Information Placard Holder For A Stadium Seat
Patent Application United States Patent and Trademark Office, Patent Application No. 11098805
Examiner Rodney Barnett White, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Space Space

No Logo Scot A. Starheim, Wasilla, AK, Applicant

Represented by BRUCE ROSS

Patent Type Utility
First Named Inventor Scot A. Starheim, Wasilla, AK, ()
Filing Date April 4, 2005
Status Patented Case
Status Date Unknown
Location Electronic
USPTO Customer Number Unknown
Attorney Docket Number
Confirmation Number 7160
Group Art Unit 3636
Class / Sub-Class 297 / 217
  Entries (119) Tab Overlap Assignments (0) Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank  Filed: 10/17/2006, Entered: None Transaction History
Recordation of Patent Grant Mailed
    LREF
    Blank  Filed: 10/17/2006, Entered: None Transaction History
    Patent Issue Date Used in PTA Calculation
      LREF
      Blank  Filed: 9/27/2006, Entered: None Transaction History
      Issue Notification Mailed
        LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 9/14/2006, Entered: None Prosecution - BIB
        Bibliographic Data Sheet (1 Page)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Blank  Filed: 9/13/2006, Entered: None Transaction History
          Dispatch to FDC
            LREF
            Blank  Filed: 9/12/2006, Entered: None Transaction History
            Correspondence Address Change
              LREF
              Blank  Filed: 9/11/2006, Entered: None Transaction History
              Application Is Considered Ready for Issue
                LREF
                Blank  Filed: 9/6/2006, Entered: None Transaction History
                Issue Fee Payment Verified
                  LREF
                  Blank  Filed: 9/6/2006, Entered: None Transaction History
                  Issue Fee Payment Received
                    LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 9/6/2006, Entered: None Prosecution - LET.
                    Miscellaneous Incoming Letter (6 Pages)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 9/6/2006, Entered: None Prosecution - C.AD
                      Change of Address (1 Page)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 9/6/2006, Entered: None Prosecution - IFEE
                        Issue Fee Payment (PTO-85B) (1 Page)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 8/24/2006, Entered: None Prior Art - 1449
                          List of References cited by applicant and considered by examiner (1 Page)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Blank  Filed: 8/16/2006, Entered: None Transaction History
                            Response to Reasons for Allowance
                              LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 8/16/2006, Entered: None Prosecution - LET.
                              Miscellaneous Incoming Letter (2 Pages)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Blank  Filed: 8/7/2006, Entered: None Transaction History
                                Mail Notice of Allowance
                                  LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 8/7/2006, Entered: None Prosecution - SRFW
                                  Search information including classification, databases and other search related notes (1 Page)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 8/7/2006, Entered: None Prosecution - BIB
                                    Bibliographic Data Sheet (1 Page)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 8/7/2006, Entered: None Prosecution - FWCLM
                                      Index of Claims (1 Page)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 8/7/2006, Entered: None Prosecution - IIFW
                                        Issue Information including classification, examiner, name, claim, renumbering, etc. (1 Page)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 8/7/2006, Entered: None Prosecution - NOA
                                          Notice of Allowance and Fees Due (PTOL-85) (6 Pages)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 8/7/2006, Entered: None Prosecution - NOA
                                            Notice of Allowance and Fees Due (PTOL-85) (3 Pages)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Blank  Filed: 8/4/2006, Entered: None Transaction History
                                              Notice of Allowance Data Verification Completed
                                                LREF
                                                Blank  Filed: 8/2/2006, Entered: None Transaction History
                                                Date Forwarded to Examiner
                                                  LREF
                                                  Blank  Filed: 7/25/2006, Entered: None Transaction History
                                                  New or Additional Drawing Filed
                                                    LREF
                                                    Blank  Filed: 7/25/2006, Entered: None Transaction History
                                                    Response after Non-Final Action
                                                      LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 7/25/2006, Entered: None Prosecution - WFEE
                                                      Fee Worksheet (SB06) (1 Page)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 7/25/2006, Entered: None Prosecution - TRNA
                                                        Transmittal of New Application (1 Page)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 7/25/2006, Entered: None Prosecution - DRW
                                                          Drawings-only black and white line drawings (2 Pages)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 7/25/2006, Entered: None Prosecution - REM
                                                            Applicant Arguments/Remarks Made in an Amendment (7 Pages)
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 7/25/2006, Entered: None Prosecution - CLM
                                                              Claims (3 Pages)
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 7/25/2006, Entered: None Prosecution - A...
