Kikukawa Iron Workers, Inc., Koch Machinery and Systems. (Simeone, Maria)
                                  LREF

                                  Statistics

                                  This case has been viewed 60 times.

                                  No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                  Space
                                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                   
                                  PlainSite
                                  Sign Up
                                  Need Password Help?