Marshall et al v. ESPN Inc. et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit Tennessee Middle District Court, Case No. 3:14-cv-01945
District Judge Kevin H. Sharp, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated December 31, 2016 at 6:29 AM EST (5.1 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts
No Logo Byron Moore, Plaintiff
No Logo Chaz Moore, Plaintiff
No Logo Chris Conner, Plaintiff
No Logo Eric Samuels, Plaintiff
No Logo Javon Marshall, Plaintiff

Represented by Bone, McAllester & Norton, PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED John Parker Branham +1 615 238 6300 +1 615 238 6301 jbranham@bonelaw.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Stephen J. Zralek +1 615 238 6300 +1 615 238 6301 szralek@bonelaw.com

Represented by Law Offices of Patrick D. McMurtray

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Patrick D. McMurtray +1 615 713 2288 +1 866 274 5384 patrick@mcmurtraylaw.com

Represented by Pettit & Damron

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Richard Manson +1 615 254 1600 richardmanson@comcast.net

Represented by Suite 300

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Ronald A. Stewart +1 615 600 4614 +1 615 891 2395 rstewart@stewartjohnsonlaw.com
No Logo Marlon Walls, Plaintiff
No Logo Patrick Miller, Plaintiff
No Logo Rod Wilks, Plaintiff
No Logo Sean Parker, Plaintiff
No Logo Steven Clarke, Plaintiff
v.
No Logo ABC, Inc., Defendant
Officer/Director, DC Holdco, Inc.
Officer/Director, ABC Radio Holdings, Inc.
Disney Enterprises, Inc. Officer/Director, Disney Enterprises, Inc.
Officer/Director, A.b.c. Enterprises, Inc.
Officer/Director, ABC Holding CO Inc.

Represented by Levine Sullivan Koch & Schulz, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Nathan E Siegel +1 202 508 1184 +1 202 861 9888 nsiegel@lskslaw.com
No Logo ATLANTIC COAST CONFERENCE, Defendant

Represented by Harwell Howard Hyne Gabbert & Manner, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED David Alexander Fardon +1 615 256 0500 daf@h3gm.com

Represented by Smith Moore LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED David Erik Albright +1 336 378 5368 +1 336 433 7402 erik.albright@smithmoorelaw.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jonathan P Heyl +1 704 384 2625 +1 704 384 2600 jon.heyl@smithmoorelaw.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Greg G. Holland +1 336 378 5200 +1 336 378 5400 greg.holland@smithmoorelaw.com
No Logo Big 12 Conference, Defendant

Represented by Brett C. Randol

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Brett C. Randol

Represented by Leitner Williams Dooley & Napolitan PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Reid D Leitner +1 615 255 7722 reid.leitner@leitnerfirm.com

Represented by Leitner, Williams, Dooley, and Napolitan (Nashville)

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED J. Gregory Grisham +1 615 780 2210 greg.grisham@leitnerfirm.com

Represented by Polsinelli Shughart, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Leane Kathleen Capps +1 214 397 0030 lcapps@polsinelli.cm
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Amy D. Fitts +1 816 218 1255 afitts@polsinelli.com
No Logo Big East Conference, Defendant
No Logo Big Ten Conference, Defendant

Represented by Mayer Brown, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Richard Joseph Favretto +1 202 263 3250 +1 202 263 5250 rfavretto@mayerbrown.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Britt M. Miller - NOT SWORN +1 312 782 0600 +1 312 706 8763 bmiller@mayerbrown.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Andrew S. Rosenman +1 312 782 0600 arosenman@mayerbrown.com

Represented by Shackelford Melton McKinley & Norton LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jay Scott Bowen +1 615 329 4440 jbowen@shackelfordlaw.net
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED William V. Parsons, III +1 615 329 4440 +1 615 329 4485 wparsons@shackelfordlaw.net
No Logo Big Ten Network Services, LLC, Defendant
CBS Broadcasting, Inc. CBS Broadcasting, Inc., Defendant

Represented by Bass Berry & Sims, PLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED R. Dale Grimes , +1 615 742 6200 +1 615 742 2744 dgrimes@bassberry.com

Represented by Weil Gotshal & Manges LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Yehudah Lev Buchweitz +1 212 310 8000 +1 212 310 8007 yehudah.buchweitz@weil.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Eric Hochstadt +1 212 310 8000 +1 212 610 8007 eric.hochstadt@weil.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED James W. Quinn +1 212 310 8000 +1 212 833 3148 james.quinn@weil.com
No Logo CBS Collegiate Sports Properties, Inc., Defendant

Represented by Baker Donelson Bearman Caldwell & Berkowitz, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED John S. Hicks +1 615 726 5600 jhicks@bakerdonelson.com

Represented by Gibson Dunn & Crutcher, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Bradley G. Hubbard +1 214 698 3100 +1 214 571 2900 bhubbard@gibsondunn.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED BRIAN E. ROBISON +1 214 698 3370 +1 214 999 7770 BRobison@gibsondunn.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Robert C Walters +1 214 698 3114 +1 214 571 2900 RWalters@gibsondunn.com
No Logo Conference USA, Defendant
No Logo Espn, Inc., Defendant

Represented by Bradley Arant Boult Cummings LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Joel D. Eckert +1 615 252 2360 +1 615 252 4710 jeckert@babc.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Samuel David Lipshie +1 615 244 2582 slipshie@babc.com

Represented by Cravath, Swaine & Moore, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Stefan Howard Atkinson +1 212 474 1014 +1 212 474 3700 satkinson@cravath.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Roger G. Brooks +1 212 474 1000 +1 212 474 3700 rbrooks@cravath.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Evan Robert Chesler +1 212 474 1000 +1 212 474 3700 echesler@cravath.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Daniel Alexander Richards +1 212 474 1634 +1 212 474 3700 drichards@cravath.com

Represented by Joe Wesley Earnhardt

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Joe Wesley Earnhardt
No Logo Fox Broadcasting Company, Defendant

Represented by Law Offices of Hal Hardin

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Hal Hardin +1 615 369 3377 +1 615 369 3344 halhardin@aol.com

Represented by Williams & Connolly, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Kevin Taylor Baine +1 202 434 5010 +1 202 434 5029 KBaine@wc.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Thomas G Hentoff +1 202 434 5804 +1 202 434 5029 thentoff@wc.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Carl Rowan Metz +1 202 434 5000 cmetz@wc.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED John E. Schmidtlein +1 202 434 5000 +1 202 434 5029 jschmidtlein@wc.com
No Logo Fox Inc., Defendant
No Logo Img College, LLC, Defendant

Represented by David R. Singer

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED David R. Singer

Represented by Jenner & Block, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Kenneth L Doroshow +1 202 639 6027 +1 202 661 4855 kdoroshow@jenner.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Andrew Jackson Thomas +1 213 239 5155 +1 213 239 5165 ajthomas@jenner.com