                                                                Amendment/Req. Reconsideration-After Non-Final Reject (1 Page)
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Blank  Filed: 4/27/2006, Entered: None Transaction History
                                                                  Mail Non-Final Rejection
                                                                    LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 4/27/2006, Entered: None Prosecution - SRFW
                                                                    Search information including classification, databases and other search related notes (1 Page)
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 4/27/2006, Entered: None Prosecution - FWCLM
                                                                      Index of Claims (1 Page)
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 4/27/2006, Entered: None Prosecution - NFDR
                                                                        Notice of Formal Drawings Required (1 Page)
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 4/27/2006, Entered: None Prosecution - CTNF
                                                                          Non-Final Rejection (7 Pages)
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Blank  Filed: 4/26/2006, Entered: None Transaction History
                                                                            Non-Final Rejection
                                                                              LREF
                                                                              Blank  Filed: 4/25/2006, Entered: None Transaction History
                                                                              Date Forwarded to Examiner
                                                                                LREF
                                                                                Blank  Filed: 4/25/2006, Entered: None Transaction History
                                                                                Date Forwarded to Examiner
                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                  Blank  Filed: 4/25/2006, Entered: None Transaction History
                                                                                  Disposal for a RCE / CPA / R129
                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                    Blank  Filed: 4/20/2006, Entered: None Transaction History
                                                                                    Request for Continued Examination (RCE)
                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                      Blank  Filed: 4/20/2006, Entered: None Transaction History
                                                                                      Request for Extension of Time - Granted
                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                        Blank  Filed: 4/20/2006, Entered: None Transaction History
                                                                                        Workflow - Request for RCE - Begin
                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 4/20/2006, Entered: None Prosecution - WFEE
                                                                                          Fee Worksheet (SB06) (1 Page)
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 4/20/2006, Entered: None Prosecution - XT/
                                                                                            Extension of Time (1 Page)
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 4/20/2006, Entered: None Prosecution - RCEX
                                                                                              Request for Continued Examination (RCE) (1 Page)
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 4/20/2006, Entered: None Prosecution - REM
                                                                                                Applicant Arguments/Remarks Made in an Amendment (6 Pages)
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 4/20/2006, Entered: None Prosecution - CLM
                                                                                                  Claims (3 Pages)
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 4/20/2006, Entered: None Prosecution - AMSB
                                                                                                    Amendment Submitted/Entered with Filing of CPA/RCE (2 Pages)
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                      Blank  Filed: 4/13/2006, Entered: None Transaction History
                                                                                                      Mail Examiner Interview Summary (PTOL - 413)
                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 4/13/2006, Entered: None Prosecution - EXIN
                                                                                                        Examiner Interview Summary Record (PTOL - 413) (3 Pages)
                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                          Blank  Filed: 4/12/2006, Entered: None Transaction History
                                                                                                          Examiner Interview Summary Record (PTOL - 413)
                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                            Blank  Filed: 3/22/2006, Entered: None Transaction History
                                                                                                            Mail Advisory Action (PTOL - 303)
                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 3/22/2006, Entered: None Prosecution - ANE.I
                                                                                                              Amendment After Final or under 37CFR 1.312, initialed by the examiner. (1 Page)
                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 3/22/2006, Entered: None Prosecution - CTAV
                                                                                                                Advisory Action (PTOL-303) (2 Pages)
                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                  Blank  Filed: 3/20/2006, Entered: None Transaction History
                                                                                                                  Advisory Action (PTOL-303)
                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                    Blank  Filed: 3/17/2006, Entered: None Transaction History
