Huebner v. Midland Credit Management, Inc.
Federal Civil Lawsuit New York Eastern District Court, Case No. 1:14-cv-06046

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated July 9, 2017 at 11:28 PM DT (4.3 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Levi Huebner, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Levi Huebner & Associates, PC
535 Dean Street
Suite 100
Brooklyn, NY 11217
212-354-5555 on behalf of himseld and all other similarly situated consumers Levi Huebner , +1 212 354 5555 +1 347 350 8789 newyorklawyer@msn.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Poltorak PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Elie C. Poltorak +1 718 943 8815 +1 718 943 8816 elie@poltoraklaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Pomerantz LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Levi Huebner & Associates, PC
535 Dean Street
Suite 100
Brooklyn, NY 11217
212-354-5555 on behalf of himseld and all other similarly situated consumers Gustavo Fabian Bruckner +1 212 661 1100 +1 212 661 8665 gfBruckner@pomlaw.com
Levi Huebner & Associates, PC
535 Dean Street
Suite 100
Brooklyn, NY 11217
212-354-5555 on behalf of himseld and all other similarly situated consumers Perry Gattegno +1 312 377 1181 +1 312 377 1184 pgattegno@pomlaw.com
Levi Huebner & Associates, PC
535 Dean Street
Suite 100
Brooklyn, NY 11217
212-354-5555 on behalf of himseld and all other similarly situated consumers Jayne Arnold Goldstein +1 954 315 3454 +1 954 315 3455 jagoldstein@pomlaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Shea and Larocque

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Levi Huebner & Associates, PC
535 Dean Street
Suite 100
Brooklyn, NY 11217
212-354-5555 on behalf of himseld and all other similarly situated consumers Leopold Gross +1 718 753 1777 leopoldgross@gmail.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Law Firm 105

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Levi Huebner & Associates, PC
535 Dean Street
Suite 100
Brooklyn, NY 11217
212-354-5555 on behalf of himseld and all other similarly situated consumers Steven Goldman +1 718 938 0650 +1 347 689 2143 goldmanattorney@gmail.com
v.
No Logo Midland Credit Management, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Gordon & Rees LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Matthew Brady Johnson +1 212 376 6433 +1 212 376 6490 mbjohnson@mdwcg.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Marshall Dennehey Warner Coleman & Goggin

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Andrew Michael Schwartz +1 215 575 2765 +1 215 575 0856 amschwartz@mdwcg.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Marshall, Dennehey, Warner, Coleman & Goggin, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Matthew Brady Johnson +1 212 376 6433 +1 212 376 6490 mbjohnson@mdwcg.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Matthew Brady Johnson +1 212 376 6433 +1 212 376 6490 mbjohnson@mdwcg.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Matthew Brady Johnson +1 212 376 6433 +1 212 376 6490 mbjohnson@mdwcg.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Matthew Brady Johnson +1 212 376 6433 +1 212 376 6490 mbjohnson@mdwcg.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Matthew Brady Johnson +1 212 376 6433 +1 212 376 6490 mbjohnson@mdwcg.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Matthew Brady Johnson +1 212 376 6433 +1 212 376 6490 mbjohnson@mdwcg.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Matthew Brady Johnson +1 212 376 6433 +1 212 376 6490 mbjohnson@mdwcg.com
Space Matthew Brady Johnson +1 212 376 6433 +1 212 376 6490 mbjohnson@mdwcg.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Matthew Brady Johnson +1 212 376 6433 +1 212 376 6490 mbjohnson@mdwcg.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Matthew Brady Johnson +1 212 376 6433 +1 212 376 6490 mbjohnson@mdwcg.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Matthew Brady Johnson +1 212 376 6433 +1 212 376 6490 mbjohnson@mdwcg.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Matthew Brady Johnson +1 212 376 6433 +1 212 376 6490 mbjohnson@mdwcg.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Matthew Brady Johnson +1 212 376 6433 +1 212 376 6490 mbjohnson@mdwcg.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Matthew Brady Johnson +1 212 376 6433 +1 212 376 6490 mbjohnson@mdwcg.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Matthew Brady Johnson +1 212 376 6433 +1 212 376 6490 mbjohnson@mdwcg.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Matthew Brady Johnson +1 212 376 6433 +1 212 376 6490 mbjohnson@mdwcg.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Matthew Brady Johnson +1 212 376 6433 +1 212 376 6490 mbjohnson@mdwcg.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Matthew Brady Johnson +1 212 376 6433 +1 212 376 6490 mbjohnson@mdwcg.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Matthew Brady Johnson +1 212 376 6433 +1 212 376 6490 mbjohnson@mdwcg.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Matthew Brady Johnson +1 212 376 6433 +1 212 376 6490 mbjohnson@mdwcg.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Matthew Brady Johnson +1 212 376 6433 +1 212 376 6490 mbjohnson@mdwcg.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Matthew Brady Johnson +1 212 376 6433 +1 212 376 6490 mbjohnson@mdwcg.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Matthew Brady Johnson +1 212 376 6433 +1 212 376 6490 mbjohnson@mdwcg.