Represented by Richard L. Stone

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Richard L. Stone

Represented by Sims Funk, PLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED W. Scott Sims +1 615 292 9335 ssims@simsfunk.com
No Logo Img Worldwide, Inc., Defendant
No Logo JMI Sports LLC, Defendant

Represented by Everhart Law Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED TTAB Attorney Placeholder amy@everhartlawfirm.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Maria A. Spear, Amy J. Everhart +1 615 800 8925 +1 615 800 8918 maria@everhartlawfirm.com

Represented by Leopold Petrich & Smith LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Daniel M Mayeda +1 310 277 3333 dmayeda@lpsla.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Louis P Petrich +1 310 277 3333 +1 310 277 7444 lpetrich@lpsla.com
No Logo Learfield Sports, LLC, Defendant

Represented by Fish & Richardson, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED M. Brett Johnson +1 214 747 5070 johnson@fr.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Thomas M Melsheimer +1 214 747 5070 +1 214 747 2091 melsheimer@fr.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Grant Kojis Schmidt +1 214 747 5070 +1 214 747 2091 schmidt@fr.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Thomas Bernard Walsh, IV +1 214 747 5070 +1 214 747 2091 walsh@fr.com

Represented by WISEMAN ASHWORTH LAW GROUP, PLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Gail Vaughn Ashworth +1 615 254 1877 +1 615 254 1878 gail@wisemanashworth.com
No Logo National Broadcasting Company, Inc., Defendant

Represented by Bass Berry & Sims, PLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jeffrey P. Yarbro +1 615 742 7793 jyarbro@bassberry.com

Represented by Davis Polk & Wardwell, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Arthur Joseph Burke +1 212 450 4352 +1 212 701 5352 arthur.burke@davispolk.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED James William Haldin +1 212 450 4059 +1 212 450 3059 james.haldin@dpw.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Dana Meredith Seshens +1 212 450 4855 +1 212 450 3855 dana.seshens@dpw.com

Represented by Kelli L. Sager

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Kelli L. Sager
No Logo Ohio Valley Conference, Defendant

Represented by Dodson, Parker, Behm & Capparella, P.C.

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Margaret Louise Behm +1 615 254 2291 +1 615 726 2241 behm@dodsonparker.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Tyler C. Yarbro +1 615 254 2291 +1 615 726 2241 tyarbro@dodsonparker.com
No Logo Pacific-12 Conference, Defendant

Represented by Proskauer Rose LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Scott P. Cooper +1 310 557 2900 +1 310 557 2193 scooper@proskauer.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jennifer Lindsay Jones +1 212 969 3704 +1 212 969 2900 jljones@proskauer.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Sarah Kroll-Rosenbaum +1 310 284 5685 skroll-rosenbaum@proskauer.com

Represented by Riley Warnock & Jacobson PLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED James N. Bowen +1 615 320 3700 jimbowen@rwjplc.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED John R. Jacobson jjacobson@rwjplc.com
No Logo SOUTHEASTERN CONFERENCE, Defendant

Represented by Neal & Harwell

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Aubrey B. Harwell, Jr. +1 615 244 1713 +1 615 726 0573 aharwell@nealharwell.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED James Isaac Sanders +1 615 244 1713 +1 615 726 0573 isanders@nealharwell.com

Represented by Robinson, Bradshaw & Hinson, PA

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Robert Walker Fuller, III +1 704 377 8324 +1 704 373 3924 rfuller@rbh.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Mark William Merritt +1 704 377 8337 +1 704 373 3937 mmerritt@rbh.com
No Logo Southeatern Conference, Defendant
No Logo T3media, Inc., Defendant

Represented by Waller Lanseden Dortch & Davis LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Todd R Hambidge +1 615 244 6380 todd.hambidge@wallerlaw.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Robb S Harvey +1 615 244 6380 +1 615 244 6804 robb.harvey@wallerlaw.com
No Logo Telesouth Communications, Inc., Defendant