                                                                                                                    Date Forwarded to Examiner
                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                      Blank  Filed: 3/13/2006, Entered: None Transaction History
                                                                                                                      New or Additional Drawing Filed
                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                        Blank  Filed: 3/13/2006, Entered: None Transaction History
                                                                                                                        Amendment after Final Rejection
                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 3/13/2006, Entered: None Prosecution - WFEE
                                                                                                                          Fee Worksheet (SB06) (1 Page)
                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 3/13/2006, Entered: None Prosecution - DRW
                                                                                                                            Drawings-only black and white line drawings (1 Page)
                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 3/13/2006, Entered: None Prosecution - REM
                                                                                                                              Applicant Arguments/Remarks Made in an Amendment (12 Pages)
                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 3/13/2006, Entered: None Prosecution - CLM
                                                                                                                                Claims (3 Pages)
                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 3/13/2006, Entered: None Prosecution - A.NE
                                                                                                                                  Amendment After Final (2 Pages)
                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                    Blank  Filed: 12/16/2005, Entered: None Transaction History
                                                                                                                                    Mail Final Rejection (PTOL - 326)
                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 12/16/2005, Entered: None Prosecution - FWCLM
                                                                                                                                      Index of Claims (1 Page)
                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 12/16/2005, Entered: None Prosecution - CTFR
                                                                                                                                        Final Rejection (10 Pages)
                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                          Blank  Filed: 12/12/2005, Entered: None Transaction History
                                                                                                                                          Final Rejection
                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                            Blank  Filed: 12/1/2005, Entered: None Transaction History
                                                                                                                                            Case Docketed to Examiner in GAU
                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 11/9/2005, Entered: None Prosecution - WFEE
                                                                                                                                              Fee Worksheet (SB06) (1 Page)
                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                Blank  Filed: 10/27/2005, Entered: None Transaction History
                                                                                                                                                Date Forwarded to Examiner
                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Blank  Filed: 10/20/2005, Entered: None Transaction History
                                                                                                                                                  New or Additional Drawing Filed
                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                    Blank  Filed: 10/20/2005, Entered: None Transaction History
                                                                                                                                                    Response after Non-Final Action
                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 10/20/2005, Entered: None Prosecution - DRW
                                                                                                                                                      Drawings-only black and white line drawings (3 Pages)
                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 10/20/2005, Entered: None Prosecution - LET.
                                                                                                                                                        Miscellaneous Incoming Letter (1 Page)
                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 10/20/2005, Entered: None Prosecution - REM
                                                                                                                                                          Applicant Arguments/Remarks Made in an Amendment (9 Pages)
                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 10/20/2005, Entered: None Prosecution - CLM
                                                                                                                                                            Claims (3 Pages)
                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 10/20/2005, Entered: None Prosecution - ABST
                                                                                                                                                              Abstract (1 Page)
                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 10/20/2005, Entered: None Prosecution - SPEC
                                                                                                                                                                Specification (2 Pages)
                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 10/20/2005, Entered: None Prosecution - A...