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Matthew Brady Johnson +1 212 376 6433 +1 212 376 6490 mbjohnson@mdwcg.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Matthew Brady Johnson +1 212 376 6433 +1 212 376 6490 mbjohnson@mdwcg.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Matthew Brady Johnson +1 212 376 6433 +1 212 376 6490 mbjohnson@mdwcg.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Matthew Brady Johnson +1 212 376 6433 +1 212 376 6490 mbjohnson@mdwcg.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Matthew Brady Johnson +1 212 376 6433 +1 212 376 6490 mbjohnson@mdwcg.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Richard David Lane, Jr. +1 212 376 6400 +1 212 376 6490 rdlane@mdwcg.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Richard David Lane, Jr. +1 212 376 6400 +1 212 376 6490 rdlane@mdwcg.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Richard David Lane, Jr. +1 212 376 6400 +1 212 376 6490 rdlane@mdwcg.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Richard David Lane, Jr. +1 212 376 6400 +1 212 376 6490 rdlane@mdwcg.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Richard David Lane, Jr. +1 212 376 6400 +1 212 376 6490 rdlane@mdwcg.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Richard David Lane, Jr. +1 212 376 6400 +1 212 376 6490 rdlane@mdwcg.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Richard David Lane, Jr. +1 212 376 6400 +1 212 376 6490 rdlane@mdwcg.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Richard David Lane, Jr. +1 212 376 6400 +1 212 376 6490 rdlane@mdwcg.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Richard David Lane, Jr. +1 212 376 6400 +1 212 376 6490 rdlane@mdwcg.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Richard David Lane, Jr. +1 212 376 6400 +1 212 376 6490 rdlane@mdwcg.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Richard David Lane, Jr. +1 212 376 6400 +1 212 376 6490 rdlane@mdwcg.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Richard David Lane, Jr. +1 212 376 6400 +1 212 376 6490 rdlane@mdwcg.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Richard David Lane, Jr. +1 212 376 6400 +1 212 376 6490 rdlane@mdwcg.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Richard David Lane, Jr. +1 212 376 6400 +1 212 376 6490 rdlane@mdwcg.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Richard David Lane, Jr. +1 212 376 6400 +1 212 376 6490 rdlane@mdwcg.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Richard David Lane, Jr. +1 212 376 6400 +1 212 376 6490 rdlane@mdwcg.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Richard David Lane, Jr. +1 212 376 6400 +1 212 376 6490 rdlane@mdwcg.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Richard David Lane, Jr. +1 212 376 6400 +1 212 376 6490 rdlane@mdwcg.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Richard David Lane, Jr. +1 212 376 6400 +1 212 376 6490 rdlane@mdwcg.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Richard David Lane, Jr. +1 212 376 6400 +1 212 376 6490 rdlane@mdwcg.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Richard David Lane, Jr. +1 212 376 6400 +1 212 376 6490 rdlane@mdwcg.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Richard David Lane, Jr. +1 212 376 6400 +1 212 376 6490 rdlane@mdwcg.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Richard David Lane, Jr. +1 212 376 6400 +1 212 376 6490 rdlane@mdwcg.com
Space Richard David Lane, Jr. +1 212 376 6400 +1 212 376 6490 rdlane@mdwcg.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Richard David Lane, Jr. +1 212 376 6400 +1 212 376 6490 rdlane@mdwcg.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Richard David Lane, Jr. +1 212 376 6400 +1 212 376 6490 rdlane@mdwcg.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Richard David Lane, Jr. +1 212 376 6400 +1 212 376 6490 rdlane@mdwcg.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Richard David Lane, Jr. +1 212 376 6400 +1 212 376 6490 rdlane@mdwcg.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Richard David Lane, Jr. +1 212 376 6400 +1 212 376 6490 rdlane@mdwcg.com
Midland Funding LLC Midland Funding LLC, Defendant
No Logo Elie C. Poltorak, Interested Party

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of Gregory Weaver (Unknown Firm)

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jacob T. Fogel jayfogel@att.net
No Logo Poltorak PC, Interested Party

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of Gregory Weaver (Unknown Firm)

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jacob T. Fogel jayfogel@att.net
No Logo Pomerantz LLP, Movant
  Entries (160) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 151 Filed: 2/24/2017, Entered: None USCA Order
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 150 Filed: 2/24/2017, Entered: None USCA Order
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 149 Filed: 1/6/2017, Entered: None USCA Order
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 148 Filed: 1/3/2017, Entered: None Status Report
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 147 Filed: 12/30/2016, Entered: None Subsequent Notice of Appeal
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 146 Filed: 12/30/2016, Entered: None Subsequent Notice of Appeal
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 145 Filed: 12/30/2016, Entered: None Extension of Time to File Document
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 144 Filed: 12/27/2016, Entered: None Strike