Represented by Baker Donelson Bearman Caldwell & Berkowitz, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Samuel D. Gregory +1 601 969 4656 +1 601 714 9956 sdgregory@bakerdonelson.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Walker W. Jones, III +1 601 351 2400 wjones@bakerdonelson.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED W. Scott Welch, III +1 601 351 2440 +1 601 592 2440 swelch@bakerdonelson.com
No Logo William Morris Endeavors, LLC, Defendant
Citation Section 28 U.S.C. § 1331
Nature of Suit 410 - Anti-Trust
  Entries (378) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 289 Filed: 7/1/2015, Entered: None
NOTICE of Filing by Steven Clarke, Chris Conner, Javon Marshall, Patrick Miller, Byron Moore, Chaz Moore, Sean Parker, Eric Samuels, Marlon Walls, Rod Wilks Notice of Appeal (Zralek, Stephen) (Entered: 07/01/2015)
    LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 288 Filed: 6/8/2015, Entered: None Memorandum Opinion of the Court
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Blank 288
        LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 287 Filed: 6/8/2015, Entered: None Order
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Blank 287
            LREF
            Blank 286 Filed: 6/4/2015, Entered: None
            Entry of Judgment re 285 Order. (hb) (Entered: 06/04/2015)
              LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 285 Filed: 6/4/2015, Entered: None Order Dismissing Case
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 284 Filed: 6/4/2015, Entered: None Memorandum Opinion of the Court
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 283 Filed: 5/4/2015, Entered: None
                  NOTICE by Steven Clarke, Chris Conner, Javon Marshall, Patrick Miller, Byron Moore, Chaz Moore, Sean Parker, Eric Samuels, Marlon Walls, Rod Wilks re 279 Notice (Other),, Plaintiffs' Response to Defendants' Notice of Filing Supplemental Authority (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibit A: Ray v. ESPN Complaint)(Zralek, Stephen) (Entered: 05/04/2015)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Blank 282 Filed: 4/29/2015, Entered: None
                    NOTICE by Ohio Valley Conference Notice of Withdrawal of Margaret L. Behm and Tyler C. Yarbro as Counsel (Box, Bradford) (Entered: 04/29/2015)
                      LREF
                      Blank 281 Filed: 4/29/2015, Entered: None
                      NOTICE of Appearance by Bradford David Box on behalf of Ohio Valley Conference (Box, Bradford) (Entered: 04/29/2015)
                        LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 280 Filed: 4/28/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                        Motion Hearing Transcript filed for date of April 13, 2015, before Judge Kevin Sharp. Court Reporter: Wynette Blathers, 615-401-7221, wynette_blathers@tnmd.uscourts.gov. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. IT IS THE RESPONSIBILITY OF COUNSEL TO REVIEW THE TRANSCRIPT AND REQUEST REDACTION OF CONTENT CLASSIFIED AS PRIVATE UNDER THE NOTICE TO MEMBERS OF THE BAR, ELECTRONIC AVAILABILITY OF TRANSCRIPTS OF COURT PROCEEDINGS, EFFECTIVE MAY 5, 2008, AVAILABLE ON THE COURT'S WEBSITE UNDER THE CM-ECF LINK at: http://www.tnmd.uscourts.gov/files/20091201Notice_to_the_Bar_Transcripts.pdf. Intent to Request Transcript Redaction due 5/5/2015. Redaction Request due 5/19/2015. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 5/29/2015. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 7/27/2015. (wb) (Entered: 04/28/2015)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Blank 279 Filed: 4/23/2015, Entered: None
                          NOTICE of Filing by ABC, Inc., Big Ten Network Services, LLC, CBS Broadcasting, Inc., ESPN Inc., Fox Broadcasting Company, National Broadcasting Company, Inc. re 214 Joint MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim , 220 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim , 218 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint (Notice of Filing Supplemental Authority in Further Support of Defendants' Motion to Dismiss Complaint) (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 - Ray v. ESPN, Inc., # 2 Exhibit 2 - Maloney v. T3Media, Inc.)(Lipshie, Samuel) (Entered: 04/23/2015)
                            LREF
                            Blank 278 Filed: 4/20/2015, Entered: None
                            NOTICE by Big 12 Conference Notice of Withdrawal of Brett C. Randol as Counsel (Leitner, Reid) (Entered: 04/20/2015)
                              LREF
                              Blank 277 Filed: 4/20/2015, Entered: None
                              NOTICE by Conference USA Notice of Withdrawal of Brett C. Randol as Counsel (Leitner, Reid) (Entered: 04/20/2015)
                                LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 276 Filed: 4/10/2015, Entered: None Order on Motion for Leave
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Blank 276
                                    LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 275 Filed: 4/9/2015, Entered: None Leave
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 275
                                        Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 274 Filed: 3/16/2015, Entered: None Appear Pro Hac Vice
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Blank 274
                                            LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 273 Filed: 3/13/2015, Entered: None Appear Pro Hac Vice
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 273
                                                Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                Blank 272 Filed: 3/13/2015, Entered: 3/13/2015 Notice of Appearance/
                                                  LREF
                                                  Blank 271 Filed: 3/6/2015, Entered: 3/6/2015 Reply to Response to Motion
                                                    LREF
                                                    Blank 270 Filed: 3/6/2015, Entered: 3/6/2015 ~Notice (other)
                                                      LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 269 Filed: 3/6/2015, Entered: 3/6/2015 Reply to Response to Motion
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 268 Filed: 3/6/2015, Entered: 3/6/2015 Reply to Response to Motion
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 267 Filed: 2/27/2015, Entered: None Appear Pro Hac Vice
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Blank 267
                                                              LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 266 Filed: 2/27/2015, Entered: None Appear Pro Hac Vice
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Blank 266
                                                                  LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 265 Filed: 2/26/2015, Entered: None Appear Pro Hac Vice
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 265
                                                                      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                      Blank 264 Filed: 2/24/2015, Entered: 2/24/2015 Certificate of Good Standing
                                                                        LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 263 Filed: 2/24/2015, Entered: None Appear Pro Hac Vice
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 263
                                                                            Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                            Blank 262 Filed: 2/20/2015, Entered: 2/20/2015 ~Notice (other)
                                                                              LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 261 Filed: 2/18/2015, Entered: 2/18/2015 Transcript
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 260 Filed: 2/13/2015, Entered: 2/13/2015 ~Notice (other)
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Blank 259 Filed: 2/13/2015, Entered: 2/13/2015 Response in Opposition to Motion
                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                    Blank 258 Filed: 2/13/2015, Entered: 2/13/2015 Response in Opposition to Motion
                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 257 Filed: 2/13/2015, Entered: 2/13/2015 Response in Opposition to Motion
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Blank 256 Filed: 2/13/2015, Entered: 2/13/2015 Notice of Appearance/
                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 255 Filed: 2/5/2015, Entered: None Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Blank 255
                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 254 Filed: 1/30/2015, Entered: None Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 254
                                                                                                  Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                  Blank 253 Filed: 1/29/2015, Entered: 1/29/2015 ~Notice (other)
                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 252 Filed: 1/29/2015, Entered: 1/29/2015 Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 251 Filed: 1/29/2015, Entered: 1/29/2015 Order on Motion for Leave
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 250 Filed: 1/28/2015, Entered: None Order on Motion for Leave
                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                          Blank 250
                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 249 Filed: 1/27/2015, Entered: None Leave
                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                              Blank 248 Filed: 1/27/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                              PROPOSED CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER [Initial] filed by All Parties. (Zralek, Stephen) (Entered: 01/27/2015)
                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 247 Filed: 1/13/2015, Entered: None Leave
                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                  Blank 246 Filed: 1/12/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                  NOTICE by CBS Collegiate Sports Properties, Inc. re 231 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction of Withdrawal of Motion to Dismiss (Hicks, John) (Entered: 01/12/2015)
