United States v. CAO
Criminal Case Indiana Southern District Court, Case No. 1:13-cr-00150
District Judge William T. Lawrence, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated February 8, 2021 at 12:57 PM ST (3.1 months ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo GUOQING CAO, Defendant (1)

Toggle Switch Represented by Fox Rothschild LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, Designation: Retained MATTHEW STEPHEN ADAMS +1 973 992 4800 +1 973 992 9125 madams@foxrothschild.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, Designation: Retained ALAIN LEIBMAN +1 609 895 6743 +1 609 896 1469 aleibman@foxrothschild.com

Toggle Switch Represented by PENCE HENSEL LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, Designation: Retained William J. Barkimer +1 317 833 1111 +1 317 833 1199 bbarkimer@pencehensel.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, Designation: Retained David J. Hensel +1 317 833 1111 +1 317 833 1199 dhensel@pencehensel.com

Note: Criminal cases with multiple defendants may have several records with the same case number: one record for the master file (all defendants), as well as one record per defendant. It can often be difficult to tell which record is which. Other likely matches for this case include:

  Entries (142) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 205 Filed: 2/8/2021, Entered: None Notice (Other)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 202 Filed: 12/5/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
    ORDER GRANTING LEAVE TO DISMISS SECOND SUPERSEDING INDICTMENT, PURSUANT TO RULE 48(a), FED. R. CRIM. P.: GRANTED 201 Motion to Dismiss as to GUOQING CAO (1), SHUYU LI (2). ORDERED AND ADJUDGED that leave of Court is GRANTED for the government's dismissal of the Second Superseding Indictment in this cause. It is further ORDERED AND ADJUDGED that the Second Superseding Indictment in this cause is DISMISSED. Signed by Judge William T. Lawrence on 12/5/2014.(DW) (Entered: 12/05/2014)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 201 Filed: 12/5/2014, Entered: None
      MOTION to Dismiss SECOND SUPERSEDING INDICTMENT PURSUANT TO RULE 48(a), FED. R. CRIM. P. by USA as to GUOQING CAO, SHUYU LI. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Ridgeway, Cynthia) (Entered: 12/05/2014)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Blank 200 Filed: 12/1/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
        ORDER granting 196 Motion to Withdraw docket #193. Signed by Judge William T. Lawrence on 12/1/2014.(JHO) (Entered: 12/01/2014)
          LREF
          Blank 197 Filed: 11/25/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
          ORDER ON MOTION TO MODIFY CONDITIONS OF RELEASE: GRANTED 190 Motion to Modify Conditions of Release as to GUOQING CAO (1) ***SEE ORDER FOR ADDTIONAL INFORMATION***. Signed by Judge William T. Lawrence on 11/25/2014.(DW) (Main Document 197 replaced on 11/25/2014) (DW). (Entered: 11/25/2014)
            LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 196 Filed: 11/24/2014, Entered: None
            MOTION to Withdraw Document 193 Response in Opposition to Motion by USA as to GUOQING CAO, SHUYU LI. (Ridgeway, Cynthia) (Entered: 11/24/2014)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 195 Filed: 11/21/2014, Entered: None
              REPLY in Support of Motion re 190 MOTION to Modify Conditions of Release by GUOQING CAO (Hensel, David) (Entered: 11/21/2014)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 194 Filed: 11/18/2014, Entered: None
                SCHEDULING ORDER as to GUOQING CAO and SHUYU LI: On the court's own motion, the status conference scheduled for December 10, 2014 shall be continued to December 11, 2014 at 10:00 a.m. in Courtroom 202 of the Birch Bayh Federal Building and U.S. Courthouse, 46 East Ohio Street, Indianapolis, Indiana. (SWM) (Entered: 11/18/2014)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 193 Filed: 11/14/2014, Entered: None
                  ***Withdrawn per 200 ***RESPONSE in Opposition re 190 MOTION to Modify Conditions of Release by USA as to GUOQING CAO, SHUYU LI (Ridgeway, Cynthia) Modified on 12/1/2014 (JHO). (Entered: 11/14/2014)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 192 Filed: 11/14/2014, Entered: None
                    ENTRY in case as to GUOQING CAO, SHUYU LI: This matter is hereby set for a discovery conference on December 10, 2014 at 10:00 a.m. in Courtroom 202. Defendants may attend in person but are not required to do so. (DW) (Entered: 11/14/2014)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 191 Filed: 11/6/2014, Entered: None
                      BRIEF/MEMORANDUM in Support re 190 MOTION to Modify Conditions of Release by GUOQING CAO (Hensel, David) (Entered: 11/06/2014)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 190 Filed: 11/6/2014, Entered: None
                        MOTION to Modify Conditions of Release by GUOQING CAO. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Hensel, David) (Entered: 11/06/2014)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 188 Filed: 11/5/2014, Entered: None
                          RESPONSE in Opposition re 184 MOTION to Compel MOTION for Sanctions by USA as to GUOQING CAO, SHUYU LI (Ridgeway, Cynthia) (Entered: 11/05/2014)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 187 Filed: 10/21/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                            ORDER granting 182 Motion to Continue as to GUOQING CAO (1) and SHUYU LI (2): Final Pretrial Conference RESET for 4/10/2015 11:00 AM in room #202, United States Courthouse, 46 E. Ohio Street, Indianapolis, Indiana before Judge William T. Lawrence. Defendants shall appear in person. Jury Trial RESET for 5/4/2015 09:00 AM in room #202, United States Courthouse, 46 E. Ohio Street, Indianapolis, Indiana before Judge William T. Lawrence. Signed by Judge William T. Lawrence on 10/21/2014.(SWM) (Entered: 10/21/2014)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 186 Filed: 10/20/2014, Entered: None
                              RESPONSE in Opposition re 184 MOTION to Compel MOTION for Sanctions by USA as to GUOQING CAO, SHUYU LI - GOVERNMENT'S ADDENDUM TO RESPONSE IN OPPOSITION (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Ridgeway, Cynthia) (Entered: 10/20/2014)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 185 Filed: 10/17/2014, Entered: None
                                RESPONSE in Opposition re 184 MOTION to Compel MOTION for Sanctions by USA as to GUOQING CAO, SHUYU LI (Ridgeway, Cynthia) (Entered: 10/17/2014)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 184 Filed: 10/16/2014, Entered: None
                                  MOTION to Compel , MOTION for Sanctions by GUOQING CAO, SHUYU LI. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A-2014-10-06 Letter to AUSA Ridgeway, # 2 Exhibit B-2014-10-06 - Letter to Atty Albaugh, # 3 Exhibit C-2014-10-09 - Email string, # 4 Text of Proposed Order)(Hensel, David) (Entered: 10/16/2014)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 183 Filed: 10/16/2014, Entered: None
                                    RESPONSE to Motion re 182 Joint MOTION to Continue Trial by USA as to GUOQING CAO, SHUYU LI (Ridgeway, Cynthia) (Entered: 10/16/2014)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 182 Filed: 10/14/2014, Entered: None