                                                                                                                                                                  Amendment/Req. Reconsideration-After Non-Final Reject (1 Page)
                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                    Blank  Filed: 9/27/2005, Entered: None Transaction History
                                                                                                                                                                    Case Docketed to Examiner in GAU
                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 8/4/2005, Entered: None Prosecution - RETMAIL
                                                                                                                                                                      Mail returned to USPTO as undelivered (3 Pages)
                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                        Blank  Filed: 8/1/2005, Entered: None Transaction History
                                                                                                                                                                        Mail Non-Final Rejection
                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 8/1/2005, Entered: None Prosecution - SRFW
                                                                                                                                                                          Search information including classification, databases and other search related notes (1 Page)
                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 8/1/2005, Entered: None Prosecution - FWCLM
                                                                                                                                                                            Index of Claims (1 Page)
                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 8/1/2005, Entered: None Prosecution - BIB
                                                                                                                                                                              Bibliographic Data Sheet (1 Page)
                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 8/1/2005, Entered: None Prior Art - 892
                                                                                                                                                                                List of references cited by examiner (3 Pages)
                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 8/1/2005, Entered: None Prior Art - 1449
                                                                                                                                                                                  List of References cited by applicant and considered by examiner (1 Page)
                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 8/1/2005, Entered: None Prosecution - CTNF
                                                                                                                                                                                    Non-Final Rejection (7 Pages)
                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank  Filed: 7/29/2005, Entered: None Transaction History
                                                                                                                                                                                      Non-Final Rejection
                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 7/27/2005, Entered: None 1 - SRNT
                                                                                                                                                                                        Examiner's search strategy and results (1 Page)
                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank  Filed: 7/21/2005, Entered: None Transaction History
                                                                                                                                                                                          Mail-Record Petition Decision of Granted to Make Special
                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 7/21/2005, Entered: None Prosecution - PETDEC
                                                                                                                                                                                            Petition Decision (2 Pages)
                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank  Filed: 7/19/2005, Entered: None Transaction History
                                                                                                                                                                                              Paralegal Petition Decision
                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank  Filed: 6/7/2005, Entered: None Transaction History
                                                                                                                                                                                                IFW TSS Processing by Tech Center Complete
                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank  Filed: 6/7/2005, Entered: None Transaction History
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Case Docketed to Examiner in GAU
                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank  Filed: 5/3/2005, Entered: None Transaction History
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Application Dispatched from OIPE
                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank  Filed: 5/3/2005, Entered: None Transaction History
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Application Is Now Complete
                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank  Filed: 4/26/2005, Entered: None Transaction History
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Cleared by L&R (LARS)
                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank  Filed: 4/21/2005, Entered: None Transaction History
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Referred to Level 2 (LARS) by OIPE CSR
                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank  Filed: 4/16/2005, Entered: None Transaction History
                                                                                                                                                                                                            IFW Scan & PACR Auto Security Review
                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank  Filed: 4/4/2005, Entered: None Transaction History
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Petition Entered
                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank  Filed: 4/4/2005, Entered: None Transaction History
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Reference capture on IDS
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank  Filed: 4/4/2005, Entered: None Transaction History
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Information Disclosure Statement (IDS) Filed
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank  Filed: 4/4/2005, Entered: None Transaction History
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Information Disclosure Statement (IDS) Filed
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank  Filed: 4/4/2005, Entered: None Transaction History
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      PGPubs nonPub Request
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank  Filed: 4/4/2005, Entered: None Transaction History
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Initial Exam Team nn
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 4/4/2005, Entered: None Prosecution - PET.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Petition Entered (1 Page)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 4/4/2005, Entered: None Prosecution - IDS
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Information Disclosure Statement (IDS) Form (SB08) (1 Page)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 4/4/2005, Entered: None Prosecution - PG.NONPUB.RQ
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Nonpublication request from applicant. (1 Page)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 4/4/2005, Entered: None Prosecution - WFEE
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Fee Worksheet (SB06) (1 Page)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 4/4/2005, Entered: None Prosecution - WFEE
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Fee Worksheet (SB06) (1 Page)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 4/4/2005, Entered: None Prosecution - DRW
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Drawings-only black and white line drawings (3 Pages)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 4/4/2005, Entered: None Prosecution - OATH
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Oath or Declaration filed (2 Pages)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 4/4/2005, Entered: None Prosecution - ABST
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Abstract (1 Page)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 4/4/2005, Entered: None Prosecution - CLM
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Claims (2 Pages)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 4/4/2005, Entered: None Prosecution - SPEC
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Specification (9 Pages)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 4/4/2005, Entered: None Prosecution - TRNA
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Transmittal of New Application (3 Pages)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Statistics

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                This case has been viewed 8 times.

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Space
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                 
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Need Password Help?