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 143 Filed: 12/23/2016, Entered: None Order(Other)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 142 Filed: 12/13/2016, Entered: None Reply in Opposition
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 142 Filed: 12/12/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                      REPLY in Opposition To Defendants Purported Fees filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A) (Gross, Leopold) (Entered: 12/12/2016)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 141 Filed: 12/5/2016, Entered: None Subsequent Notice of Appeal
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 140 Filed: 12/5/2016, Entered: None Subsequent Notice of Appeal
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 139 Filed: 12/5/2016, Entered: None Transcript
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 138 Filed: 12/5/2016, Entered: None Transcript
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 137 Filed: 12/2/2016, Entered: None Transcript
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 136 Filed: 11/30/2016, Entered: None Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 135 Filed: 11/23/2016, Entered: None Status Report
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 134 Filed: 11/10/2016, Entered: None Order on Motion for Sanctions
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 133 Filed: 10/13/2016, Entered: None Reply in Support
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Blank 132 Filed: 10/5/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                          Letter MOTION to Produce Sealed Exhibits, Letter MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to Order on Motion for Leave to Electronically File Document under Seal, 128 Affidavit in Opposition to Motion, 130 Affidavit in Opposition to Motion, by Midland Credit Management, Inc, Midland Funding LLC. (Johnson, Matthew) (Entered: 10/05/2016)
                                            LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 131 Filed: 10/5/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                            EXHIBIT H, I and J by Levi Huebner. Related document: Order on Motion for Leave to Electronically File Document under Seal, 130 Affidavit in Opposition to Motion, filed by Levi Huebner. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit H, # 2 Exhibit I, # 3 Exhibit J) (Gross, Leopold) (Entered: 10/05/2016)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Blank 130 Filed: 9/30/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                              AFFIDAVIT/DECLARATION in Opposition re 97 MOTION for Sanctions the Declaration of Levi Huebner filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G, # 8 Exhibit K, # 9 Exhibit L, # 10 Exhibit M, # 11 Exhibit N, # 12 Exhibit O) (Gross, Leopold) (Entered: 09/30/2016)
                                                LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 129 Filed: 9/30/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                Letter MOTION for Leave to Electronically File Document under Seal by Levi Huebner. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit H, # 2 Exhibit I, # 3 Exhibit J) (Gross, Leopold) (Entered: 09/30/2016)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 128 Filed: 9/30/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                  AFFIDAVIT/DECLARATION in Opposition re 97 MOTION for Sanctions of Leopold Gross filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1) (Gross, Leopold) (Entered: 09/30/2016)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 127 Filed: 9/19/2016, Entered: None Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 126 Filed: 9/19/2016, Entered: None Notice of Appearance
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 125 Filed: 9/9/2016, Entered: None Order on Motion for Reconsideration
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 124 Filed: 9/6/2016, Entered: None Memorandum in Support
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 123 Filed: 9/2/2016, Entered: None Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 122 Filed: 8/26/2016, Entered: None Memorandum in Opposition
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 121 Filed: 8/23/2016, Entered: None Pro Se Consent to Electronic Notification
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 120 Filed: 8/17/2016, Entered: None Reconsideration
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 119 Filed: 8/10/2016, Entered: None Reply in Opposition
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 118 Filed: 8/5/2016, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                      ORDER granting 102 and 108 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney for Plaintiff. See Order for details. Ordered by Judge Brian M. Cogan on 8/5/2016. (Weisberg, Peggy) c/m to Levi Huebner at 535 Dean Street, Suite 100, Brooklyn, NY 11217 Modified on 8/5/2016 (Clarke, Melonie). (Entered: 08/05/2016)
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 117 Filed: 8/5/2016, Entered: None
                                                                        Letter MOTION for Leave to File Sur-Reply in Opposition to Sanctions Motion by Levi Huebner. (Bruckner, Gustavo) (Entered: 08/05/2016)
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 116 Filed: 8/4/2016, Entered: None
                                                                          REPLY in Support re 111 Exparte, Memorandum in Opposition filed by All Defendants. (Johnson, Matthew) (Entered: 08/04/2016)