                                      Joint MOTION to Continue Trial by GUOQING CAO, SHUYU LI. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order Order on Joint Motion to Continue)(Hensel, David) (Entered: 10/14/2014)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 181 Filed: 10/9/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                        MINUTE ORDER for status conference held on 10/09/14 before Judge William T. Lawrence: Parties appear by counsel. Counsel for Lilly also present. Defendants to file unopposed motion to continue trial. Counsel to contact courtroom deputy clerk to arrange a status conference. (Court Reporter Cathy Jones) (JHO) (Entered: 10/09/2014)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 180 Filed: 9/30/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                          MINUTE ORDER for proceedings held before Judge William T. Lawrence: Status Conference as to GUOQING CAO, SHUYU LI held on 9/22/2014. ***See entry for deadlines*** Final Pretrial Conference set for 12/3/2014 01:00 PM. Follow-up phone conference held 9/29/14. Parties appear by phone and conference held. Follow-up Status Conference set for 10/9/2014 03:00 PM in room #202, United States Courthouse, 46 E. Ohio Street, Indianapolis, Indiana before Judge William T. Lawrence. Counsel may appear by phone. Signed by Judge William T. Lawrence. (Court Reporter Cathy Jones) (JHO) (Entered: 09/30/2014)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 179 Filed: 9/10/2014, Entered: None
                                            NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE Matthew J. Lasher appearing for USA. (Lasher, Matthew) (Entered: 09/10/2014)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 177 Filed: 8/28/2014, Entered: None
                                              RESPONSE IN OPPOSITION, re 176 Response in Opposition to Motion by USA as to GUOQING CAO, SHUYU LI. (Ridgeway, Cynthia) (Entered: 08/28/2014)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 176 Filed: 8/27/2014, Entered: None
                                                RESPONSE in Opposition re 174 MOTION in Limine FOR PRETRIAL DETERMINATION OF ADMISSIBILITY OF INCULPATORY STATEMENT OF DEFENDANT SHUYU LI by GUOQING CAO, SHUYU LI (Hensel, David) (Entered: 08/27/2014)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 174 Filed: 8/20/2014, Entered: None
                                                  MOTION in Limine FOR PRETRIAL DETERMINATION OF ADMISSIBILITY OF INCULPATORY STATEMENT OF DEFENDANT SHUYU LI by USA as to GUOQING CAO, SHUYU LI. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Ridgeway, Cynthia) (Entered: 08/20/2014)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 172 Filed: 7/8/2014, Entered: None
                                                    Submission GOVERNMENTS BRIEF IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO QUASH DEFENDANTS MAY 19, 2014 SUBPOENA DUCES TECUM, (filed on July 7, 2014 under misc. no. 1:14-mc-00071, Dkt. 3) by USA as to GUOQING CAO, SHUYU LI. (Ridgeway, Cynthia) (Entered: 07/08/2014)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 171 Filed: 6/19/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                      CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER as to GUOQING CAO and SHUYU LI: As directed by the Court at the hearing conducted on May 19, 2014, the parties have consulted and hereby stipulate to the following schedule of anticipated further proceedings (see Order for established deadlines and additional information). Signed by Judge William T. Lawrence on 6/19/2014. (SWM) (Entered: 06/19/2014)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 170 Filed: 6/19/2014, Entered: None
                                                        Submission OF JOINT PROPOSED CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER by USA as to GUOQING CAO, SHUYU LI. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 - Case Management Order)(Ridgeway, Cynthia) (Entered: 06/19/2014)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 169 Filed: 6/13/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                          TRANSCRIPT of Hearing On Discovery Motions as to GUOQING CAO, SHUYU LI held on May 19, 2014 before Judge William T. Lawrence. (17 pages.) Court Reporter/Transcriber: Cathy Jones (Telephone: (317) 423-0436). Please review Local Rule 80-2 for more information on redaction procedures. Redaction Statement due 7/7/2014. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 9/11/2014. (Jones, Cathy) Released on 9/11/2014 (SWM). (Entered: 06/13/2014)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 168 Filed: 6/13/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                            NOTICE of FILING of OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Hearing on Discovery Motions held before Judge William T. Lawrence on May 19, 2014, in case as to GUOQING CAO, SHUYU LI (Jones, Cathy) (Entered: 06/13/2014)
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 167 Filed: 5/20/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                              ORDER ON DISCOVERY as to GUOQING CAO, SHUYU LI: This cause is before the Court on the Defendants' request for certain discovery (dkt. no. 164-1). The Government has responded to the Defendants' request (dkt. no. 165), and a hearing on the request was held on May 19, 2014. At the hearing, the Court ruled from the bench on each of the contested issues. The Court now provides the following explanation for its ruling ***SEE ORDER FOR ADDITIONAL INFORMATION***. Signed by Judge William T. Lawrence on 5/20/2014. (DW) (Entered: 05/20/2014)
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 166 Filed: 5/19/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                COURTROOM MINUTES for proceedings held before Judge William T. Lawrence - Discovery Hearing held on 5/19/2014: Defendant appears in person and by retained counsel; FOR GUOQING CAO: Alain Leibman, David Hensel, Matthew Adams, and William Barkimer, FOR SHUYU LI: Scott Newman. Appearance for the USA by AUSA Cynthia Ridgeway. On May 19, 2014, a previously-scheduled hearing was held in the above cause. The following was discussed and determined. The Court orally announced its ruling on the outstanding discovery issues. A formal, written entry will follow. The Court set this matter for trial to begin on Tuesday, January 6, 2015, at 9:00 a.m. in Courtroom 202 of the U.S. Courthouse, 46 East Ohio Street, Indianapolis, Indiana. The Court finds that the time lapse between the June 23, 2014, trial date and the next trial date are excludable under 18 U.S.C. § 3161, et. seq. The parties indicated they will work together to develop a new case management plan. Signed by Judge William T. Lawrence on 5/19/2014. (Court Reporter Cathy Jones) (DW) (Entered: 05/20/2014)
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 163 Filed: 5/6/2014, Entered: None
                                                                  NOTICE OF EX PARTE FILING by USA as to GUOQING CAO, SHUYU LI (Ridgeway, Cynthia) (Entered: 05/06/2014)
