Roe 1 et al v. Anderson et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit Washington Western District Court, Case No. 3:14-cv-05810
District Judge Ronald B. Leighton, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated August 1, 2017 at 7:03 PM DT (3.8 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Dreamgirls at Fox's LLC, Plaintiff
No Logo Dreamgirls of Tacoma LLC, Plaintiff
No Logo Jane Roe 1, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Attorney Gilbert H. Levy

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Gilbert Henry Levy +1 206 443 0670 +1 206 448 2252 courts@glevylawyer.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Ultimo Law Firm, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jennifer Kaplan +1 206 443 0670 jenn.kaplan@yahoo.com
No Logo Jane Roe 2, Plaintiff
v.
No Logo David Van Vleet, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by David Van Vleet

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space David Van Vleet
No Logo Julie Anderson, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by PIERCE COUNTY PROSECUTING ATTORNEY'S OFFICE (CIVIL)

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Daniel R. Hamilton +1 253 798 7746 +1 253 798 6713 dhamilt@co.pierce.wa.us
Space Cort O'Connor +1 253 798 6201 coconno@co.pierce.wa.us
No Logo Pierce County, Defendant
Citation Section 28 U.S.C. § 1331
Nature of Suit 440 - Civil Rights: Other
  Entries (51) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 51 Filed: 8/11/2015, Entered: None
JUDGMENT BY COURT (mailed) (JAB) (Entered: 08/11/2015)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 8/10/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
    ORDER granting 33 Motion to Certify Class; signed by Judge Ronald B. Leighton.(DN) Modified on 8/10/2015 (DN). (cc to Van Vleet) (Entered: 08/10/2015)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Blank 49 Filed: 8/10/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
      ORDER granting 38 Plaintiffs' Motion for Summary Judgment; this matter is DISMISSED; signed by Judge Ronald B. Leighton.(DN) Modified on 8/10/2015 (DN). (cc to Van Vleet) (Entered: 08/10/2015)
        LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 2/12/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
        ORDER granting 45 Motion To File Amicus Curiae Brief by Judge Ronald B. Leighton.(JAB) (Main Document 48 replaced on 2/12/2015) (JAB). (Entered: 02/12/2015)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 2/5/2015, Entered: None
          REPLY, filed by Plaintiff Dreamgirls of Tacoma LLC, TO RESPONSE to 45 MOTION File Amicus Curiae Brief of the Attorney General of Washington (Levy, Gilbert) (Entered: 02/05/2015)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 2/4/2015, Entered: None
            RESPONSE, by Plaintiffs Dreamgirls of Tacoma LLC, Jane Roe 1, Jane Roe 2, to 45 MOTION File Amicus Curiae Brief of the Attorney General of Washington. (Levy, Gilbert) Modified on 2/5/2015 (MET). (Entered: 02/04/2015)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 1/29/2015, Entered: None
              MOTION File Amicus Curiae Brief of the Attorney General of Washington by Amicus Attorney General Washington. Noting Date 2/13/2015, (Copsey, Alan) (Entered: 01/29/2015)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 1/13/2015, Entered: None
                NOTICE that the following is RE-NOTED: 38 MOTION for Summary Judgment . Filed by Plaintiff Dreamgirls of Tacoma LLC. Noting Date 3/13/2015, (Levy, Gilbert) (Entered: 01/13/2015)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 1/13/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                  ORDER granting 42 Plaintiffs' Motion to renote Motion for Summary Judgment; 38 MOTION for Summary Judgment is renoted for 3/13/2015; signed by Judge Ronald B. Leighton.(DN) Modified on 1/13/2015 (DN). (cc to Van Vleet) (Entered: 01/13/2015)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 1/12/2015, Entered: None
                    MOTION FOR LEAVE TO RE-NOTE SUMMARY JUDGMENT MOTION re 38 MOTION for Summary Judgment by Plaintiff Dreamgirls of Tacoma LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order) Noting Date 2/6/2015, (Levy, Gilbert) (Entered: 01/12/2015)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 1/12/2015, Entered: None
                      NOTICE OF CONSTITUTIONAL QUESTION re 38 MOTION for Summary Judgment ; filed by Plaintiff Dreamgirls of Tacoma LLC. (Levy, Gilbert) (Entered: 01/12/2015)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 1/7/2015, Entered: None
                        PROPOSED ORDER (Unsigned) Granting Permanent Injunction (Levy, Gilbert) (Entered: 01/07/2015)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 1/7/2015, Entered: None
                          DECLARATION of Gilbert H. Levy in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for Summary Judgment filed by Plaintiff Dreamgirls of Tacoma LLC re 38 MOTION for Summary Judgment (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit s 1 - 10)(Levy, Gilbert) (Entered: 01/07/2015)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 1/7/2015, Entered: None