                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                    Blank 245 Filed: 1/12/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                    NOTICE of Resetting Initial Case Management Conference set for 2/5/2015 at 10:30 AM in Courtroom A826 before Chief Judge Kevin H. Sharp. (hb) (Main Document 245 replaced on 1/12/2015) (hb). (Entered: 01/12/2015)
                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 244 Filed: 1/8/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                      NOTICE of Filing by Steven Clarke, Chris Conner, Javon Marshall, Patrick Miller, Byron Moore, Chaz Moore, Sean Parker, Eric Samuels, Marlon Walls, Rod Wilks Case Law in Support of Plaintiffs' Response in Opposition to Defendants' Motion to Stay Discovery (Attachments: # 1 Attachment Alvion Properties v. Weber, # 2 Attachment Cockrill v. Mortgage Elec., # 3 Attachment Benson v. Asurion Corp, # 4 Attachment Collins v. Mortg. Elec., # 5 Attachment Daughter v. Int'l Union 9/15/08, # 6 Attachment Daughtery v. Int'l Union 12/18/08, # 7 Attachment Chapman v. Bell, # 8 Attachment Mofield v. FNX Mining, # 9 Attachment City of Lancaster v. Flagstar, # 10 Attachment Smartvue v. Mistral)(Zralek, Stephen) (Entered: 01/08/2015)
                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                        Blank 243 Filed: 1/8/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                        RESPONSE in Opposition re 224 MOTION to Stay Discovery Pending the Resolution of Defendants' Motion to Dismiss filed by Steven Clarke, Chris Conner, Javon Marshall, Patrick Miller, Byron Moore, Chaz Moore, Sean Parker, Eric Samuels, Marlon Walls, Rod Wilks. (Zralek, Stephen) (Entered: 01/08/2015)
                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 242 Filed: 12/18/2014, Entered: None Order
                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                            Blank 242
                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 241 Filed: 12/17/2014, Entered: None Miscellaneous Relief
                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 241
                                                                                                                                  Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 240 Filed: 12/16/2014, Entered: None Appear Pro Hac ViceCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                  ORDER granting 213 Motion for Thomas B. Walsh to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Chief Judge Kevin H. Sharp on 12/16/14. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(dt) (Entered: 12/17/2014)
                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 240
                                                                                                                                      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 239 Filed: 12/16/2014, Entered: None Appear Pro Hac ViceCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                      ORDER granting 212 Motion for Grant Kojis Schmidt to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Chief Judge Kevin H. Sharp on 12/16/14. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(dt) (Entered: 12/17/2014)
                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 239
                                                                                                                                          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 238 Filed: 12/16/2014, Entered: None Appear Pro Hac ViceCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                          ORDER granting 211 Motion for Thomas M. Melsheimer to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Chief Judge Kevin H. Sharp on 12/16/14. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(dt) (Entered: 12/17/2014)
                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 238
                                                                                                                                              Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 237 Filed: 12/16/2014, Entered: None Appear Pro Hac ViceCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                              ORDER granting 210 Motion for M. Brett Johnson to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Chief Judge Kevin H. Sharp on 12/16/14. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(dt) (Entered: 12/17/2014)
                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 237
                                                                                                                                                  Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 236 Filed: 12/16/2014, Entered: None Appear Pro Hac ViceCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                  ORDER granting 207 Motion for Dana Meredith Seshens to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Chief Judge Kevin H. Sharp on 12/16/14. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(dt) (Entered: 12/17/2014)
                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 236
                                                                                                                                                      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 235 Filed: 12/16/2014, Entered: None Appear Pro Hac ViceCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                      ORDER granting 205 Motion for James Haldin to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Chief Judge Kevin H. Sharp on 12/16/14. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(dt) Modified on 12/17/2014 (dt). (Entered: 12/17/2014)
                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 235
                                                                                                                                                          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 234 Filed: 12/16/2014, Entered: None Appear Pro Hac ViceCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                          ORDER granting 203 Motion for Arthur J. Burke to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Chief Judge Kevin H. Sharp on 12/16/14. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(dt) (Entered: 12/17/2014)
                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 234
                                                                                                                                                              Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 233 Filed: 12/16/2014, Entered: None Appear Pro Hac ViceCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                              ORDER granting 195 Motion for Kelli L. Sager to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Chief Judge Kevin H. Sharp on 12/16/14. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(dt) (Entered: 12/17/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 233
                                                                                                                                                                  Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 232 Filed: 12/10/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                  MEMORANDUM in Support of 231 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by CBS Collegiate Sports Properties, Inc. . (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 - Declaration of Douglas Paschal, # 2 Exhibit 2 - Notice of Filing Case Law in Support of Defendant Outfront Media Sports, Inc.'s Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction)(Walters, Robert) (Entered: 12/10/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 231 Filed: 12/10/2014, Entered: None Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction
                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 231
                                                                                                                                                                        Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 230 Filed: 12/10/2014, Entered: None Miscellaneous Relief
                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 230
                                                                                                                                                                            Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 229 Filed: 12/10/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE of Filing by ABC, Inc., Atlantic Coast Conference, Big 12 Conference, Big East Conference, Big Ten Conference, Big Ten Network Services, LLC, CBS Broadcasting, Inc., CBS Collegiate Sports Properties, Inc., Conference USA, ESPN Inc., Fox Broadcasting Company, IMG College, LLC, IMG Worldwide, Inc., JMI Sports LLC, Learfield Sports LLC, National Broadcasting Company, Inc., Ohio Valley Conference, Pacific-12 Conference, Southeastern Conference, T3 Media, Inc., Telesouth Communications, Inc., William Morris Endeavors, LLC re 224 MOTION to Stay Discovery Pending the Resolution of Defendants' Motion to Dismiss (Lipshie, Samuel) (Entered: 12/10/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 228 Filed: 12/10/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE of Filing by ABC, Inc., Atlantic Coast Conference, Big 12 Conference, Big East Conference, Big Ten Conference, Big Ten Network Services, LLC, CBS Broadcasting, Inc., CBS Collegiate Sports Properties, Inc., Conference USA, ESPN Inc., Fox Broadcasting Company, IMG College, LLC, IMG Worldwide, Inc., JMI Sports LLC, Learfield Sports LLC, National Broadcasting Company, Inc., Ohio Valley Conference, Pacific-12 Conference, Southeastern Conference, T3 Media, Inc., Telesouth Communications, Inc., William Morris Endeavors, LLC re 224 MOTION to Stay Discovery Pending the Resolution of Defendants' Motion to Dismiss (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Proposed Order Granting Defendants' Motion to Stay Discovery Pending Resolution of Motions to Dismiss)(Lipshie, Samuel) (Entered: 12/10/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 227 Filed: 12/10/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                MEMORANDUM in Support of 226 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Telesouth Communications, Inc. . (Welch, W.) (Entered: 12/10/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 226 Filed: 12/10/2014, Entered: None Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction