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 161 Filed: 4/28/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                    TRANSCRIPT of Status Conference as to GUOQING CAO, SHUYU LI held on 04/23/2014 before Judge William T. Lawrence. (41 pages.) Court Reporter/Transcriber: David Moxley (Telephone: (317) 916-8209). Please review Local Rule 80-2 for more information on redaction procedures. Redaction Statement due 5/19/2014. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 7/28/2014. (Moxley, David) Released on 7/30/2014 (SWM). (Entered: 04/28/2014)
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 160 Filed: 4/28/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                      NOTICE of FILING of OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Status Conference held before Judge William T. Lawrence on 04/23/2014 in case as to GUOQING CAO, SHUYU LI (Moxley, David) (Entered: 04/28/2014)
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 159 Filed: 4/24/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                        MINUTE ORDER for status conference held on 4/23/14 before Judge William T. Lawrence: Defendants GUOQING CAO, SHUYU LI appear in person and by counsel. Appearance for the USA by AUSA Cynthia Ridgeway. USPO represented by David Schoettmer. Conference held and continued. Motion Hearing set for 5/19/2014 10:00 AM in room #202, United States Courthouse, 46 E. Ohio Street, Indianapolis, Indiana before Judge William T. Lawrence. ***SEE ENTRY FOR DEADLINES AND FURTHER INFORMATION*** Signed by Judge William T. Lawrence. (Court Reporter David Moxley) (JHO) (Entered: 04/24/2014)
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 158 Filed: 4/23/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                          ENTRY ON DEFENDANTS' MOTIONS TO MODIFY CONDITIONS OF RELEASE: The Court GRANTS Defendants Cao and Li's motions to modify their conditions of release (dkt. nos. 132 and 141). In addition to the conditions set forth above, further conditions of Cao and Li's release have been set under separate order. Signed by Judge William T. Lawrence on 4/23/2014.(SWM) Modified on 4/24/2014 (SWM). (Entered: 04/24/2014)
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 156 Filed: 4/23/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                            ORDER Setting Conditions of Release as to GUOQING CAO. Signed by Judge William T. Lawrence on 4/23/2014. (JHO) (Entered: 04/23/2014)
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 155 Filed: 4/23/2014, Entered: None
                                                                              RESPONSE IN OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS REQUEST FOR BILL OF PARTICULARS by USA as to GUOQING CAO, SHUYU LI. (Ridgeway, Cynthia) (Entered: 04/23/2014)
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 154 Filed: 4/7/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                ORDER granting USA's 131 Motion to Continue as to GUOQING CAO (1), SHUYU LI and (2): Status Conference RESET for 4/23/2014 02:00 PM in room #202, United States Courthouse, 46 E. Ohio Street, Indianapolis, Indiana before Judge William T. Lawrence. Signed by Judge William T. Lawrence on 4/7/2014.(SWM) (Entered: 04/07/2014)
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 152 Filed: 3/25/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                  ENTRY in case as to GUOQING CAO - Waiver accepted. Hearing vacated as to this defendant (Marginal Notation). Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark J. Dinsmore on 3/25/2014. (MAC) (Entered: 03/26/2014)
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 150 Filed: 3/25/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                    WAIVER of Initial Appearance, Arraignment, and Execution of Warrant on Second Superseding Indictment of Shuyu LI by GUOQING CAO, SHUYU LI (Hensel, David) (Entered: 03/25/2014)
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 149 Filed: 3/24/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                      RESPONSE in Opposition re 141 First MOTION to Modify Conditions of Release by USA as to GUOQING CAO, SHUYU LI (Ridgeway, Cynthia) (Entered: 03/24/2014)
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 148 Filed: 3/24/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                        WAIVER of Initial Appearance, Arraignment, and Execution of Warrant on Second Superseding Indictment by GUOQING CAO (Hensel, David) (Entered: 03/24/2014)
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 146 Filed: 3/21/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                          REPLY in Support of Motion re 132 MOTION to Modify Conditions of Release by GUOQING CAO (Hensel, David) (Entered: 03/21/2014)
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 145 Filed: 3/21/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                            WAIVER of Initial Appearance, Arraignment, and Execution of Warrant on Second Superseding Indictment by GUOQING CAO (Hensel, David) (Entered: 03/21/2014)
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 144 Filed: 3/20/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                              Summons Returned Executed on 3/20/2014 for 129 Summons Issued in case as to GUOQING CAO. Initial Appearance set for 3/25/2014 01:00 PM in room #243, United States Courthouse, 46 E. Ohio Street, Indianapolis, Indiana before Criminal Duty Magistrate Judge. Electronic Notice to USM.(SWM) (SWM) (Entered: 03/21/2014)
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 140 Filed: 3/19/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                RESPONSE in Opposition re 132 MOTION to Modify Conditions of Release by USA as to GUOQING CAO, SHUYU LI (Ridgeway, Cynthia) (Entered: 03/19/2014)
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 139 Filed: 3/18/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                  SCHEDULING ORDER as to GUOQING CAO, SHUYU LI Initial Appearance set for 3/25/2014 01:00 PM in room #270, United States Courthouse, 46 E. Ohio Street, Indianapolis, Indiana before Criminal Duty Magistrate Judge. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark J. Dinsmore on 3/18/2014. (CKM) (Entered: 03/19/2014)
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 138 Filed: 3/19/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                    RESPONSE , re 136 Response in Opposition to Motion by USA as to GUOQING CAO, SHUYU LI. (Ridgeway, Cynthia) (Entered: 03/19/2014)
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 137 Filed: 3/18/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                      ORDER granting 135 Motion to Seal Docket Number 134 as to GUOQING CAO (1). Signed by Judge William T. Lawrence on 3/18/2014.(SWM) (Entered: 03/18/2014)
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 136 Filed: 3/17/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                        RESPONSE in Opposition re 131 MOTION to Continue STATUS CONFERENCE by GUOQING CAO as to GUOQING CAO, SHUYU LI (Hensel, David) (Entered: 03/17/2014)
