Elephant, et al v Massachusetts Financial Services Company, et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit Massachusetts District Court, Case No. 1:03-cv-12570-NG

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Anthony Yonkers, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Gilman & Pastor, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space David Pastor +1 617 742 9700 +1 617 742 9701 dpastor@pastorlawoffice.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Kessler Topaz Meltzer & Check, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Andrew L. Barroway +1 610 667 7706 +1 610 667 7056 abarroway@sbtklaw.com
No Logo Burrell, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Gilman & Pastor, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space David Pastor +1 617 742 9700 +1 617 742 9701 dpastor@pastorlawoffice.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of John E. Lawlor

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Aaron Lee Brody +1 212 687 7230 +1 212 490 2022 ssbny@aol.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Weiss & Lurie

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Joesph Weiss +1 212 682 3025
No Logo Jacob Elephant, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Nancy F. Gans +1 781 235 2246 +1 781 239 0353 nlfgans@gmail.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Bernstein Liebhard LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Sandy A Liebhard +1 212 779 1414 +1 212 779 3218 liebhard@bernlieb.com
No Logo Justin Cohen, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Gilman & Pastor, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space David Pastor +1 617 742 9700 +1 617 742 9701 dpastor@pastorlawoffice.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Kessler Topaz Meltzer & Check, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Andrew L. Barroway +1 610 667 7706 +1 610 667 7056 abarroway@sbtklaw.com
No Logo Kevin Quinn, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Gilman & Pastor, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space David Pastor +1 617 742 9700 +1 617 742 9701 dpastor@pastorlawoffice.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Kessler Topaz Meltzer & Check, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Andrew L. Barroway +1 610 667 7706 +1 610 667 7056 abarroway@sbtklaw.com
No Logo Lewis Plaintiff Group, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Gilman & Pastor, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space David Pastor +1 617 742 9700 +1 617 742 9701 dpastor@pastorlawoffice.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Kessler Topaz Meltzer & Check, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Andrew L. Barroway +1 610 667 7706 +1 610 667 7056 abarroway@sbtklaw.com
No Logo Robert K. Willms, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Gilman & Pastor, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space David Pastor +1 617 742 9700 +1 617 742 9701 dpastor@pastorlawoffice.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Gottlieb, Rackman & Reisman, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Samuel Howard Rudman +1 631 367 7100 +1 631 367 1173 srudman@rgrdlaw.com
No Logo Sandra Coderre, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Gilman & Pastor, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space David Pastor +1 617 742 9700 +1 617 742 9701 dpastor@pastorlawoffice.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Kessler Topaz Meltzer & Check, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Andrew L. Barroway +1 610 667 7706 +1 610 667 7056 abarroway@sbtklaw.com
v.
No Logo John Does 1-100, Defendant
No Logo Massachusetts Financial Services Company, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Wilmer Hale, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Jonathan Acker Shapiro +1 650 858 6000 +1 650 858 6100 jonathan.shapiro@wilmerhale.com
No Logo Massachusetts Investors Growth Stock, Defendant
No Logo Massachusetts Investors Trust, Defendant
No Logo MFS Aggressive Growth Allocation Fund, Defendant
No Logo MFS Alabama Municipal Bond Fund, Defendant
No Logo MFS Arkansas Municipal Bond Fund, Defendant
No Logo MFS Bond Fund, Defendant
No Logo MFS California Municipal Bond Fund, Defendant
No Logo MFS Capital Opportunities Fund, Defendant
No Logo MFS Conservative Allocation Fund, Defendant
No Logo MFS Core Growth Fund, Defendant
No Logo MFS Emerging Growth Fund, Defendant