                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 226
                                                                                                                                                                                      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 225 Filed: 12/10/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                      MEMORANDUM in Support of 224 MOTION to Stay Discovery Pending the Resolution of Defendants' Motion to Dismiss filed by ABC, Inc., Atlantic Coast Conference, Big 12 Conference, Big East Conference, Big Ten Conference, Big Ten Network Services, LLC, CBS Broadcasting, Inc., CBS Collegiate Sports Properties, Inc., Conference USA, ESPN Inc., Fox Broadcasting Company, IMG College, LLC, IMG Worldwide, Inc., JMI Sports LLC, Learfield Sports LLC, National Broadcasting Company, Inc., Ohio Valley Conference, Pacific-12 Conference, Southeastern Conference, T3 Media, Inc., Telesouth Communications, Inc., William Morris Endeavors, LLC . (Lipshie, Samuel) (Entered: 12/10/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 224 Filed: 12/10/2014, Entered: None Stay
                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 224
                                                                                                                                                                                            Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 223 Filed: 12/10/2014, Entered: None Miscellaneous Relief
                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 223
                                                                                                                                                                                                Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 222 Filed: 12/10/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE of Filing by ABC, Inc., ESPN Inc. (Lipshie, Samuel) (Entered: 12/10/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 221 Filed: 12/10/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                  MEMORANDUM in Support of 220 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by ABC, Inc., ESPN Inc. . (Lipshie, Samuel) (Entered: 12/10/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 220 Filed: 12/10/2014, Entered: None Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 220
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 219 Filed: 12/10/2014, Entered: 12/10/2014 Memorandum in Support
                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 218 Filed: 12/10/2014, Entered: None Dismiss
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 217 Filed: 12/10/2014, Entered: 12/10/2014 Receipt
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 216 Filed: 12/10/2014, Entered: None Hearing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 215 Filed: 12/10/2014, Entered: 12/10/2014 Memorandum in Support
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 214 Filed: 12/10/2014, Entered: None Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 213 Filed: 12/9/2014, Entered: None Appear Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 212 Filed: 12/9/2014, Entered: None Appear Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 211 Filed: 12/9/2014, Entered: None Appear Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 210 Filed: 12/9/2014, Entered: None Appear Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 209 Filed: 12/9/2014, Entered: 12/9/2014 Receipt
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            RECEIPT #34675034243 in the amount of $300 re 207 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, 195 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, 205 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, 203 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (hb) (Entered: 12/09/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 208 Filed: 12/3/2014, Entered: 12/3/2014 Certificate of Good Standing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 207 Filed: 12/3/2014, Entered: None Appear Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 207
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 206 Filed: 12/3/2014, Entered: 12/3/2014 Certificate of Good Standing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 205 Filed: 12/3/2014, Entered: None Appear Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 205
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 204 Filed: 12/3/2014, Entered: 12/3/2014 Certificate of Good Standing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 203 Filed: 12/3/2014, Entered: None Appear Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 203
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 202 Filed: 12/3/2014, Entered: 12/3/2014 Notice of Case Management Conference
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 201 Filed: 12/2/2014, Entered: None Order of Recusal
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 201
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 200 Filed: 12/1/2014, Entered: 12/1/2014 Appear - Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 199 Filed: 12/1/2014, Entered: 12/1/2014 Certificate of Good Standing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 198 Filed: 12/1/2014, Entered: None Appear Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 197 Filed: 11/26/2014, Entered: None Order on Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 197 Filed: 11/25/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER GRANTING 193 NBCUNIVERSAL MEDIA, LLCS UNOPPOSED MOTION TO EXTEND TIME FOR FILING MOTIONS TO DISMISS, TO ESTABLISH BRIEFING SCHEDULE, AND TO EXCEED PAGE LIMITS. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joe Brown on 11/25/2014. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(hb) Modified text on 11/26/2014 (hb). (Entered: 11/26/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 196 Filed: 11/25/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                CERTIFICATE OF GOOD STANDING of Attorney Kelli L. Sager from the United States District Court for the Central of California filed by National Broadcasting Company, Inc.. (Grimes, Robert) (Entered: 11/25/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 195 Filed: 11/25/2014, Entered: None Appear Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 194 Filed: 11/25/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER granting 190 Motion for Brett C. Randol to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joe Brown on 11/25/14. (rd) (Entered: 11/25/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 193 Filed: 11/25/2014, Entered: None File Excess Pages
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 192 Filed: 11/25/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by National Broadcasting Company, Inc.. (Grimes, Robert) (Entered: 11/25/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 191 Filed: 11/25/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE of Appearance by Robert Dale Grimes on behalf of National Broadcasting Company, Inc. (Grimes, Robert) (Entered: 11/25/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 190 Filed: 11/25/2014, Entered: None Appear Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 189 Filed: 11/24/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER granting 187 Motion for Bradley G. Hubbard to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joe Brown on 11/24/14. (rd) (Entered: 11/24/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 188 Filed: 11/24/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                CERTIFICATE OF GOOD STANDING of Attorney Bradley G. Hubbard from the United States District Court for the Northern of Texas filed by CBS Collegiate Sports Properties, Inc.. (Robison, Brian) (Entered: 11/24/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 187 Filed: 11/24/2014, Entered: None Appear Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 186 Filed: 11/21/2014, Entered: 11/21/2014 Corporate Disclosure Statement
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 185 Filed: 11/21/2014, Entered: 11/21/2014 Appear - Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 184 Filed: 11/21/2014, Entered: 11/21/2014 Certificate of Good Standing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 183 Filed: 11/21/2014, Entered: 11/21/2014 Certificate of Good Standing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 182 Filed: 11/21/2014, Entered: 11/21/2014 Certificate of Good Standing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 181 Filed: 11/21/2014, Entered: None Appear Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 180 Filed: 11/21/2014, Entered: 11/21/2014 Corporate Disclosure Statement
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 179 Filed: 11/21/2014, Entered: 11/21/2014 Appear - Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 178 Filed: 11/21/2014, Entered: None Order on Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 177 Filed: 11/21/2014, Entered: None Appear Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 176 Filed: 11/20/2014, Entered: None File Excess Pages
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 175 Filed: 11/18/2014, Entered: 11/18/2014 Appear - Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 174 Filed: 11/18/2014, Entered: None Order on Motion to Stay
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 174
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 173 Filed: 11/18/2014, Entered: None Appear Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 173
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 172 Filed: 11/17/2014, Entered: None Appear Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 172
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 171 Filed: 11/17/2014, Entered: None Stay
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 171
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 170 Filed: 11/17/2014, Entered: 11/17/2014 Notice of Appearance/
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 169 Filed: 11/17/2014, Entered: 11/17/2014 Certificate of Good Standing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 168 Filed: 11/17/2014, Entered: None Appear Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 168
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 167 Filed: 11/17/2014, Entered: 11/17/2014 Certificate of Good Standing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 166 Filed: 11/17/2014, Entered: None Appear Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 166