                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                          Sealed Legal Document 135 Filed: 3/17/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                          MOTION to Seal a Document 134 SEALED Document (Sealed - entry) by GUOQING CAO. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Hensel, David) (Entered: 03/17/2014)
                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 133 Filed: 3/17/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                            BRIEF/MEMORANDUM in Support re 132 MOTION to Modify Conditions of Release by GUOQING CAO as to GUOQING CAO, SHUYU LI (Hensel, David) (Entered: 03/17/2014)
                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 132 Filed: 3/17/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                              MOTION to Modify Conditions of Release by GUOQING CAO as to GUOQING CAO, SHUYU LI. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Hensel, David) (Entered: 03/17/2014)
                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 131 Filed: 3/17/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                MOTION to Continue STATUS CONFERENCE by USA as to GUOQING CAO, SHUYU LI. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Ridgeway, Cynthia) (Entered: 03/17/2014)
                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 128 Filed: 3/13/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                  ENTRY FOR MARCH 13, 2014, HONORABLE WILLIAM T. LAWRENCE, JUDGE: The court will conduct a status conference on Thursday, April 17, 2014 at 1:00 p.m. in Courtroom 202. This time had been previously reserved for the final pretrial conference. Please disregard the reference to April 14, 2014 in the Minute Entry at docket 116. (SWM) (Entered: 03/13/2014)
                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 123 Filed: 3/12/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                    NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE Cynthia J. Ridgeway appearing for USA. (DW) (Entered: 03/13/2014)
                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 120 Filed: 3/12/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                      SECOND SUPERSEDING INDICTMENT ***REDACTED*** as to GUOQING CAO (1) count(s) 1ss, 2ss, SHUYU LI (2) count(s) 2ss, 3ss. Electronic Notice to USM. (DW) (Entered: 03/13/2014)
                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 119 Filed: 2/24/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                        TRANSCRIPT of Discovery Conference as to GUOQING CAO, SHUYU LI held on 02/14/2014 before Judge William T. Lawrence. (37 pages.) Court Reporter/Transcriber: David Moxley (Telephone: (317) 916-8209). Please review Local Rule 80-2 for more information on redaction procedures. Redaction Statement due 3/17/2014. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 5/27/2014. (Moxley, David) Released on 5/28/2014 (SWM). (Entered: 02/24/2014)
                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 118 Filed: 2/24/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                          NOTICE of FILING of OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Discovery Conference held before Judge William T. Lawrence on 02/14/2014 in case as to GUOQING CAO, SHUYU LI (Moxley, David) (Entered: 02/24/2014)
                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 117 Filed: 2/20/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                            NOTICE OF COMPLIANCE by USA as to GUOQING CAO, SHUYU LI (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 - Draft Case Management Order)(Ridgeway, Cynthia) (Entered: 02/20/2014)
                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 116 Filed: 2/18/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                              MINUTE ORDER for proceedings held before Judge William T. Lawrence: Discovery Conference as to GUOQING CAO, SHUYU LI held on 2/14/2014. ***SEE ENTRY FOR DETAILS*** Signed by Judge William T. Lawrence. (Court Reporter David Moxley) (JHO) (Entered: 02/18/2014)
                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 115 Filed: 2/5/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                ORDER re STIPULATED ORDER PURSUANT TO FEDERAL RULE OF EVIDENCE 502(b) and (d) as to GUOQING CAO and SHUYU LI re 112 and 113 . ADOPTED and ORDERED. Signed by Judge William T. Lawrence on 2/5/2014. (SWM) (Entered: 02/06/2014)
                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 114 Filed: 2/5/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                  ENTRY FOR FEBRUARY 5, 2014 as to GUOQING CAO, SHUYU LI: The Court shall hold a conference to discuss discovery issues on Friday, February 14, 2014 at 3:30 p.m. in Courtroom 202 of the U.S. Courthouse, Indianapolis, Indiana. Defendants need not appear in person. Out of town counsel may appear by phone by calling (317) 229-3610.(DW) (Entered: 02/05/2014)
                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 113 Filed: 2/4/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                    Submission STIPULATED ORDER PURSUANT TO FEDERAL RULE OF EVIDENCE 502(b) and (d) by USA, GUOQING CAO, SHUYU LI as to GUOQING CAO, SHUYU LI. (Ridgeway, Cynthia) (Entered: 02/04/2014)
                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 112 Filed: 2/4/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                      Submission OF PROPOSED CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER by USA as to GUOQING CAO, SHUYU LI. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Ridgeway, Cynthia) (Entered: 02/04/2014)
                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 111 Filed: 2/4/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                        INTERIM PROTECTIVE ORDER as to GUOQING CAO (1), SHUYU LI (2) ***SEE ORDER FOR ADDITIONAL INFORMATION***. Signed by Judge William T. Lawrence on 2/3/2014.(DW) (Entered: 02/04/2014)
                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 110 Filed: 2/3/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                          Submission JOINT SUBMISSION FOR PROPOSED PROTECTIVE ORDER by USA, GUOQING CAO, SHUYU LI as to GUOQING CAO, SHUYU LI. (Ridgeway, Cynthia) (Entered: 02/03/2014)
                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 108 Filed: 1/27/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                            NOTICE OF COMPLIANCE by USA as to GUOQING CAO, SHUYU LI (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 - letter to defense counsel)(Ridgeway, Cynthia) (Entered: 01/27/2014)
                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 107 Filed: 1/16/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                              ENTRY in case as to GUOQING CAO and SHUYU LI: Prior to pretrial conference a discussion was held off the record. ***SEE ENTRY FOR DEADLINES*** The Court vacated the pretrial conference. Signed by Judge William T. Lawrence on 1/16/2014. (JHO) (Entered: 01/16/2014)