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 115 Filed: 7/27/2016, Entered: None
                                                                            MOTION to Seal Document 114 Reply in Support of Motion to Withdraw by Levi Huebner. (Bruckner, Gustavo) (Entered: 07/27/2016)
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Blank 114 Filed: 7/27/2016, Entered: None
                                                                              REPLY in Support re 108 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney filed by Levi Huebner. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration Declaration of Attorney Gustavo F. Bruckner) (Bruckner, Gustavo) (Entered: 07/27/2016)
                                                                                LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 113 Filed: 7/21/2016, Entered: None
                                                                                AFFIRMATION in Opposition re 108 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Levi Huebner, Pro Se. (Attachments: # 1 Letter) (Lee, Tiffeny) (Entered: 07/25/2016)
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 112 Filed: 7/13/2016, Entered: None
                                                                                  MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply requesting until 7/21/16 to submit opposition to the Pomerantz motion by Levi Huebner. (Guzzi, Roseann) (Entered: 07/15/2016)
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 111 Filed: 7/12/2016, Entered: None
                                                                                    MEMORANDUM in Opposition TO DEFENDANTS MOTION FOR SANCTIONS AGAINST PLAINTIFFS COUNSEL filed by Levi Huebner. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Attorney Jayne A. Goldstein) (Bruckner, Gustavo) (Entered: 07/12/2016)
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 110 Filed: 7/11/2016, Entered: None
                                                                                      REPLY to Response to Motion re 108 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney filed by Levi Huebner. (Bruckner, Gustavo) (Entered: 07/11/2016)
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 109 Filed: 7/8/2016, Entered: None
                                                                                        MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to respond to defendants' post judgment motion 30 days after the Court determines Pomerantz's motion to withdraw as counsel by Levi Huebner. (Guzzi, Roseann) (Entered: 07/11/2016)
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 108 Filed: 7/11/2016, Entered: None
                                                                                          MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Levi Huebner. (Attachments: # 1 Notice of Motion, # 2 Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion, # 3 Declaration) (Bruckner, Gustavo) (Entered: 07/11/2016)
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 107 Filed: 7/6/2016, Entered: None
                                                                                            REPLY to Response to Motion re 102 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney Ex Parte Application for Order Shortening Notice and Expediting Hearing on Plaintiff's Counsel Pomerantz LLP's Motion to Withdraw as Counsel for Plaintiff - Memorandum in Reply to Defendants' Opposition to Plaintiff's Counsel Pomerantz LLP's Motion to Withdraw filed by Levi Huebner. (Bruckner, Gustavo) (Entered: 07/06/2016)
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Blank 106 Filed: 7/6/2016, Entered: None
                                                                                              NOTICE OF APPEAL as to Order to Show Cause,, Order on Motion to Adjourn Conference,,, 96 Clerk's Judgment, Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply, Order, 4 Scheduling Order, 26 Order on Motion to Vacate, Order on Motion to Reassign Case, Order on Motion for Recusal, Order on Motion for Leave to Appeal,,,, 16 Memorandum & Opinion, Order to Show Cause,, 95 Order on Motion for Summary Judgment, Order on Motion to Certify Class, Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel,,, Order on Motion to Appear by Telephone, by Levi Huebner. Filing fee $ 505, receipt number 0207-8739476. Appeal Record due by 7/20/2016. (Fogel, Jacob) (Entered: 07/06/2016)
                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 105 Filed: 7/6/2016, Entered: None
                                                                                                NOTICE OF APPEAL as to 96 Clerk's Judgment, 95 Order on Motion for Summary Judgment, Order on Motion to Certify Class, Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel, by Levi Huebner. Filing fee $ 505.00. Receipt #4653103641. Service done electronically. Appellant also includes list of District Court Orders. See document for further details. (McGee, Mary Ann) (Entered: 07/06/2016)
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 104 Filed: 7/6/2016, Entered: None
                                                                                                  AFFIDAVIT/DECLARATION in Opposition re 101 Letter MOTION for pre motion conference in connection with ECF entry 103 filed by All Defendants. (Johnson, Matthew) (Entered: 07/06/2016)