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 165 Filed: 11/17/2014, Entered: 11/17/2014 Corporate Disclosure Statement
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 164 Filed: 11/17/2014, Entered: 11/17/2014 Certificate of Good Standing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 163 Filed: 11/17/2014, Entered: None Appear Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 163
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 162 Filed: 11/17/2014, Entered: 11/17/2014 Certificate of Good Standing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 161 Filed: 11/17/2014, Entered: None Appear Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 161
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 160 Filed: 11/17/2014, Entered: 11/17/2014 Certificate of Good Standing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 159 Filed: 11/17/2014, Entered: None Appear Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 159
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 158 Filed: 11/14/2014, Entered: None Appear Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 158
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 157 Filed: 11/14/2014, Entered: None Appear Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 157
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 156 Filed: 11/11/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Big Ten Conference. (Bowen, Jay) (Entered: 11/11/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 155 Filed: 11/10/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by T3 Media, Inc.. (Harvey, Robb) (Entered: 11/10/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 154 Filed: 11/8/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER granting 151 Motion for Richard J. Favretto to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Brown, Joe) (Entered: 11/08/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 153 Filed: 11/8/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER granting 149 Motion for Nathan E. Siegel to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Brown, Joe) (Entered: 11/08/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 152 Filed: 11/8/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER granting 147 Motion for Samuel D. Gregory to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Brown, Joe) (Entered: 11/08/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 151 Filed: 11/7/2014, Entered: None Appear Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 150 Filed: 11/7/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  SUMMONS returned executed by Plaintiffs. Telesouth Communications, Inc. served on 10/9/2014. (Zralek, Stephen) (Entered: 11/07/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 149 Filed: 11/6/2014, Entered: None Appear Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 149
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 148 Filed: 11/6/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        CERTIFICATE OF GOOD STANDING of Attorney Samuel D. Gregory from the United States District Court for the Southern District of Mississippi filed by Telesouth Communications, Inc.. (Hicks, John) (Entered: 11/06/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 147 Filed: 11/6/2014, Entered: None Appear Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 147
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 146 Filed: 11/5/2014, Entered: 11/5/2014 Summons Returned Executed
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 145 Filed: 11/5/2014, Entered: None Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 144 Filed: 11/5/2014, Entered: 11/5/2014 Summons Returned Executed
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 143 Filed: 11/5/2014, Entered: 11/5/2014 Summons Returned Executed
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 142 Filed: 11/5/2014, Entered: 11/5/2014 Summons Returned Executed
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 141 Filed: 11/5/2014, Entered: 11/5/2014 Summons Returned Executed
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 140 Filed: 11/5/2014, Entered: 11/5/2014 Summons Returned Executed
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 139 Filed: 11/4/2014, Entered: 11/4/2014 Corporate Disclosure Statement
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 138 Filed: 11/4/2014, Entered: None Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 137 Filed: 11/4/2014, Entered: 11/4/2014 Notice of Appearance/
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 136 Filed: 11/4/2014, Entered: None Appear Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 135 Filed: 11/4/2014, Entered: None Appear Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 134 Filed: 11/4/2014, Entered: None Appear Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 133 Filed: 11/4/2014, Entered: 11/4/2014 Certificate of Good Standing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 132 Filed: 11/4/2014, Entered: None Appear Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 131 Filed: 11/4/2014, Entered: 11/4/2014 Certificate of Good Standing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 130 Filed: 11/4/2014, Entered: None Appear Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 129 Filed: 11/4/2014, Entered: 11/4/2014 Certificate of Good Standing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 128 Filed: 11/4/2014, Entered: None Appear Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 127 Filed: 11/4/2014, Entered: 11/4/2014 Certificate of Good Standing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 126 Filed: 11/4/2014, Entered: None Appear Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 125 Filed: 11/4/2014, Entered: 11/4/2014 Corporate Disclosure Statement
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 124 Filed: 11/4/2014, Entered: 11/4/2014 Corporate Disclosure Statement
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 123 Filed: 11/4/2014, Entered: 11/4/2014 Certificate of Good Standing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 122 Filed: 11/4/2014, Entered: None Appear Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 121 Filed: 11/4/2014, Entered: 11/4/2014 Certificate of Good Standing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 120 Filed: 11/4/2014, Entered: None Appear Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 119 Filed: 11/4/2014, Entered: 11/4/2014 Certificate of Good Standing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 118 Filed: 11/4/2014, Entered: None Appear Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 117 Filed: 11/4/2014, Entered: None Extension of Time to File Answer
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 116 Filed: 11/4/2014, Entered: None Extension of Time to File Answer
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 115 Filed: 11/3/2014, Entered: None Appear Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 114 Filed: 11/3/2014, Entered: None Appear Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 113 Filed: 11/3/2014, Entered: 11/3/2014 Corporate Disclosure Statement
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 112 Filed: 11/3/2014, Entered: None Extension of Time to File Answer
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 111 Filed: 11/3/2014, Entered: None Extension of Time to File Answer
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 110 Filed: 11/3/2014, Entered: 11/3/2014 Corporate Disclosure Statement
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 109 Filed: 11/3/2014, Entered: None Order of Recusal
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 108 Filed: 11/3/2014, Entered: 11/3/2014 Corporate Disclosure Statement
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 107 Filed: 11/3/2014, Entered: 11/3/2014 Summons Returned Executed
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 106 Filed: 11/3/2014, Entered: None Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 105 Filed: 11/3/2014, Entered: None Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 104 Filed: 11/3/2014, Entered: None Appear Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 103 Filed: 11/3/2014, Entered: 11/3/2014 Receipt
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 102 Filed: 10/31/2014, Entered: 10/31/2014 Corporate Disclosure Statement
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 101 Filed: 10/31/2014, Entered: None Extension of Time to File Answer
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 101
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 100 Filed: 10/31/2014, Entered: 10/31/2014 Notice of Appearance/
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 99 Filed: 10/31/2014, Entered: 10/31/2014 Notice of Appearance/
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 98 Filed: 10/30/2014, Entered: 10/30/2014 Corporate Disclosure Statement
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 97 Filed: 10/30/2014, Entered: None Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 97
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 96 Filed: 10/30/2014, Entered: None Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 96
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 95 Filed: 10/30/2014, Entered: None Appear Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 95
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 94 Filed: 10/30/2014, Entered: None Appear Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 94
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 93 Filed: 10/30/2014, Entered: None Appear Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 93
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 92 Filed: 10/30/2014, Entered: 10/30/2014 Corporate Disclosure Statement
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 91 Filed: 10/30/2014, Entered: 10/30/2014 Corporate Disclosure Statement
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 90 Filed: 10/30/2014, Entered: 10/30/2014 Certificate of Good Standing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 89 Filed: 10/30/2014, Entered: None Appear Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 89
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 88 Filed: 10/30/2014, Entered: None Appear Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 88
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 87 Filed: 10/30/2014, Entered: 10/30/2014 Certificate of Good Standing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 86 Filed: 10/30/2014, Entered: None Appear Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 86