                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 105 Filed: 1/16/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                STATUS REPORT AND PROPOSED DISCOVERY SCHEDULE by USA as to GUOQING CAO, SHUYU LI (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 - Draft Stipulated Interim Protective Order, # 2 Exhibit 3 - Draft Stipulated Order, # 3 Exhibit 4 - Draft Discovery Scheduling Order)(Ridgeway, Cynthia) (Entered: 01/16/2014)
                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 104 Filed: 12/19/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                  MINUTE ORDER for proceedings held before Judge William T. Lawrence: Parties appear by counsel for status conference. Conference held off the record in chambers. Conference concluded without further order. (JHO) (Entered: 12/19/2013)
                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 103 Filed: 12/19/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                    REDACTED Version of previously filed 43 TRANSCRIPT of Detention Hearing as to GUOQING CAO, SHUYU LI held on 10/08/2013 before Magistrate Judge Mark J. Dinsmore. (88 pages.) Court Reporter/Transcriber: David Moxley (Telephone: (317) 916-8209). (Moxley, David) Released on 1/13/2014 (SWM). (Entered: 12/19/2013)
                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 102 Filed: 12/19/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE of FILING of REDACTED OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Detention Hearing held before Magistrate Judge Mark J. Dinsmore on 10/08/2013 in case as to GUOQING CAO, SHUYU LI (Moxley, David) (Entered: 12/19/2013)
                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 101 Filed: 12/17/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                        RESPONSE GOVERNMENT'S LIMITED REPLY TO DEFENDANTS JOINT RESPONSE IN OPPOSITION TO GOVERNMENTS SECOND MOTION FOR A PROTECTIVE ORDER, re 100 Response in Opposition to Motion by USA as to GUOQING CAO, SHUYU LI. (Ridgeway, Cynthia) (Entered: 12/17/2013)
                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 100 Filed: 12/16/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                          RESPONSE in Opposition re 98 Second MOTION FOR A PROTECTIVE ORDER PURSUANT TO 18 U.S.C. § 1835 and FEDERAL RULE OF CRIMINAL PROCEDURE RULE 16(d)(1) by GUOQING CAO, SHUYU LI (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A-Defendants' Proposed Protective Order, # 2 Exhibit B-Government's Proposed Protective Order, # 3 Exhibit C-November 21, 2013 Letter to Assistant United States Attorney Ridgeway)(Hensel, David) (Entered: 12/16/2013)
                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 99 Filed: 12/16/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE OF SUBMISSION OF ATTACHMENT by USA as to GUOQING CAO, SHUYU LI re 98 Second MOTION FOR A PROTECTIVE ORDER PURSUANT TO 18 U.S.C. § 1835 and FEDERAL RULE OF CRIMINAL PROCEDURE RULE 16(d)(1) (Ridgeway, Cynthia) (Entered: 12/16/2013)
                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 98 Filed: 12/16/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                              Second MOTION FOR A PROTECTIVE ORDER PURSUANT TO 18 U.S.C. § 1835 and FEDERAL RULE OF CRIMINAL PROCEDURE RULE 16(d)(1) by USA as to GUOQING CAO, SHUYU LI. (Ridgeway, Cynthia) (Entered: 12/16/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 97 Filed: 12/5/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                SCHEDULING ORDER as to GUOQING CAO, SHUYU LI: This matter is hereby scheduled for a status conference on Tuesday, December 17, 2013 at 2:30 p.m. in Courtroom 202 of the U.S. Courthouse, 46 East Ohio Street, Indianapolis, Indiana. Defendants need not appear in person. Out of state counsel may participate by phone. Please call (317) 229-3610 to participate. Signed by Judge William T. Lawrence on 12/5/2013. (JHO) (Entered: 12/05/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 96 Filed: 11/27/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                  RESPONSE in Opposition re 91 MOTION TO CLARIFY CONDITIONS OF RELEASE, 94 MOTION For Clarification of Conditions of Release by USA as to GUOQING CAO, SHUYU LI (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Customs & Border Protection flight records summary, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Ridgeway, Cynthia) (Entered: 11/27/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 95 Filed: 11/27/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER - This cause is before the Court on Defendants Guoquing Cao (1) and Shuyu Li's (2) motions for clarification of conditions of release (dkt. nos. 91 , 94 ). Both Defendants seek permission from this Court for a 12-hour leave for the Thanksgiving holiday. The Court, being duly advised, DENIES both of their requests for leave. The Court takes the remainder of Defendant Li's motion--his request to reside on a different floor at the VOA--under advisement at this time. Signed by Judge William T. Lawrence on 11/27/2013. (JKS) (Entered: 11/27/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 94 Filed: 11/26/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION For Clarification of Conditions of Release by GUOQING CAO. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Hensel, David) (Entered: 11/26/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 93 Filed: 11/26/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER granting 88 Motion to Continue as to GUOQING CAO (1), SHUYU LI (2): IT IS THEREFORE ORDERED, that the trial scheduled for December 2, 2013, is hereby vacated, and rescheduled for the 19th day of May, 2014, beginning at 9:00 a.m. in Courtroom 202. A Pretrial Conference is scheduled for January 16, 2014 at 1:00 p.m.; and a Final Pretrial Conference is scheduled for April 17, 2014, at 1:00 p.m. Both conferences shall be held in Courtroom 202. Defendants shall appear by person. Signed by Judge William T. Lawrence on 11/26/2013.(DW) (Entered: 11/26/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 92 Filed: 11/26/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: William J. Barkimer appearing for GUOQING CAO (Retained). (Barkimer, William) (Entered: 11/26/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 90 Filed: 11/22/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                            TRANSCRIPT of Hearing on Defendants' Motion for Independent Review and Motion in Support of Revocation of Detention Order as to GUOQING CAO, SHUYU LI held on November 5, 2013 before Judge William T. Lawrence. (69 pages.) Court Reporter/Transcriber: Cathy Jones (Telephone: (317) 423-0436). Please review Local Rule 80-2 for more information on redaction procedures. Redaction Statement due 12/13/2013. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 2/20/2014. (Jones, Cathy) Released on 2/20/2014 (SWM). (Entered: 11/22/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 89 Filed: 11/22/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE of FILING of OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Hearing on Defendant's Motion for Independent Review and Motion in Support of Revocation of Detention Order held before Judge William T. Lawrence on November 5, 2013 in case as to GUOQING CAO, SHUYU LI (Jones, Cathy) (Entered: 11/22/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 88 Filed: 11/22/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                Joint MOTION to Continue Trial by USA, GUOQING CAO, SHUYU LI as to GUOQING CAO, SHUYU LI. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Hensel, David) (Entered: 11/22/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 87 Filed: 11/8/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER granting 40 Defendant Cao's Motion for an Independent Review and granting 46 Defendant Li's Motion in Support of Revocation of Detention Order. The Court orders the Defendants released from custody pursuant to the conditions set forth in the order. ***SEE ORDER FOR CONDITIONS*** Additional conditions of release will be set under separate order. Signed by Judge William T. Lawrence on 11/8/2013.(JHO) (Entered: 11/08/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 86 Filed: 11/5/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                    Receipt for $30.00, Pro Hac Vice Fee, RECEIPT # IP038014, received from Pence Hensel LLC on behalf of MATTHEW S. ADAMS, re 81 Motion to Appear, as to GUOQING CAO (1) (JKS) (Entered: 11/06/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 85 Filed: 11/6/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                      MINUTE ORDER for hearing on potential conflict of interest held on 11/01/13 before Judge William T. Lawrence: Defendant GUOQING CAO appears in person and by retained counsel David Hensel and Alain Leibman. Appearance for the USA by AUSA Cynthia Ridgeway. Court reviews evidence and hears argument. Court concludes no actual or potential conflict exists. Defendant is remanded to custody of USM. Signed by Judge William T. Lawrence. (Court Reporter Cathy Jones) (JHO) (Entered: 11/06/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 84 Filed: 11/5/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                        REDACTION STATEMENT in case as to GUOQING CAO re 43 Transcript filed by attorney David J. Hensel (Hensel, David) (Entered: 11/05/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 83 Filed: 11/5/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER granting 81 Motion for Matthew S. Adams to Appear pro hac vice as to GUOQING CAO (1). Signed by Judge William T. Lawrence on 11/5/2013.(JHO) (Entered: 11/05/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 81 Filed: 11/4/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION for Attorney Matthew S. Adams to Appear pro hac vice. (No fee paid with this filing) by GUOQING CAO. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A-Certification of Matthew S. Adams, # 2 Text of Proposed Order Order)(Hensel, David) (Entered: 11/04/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 80 Filed: 11/4/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                              RESPONSE in Opposition re 67 MOTION to Seal a Document by GUOQING CAO Response to Government's Ex Parte Request for Protective Order (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A-Stipulated Interim Protective Order)(Hensel, David) (Entered: 11/04/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 79 Filed: 11/1/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                RESPONSE in Opposition re 40 MOTION For An Independent Review, 46 MOTION by USA as to GUOQING CAO, SHUYU LI (Ridgeway, Cynthia) (Entered: 11/01/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 78 Filed: 11/1/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER granting 75 Motion to Seal Document Number 74 as to GUOQING CAO (1). Signed by Judge William T. Lawrence on 11/1/2013.(SWM) (Entered: 11/01/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 77 Filed: 11/1/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER granting USA's 76 Motion to file an oversize brief in response to defts' brief in support of their request to revoke Magistrate Mark J. Dinsmore's Order of pretrial detention as to GUOQING CAO (1) and SHUYU LI (2). Signed by Judge William T. Lawrence on 11/1/2013.(SWM) (Entered: 11/01/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 76 Filed: 10/31/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION TO FILE OVERSIZE BRIEF by USA as to GUOQING CAO, SHUYU LI. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Ridgeway, Cynthia) (Entered: 10/31/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Sealed Legal Document 75 Filed: 10/31/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION to Seal a Document 74 SEALED Document (Sealed - entry) by GUOQING CAO. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Hensel, David) (Entered: 10/31/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 73 Filed: 10/31/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                          REDACTION by GUOQING CAO to 40 MOTION For An Independent Review filed by GUOQING CAO (Hensel, David) (Entered: 10/31/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 72 Filed: 10/30/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                            SCHEDULING ORDER as to GUOQING CAO, SHUYU LI: The Court shall conduct a hearing on the Defendant Cao's Motion for an Independent Review (dkt. 40) and Defendant Li's Motion in Support of Revocation of Detention Order (dkt. 46) on Tuesday, November 5, 2013 at 2:00 p.m. in Courtroom 202 of the United States Courthouse, 46 East Ohio Street, Indianapolis, Indiana. Signed by Judge William T. Lawrence on 10/30/2013. (JHO) (Entered: 10/30/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 71 Filed: 10/29/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER as to GUOQING CAO, SHUYU LI: The Court, having considered the government's ex parte request for a Protective Order in discovery and its request for an enlargement of time to provide Rule 16 discovery, and in order to prevent the unnecessary and irreparably harmful disclosure of Eli Lilly & Company owned trade secrets, while still preserving the defendants' right to a fair trial and meaningful discovery, and pursuant to the Court's authority under Title 18, United States Code, Section 1835 and Federal Rule of Criminal Procedure 16(d)(1), HEREBY orders the defendants to file any objections to the terms as set forth below no later than the 4th day of November, 2013. If no objections are received, the Court is prepared to grant the government's motion and adopt the government's proposed INTERIM PROTECTIVE ORDER ***SEE ORDER FOR ADDITIONAL INFORMATION***. Signed by Judge William T. Lawrence on 10/29/2013. (DW) (Entered: 10/29/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 70 Filed: 10/29/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER granting 67 Motion to Seal Document as to GUOQING CAO (1): The Court, having reviewed the motion to seal filed by the United States of America ("the government"), requesting its Motion For a Protective Order And An Enlargement Of Time To Provide Rule 16 Discovery, pursuant to Local Rule 5-11, now grants the government's motion and ORDERS the Clerk of Courts to maintain Document 63 submitted ex parte UNDER SEAL. Signed by Judge William T. Lawrence on 10/29/2013.