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 103 Filed: 7/6/2016, Entered: None
                                                                                                    MEMORANDUM in Opposition to Pomerantz LLP Motion to Withdraw filed by All Defendants. (Johnson, Matthew) (Entered: 07/06/2016)
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 102 Filed: 7/1/2016, Entered: None
                                                                                                      MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney Ex Parte Application for Order Shortening Notice and Expediting Hearing on Plaintiff's Counsel Pomerantz LLP's Motion to Withdraw as Counsel for Plaintiff by Levi Huebner. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration In Support of Ex Parte Application, # 2 Notice of Motion, # 3 Exhibit motion to withdraw, # 4 Exhibit Memorandum of Law In Support of Motion to Withdraw, # 5 Declaration IN Support of Motion to Withdraw) (Bruckner, Gustavo) (Entered: 07/01/2016)
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                        Blank 101 Filed: 6/24/2016, Entered: None
                                                                                                        Letter MOTION for pre motion conference by Levi Huebner. (Bruckner, Gustavo) (Entered: 06/24/2016)
                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                          Blank 100 Filed: 6/23/2016, Entered: None
                                                                                                          MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 97 MOTION for Sanctions by Levi Huebner. (Bruckner, Gustavo) (Entered: 06/23/2016)
                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 99 Filed: 6/13/2016, Entered: None
                                                                                                            AFFIDAVIT/DECLARATION in Support re 97 MOTION for Sanctions filed by Midland Credit Management, Inc, Midland Funding LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G, # 8 Exhibit H, # 9 Exhibit I, # 10 Exhibit J) (Johnson, Matthew) (Entered: 06/13/2016)
                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 98 Filed: 6/13/2016, Entered: None
                                                                                                              MEMORANDUM in Support re 97 MOTION for Sanctions filed by Midland Credit Management, Inc, Midland Funding LLC. (Johnson, Matthew) (Entered: 06/13/2016)
                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 97 Filed: 6/13/2016, Entered: None
                                                                                                                MOTION for Sanctions by Midland Credit Management, Inc, Midland Funding LLC. (Johnson, Matthew) (Entered: 06/13/2016)
                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 96 Filed: 6/6/2016, Entered: None
                                                                                                                  CLERK'S JUDGMENT dated 6/6/16 that defendants' motion for summary judgment is granted; that the Third Amended Complaint is dismissed; and that plaintiff's motion for class certification is denied. ( Ordered by Janet Hamilton, Deputy Clerk on behalf of Douglas C. Palmer, Clerk of Court on 6/6/2016 ) (Guzzi, Roseann) (Entered: 06/06/2016)
                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 95 Filed: 6/6/2016, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                    MEMORANDUM DECISION & ORDER dated 6/3/16 granting defendant's 63 Motion for Summary Judgment; and the Third Amended Complaint is dismissed. Plaintiff's 91 Motion for class certification is denied. ( Ordered by Judge Brian M. Cogan on 6/3/2016 ) *Forwarded for jgm. (Guzzi, Roseann) (Entered: 06/06/2016)
                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 94 Filed: 2/17/2016, Entered: None Reply in Support
                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 93 Filed: 2/10/2016, Entered: None Memorandum in Opposition
                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 92 Filed: 1/27/2016, Entered: None
                                                                                                                          AFFIDAVIT/DECLARATION in Support re 91 MOTION to Certify Class MOTION to Appoint Counsel filed by Levi Huebner. (Goldstein, Jayne) (Entered: 01/27/2016)
                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 91 Filed: 1/27/2016, Entered: None Appoint Counsel
                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 90 Filed: 1/22/2016, Entered: None
                                                                                                                              AFFIDAVIT/DECLARATION in Support re 87 Amended MOTION for Summary Judgment Requesting Oral Argument with Exhibit F filed by All Defendants. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit F) (Johnson, Matthew) (Entered: 01/22/2016)
                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 89 Filed: 1/22/2016, Entered: None Rule 56.1 Statement
                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 88 Filed: 1/22/2016, Entered: None Reply in Support
                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 87 Filed: 1/22/2016, Entered: None SUMMARY JUDGMENT
