USA v. Levin et al

Criminal Case New York Southern District Court, Case No. 1:10-cr-00031
District Judge Sidney H. Stein, presiding
Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
District Judge Sidney H. Stein
Last Updated October 5, 2016 at 11:19 PM EDT (8.6 years ago) Update UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert AlertsSpaceJump Jump
Summary

No one has written a summary of this case yet. Sign up or sign in to contribute one.

Parties
No Logo Igor Levin, Defendant (1)

Represented by Andrew J. Frisch

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 03/28/2011

also known asEric
TERMINATED: 03/28/2011
also known asTiger
TERMINATED: 03/28/2011
also known asTrigger
TERMINATED: 03/28/2011 Andrew J. Frisch +1 212 784 2413 +1 646 304 0352 afrisch@andrewfrisch.com

Represented by Law Offices of Andrew J. Frisch

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, Designation: Retained Andrew J. Frisch +1 212 784 2413 +1 646 304 0352 afrisch@andrewfrisch.com

Note: Criminal cases with multiple defendants may have several records with the same case number: one record for the master file (all defendants), as well as one record per defendant. It can often be difficult to tell which record is which. Other likely matches for this case include:

Attributes
Timeline
  Entries (40) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Sealed Legal Document 121 Filed: 4/18/2014, Entered: None
SEALED DOCUMENT placed in vault. (nm) (Entered: 04/18/2014)
LREF
Sealed Legal Document 120 Filed: 4/18/2014, Entered: None
SEALED DOCUMENT placed in vault. (nm) (Entered: 04/18/2014)
LREF
Sealed Legal Document 116 Filed: 7/9/2013, Entered: None
SEALED DOCUMENT placed in vault. (mps) (Entered: 07/10/2013)
LREF
Sealed Legal Document 106 Filed: 11/23/2011, Entered: None
SEALED DOCUMENT placed in vault. (nm) (Entered: 11/23/2011)
LREF
Sealed Legal Document 94 Filed: 8/24/2011, Entered: None
SEALED DOCUMENT placed in vault. (nm) (Entered: 08/24/2011)
LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 70 Filed: 4/18/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
ENDORSED LETTER as to Igor Levin addressed to Judge Sidney H. Stein from Andrew J. Frisch dated 4/14/11 re: I respectfully submit this letter to ask for Your Honor's assistance with Mr. Levin's designation. At sentencing Your Honor granted my request that Your Honor recommend that Mr. Levin be lodged in the tri-state area. Notwithstanding that recommendation. I have been advised that the Bureau of Prisons (BOP) has designated FCI Beaumont in Texas for Mr. Levin...ENDORSEMENT...Application denied. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Sidney H. Stein on 4/18/11)(jw) (Entered: 04/18/2011)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 69 Filed: 4/18/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
ENDORSED LETTER as to Igor Levin addressed to Judge Sidney H. Stein from Andrew J. Frisch dated 4/14/11 re: I respectfully request that Your Honor reschedule Mr. Levin's surrender date so he can accomplish as many of these procedures as possible before he begins serving his sentence. The government has advised me that it does not consent to this request....ENDORSEMENT...Application denied. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Sidney H. Stein on 4/18/11)(jw) (Entered: 04/18/2011)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 67 Filed: 4/11/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
CONSENT ORDER OF FORFEITURE: As to Igor Levin. For the reasons set forth in this ORDER, IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED, by and between the plaintiff, United States of America, by its attorney Preet Bharara, United States Attorney, Assistant United States Attorney Daniel Goldman, of counsel, and the defendant, and his counsel, Andrew Frisch, Esq. that: As a result of the offense charged in the Information, to which the defendant pled guilty, a money judgment in the amount of $7,000,000 in United States currency shall be entered against the defendant. The Clerk of the Court shall forward three certified copies of this Consent Order of Forfeiture to Assistant United States Attorney Daniel Goldman, United States Attorney's Office, One St. Andrew's Plaza, New York, New York 10007. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Sidney H. Stein on 4/8/2011) The Clerks Office Has Mailed Copies. (dnd) (Entered: 04/11/2011)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 66 Filed: 3/28/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