(DW) (Entered: 10/29/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 69 Filed: 10/29/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER granting 64 Motion to Seal Document as to GUOQING CAO (1). The Court, having reviewed the motion to seal filed by the United States of America ("the government"), requesting its Motion For a Hearing Regarding an Unforeseen Potential Conflict of Interest, pursuant to Local Rule 5-11, now grants the government's motion and ORDERS the Clerk of Courts to maintain Document 62 UNDER SEAL. Signed by Judge William T. Lawrence on 10/29/2013.(DW) (Entered: 10/29/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 68 Filed: 10/29/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER granting 62 Sealed Motion for Hearing as to GUOQING CAO (1); Motion Hearing set for 11/1/2013 01:00 PM in room #202, United States Courthouse, 46 E. Ohio Street, Indianapolis, Indiana before Judge William T. Lawrence. Hearing shall be closed to the public. Only counsel and defendant in attendance. Signed by Judge William T. Lawrence on 10/29/2013.(JHO) (Entered: 10/29/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 67 Filed: 10/28/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION to Seal a Document by USA as to GUOQING CAO, SHUYU LI. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Ridgeway, Cynthia) (Entered: 10/28/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 66 Filed: 10/28/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Submission of Proposed Order by USA as to GUOQING CAO, SHUYU LI. (Ridgeway, Cynthia) (Entered: 10/28/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 64 Filed: 10/28/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION to Seal a Document 62 SEALED MOTION FOR A HEARING REGARDING AN UNFORESEEN POTENTIAL CONFLICT OF INTEREST by USA as to GUOQING CAO. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Ridgeway, Cynthia) (Entered: 10/28/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 61 Filed: 10/22/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER granting 58 Motion for Leave to File Oversize Brief as to GUOQING CAO (1). Signed by Judge William T. Lawrence on 10/22/2013.(SWM) (Entered: 10/22/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 60 Filed: 10/22/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER granting 57 Motion to Seal Memorandum In Support of Motion for Independent Review of Detention Order and its accompanying exhibits. Signed by Judge William T. Lawrence on 10/22/2013.(SWM) (Entered: 10/22/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 58 Filed: 10/21/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages by GUOQING CAO. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order Order Granting Motion for Excess Pages)(Hensel, David) (Entered: 10/21/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Sealed Legal Document 57 Filed: 10/21/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION to Seal a Case , First MOTION to Seal a Document 56 SEALED Document (Sealed - entry) Memo in Support of his Motion for Independent Review of Detention Order by GUOQING CAO. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order Order Granting Motion to Seal)(Hensel, David) (Entered: 10/21/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 55 Filed: 10/21/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER granting USA's 54 Motion for Extension of Time to File its brief in response to the defendants' brief in support of their request to revoke Magistrate Mark J. Dinsmore's Order of pretrial detention. as to GUOQING CAO (1) and SHUYU LI (2) to 11/4/2013. If desired, the defendants may file a reply brief on or before 11/11/2013. A hearing on the motion may be scheduled thereafter under a separate Order. Signed by Judge William T. Lawrence on 10/21/2013.(SWM) (Entered: 10/21/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 54 Filed: 10/21/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION for Extension of Time to FILE RESPONSIVE BRIEF TO DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO REVOKE MAGISTRATE DINSMORE'S ORDER OF PRETRIAL DETENTION by USA as to GUOQING CAO, SHUYU LI. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Ridgeway, Cynthia) (Entered: 10/21/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 51 Filed: 10/16/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Mail Returned as undeliverable. 33 SEALED Order. (SWM) (Entered: 10/17/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 10/16/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER granting Parties' 48 Joint Motion for Release of Pretrial Services Reports as to GUOQING CAO (1), SHUYU LI (2); granting 49 Motion as to GUOQING CAO (1). Signed by Judge William T. Lawrence on 10/16/2013.(SWM) (Entered: 10/16/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 10/16/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Joint MOTION For Release of Pretrial Services Report by GUOQING CAO as to GUOQING CAO, SHUYU LI. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Hensel, David) (Entered: 10/16/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 10/16/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Joint MOTION For Release of Pretrial Services Report by GUOQING CAO as to GUOQING CAO, SHUYU LI. (Hensel, David) (Entered: 10/16/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 10/15/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER granting 37 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney ALAIN LEIBMAN for GUOQING CAO (1). Signed by Judge William T. Lawrence on 10/15/2013.(JKS) (Entered: 10/15/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 10/15/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE of FILING of OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Detention Hearing held before Magistrate Judge Mark J. Dinsmore on 10/08/2013 in case as to GUOQING CAO, SHUYU LI (Moxley, David) (Entered: 10/15/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 10/15/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    *** SEE DKT. NUMBER 103 FOR REDACTED TRANSCRIPT *** TRANSCRIPT of Detention Hearing as to GUOQING CAO, SHUYU LI held on 10/08/2013 before Magistrate Judge Mark J. Dinsmore. (88 pages.) Court Reporter/Transcriber: David Moxley (Telephone: (317) 916-8209). Please review Local Rule 80-2 for more information on redaction procedures. Redaction Statement due 11/5/2013. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 1/13/2014. (Moxley, David) Modified on 1/13/2014 (SWM). (Entered: 10/15/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 10/11/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ENTRY and ORDER granting 34 Motion for Pretrial Detention as to GUOQING CAO (1) and SHUYU LI (2). Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark J. Dinsmore on 10/11/2013.(CBU) (Entered: 10/11/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 10/11/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER granting 40 Motion for Independent Reviewas to GUOQING CAO (1): Defendant's brief shall be filed on or before 10/21/13, govt's response due on or before 10/28/13, defendant's reply brief, if desired, to be filed on or before 11/01/13. Hearing to be set under separate order. Signed by Judge William T. Lawrence on 10/11/2013.