                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 86 Filed: 1/15/2016, Entered: None Leave to Electronically File Document under Seal
                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 85 Filed: 1/15/2016, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                        AFFIDAVIT/DECLARATION in Opposition re 63 Notice of MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Levi Huebner. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6, # 7 Exhibit 7, # 8 Exhibit 14, # 9 Exhibit 15, # 10 Exhibit 16, # 11 Exhibit 17, # 12 Exhibit 19, # 13 Exhibit 20, # 14 Exhibit 21) (Bruckner, Gustavo) (Entered: 01/15/2016)
                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 84 Filed: 1/15/2016, Entered: None Rule 56.1 Statement
                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 83 Filed: 1/15/2016, Entered: None Memorandum in Opposition
                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 82 Filed: 1/8/2016, Entered: None Notice of Appearance
                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 81 Filed: 1/7/2016, Entered: None Appear Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 80 Filed: 1/7/2016, Entered: None Notice of Appearance
                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 79 Filed: 1/6/2016, Entered: None Appear Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 78 Filed: 12/30/2015, Entered: None Extension of Time to File Document
                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 77 Filed: 12/28/2015, Entered: None Notice of Appearance
                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 76 Filed: 12/15/2015, Entered: None Reply in Opposition
                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                            Blank 75 Filed: 12/15/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                            RESPONSE in Opposition re 74 Letter MOTION for pre motion conference Re: Cross-Moving for Partial Summary Judgment filed by Midland Credit Management, Inc, Midland Funding LLC. (Johnson, Matthew) (Entered: 12/15/2015)
                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 74 Filed: 12/15/2015, Entered: None Pre Motion Conference
                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 73 Filed: 12/11/2015, Entered: None Exhibit
                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 72 Filed: 12/6/2015, Entered: None Strike
                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 71 Filed: 12/6/2015, Entered: None Reply in Opposition
                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 70 Filed: 12/6/2015, Entered: None Leave to Electronically File Document under Seal
                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 69 Filed: 12/6/2015, Entered: None Reply in Support
                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 68 Filed: 12/5/2015, Entered: None Leave to Electronically File Document under Seal
                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 67 Filed: 12/5/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                            RESPONSE in Opposition re 62 Letter MOTION for pre motion conference re Order, dated November 24, 2015 filed by Midland Credit Management, Inc, Midland Funding LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B) (Johnson, Matthew) (Entered: 12/05/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 66 Filed: 12/1/2015, Entered: None Memorandum in Support
                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 65 Filed: 12/1/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                AFFIDAVIT/DECLARATION in Support re 63 Notice of MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Midland Credit Management, Inc, Midland Funding LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E) (Johnson, Matthew) (Entered: 12/01/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 64 Filed: 12/1/2015, Entered: None Rule 56.1 Statement
                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 63 Filed: 12/1/2015, Entered: None SUMMARY JUDGMENT
                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 62 Filed: 12/1/2015, Entered: None Pre Motion Conference
                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 62 Filed: 11/30/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                        Letter MOTION for pre motion conference re Order, dated November 24, 2015 by Levi Huebner. (Fogel, Jacob) (Entered: 11/30/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 61 Filed: 11/24/2015, Entered: None Filing Fee Received
                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 61 Filed: 11/20/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                            FILING FEE: $ 350.00, receipt number 4653095208 for Levi Huebner re: sanctions/contempt fines. (Guzzi, Roseann) (Entered: 11/24/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 60 Filed: 11/23/2015, Entered: None Affidavit/Affirmation
                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 59 Filed: 11/19/2015, Entered: None Order on Motion for Pre Motion Conference
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 58 Filed: 11/19/2015, Entered: None Pre Motion Conference
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 57 Filed: 11/13/2015, Entered: None Letter
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 56 Filed: 11/5/2015, Entered: None Seal