No Logo MFS Emerging Markets Debt Fund, Defendant
No Logo MFS Emerging Markets Equity Fund, Defendant
No Logo MFS Florida Municipal Bond Fund, Defendant
No Logo MFS Funds, Defendant
No Logo MFS Georgia Municipal Bond Fund, Defendant
No Logo MFS Global Equity Fund, Defendant
No Logo MFS Global Growth Fund, Defendant
No Logo MFS Global Total Return Fund, Defendant
No Logo MFS Government Limited Maturity Fund, Defendant
No Logo MFS Government Mortgage Fund, Defendant
No Logo MFS Government Securities Fund, Defendant
No Logo MFS High Income Fund, Defendant
No Logo MFS High Yield Opportunities Fund, Defendant
No Logo MFS Intermediate Investment Grade Bond Fund, Defendant
No Logo MFS International Growth Fund, Defendant
No Logo MFS International New Discovery Fund, Defendant
No Logo MFS International Value Fund, Defendant
No Logo MFS Investment Management, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Wilmer Hale, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Jonathan Acker Shapiro +1 650 858 6000 +1 650 858 6100 jonathan.shapiro@wilmerhale.com
No Logo MFS Large Cap Growth Fund, Defendant
No Logo MFS Limited Maturity Fund, Defendant
No Logo MFS Managed Sectors Fund, Defendant
No Logo MFS Maryland Municipal Bond Fund, Defendant
No Logo MFS Massachusetts Municipal Bond Fund, Defendant
No Logo MFS Mid Cap Growth Fund, Defendant
No Logo MFS Mid Cap Value Fund, Defendant
No Logo MFS Mississippi Municipal Bond Fund, Defendant
No Logo MFS Moderate Allocation Fund, Defendant
No Logo MFS Municipal Bond Fund, Defendant
No Logo MFS Municipal Limited Maturity Fund, Defendant
No Logo MFS New Discovery Fund, Defendant
No Logo MFS New Endeavor Fund, Defendant
No Logo MFS New York Municipal Bond Fund, Defendant
No Logo MFS North Carolina Municipal Bond Fund, Defendant
No Logo MFS Pennsylvania Municipal Bond Fund, Defendant
No Logo MFS Research Bond Fund, Defendant
No Logo MFS Research Fund, Defendant
No Logo MFS Research Growth and Income Fund, Defendant
No Logo MFS Research International Fund, Defendant
No Logo MFS Series Trust I, Defendant
No Logo MFS Series Trust II, Defendant
No Logo MFS Series Trust III, Defendant
No Logo MFS Series Trust IV, Defendant
No Logo MFS Series Trust IX, Defendant
No Logo MFS Series Trust V, Defendant
No Logo MFS Series Trust VI, Defendant
No Logo MFS Series Trust VII, Defendant
No Logo MFS Series Trust VIII, Defendant
No Logo MFS Series Trust X, Defendant
No Logo MFS Series Trust XI, Defendant
No Logo MFS South Carolina Municipal Bond Fund, Defendant
No Logo MFS Strategic Growth Fund, Defendant
No Logo MFS Strategic Income Fund, Defendant
No Logo MFS Technology Fund, Defendant
No Logo MFS Tennessee Municipal Bond Fund, Defendant
No Logo MFS Total Return Fund, Defendant
No Logo MFS Union Standard Equity Fund, Defendant
No Logo MFS Utilities Fund, Defendant
No Logo MFS Value Fund, Defendant
No Logo MFS Virginia Municipal Bond Fund, Defendant
No Logo MFS West Virginia Municipal Bond Fund, Defendant
No Logo Sun Life Financial Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Wilmer Hale, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Jonathan Acker Shapiro +1 650 858 6000 +1 650 858 6100 jonathan.shapiro@wilmerhale.com
Office Boston
Filed 12/19/2003
Jury Demand Plaintiff
Demand
Nature of Suit 160 - Contract: Stockholders' Suits
Cause Section 28 U.S.C. § 1332 Diversity - Stockholders Suits
Jurisdiction Federal Question
Disposition Transfer/Remand - Transfer to Another District
County Suffolk
Terminated 6/10/2004
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case
Related Case
103-cv-12500-NG
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flag CLOSED
  Entries (17) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank -- Filed: 6/30/2004, Entered: 6/30/2004 Terminate Motions
Motions terminated: [2] MOTION to Consolidate Cases MOTION to be Appointed Lead Plaintiffs and for Approval of Lead Plaintiffs' Selection of Lead Counsel and Liaison Counsel filed by Lewis Plaintiff Group, [7] MOTION to Consolidate Cases MOTION Appointment as Lead Plaintiffs and Approval of Selection of Lead and Liaison Counsel filed by Burrell, [4] MOTION to Consolidate Cases MOTION Appointment as Lead Plaintiff and For Approval of Selection of Lead and Liaison Counsel filed by Robert K. Willms. (Filo, Jennifer)
    LREF
    Blank -- Filed: 6/21/2004, Entered: 6/22/2004 Mail Returned
    Mail Returned as Undeliverable. Mail sent to Joseph Weiss (Filo, Jennifer)
      LREF
      Blank -- Filed: 6/10/2004, Entered: 6/16/2004 case transferred out - district transfer
