Annastasiah Mhaka v. Genspera, Inc.
Appeal Court of Appeals for the Fourth Circuit, Case No. 14-2119

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated December 20, 2016 at 11:46 PM EST (5 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Space Space

Nature of Suit 3830 - Property Rights: Patent
  Entries (13) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 11/3/2014, Entered: None
ORDER filed [999468360] granting Motion to consolidate case (Local Rule 12(b)) [999466959-2] in 14-2118.. Copies to all parties.. [14-2118, 14-2119] (RHS)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 10/31/2014, Entered: None
    DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS (Local Rule 26.1) by Appellee Genspera, Inc.. Was any question on Disclosure Form answered yes? No [999467200] [14-2119] John Nilsson
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 10/31/2014, Entered: None
      APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL (Local Rule 46(c)) by Seth I. Heller for Genspera, Inc..[999467192] [14-2119] Seth Heller
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 10/31/2014, Entered: None
        APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL (Local Rule 46(c)) by John E. Nilsson for Genspera, Inc..[999467188] [14-2119] John Nilsson
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 10/31/2014, Entered: None
          Initial mediation conference scheduled. [14-2118, 14-2119] (SLW)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 10/31/2014, Entered: None
            DOCKETING STATEMENT by Appellant Annastasiah Mudiwa Mhaka. [14-2119] Ezra Gollogly
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 10/31/2014, Entered: None
              DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS (Local Rule 26.1) by Appellant Annastasiah Mudiwa Mhaka. Was any question on Disclosure Form answered yes? No [999466967] [14-2119] Ezra Gollogly
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 10/31/2014, Entered: None
                APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL (Local Rule 46(c)) by Ezra S. Gollogly for Annastasiah Mudiwa Mhaka.[999466964] [14-2119] Ezra Gollogly
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 10/31/2014, Entered: None
                  APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL (Local Rule 46(c)) by Philip M. Andrews for Annastasiah Mudiwa Mhaka.[999466963] [14-2119] Ezra Gollogly
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 10/31/2014, Entered: None
                    APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL (Local Rule 46(c)) by Spencer Hosie for Annastasiah Mudiwa Mhaka.[999466961] [14-2119] Ezra Gollogly
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 10/24/2014, Entered: None
                      NOTICE re: Withdrawal of Appearance by Annastasiah Mudiwa Mhaka. [14-2119] Ezra Gollogly
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 10/17/2014, Entered: None
                        DOCKETING NOTICE issued Re: [1] case docketed Initial forms due within 14 days. Originating case number: 1:12-cv-03302-MJG.. [14-2119] (RHS)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 10/17/2014, Entered: None
                          Case docketed. Originating case number: 1:12-cv-03302-MJG. Case manager: RSewell. [14-2119] (RHS)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF

                            Statistics

                            This case has been viewed 230 times.

                            No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                            Space
                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                             
                            PlainSite
                            Sign Up
                            Need Password Help?