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 55 Filed: 11/4/2015, Entered: None Pre Motion Conference
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 54 Filed: 10/15/2015, Entered: None Order on Motion for Pre Motion Conference
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 53 Filed: 10/14/2015, Entered: None Reply in Opposition
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 53 Filed: 10/13/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                              REPLY in Opposition re 52 Letter MOTION for pre motion conference re 51 Order on Motion for Discovery filed by Levi Huebner. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A) (Fogel, Jacob) (Entered: 10/13/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 52 Filed: 10/5/2015, Entered: None Pre Motion Conference
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 51 Filed: 9/22/2015, Entered: None Order on Motion for Discovery
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 9/18/2015, Entered: None Discovery
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 9/4/2015, Entered: None Notice of Appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 9/2/2015, Entered: None Extension of Time to File Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 48 Filed: 9/1/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Letter MOTION for Extension of Time to File Motion For Class Certification by Levi Huebner. (Fogel, Jacob) (Entered: 09/01/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 9/1/2015, Entered: None Notice of Appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 8/31/2015, Entered: None Appear Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 8/20/2015, Entered: None Order on Motion for Protective Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 8/19/2015, Entered: None Protective Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 8/18/2015, Entered: None Order on Motion for Protective Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 8/18/2015, Entered: None Protective Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 41 Filed: 8/17/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        RESPONSE in Opposition re 40 Letter MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery filed by Levi Huebner. (Poltorak, Elie) (Entered: 08/17/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 8/16/2015, Entered: None Extension of Time to Complete Discovery
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 8/11/2015, Entered: None Appear by Telephone
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 7/22/2015, Entered: None Adjourn Conference
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 7/21/2015, Entered: None Extension of Time to Complete Discovery
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 6/19/2015, Entered: None Answer to Amended Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 6/5/2015, Entered: None Amended Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 5/29/2015, Entered: None Extension of Time to Complete Discovery
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 5/29/2015, Entered: None Stipulation
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 5/28/2015, Entered: None Notice of Appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 5/28/2015, Entered: None Corporate Disclosure Statement
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 5/22/2015, Entered: None Extension of Time to Complete Discovery
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 5/22/2015, Entered: None Amended Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 5/21/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  AMENDED COMPLAINT against Midland Credit Management, Inc, filed by Levi Huebner. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit, # 2 Exhibit, # 3 Exhibit) (Fogel, Jacob) (Entered: 05/22/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 5/7/2015, Entered: None Filing Fee Received
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 5/7/2015, Entered: None Notice of Appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 5/1/2015, Entered: None Order on Motion for Leave to Appeal
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 4/29/2015, Entered: None Reply in Opposition
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 4/28/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            REPLY in Opposition re 21 Reply in Opposition, filed by Levi Huebner. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibit A: Levi Huebners Credit Check [REDACTED] of all three credit bureaus., # 2 Exhibit Exhibit B: GARCIA v. MIDLAND CREDIT MANAGEMENT (D. Colo. 6-9-2014)., # 3 Exhibit Exhibit C: RANDALL v. MIDLAND FUNDING, LLC (D.Neb. 7-23-2009)., # 4 Exhibit Exhibit D: VELDERMAN v. MIDLAND CREDIT MANAGEMENT, INC. (W.D.Mich. 2005)., # 5 Exhibit Exhibit E: SMITH v. ENCORE CAPITAL GROUP INC. (E.D.Wis. 8-23-2013)., # 6 Exhibit Exhibit F: MONTGOMERY V. MIDLAND CREDIT MGMT. (E. D. Pa. June 19, 2014)., # 7 Exhibit Exhibit G: Ownership Summary of Encore Capital Management., # 8 Exhibit Exhibit H: Performance of iShares Russell 2000 Growth ETF showing ownership in Encore Capital increased., # 9 Exhibit Exhibit I: 2013 Financial Disclosure Report of Judge Cogan., # 10 Exhibit Exhibit J: The Vanguard Group Inc. 529 Portfolios of College Access., # 11 Exhibit Exhibit K: The Vanguard Group Inc. ownership in Encore.) (Gross, Leopold) (Entered: 04/28/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 4/29/2015, Entered: None Notice of Appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 4/28/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE of Appearance by Leopold Gross on behalf of Levi Huebner (aty to be noticed) (Gross, Leopold) (Entered: 04/28/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 4/24/2015, Entered: None Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 4/7/2015, Entered: None Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 4/3/2015, Entered: None Reply in Opposition