      Case transferred to to District of Maryland pursuant to Conditional Transfer Order entered by the MDL Panel on 6/4/04 docket sheet sent to the Clerk in that district. (Filo, Jennifer)
        LREF
        Legal Document 12 Filed: 4/6/2004, Entered: 4/6/2004 Notice of Appearance/
        NOTICE of Appearance by Jonathan A. Shapiro on behalf of MFS Investment Management, Massachusetts Financial Services Company, Sun Life Financial Inc. (Shapiro, Jonathan)
          LREF
          Legal Document 11 Filed: 2/12/2004, Entered: 2/12/2004 Case Assigned/ReassignedCourt Filing
          Case REASSIGNED to Judge Nancy Gertner. Judge William G. Young no longer assigned to the case. Counsel are directed to the Court's Standing Orders re: Electronic Case Filing. (Bell, Marie)
            LREF
            Legal Document 10 Filed: 2/11/2004, Entered: 2/11/2004 Order of RecusalCourt Filing
            Judge William G. Young : ORDER OF RECUSAL entered.(Bell, Marie)
              LREF
              Legal Document 9 Filed: 2/9/2004, Entered: 2/11/2004 Affidavit in Support of Motion
              AFFIDAVIT of Bradley P. Dyer in Support re [7] MOTION to Consolidate Cases Appointment as Lead Plaintiffs and Approval of Selection of Lead and Liaison Counsel . (Bell, Marie)
                LREF
                Legal Document 8 Filed: 2/9/2004, Entered: 2/11/2004 Affidavit in Support of Motion
                AFFIDAVIT of David Pastor in Support re [7] MOTION to Consolidate Cases Appointment as Lead Plaintiffs and Approval of Selection of Lead and Liaison Counsel . (Attachments: # (1) Part 2)(Bell, Marie)
                LREF
                Legal Document 7 Filed: 2/9/2004, Entered: 2/11/2004 Motion to Consolidate Cases
                MOTION to Consolidate Cases, Appointment as Lead Plaintiffs and Approval of Selection of Lead and Liaison Counsel by Burrell. c/s.(Bell, Marie)
                  LREF
                  Legal Document 6 Filed: 2/9/2004, Entered: 2/11/2004 Affidavit in Support of Motion
                  AFFIDAVIT of David Pastor in Support re [4] MOTION to Consolidate Cases Appointment as Lead Plaintiff and For Approval of Selection of Lead and Liaison Counsel . (Bell, Marie)
                    LREF
                    Legal Document 5 Filed: 2/9/2004, Entered: 2/11/2004 Memorandum in Support of Motion
                    MEMORANDUM in Support re [4] MOTION to Consolidate Cases, Appointment as Lead Plaintiff and For Approval of Selection of Lead and Liaison Counsel filed by Robert K. Willms. (Bell, Marie)
                      LREF
                      Legal Document 4 Filed: 2/9/2004, Entered: 2/11/2004 Motion to Consolidate Cases
                      MOTION to Consolidate Cases, Appointment as Lead Plaintiff and For Approval of Selection of Lead and Liaison Counsel by Robert K. Willms.c/s.(Bell, Marie)
                        LREF
                        Legal Document 3 Filed: 2/9/2004, Entered: 2/11/2004 Memorandum in Support of Motion
                        MEMORANDUM in Support re [2] to Consolidate Cases MOTION to be Appointed Lead Plaintiffs and for Approval of Lead Plaintiffs' Selection of Lead Counsel and Liaison Counsel filed by Lewis Plaintiff Group. (Bell, Marie)
                          LREF
                          Legal Document 2 Filed: 2/9/2004, Entered: 2/11/2004 Motion to Consolidate Cases
                          MOTION to Consolidate Cases, to be Appointed Lead Plaintiffs and for Approval of Lead Plaintiffs' Selection of Lead Counsel and Liaison Counsel by Lewis Plaintiff Group. c/s.(Bell, Marie)
                            LREF
                            Legal Document 1 Filed: 12/19/2003, Entered: 12/22/2003 Complaint
                            COMPLAINT against John Does 1-100, MFS Aggressive Growth Allocation Fund, MFS Alabama Municipal Bond Fund, MFS Arkansas Municipal Bond Fund, MFS Bond Fund, MFS California Municipal Bond Fund, MFS Capital Opportunities Fund, MFS Conservative Allocation Fund, MFS Core Growth Fund, MFS Emerging Growth Fund, MFS Emerging Markets Debt Fund, MFS Emerging Markets Equity Fund, MFS Florida Municipal Bond Fund, MFS Funds, MFS Georgia Municipal Bond Fund, MFS Global Equity Fund, MFS Global Growth Fund, MFS Global Total Return Fund, MFS Government Limited Maturity Fund, MFS Government Mortgage Fund, MFS Government Securities Fund, MFS High Income Fund, MFS High Yield Opportunities Fund, MFS Intermediate Investment Grade Bond Fund, MFS International Growth Fund, MFS International New Discovery