JUDGMENT In A Criminal Case (S1-10-Cr-31-01). Date of Imposition of Judgment: March 25, 2011. Defendant Igor Levin (1) pleaded guilty to Count(s) 1s (Count One of the Superseding Information). Underlying Indictment is dismissed on the motion of the United States. IMPRISONMENT: 87 MONTHS. The court makes the following recommendations to the Bureau of Prisons: 1. That defendant be incarcerated in the tri state area in order to facilitate visits with his family. The defendant shall surrender for service of sentence at the institution designated by the Bureau of Prisons: before 2 p.m. on April 25, 2011. SUPERVISED RELEASE: THREE YEARS. The defendant will be supervised by the district of his residence. The defendant shall not possess a firearm, ammunition, destructive device, or any other dangerous weapon. The defendant shall cooperate in the collection of DNA as directed by the probation officer. Special Conditions of Supervision (see page 4 of judgment). ASSESSMENT: $100.00, due immediately. RESTITUTION: $7 million, Name of Payee (see page 5 of judgment). Special instructions regarding the payment of criminal monetary penalties (see page 6 of judgment). Joint and Several: Yevgeny Shvartsshteyn - 10Cr.31-02(SHS), Daniel Ledven - 09Cr.666-01(DLC), Alan Fishman - 09Cr.666-02(DLC), Edward Veisman - 09Cr.666-04(DLC). (Signed by Judge Sidney H. Stein on 3/28/2011)(bw) Modified on 11/21/2011 (jar). (dnd). (Entered: 03/29/2011)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 64 Filed: 3/19/2011, Entered: None
SENTENCING MEMORANDUM by USA as to Igor Levin, Yevgeny Shvartsshteyn. (Goldman, Daniel) (Entered: 03/19/2011)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 63 Filed: 3/19/2011, Entered: None
SENTENCING MEMORANDUM by USA as to Igor Levin, Yevgeny Shvartsshteyn. (Goldman, Daniel) (Entered: 03/19/2011)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 61 Filed: 3/16/2011, Entered: None
SENTENCING MEMORANDUM by Igor Levin as to Igor Levin, Yevgeny Shvartsshteyn, William Shternfeld, Benjamin Koifman. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit Exhibit D (1 of 2), # 5 Exhibit Exhibit D (2 of 2), # 6 Exhibit Exhibit E, # 7 Exhibit Exhibit F, # 8 Exhibit Exhibit G, # 9 Exhibit Exhibit H)(Frisch, Andrew) (Entered: 03/16/2011)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 60 Filed: 3/9/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
ENDORSED LETTER as to Igor Levin, Yevgeny Shvartsshteyn, addressed to Judge Stein, from Andrew J. Frisch, atty for dft, dated 3/9/2011, re: request that the Court flip the order of the sentencings so that Mr. Levin goes first at 10:30 a.m. followed by Mr. Shvartsshteyn at 11:30 a.m. -- Judge endorsed: SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Sidney H. Stein on 3/9/2011)(ja) (Entered: 03/10/2011)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 59 Filed: 3/9/2011, Entered: None
FILING ERROR - ELECTRONIC FILING FOR NON-ECF DOCUMENT(LETTER) - MOTION to flip the order of sentencing.. Document filed by Igor Levin as to Igor Levin, Yevgeny Shvartsshteyn, William Shternfeld, Benjamin Koifman. (Frisch, Andrew) Modified on 3/10/2011 (ka). (Entered: 03/09/2011)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 58 Filed: 2/17/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
ENDORSED LETTER as to Igor Levin addressed to Judge Sidney H. Stein from Andrew J. Frisch dated 2/16/11 re: I expect to be able to file my submission on Monday, February 21, 2011. Because Monday is a hoilday, I will have my papers hand-delivered to Your Honor on Tuesday. The prosecutor in this case, Daniel Goldman, has advised me that he will be able to submit any response he may make to my submission by Wednesday, February 23, 2011. I expect my submission to address issues including the Section 3553 sentencing factors, disparity with others prosecuted in this case and consequences of sentence arising from Mr. Levin's non-citizen status. I do not expect my submission to raise any especially complicated issue...ENDORSEMENT..SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Sidney H. Stein on 2/17/11)(jw) (Entered: 02/17/2011)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 54 Filed: 1/24/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER ACCEPTING THE PLEA ALLOCUTION BEFORE A US MAGISTRATE as to Igor Levin. It is hereby ORDERED that the defendant's guilty plea is acceptable to the Court. The Clerk of Court is directed to enter the plea. (Signed by Judge Sidney H. Stein on 1/24/11)(jw) (Entered: 01/24/2011)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 53 Filed: 1/19/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings as to Igor Levin, Yevgeny Shvartsshteyn held on 12/1/2010 before Magistrate Judge Ronald L. Ellis. (mbe) (Entered: 01/20/2011)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Sealed Legal Document 38 Filed: 12/14/2010, Entered: None