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 3/19/2015, Entered: None Recusal
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 20 Filed: 3/18/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION to Vacate 16 Memorandum & Opinion, Order to Show Cause,, FRCP 60(b), MOTION to Reassign Case 28 U.S.C. section 144, MOTION for Recusal 28 U.S.C. section 144, MOTION for Leave to Appeal 28 U.S.C.1292 by Levi Huebner. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Attorney Affidavit in Support of Motion, # 2 Exhibit A: True certified copy of the phone recording between Levi Huebner and Midland Credit Management, # 3 Exhibit B: True copy of the Levi Huebners Credit Report dated March 7, 2015 showing a negative reporting by Midland Credit Management, # 4 Exhibit C: True copy of the collection letter, by Midland Credit Management attached to its answer, backdated August 9, 2013, showing that in order to dispute a debt the debtor must do so in writing, # 5 Exhibit D: Ttrue copy of the cessation letter that Midland Credit Management claims to have sent to Levi Huebner, backdated October 17, 2013 which makes it appear as if the disputed debt was removed from Levi Huebners Credit Report, # 6 Exhibit E: True copy of the Corporate Disclosure Statement by Midland Credit Management showing to be owned by Encore Capital Group, Inc, # 7 Exhibit F: True copy of the fax cover with letter from Levi Huebner to I.C. Systems disputing the debt and demanding verification, dated July 27, 2011, # 8 Exhibit G: True copy of the collection letter from Afni Inc, addressed to Levi Huebner dated, October 14, 2011, # 9 Exhibit H: True copy of Levi Huebners Credit Report dated October 8, 2013, # 10 Exhibit I: True copy of the COLLECTION PRACTICE MADE EASY, Gerard J. Felt, Esq., Pressler & Pressler, LLP, an attorney of a firm that often represents Midland Credit Management, # 11 Exhibit J: True copy of the FINANCIAL DISCLOSURE REPORT of the Hon. Brian M. Cogan for the calendar year of 2012, showing that Judge Cogan has shares in iShares Russell 2000 ETF, # 12 Exhibit K: True copy of the snap shot of iShares Russell 2000 ETF disclosure sheet published on iShares Russell 2000 ETF showing to own Encore Capital Group, Inc., # 13 Exhibit L: True copy of the of the profile Encore Capital Group, Inc, has on the website of the Wall Street General showing that iShares Russell 2000 ETF owns over 500,000 shares in Encore Capital Group, Inc., # 14 Plaintiff's Response and Memorandum) (Poltorak, Elie) (Entered: 03/18/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 19 Filed: 3/2/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            RESPONSE in Opposition re 18 Letter MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 16 Memorandum & Opinion, Order to Show Cause,, Sufficient to Receive Certified Transcript filed by Midland Credit Management, Inc. (Johnson, Matthew) (Entered: 03/02/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 3/2/2015, Entered: None Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 2/15/2015, Entered: None Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 2/11/2015, Entered: None Order to Show Cause
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 2/2/2015, Entered: None Appear by Telephone
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 1/30/2015, Entered: None Notice of Appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 1/28/2015, Entered: None Letter
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 1/2/2015, Entered: None Adjourn Conference
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 12/15/2014, Entered: None Answer to Amended Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 12/15/2014, Entered: None Corporate Disclosure Statement
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 12/15/2014, Entered: None Notice of Appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 12/12/2014, Entered: None Summons Returned Executed
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 12/11/2014, Entered: None Adjourn Conference
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 11/20/2014, Entered: None Summons Issued
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 11/20/2014, Entered: None Notice(Other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 11/4/2014, Entered: None Scheduling Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 10/23/2014, Entered: None Amended Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 10/16/2014, Entered: None Clerks Notice of Rule 73
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 10/15/2014, Entered: None Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Space Space

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Statistics

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  This case has been viewed 533 times.

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Space
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                   
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Need Password Help?