Fund, MFS International Value Fund, MFS Investment Management, MFS Large Cap Growth Fund, MFS Limited Maturity Fund, MFS Managed Sectors Fund, MFS Maryland Municipal Bond Fund, MFS Massachusetts Municipal Bond Fund, MFS Mid Cap Growth Fund, MFS Mid Cap Value Fund, MFS Mississippi Municipal Bond Fund, MFS Moderate Allocation Fund, MFS Municipal Bond Fund, MFS Municipal Limited Maturity Fund, MFS New Discovery Fund, MFS New Endeavor Fund, MFS New York Municipal Bond Fund, MFS North Carolina Municipal Bond Fund, MFS Pennsylvania Municipal Bond Fund, MFS Research Bond Fund, MFS Research Fund, MFS Research Growth and Income Fund, MFS Research International Fund, MFS Series Trust I, MFS Series Trust II, MFS Series Trust III, MFS Series Trust IV, MFS Series Trust IX, MFS Series Trust V, MFS Series Trust VI, MFS Series Trust VII, MFS Series Trust VIII, MFS Series Trust X, MFS Series Trust XI, MFS South Carolina Municipal Bond Fund, MFS Strategic Growth Fund, MFS Strategic Income Fund, MFS Technology Fund, MFS Tennessee Municipal Bond Fund, MFS Total Return Fund, MFS Union Standard Equity Fund, MFS Utilities Fund, MFS Value Fund, MFS Virginia Municipal Bond Fund, MFS West Virginia Municipal Bond Fund, Massachusetts Financial Services Company, Massachusetts Investors Growth Stock, Massachusetts Investors Trust, Sun Life Financial Inc. Filing fee: $ 150, receipt number 52647, filed by Jacob Elephant.(Bell, Marie)
                              LREF
                              Blank -- Filed: 12/19/2003, Entered: 12/22/2003 Magistrate Judge Assignment
                              If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge Dein. (Bell, Marie)
                                LREF
                                Blank -- Filed: 12/19/2003, Entered: 12/22/2003 Summons Issued
                                Summons Issued as to Jacob Elephant, John Does 1-100, MFS Aggressive Growth Allocation Fund, MFS Alabama Municipal Bond Fund, MFS Arkansas Municipal Bond Fund, MFS Bond Fund, MFS California Municipal Bond Fund, MFS Capital Opportunities Fund, MFS Conservative Allocation Fund, MFS Core Growth Fund, MFS Emerging Growth Fund, MFS Emerging Markets Debt Fund, MFS Emerging Markets Equity Fund, MFS Florida Municipal Bond Fund, MFS Funds, MFS Georgia Municipal Bond Fund, MFS Global Equity Fund, MFS Global Growth Fund, MFS Global Total Return Fund, MFS Government Limited Maturity Fund, MFS Government Mortgage Fund, MFS Government Securities Fund, MFS High Income Fund, MFS High Yield Opportunities Fund, MFS Intermediate Investment Grade Bond Fund, MFS International Growth Fund, MFS International New Discovery Fund, MFS International Value Fund, MFS Investment Management, MFS Large Cap Growth Fund, MFS Limited Maturity Fund, MFS Managed Sectors Fund, MFS Maryland Municipal Bond Fund, MFS Massachusetts Municipal Bond Fund, MFS Mid Cap Growth Fund, MFS Mid Cap Value Fund, MFS Mississippi Municipal Bond Fund, MFS Moderate Allocation Fund, MFS Municipal Bond Fund, MFS Municipal Limited Maturity Fund, MFS New Discovery Fund, MFS New Endeavor Fund, MFS New York Municipal Bond Fund, MFS North Carolina Municipal Bond Fund, MFS Pennsylvania Municipal Bond Fund, MFS Research Bond Fund, MFS Research Fund, MFS Research Growth and Income Fund, MFS Research International Fund, MFS Series Trust I, MFS Series Trust II, MFS Series Trust III, MFS Series Trust IV, MFS Series Trust IX, MFS Series Trust V, MFS Series Trust VI, MFS Series Trust VII, MFS Series Trust VIII, MFS Series Trust X, MFS Series Trust XI, MFS South Carolina Municipal Bond Fund, MFS Strategic Growth Fund, MFS Strategic Income Fund, MFS Technology Fund, MFS Tennessee Municipal Bond Fund, MFS Total Return Fund, MFS Union Standard Equity Fund, MFS Utilities Fund, MFS Value Fund, MFS Virginia Municipal Bond Fund, MFS West Virginia Municipal Bond Fund, Massachusetts Financial Services Company, Massachusetts Investors Growth Stock, Massachusetts Investors Trust, Sun Life Financial Inc.. (Bell, Marie)
                                  LREF

                                  Statistics

                                  This case has been viewed 119 times.

                                  No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                  Space
                                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                   
                                  PlainSite
                                  Sign Up
                                  Need Password Help?