SEALED DOCUMENT placed in vault. (nm) Modified on 12/20/2010 (nm). (Entered: 12/20/2010)
LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 12/1/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
CONSENT TO PROCEED BEFORE US MAGISTRATE JUDGE ON A FELONY PLEA ALLOCUTION by (S1-10-Cr-31-01) Igor Levin. (Accepted by Magistrate Judge Ronald L. Ellis on 12/1/2010) (bw) (Entered: 12/03/2010)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 12/1/2010, Entered: None
WAIVER OF INDICTMENT (on S1) by Igor Levin. (bw) (Entered: 12/03/2010)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 12/1/2010, Entered: None
(S1) SUPERSEDING INFORMATION (Felony) filed as to Igor Levin (1) count(s) 1s, Yevgeny Shvartsshteyn (2) count(s) 1s. (bw) (Entered: 12/03/2010)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 11/23/2010, Entered: None
NOTICE of Change of Address as to Igor Levin. New Address: Law Offices of Andrew J. Frisch, 950 Third Avenue, 15th Floor, New York, New York, United States 10022, 212-784-2413. (Frisch, Andrew) (Entered: 11/23/2010)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 7/28/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
ENDORSED LETTER as to Igor Levin, Yevgeny Shvartsshteyn, addressed to Judge Stein, from Daniel S. Goldman, AUSA, dated 7/28/2010, re: request that the pretrial conference currently scheduled for 7/29/2010, be adjourned for approximately 60 days and that the time between today and the next conference be excluded from calculations under the Speedy Trial Act.... -- Judge endorsed: Request denied. This letter is essentially identical to the May 25 letter. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Sidney H. Stein on 7/28/2010)(ja) (Entered: 07/28/2010)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 7/14/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
ENDORSED LETTER as to Igor Levin addressed to Judge Sidney H. Stein from Andrew J. Frisch dated 7/13/2010 re: Counsel writes to request that the conditions of Mr. Levin's pretrial release be modified by removing him from electronic monitoring and the curfew. ENDORSED: Application Granted. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Sidney H. Stein on 7/14/2010)(ab) (Entered: 07/14/2010)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 7/13/2010, Entered: None
FILING ERROR - ELECTRONIC FILING FOR NON-ECF DOCUMENT(LETTER) - MOTION to Modify Conditions of Release. Document filed by Igor Levin. (Frisch, Andrew) Modified on 7/14/2010 (KA). (Entered: 07/13/2010)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 5/26/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
ENDORSED LETTER as to Igor Levin, Yevgeny Shvartsshteyn, addressed to Judge Stein, from Daniel S. Goldman, AUSA, dated 5/25/2010, re: on consent of defense counsel, request that the PTC currently scheduled for Friday, May 27, 2010 be adjourned for approx. 60 days to a date and time convenient to the Court and that the time between today and the next conference - the Gov't is currently considering whether to seek a superseding indictment that would add new charges and/or dfts. -- Judge endorsed: T/E from today until 7/29/2010 pursuant to 18 USC Sec. 3161.... SO ORDERED. ( Pretrial Conference set for 7/29/2010 at 04:00 PM before Judge Sidney H. Stein.) (Signed by Judge Sidney H. Stein on 5/26/2010)(ja) (Entered: 05/26/2010)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 4/22/2010, Entered: None
NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE Daniel Sachs Goldman appearing for USA. (Goldman, Daniel) (Entered: 04/22/2010)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 4/6/2010, Entered: None
NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE Jonathan Brian New appearing for USA. (New, Jonathan) (Entered: 04/06/2010)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 4/5/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