                            MOTION for Summary Judgment by Plaintiff Dreamgirls of Tacoma LLC. Oral Argument Requested. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order) Noting Date 2/6/2015, (Levy, Gilbert) (Entered: 01/07/2015)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 11/25/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                              MINUTE ORDER STRIKING as moot 34 MOTION Anonymous Telephonic Testimony filed by Jane Roe 2, Jane Roe 1, Dreamgirls of Tacoma LLC. s/Jean Boring as authorized by Judge Ronald B. Leighton. (MAILED)(JAB) (Entered: 11/25/2014)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 11/25/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                MINUTE ORDER SETTING DEADLINES: At the direction of the Court, the clerk enters the following schedule: Dispositive motion(s) shall be filed not later than 1/9/2015. The motion(s) shall be noted on the motion docket for 2/6/2014 in accord with Local Rule 7 (LCR 7). Any opposition papers shall be filed and served not later than the Monday before the noting date. If service is by mail, the opposition papers shall be mailed not later than the Friday preceding the noting date. Any reply papers shall be filed and served no later than the noting date. s/ Jean Boring as directed by Judge Ronald B. Leighton. (JAB) Modified on 11/25/2014 (JAB). (MAILED) (Entered: 11/25/2014)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 11/24/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                  NOTICE of Stricken In Court Hearing on 12/15/2014. s/Jean Boring as directed by Judge Ronald B. Leighton. (Mailed) (JAB) (Entered: 11/24/2014)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 11/20/2014, Entered: None
                                    MOTION Anonymous Telephonic Testimony by Plaintiffs Dreamgirls of Tacoma LLC, Jane Roe 1, Jane Roe 2. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit, # 2 Proposed Order) Noting Date 12/12/2014, (Levy, Gilbert) (Entered: 11/20/2014)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 11/14/2014, Entered: None
                                      MOTION to Certify Class by Plaintiffs Dreamgirls of Tacoma LLC, Jane Roe 1, Jane Roe 2. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit, # 2 Proposed Order) Noting Date 12/12/2014, (Levy, Gilbert) (Entered: 11/14/2014)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 11/6/2014, Entered: None
                                        ANSWER to 21 Amended Complaint with JURY DEMAND by Julie Anderson, Pierce County.(Hamilton, Daniel) (Entered: 11/06/2014)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 11/4/2014, Entered: None
                                          CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Plaintiff Dreamgirls of Tacoma LLC re 1 Complaint, (Levy, Gilbert) (Entered: 11/04/2014)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 11/4/2014, Entered: None
                                            CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Plaintiff Dreamgirls of Tacoma LLC re 5 Declaration, 15 Declaration, 2 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and Order to Show Cause, 4 Declaration, 3 Declaration, 14 Praecipe to Attach Document, 9 Corporate Disclosure Statement, 1 Complaint, 6 Declaration, 13 Praecipe to Attach Document, 8 Declaration (Levy, Gilbert) (Entered: 11/04/2014)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 11/4/2014, Entered: None
                                              CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Plaintiff Dreamgirls of Tacoma LLC re 5 Declaration, 15 Declaration, 2 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and Order to Show Cause, 4 Declaration, 3 Declaration, 7 Declaration, 14 Praecipe to Attach Document, 9 Corporate Disclosure Statement, 1 Complaint, 6 Declaration, 13 Praecipe to Attach Document, 8 Declaration (Levy, Gilbert) (Entered: 11/04/2014)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 10/23/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                NOTICE of Hearing: In-court Hearing set for 12/15/2014 at 09:00 AM in B Courtroom before Judge Ronald B. Leighton.(JAB) (Entered: 10/27/2014)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 10/23/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                  MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Judge Ronald B. Leighton- Dep Clerk: Jean Boring; Pla Counsel: Jennifer Kaplan; Def Counsel: Cort O'Connor, Dan Hamilton; David Van Vleet (pro se) CR: Teri Hendrix; Preliminary Injunction Hearing held on 10/23/2014. Oral argument conducted. For the reasons orally stated, on the record, the Court issues the preliminary injuction. Order signed. Hearing concluded. (JAB) (Entered: 10/23/2014)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document 26 Filed: 10/23/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                    ORDER/FINDINGS ON PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION by Judge Ronald B. Leighton. (JAB) (Entered: 10/23/2014)