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 85 Filed: 10/30/2014, Entered: None Extension of Time to File Answer
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 85
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 84 Filed: 10/30/2014, Entered: 10/30/2014 Receipt
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 83 Filed: 10/29/2014, Entered: None Extension of Time to File Answer
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 83
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 82 Filed: 10/29/2014, Entered: None Appear Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 82
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 81 Filed: 10/29/2014, Entered: None Appear Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 81
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 80 Filed: 10/29/2014, Entered: None Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 80
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 79 Filed: 10/29/2014, Entered: 10/29/2014 Proposed Pretrial Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 78 Filed: 10/29/2014, Entered: None Extension of Time to File Answer
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 78
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 77 Filed: 10/29/2014, Entered: 10/29/2014 Corporate Disclosure Statement
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 76 Filed: 10/29/2014, Entered: 10/29/2014 Proposed Pretrial Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 75 Filed: 10/29/2014, Entered: None Extension of Time to File Answer
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 75
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 74 Filed: 10/29/2014, Entered: 10/29/2014 Corporate Disclosure Statement
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 73 Filed: 10/29/2014, Entered: None Appear Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 73
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 72 Filed: 10/29/2014, Entered: 10/29/2014 Notice of Appearance/
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 71 Filed: 10/29/2014, Entered: None Appear Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 71
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 70 Filed: 10/29/2014, Entered: 10/29/2014 Notice of Appearance/
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 69 Filed: 10/29/2014, Entered: None Appear Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 69
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 68 Filed: 10/29/2014, Entered: None Appear Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 68
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 67 Filed: 10/28/2014, Entered: None Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 67 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER granting 60 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re 1 Complaint. Big East Conference answer due 12/3/2014; Pacific-12 Conference answer due 12/3/2014. Signed by Magistrate Judge John S. Bryant on 10/28/2014. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(hb) (Entered: 10/28/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 66 Filed: 10/28/2014, Entered: None Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 66 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER granting 59 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re 1 Complaint. Southeastern Conference answer due 12/3/2014. Signed by Magistrate Judge John S. Bryant on 10/28/2014. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(hb) (Entered: 10/28/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 65 Filed: 10/28/2014, Entered: None Appear Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 65 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER granting 55 Motion for Mark W. Merritt to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Magistrate Judge John S. Bryant on 10/28/2014. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(hb) (Entered: 10/28/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 64 Filed: 10/28/2014, Entered: None Extension of Time to File Answer
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 64
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond to Complaint by Ohio Valley Conference. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Behm, Margaret) (Entered: 10/28/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 63 Filed: 10/28/2014, Entered: 10/28/2014 Notice of Appearance/
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE of Appearance by Margaret Louise Behm on behalf of Ohio Valley Conference (Behm, Margaret) (Entered: 10/28/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 62 Filed: 10/28/2014, Entered: None Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 62 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER granting 53 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re 1 Complaint. Atlantic Coast Conference answer due 12/3/2014. Signed by Magistrate Judge John S. Bryant on 10/28/2014. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(hb) (Entered: 10/28/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 61 Filed: 10/28/2014, Entered: None Appear Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 61 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER granting 47 Motion for Robert W. Fuller to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Magistrate Judge John S. Bryant on 10/28/2014. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(hb) (Entered: 10/28/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 60 Filed: 10/28/2014, Entered: None Extension of Time to File Answer
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 60
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond to Complaint (Unopposed) by Big East Conference, Pacific-12 Conference. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order granting motion)(Jacobson, John) (Entered: 10/28/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 59 Filed: 10/28/2014, Entered: None Extension of Time to File Answer
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 59
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond to Complaint by Southeastern Conference. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A-Proposed Order Granting Extension of Time to Answer Complaint)(Sanders, James) (Entered: 10/28/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 58 Filed: 10/28/2014, Entered: 10/28/2014 Receipt
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      RECEIPT #34675033697 in the amount of $75 re 55 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (hb) (Entered: 10/28/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 57 Filed: 10/27/2014, Entered: 10/28/2014 Letter
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Copy of letter from CT Corporation regarding service on Fox Broadcasting Inc. (hb) (Entered: 10/28/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 56 Filed: 10/28/2014, Entered: 10/28/2014 Certificate of Good Standing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          CERTIFICATE OF GOOD STANDING of Attorney Mark W. Merritt from the United States District Court for the Western of North Carolina filed by Southeastern Conference. (Sanders, James) (Entered: 10/28/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 55 Filed: 10/28/2014, Entered: None Appear Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 55
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION for attorney(s) Mark W. Merritt to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Fee not paid-due within 20 days) by Southeastern Conference. (Sanders, James) (Entered: 10/28/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 54 Filed: 10/28/2014, Entered: 10/28/2014 Certificate of Good Standing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                CERTIFICATE OF GOOD STANDING of Attorney Robert W. Fuller from the United States District Court for the Western of North Carolina filed by Southeastern Conference. (Sanders, James) (Entered: 10/28/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 53 Filed: 10/27/2014, Entered: None Extension of Time to File Answer
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 53
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 52 Filed: 10/27/2014, Entered: 10/27/2014 Summons Returned Executed
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 51 Filed: 10/27/2014, Entered: 10/27/2014 Summons Returned Executed
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 10/27/2014, Entered: None Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 10/27/2014, Entered: 10/27/2014 Receipt
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 10/27/2014, Entered: 10/27/2014 Certificate of Good Standing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 10/27/2014, Entered: None Appear Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 10/24/2014, Entered: None Extension of Time to File Answer
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond to Complaint (on behalf of ABC, Inc., ESPN Inc., CBS Broadcasting, Inc., and FOX, Inc.) by ABC, Inc., ESPN Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order Exhibit A - Order Granting Joint Unopposed Motion)(Lipshie, Samuel) (Entered: 10/24/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 10/24/2014, Entered: None Appear Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER granting 32 Motion for Stefan H. Atkinson to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Magistrate Judge John S. Bryant on 10/24/2014. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(hb) (Entered: 10/24/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 10/24/2014, Entered: None Appear Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER granting 31 Motion for Evan R. Chesler to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Magistrate Judge John S. Bryant on 10/24/2014. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(hb) (Entered: 10/24/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 10/24/2014, Entered: None Appear Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER granting 30 Motion for Roger G. Brooks to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Magistrate Judge John S. Bryant on 10/24/2014. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(hb) (Entered: 10/24/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 10/24/2014, Entered: 10/24/2014 Notice of Appearance/
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE of Appearance by Hal D. Hardin on behalf of FOX, Inc. (Hardin, Hal) (Entered: 10/24/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 10/24/2014, Entered: 10/24/2014 Notice of Appearance/