MEMO ENDORSEMENT as to Igor Levin. re: Defense counsel writes seeking to modify the conditions of Mr. Levin's release by eliminating the condition of full-time home confinement and replacing it with a daily curfew of 10:00 p.m. to 6:00 a.m. to be enforced by electronic monitoring. With the consent of the government, Mr. Levin requests that the Court so modify the conditions of his pretrial release. ENDORSEMENT: SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Sidney H. Stein on 4/5/2010)(dnd) (Entered: 04/05/2010)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 4/5/2010, Entered: None
FILING ERROR - ELECTRONIC FILING FOR NON-ECF DOCUMENT (LETTER) - MOTION to Modify Conditions of Release on consent. Document filed by Igor Levin. (Frisch, Andrew) Modified on 4/6/2010 (jar). (Entered: 04/05/2010)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 3/31/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
ENDORSED LETTER: As to Igor Levin, Yevgeny Shvartsshteyn, addressed to Judge Sidney H. Stein from Jonathan A. New dated 3/30/2010 re: The Government respectfully submits this letter, on consent, to request that the pretrial conference in the above referenced matter currently scheduled for Friday, April 2, 2010 be adjourned for approximately 45 days, to a date and time convenient to the Court, and that the time between today and the next conference be excluded from calculations under the Speedy Trial Act. ENDORSEMENT: The conference is adjourned to May 28, 2010 at 3:00 p.m. The time is excluded from today to May 28, 2010. The Court finds that the ends of justice served by this continuance outweigh the best interests of the public and the defendant in a speedy trial pursuant to 18 U.S.C. § 3161(h)(7)(A). SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Sidney H. Stein on 3/31/2010)(dnd) (Entered: 03/31/2010)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 3/24/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
ENDORSED LETTER as to Igor Levin addressed to Judge Stein from Attorney Andrew J. Frisch dated March 23, 2010 re: submitted to request that Mr. Igor Levin's travel restrictions be modified to allow him to visit his brother's home in Manalapan, New Jersey, on March 30, 2010, from 10:00 a.m. to 8:00 p.m. ENDORSEMENT: So Ordered. (Signed by Judge Sidney H. Stein on 3/24/2010)(bw) (Entered: 03/24/2010)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 3/23/2010, Entered: None
FILING ERROR - ELECTRONIC FILING FOR NON-ECF DOCUMENT(LETTER) - MOTION to Modify Conditions of Release to Permit Travel on March 30, 2010. Document filed by Igor Levin. (Frisch, Andrew) (Entered: 03/23/2010)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 2/1/2010, Entered: None
NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Andrew James Frisch appearing for Igor Levin. (Frisch, Andrew) (Entered: 02/01/2010)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 1/19/2010, Entered: None
AGREEMENT TO FORFEIT PROPERTY TO OBTAIN A DEFENDANT'S RELEASE by Igor Levin; property at 3130 Brighton 6th Avenue, Apt. 3D, Brooklyn, NY 11235. (ja) (Entered: 01/28/2010)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 1/20/2010, Entered: None
ADVICE OF PENALTIES AND SANCTIONS as to Igor Levin. Dft released. (ja) (Entered: 01/28/2010)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 1/20/2010, Entered: None
Appearance Bond Entered as to Igor Levin in the amount of $1,000,000 PRB, cosigned by 3 FRPs and secured by $20,000 cash and $500,000 property; travel restricted to SNDY/EDNY; surrender travel documents and no new applications; strict pretrial supervision; drug testing/treatment; home detention with electronic monitoring; dft released when all conditions are met; dft is to provide documents related to trip to Israel; and Consular notification not made because USSR is not in existence. (ja) (Entered: 01/28/2010)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 1/19/2010, Entered: None
AGREEMENT TO FORFEIT PROPERTY TO OBTAIN A DEFENDANT'S RELEASE by Igor Levin; property at 9 Turtle Hollow Drive, Manalapan, NJ 07726. (ja) Modified on 1/28/2010 (ja). (Entered: 01/28/2010)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 1/14/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
Order to Unseal Indictment as to Sealed Defendant 1, Sealed Defendant 2.. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Frank Maas on 1/14/10)(jm) (Entered: 01/19/2010)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Sealed Legal Document 1 Filed: 1/13/2010, Entered: None
SEALED INDICTMENT as to Sealed Defendant 1 (1) count(s) 1, 2, 3, 4, Sealed Defendant 2 (2) count(s) 1, 2, 3, 4. (jm) (Entered: 01/19/2010)
LREF

Statistics

This case has been viewed 814 times.

Space
Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
 
PlainSite
Sign Up
Need Password Help?