                                                      LREF
                                                      Blank 25 Filed: 10/22/2014, Entered: None
                                                      DECLARATION of Jane Doe filed by Plaintiffs Dreamgirls of Tacoma LLC, Jane Roe 1, Jane Roe 2 re 2 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and Order to Show Cause (Levy, Gilbert) (Entered: 10/22/2014)
                                                        LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 10/22/2014, Entered: None
                                                        NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Daniel R. Hamilton on behalf of Defendants Julie Anderson, Pierce County. (Hamilton, Daniel) (Entered: 10/22/2014)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 10/21/2014, Entered: None
                                                          Proposed Findings of Fact by Plaintiff DREAMGIRLS OF TACOMA LLC (Levy, Gilbert) (Entered: 10/21/2014)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 10/21/2014, Entered: None
                                                            NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Daniel R. Hamilton on behalf of Defendants Julie Anderson, Pierce County. (Hamilton, Daniel) (Entered: 10/21/2014)
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 10/21/2014, Entered: None
                                                              AMENDED COMPLAINT FOR INJUNCTIVE AND DECLARATORY RELIEF against defendant(s) All Defendants Attorney Gilbert Henry Levy added to party DREAMGIRLS OF TACOMA LLC(pty:pla), filed by DREAMGIRLS OF TACOMA LLC.(Levy, Gilbert) (Entered: 10/21/2014)
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 10/21/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                MINUTE ORDER: In the unlikely event the Court allows testimony, the Plaintiff's will be allowed to testify telephonically and anonymously. s/Jean Boring as directed by Judge Ronald B. Leighton. 17 (JAB) (Entered: 10/21/2014)
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 10/20/2014, Entered: None
                                                                  Proposed Findings of Fact by Plaintiff Dreamgirls at Fox's LLC (Levy, Gilbert) (Entered: 10/20/2014)
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 10/20/2014, Entered: None
                                                                    MEMORANDUM re 16 Order on Motion for TRO, Set/Reset Hearings Preliminary Injunction Hearing Memorandum by Plaintiff Dreamgirls at Fox's LLC (Attachments: # 1 Supplement Declaration)(Levy, Gilbert) (Entered: 10/20/2014)
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 10/14/2014, Entered: None
                                                                      PRAECIPE to attach document Declaration of Mary Margaret Kelly re 7 Declaration by Plaintiffs Dreamgirls at Fox's LLC, Jane Roe 1, Jane Roe 2 (Levy, Gilbert) (Entered: 10/14/2014)
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 10/20/2014, Entered: None
                                                                        MOTION to Allow Plaintiff's to Testify Telephonically and Anonymously re 16 Order on Motion for TRO, Set/Reset Hearings by Plaintiff Dreamgirls at Fox's LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit, # 2 Proposed Order) Noting Date 11/7/2014, (Levy, Gilbert) (Entered: 10/20/2014)
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 10/14/2014, Entered: None
                                                                          PRAECIPE to attach document Declaration of Jeff Walker re 8 Declaration by Plaintiffs Dreamgirls at Fox's LLC, Jane Roe 1, Jane Roe 2 (Levy, Gilbert) (Entered: 10/14/2014)
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Blank 16 Filed: 10/15/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                            ORDER granting 2 Motion for Temporary TRO; Preliminary/Permanent Injunction Hearing set for 10/23/2014 at 09:30 AM in B Courtroom before Judge Ronald B. Leighton; signed by Judge Ronald B. Leighton.(DN) (Entered: 10/15/2014)
                                                                              LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 10/14/2014, Entered: None
                                                                              Summons Issued Electronically as to defendant David Van Vleet. (GMR) (Entered: 10/14/2014)
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 10/14/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                Summons Issued Electronically as to defendant Pierce County. (GMR) (Entered: 10/14/2014)