(JHO) (Entered: 10/11/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 10/11/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION For An Independent Review by GUOQING CAO as to GUOQING CAO, SHUYU LI. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Hensel, David) (Entered: 10/11/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 10/9/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MINUTE ORDER for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Mark J. Dinsmore: Detention Hearing as to GUOQING CAO, SHUYU LI held on 10/8/2013. Defendant GUOQING CAO appears in person and by retained counsel David Hensel. Defendant Shuyu Li appears in person and by retained counsel Scott Newman. Appearance for the USA by AUSA Cynthia Ridgeway. USPO represented by Mandy Burton. Government orally moved to unseal the case file as to both defendants and the same granted. Detention hearing held. Testimony presented and proffered. Court's Exhibits A and B admitted. Government's Exhibit 1 admitted. Defendant Cao's Exhibit 1 admitted. Arguments made. Court grants Government's written motion for pretrial detention 34 and orders defendants detained. Defendants remanded to the custody of the U.S. Marshals.Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark J. Dinsmore. (BAS) (Entered: 10/09/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 10/9/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Receipt No. IP037661 for the pro hac vice admission fee of Attorney Alain Leibman in the amount of $30.00 as to GUOQING CAO. (DJH) (Entered: 10/09/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 10/9/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION for Attorney Alain Leibman to Appear pro hac vice. (No fee paid with this filing) by GUOQING CAO. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Addidavit in Support of pro hac vice admission, # 2 Text of Proposed Order Order granting pro hac vice admission)(Hensel, David) (Entered: 10/09/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 10/9/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER - granting 35 Motion to Withdraw Attorney Appearance. G. Allen Lidy and Roscoe Stovall, Jr withdrawn from case. as to GUOQING CAO (1). Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark J. Dinsmore on 10/9/2013.(CKM) (Entered: 10/09/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 10/8/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION to Withdraw Attorney Appearance by G. ALLEN LIDY and ROSCOE STOVALL, JR, by GUOQING CAO (1). (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(JKS) (Entered: 10/08/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 10/8/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION for PRETRIAL DETENTION by USA as to GUOQING CAO, SHUYU LI. (Ridgeway, Cynthia) (Entered: 10/08/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 10/7/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: David J. Hensel appearing for GUOQING CAO (Retained). (DW) (Entered: 10/07/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 10/3/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MINUTE ORDER for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Mark J. Dinsmore: Initial Appearance on Superseding Indictment held on 10/2/2013. Defendant GUOQING CAO appears in person with assistance by FCD counsel Joe Cleary. Appearance for the USA by AUSA Cynthia Ridgeway. USPO represented by Audrey Veneck. Charges, Rights and Penalties explained. Parties ordered to meet and confer regarding disclosure of evidence on or before 10/31/13. Government orally moved for pretrial detention and a hearing was granted. Detention Hearing set for 10/8/2013 02:30 PM in room #243. Defendant waived formal arraignment. Government orally moved for the defendant to have restrictions while in U.S. Marshal Custody and the same granted. Defendant is not to have any contact with (a) current or former employees of Eli Lilly and Company, (b) co-defendant Shuyu LI, and (c) current or former employees of defendant's current employer, Jiangsu Hengrui Medicine Company. Additionally, defendant is not to access any internet connected device. Defendant's lawyer may advise defendant's current employer of defendant's arrest only. File is to remain sealed. Defendant is remanded to custody of USM. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark J. Dinsmore. (BAS) (Entered: 10/07/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 10/4/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: G. Allen Lidy appearing for GUOQING CAO (Retained). (DW) (Entered: 10/04/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 10/2/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Arrest Warrant Returned by US Marshal. Service of Warrant EXECUTED on 10/1/2013 in case as to GUOQING CAO. (CKM) (Entered: 10/04/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 10/3/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Roscoe Stovall, Jr appearing for GUOQING CAO (Retained). (JKS) (Entered: 10/03/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 8/15/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ENTRY FOR AUGUST 15, 2013 as to GUOQING CAO, SHUYU LI: The defendants have not appeared before a judicial officer of this court. Accordingly, the trial of these defendants scheduled for September 16, 2013 is VACATED. A new trial date will be scheduled when there has been an appearance before a judicial officer.(DW) (Entered: 08/15/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 8/14/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE Cynthia J. Ridgeway appearing for USA. (DW) (Entered: 08/15/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Sealed Legal Document 13 Filed: 8/14/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      SEALED SUPERSEDING INDICTMENT ***REDACTED*** as to GUOQING CAO (1) count(s) 1s-3s, 4s, 5s-7s, SHUYU LI (2) count(s) 4s, 5s-7s. Electronic Notice to USM. (DW) (Entered: 08/15/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 7/17/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTIFICATION of Assigned Judge, Automatic Not Guilty Plea, Trial Date, Discovery Order and Other Matters as to GUOQING CAO. Jury Trial set for 9/16/2013 at 9:00 AM in room #202, United States Courthouse, 46 E. Ohio Street, Indianapolis, Indiana before Judge William T. Lawrence. Signed by Judge William T. Lawrence on 7/17/2013. Electronic Notice to USM (DW) (Entered: 07/17/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 7/17/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE Cynthia J. Ridgeway appearing for USA. (DW) (Entered: 07/17/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Sealed Legal Document 1 Filed: 7/16/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            SEALED INDICTMENT ***REDACTED*** as to GUOQING CAO (1) count(s) 1-3, 4, 5-10, SHUYU LI (2) count(s) 4, 5-10. Electronic Notice to USM. (DW) (Entered: 07/16/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Statistics

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              This case has been viewed 808 times.

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Space
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                               
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Need Password Help?