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE of Appearance by David Alexander Fardon on behalf of Atlantic Coast Conference (Fardon, David) (Entered: 10/24/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 10/24/2014, Entered: 10/24/2014 Corporate Disclosure Statement
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by CBS Broadcasting, Inc.. (Grimes, Robert) (Entered: 10/24/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 10/24/2014, Entered: 10/24/2014 Certificate of Good Standing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            CERTIFICATE OF GOOD STANDING of Attorney Eric Shaun Hochstadt from the United States District Court for the Southern of New York filed by CBS Broadcasting, Inc.. (Grimes, Robert) (Entered: 10/24/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 10/24/2014, Entered: None Appear Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION for attorney(s) Eric Shaun Hochstadt to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Fee not paid-due within 20 days) by CBS Broadcasting, Inc.. (Grimes, Robert) (Entered: 10/24/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 10/24/2014, Entered: 10/24/2014 Certificate of Good Standing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  CERTIFICATE OF GOOD STANDING of Attorney Yehudah Lev Buchweitz from the United States District Court for the Southern of New York filed by CBS Broadcasting, Inc.. (Grimes, Robert) (Entered: 10/24/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 10/24/2014, Entered: None Appear Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION for attorney(s) Yehudah Lev Buchweitz to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Fee not paid-due within 20 days) by CBS Broadcasting, Inc.. (Grimes, Robert) (Entered: 10/24/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 10/24/2014, Entered: 10/24/2014 Certificate of Good Standing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        CERTIFICATE OF GOOD STANDING of Attorney James W. Quinn from the United States District Court for the Southern of New York filed by CBS Broadcasting, Inc.. (Grimes, Robert) (Entered: 10/24/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 10/24/2014, Entered: None Appear Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION for attorney(s) James W. Quinn to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Fee not paid-due within 20 days) by CBS Broadcasting, Inc.. (Grimes, Robert) (Entered: 10/24/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 10/24/2014, Entered: 10/24/2014 Notice of Appearance/
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE of Appearance by Robert Dale Grimes on behalf of CBS Broadcasting, Inc. (Grimes, Robert) (Entered: 10/24/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 10/23/2014, Entered: None Appear Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION for attorney(s) Stefan H. Atkinson to Appear Pro Hac Vice (paid $75 PHV fee; receipt number 0650-1865058) by ABC, Inc., ESPN Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Certificate of Good Standing)(Lipshie, Samuel) (Entered: 10/23/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 10/23/2014, Entered: None Appear Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION for attorney(s) Evan R. Chesler to Appear Pro Hac Vice (paid $75 PHV fee; receipt number 0650-1865057) by ABC, Inc., ESPN Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Certificate of Good Standing)(Lipshie, Samuel) (Entered: 10/23/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 10/23/2014, Entered: None Appear Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION for attorney(s) Roger G. Brooks to Appear Pro Hac Vice (paid $75 PHV fee; receipt number 0650-1865053) by ABC, Inc., ESPN Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Certificate of Good Standing)(Lipshie, Samuel) (Entered: 10/23/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 10/23/2014, Entered: 10/23/2014 Notice of Appearance/
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE of Appearance by Samuel David Lipshie on behalf of ABC, Inc., ESPN Inc. (Lipshie, Samuel) (Entered: 10/23/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 28 Filed: 10/22/2014, Entered: 10/22/2014 Summons Returned Executed
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              SUMMONS returned executed by Steven Clarke, Marlon Walls, Eric Samuels, Javon Marshall, Chris Conner, Byron Moore, Sean Parker, Patrick Miller, Chaz Moore, Rod Wilks. IMG College, LLC served on 10/16/2014. (Zralek, Stephen) (Entered: 10/22/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 27 Filed: 10/22/2014, Entered: 10/22/2014 Notice of Appearance/
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE of Appearance by William V. Parsons, III on behalf of Big Ten Conference (Parsons, William) (Entered: 10/22/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 26 Filed: 10/22/2014, Entered: 10/22/2014 Notice of Appearance/
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE of Appearance by Jay Scott Bowen on behalf of Big Ten Conference (Bowen, Jay) (Entered: 10/22/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 25 Filed: 10/21/2014, Entered: 10/21/2014 Summons Returned Executed
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 24 Filed: 10/21/2014, Entered: 10/21/2014 Summons Returned Executed
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 23 Filed: 10/17/2014, Entered: 10/17/2014 Notice of Appearance/
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 22 Filed: 10/16/2014, Entered: 10/16/2014 Summons Returned Executed
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 10/15/2014, Entered: 10/15/2014 Summons Returned Executed
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 10/15/2014, Entered: 10/15/2014 Summons Returned Executed
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 10/15/2014, Entered: 10/15/2014 Summons Returned Executed
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 10/15/2014, Entered: 10/15/2014 Summons Returned Executed
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 10/15/2014, Entered: 10/15/2014 Summons Returned Executed
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 10/15/2014, Entered: 10/15/2014 Summons Returned Executed
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 10/15/2014, Entered: 10/15/2014 Summons Returned Executed
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 10/15/2014, Entered: 10/15/2014 Summons Returned Executed
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 10/15/2014, Entered: 10/15/2014 Summons Returned Executed
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 10/15/2014, Entered: 10/15/2014 Summons Returned Executed
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 10/15/2014, Entered: 10/15/2014 Summons Returned Executed
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 10/14/2014, Entered: 10/14/2014 Summons Returned Executed
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 10/14/2014, Entered: 10/14/2014 Summons Returned Executed
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 10/13/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      SUMMONS returned executed by Steven Clarke, Marlon Walls, Eric Samuels, Javon Marshall, Chris Conner, Byron Moore, Sean Parker, Patrick Miller, Chaz Moore, Rod Wilks. Ohio Valley Conference served on 10/8/2014. (Zralek, Stephen) (Entered: 10/13/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 10/8/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        CORRECTED Summons Reissued as to ABC, Inc., CBS Broadcasting, Inc., CBS Collegiate Sports Properties, Inc., Learfield Sports LLC, National Broadcasting Company, Inc.. (hb) (Entered: 10/08/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 10/7/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Summons issued as to CBS Broadcasting Inc., ABC Inc., CBS Collegiate Sports Properties Inc., Learfield Sports LLC, National Broadcasting Company, Inc.. (hb) (Entered: 10/07/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 10/7/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Summons issued as to Atlantic Coast Conference, Big 12 Conference, Big East Conference, Big Ten Conference, Big Ten Network Services, LLC, Conference USA, ESPN Inc., FOX, Inc., IMG College, LLC, IMG Worldwide, Inc., JMI Sports LLC, Inc., Ohio Valley Conference, Pacific-12 Conference, Southeatern Conference, T3 Media, Inc., Telesouth Communications, Inc., William Morris Endeavors, LLC. (hb) Modified text on 10/7/2014 (hb). (Entered: 10/07/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 10/7/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              RECEIPT #34675033430 in the amount of $400 re 1 Complaint. (hb) (Entered: 10/07/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 3 Filed: 10/6/2014, Entered: 10/6/2014 Notice of Case Management ConferenceCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE of Initial Case Management Conference set for 12/8/2014 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom 776 before Magistrate Judge John S. Bryant. (hb) (Entered: 10/06/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 10/6/2014, Entered: 10/6/2014 ~Notice (other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE from USDC Clerk regarding Corporate Disclosure Statement requirement. (hb) (Entered: 10/06/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 1 Filed: 10/3/2014, Entered: 10/6/2014 Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    COMPLAINT against ABC, Inc., Atlantic Coast Conference, Big 12 Conference, Big East Conference, Big Ten Conference, Big Ten Network Services, LLC, CBS Broadcasting, Inc., CBS Collegiate Sports Properties, Inc., Conference USA, ESPN Inc., FOX, Inc., IMG College, LLC, IMG Worldwide, Inc., JMI Sports LLC, Learfield Sports LLC, National Broadcasting Company, Inc., Ohio Valley Conference, Pacific-12 Conference, Southeatern Conference, T3 Media, Inc., Telesouth Communications, Inc., William Morris Endeavors, LLC, filed by Steven Clarke, Marlon Walls, Eric Samuels, Javon Marshall, Chris Conner, Byron Moore, Sean Parker, Patrick Miller, Chaz Moore, Rod Wilks. (filing fee paid $400) (no summons issued) (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet)(hb) Modified text on 10/6/2014 (hb). (Entered: 10/06/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Statistics

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    This case has been viewed 733 times.

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Space
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                     
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Need Password Help?