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Blank 15 Filed: 10/14/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                  Supplemental DECLARATION of Gilbert H. Levy filed by Plaintiffs Dreamgirls at Fox's LLC, Jane Roe 1, Jane Roe 2 re 2 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and Order to Show Cause (Levy, Gilbert) (Entered: 10/14/2014)
                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 10/14/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                    Summons Issued Electronically as to defendant Julie Anderson. (GMR) Modified on 10/14/2014 - typo (GMR). (Entered: 10/14/2014)
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 10/14/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                      CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by Dreamgirls at Fox's LLC, Jane Roe 1, Jane Roe 2 (Levy, Gilbert) (Entered: 10/14/2014)
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 10/14/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                        DECLARATION of Jeff Walker filed by Plaintiffs Dreamgirls at Fox's LLC, Jane Roe 1, Jane Roe 2 re 2 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and Order to Show Cause (Levy, Gilbert) (Entered: 10/14/2014)
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Blank 7 Filed: 10/14/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                          DECLARATION of Mary Margaret Kelly filed by Plaintiffs Dreamgirls at Fox's LLC, Jane Roe 1, Jane Roe 2 re 2 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and Order to Show Cause (Levy, Gilbert) (Entered: 10/14/2014)
                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 10/14/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                            DECLARATION of Jane Roe 3 filed by Plaintiffs Dreamgirls at Fox's LLC, Jane Roe 1, Jane Roe 2 re 2 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and Order to Show Cause (Levy, Gilbert) (Entered: 10/14/2014)
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 10/14/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                              DECLARATION of Jane Roe 2 filed by Plaintiffs Dreamgirls at Fox's LLC, Jane Roe 1, Jane Roe 2 re 2 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and Order to Show Cause (Levy, Gilbert) (Entered: 10/14/2014)
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 10/14/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                DECLARATION of Jane Roe 1 filed by Plaintiffs Dreamgirls at Fox's LLC, Jane Roe 1, Jane Roe 2 re 2 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and Order to Show Cause (Levy, Gilbert) (Entered: 10/14/2014)
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 10/14/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                  DECLARATION of Gilbert H. Levy filed by Plaintiffs Dreamgirls at Fox's LLC, Jane Roe 1, Jane Roe 2 re 2 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and Order to Show Cause (Levy, Gilbert) (Entered: 10/14/2014)
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 10/14/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                    MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and Order to Show Cause by Plaintiffs Dreamgirls at Fox's LLC, Jane Roe 1, Jane Roe 2. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order) Noting Date 10/15/2014, (Levy, Gilbert) (Entered: 10/14/2014)
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                      Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                      Blank 1 Filed: 10/14/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                      COMPLAINT Class Action for injunctive and declaratory relief against defendant(s) Julie Anderson, Pierce County, David Van Vleet, (Receipt # 0981-3772071) filed by Jane Roe 1, Jane Roe 2, and Dreamgirls at Fox's LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons, # 3 Summons, # 4 Summons)(Levy, Gilbert) Modified on 10/14/2014 to remove duplicative text/languageand add language re class action allegation- NEF regenerated (GMR). (Entered: 10/14/2014)
                                                                                                      LREF

                                                                                                      Statistics

                                                                                                      This case has been viewed 303 times.

                                                                                                      No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                      Space
                                                                                                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                       
                                                                                                      PlainSite
                                                                                                      Sign Up
                                                                                                      Need Password Help?