Genspera, Inc. v. Annastasiah Mhaka
Appeal Court of Appeals for the Fourth Circuit, Case No. 14-2118

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated December 21, 2016 at 3:18 AM EST (5.1 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Space Space

Nature of Suit 3830 - Property Rights: Patent
  Entries (29) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00405284488
    Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00405210879 Filed: 10/31/2014, Entered: None
    (ENTRY RESTRICTED) APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL (Local Rule 46(c)) by Ezra S. Gollogly for Annastasiah Mudiwa Mhaka.[999466936] [14-2118] Ezra Gollogly
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31
        Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30
          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29
            Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28
              Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27
                Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26
                  Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25
                    Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24
                      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22
                        Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21
                          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20
                            Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19
                              Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18
                                Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 11/3/2014, Entered: None
                                ORDER filed [999468360] granting Motion to consolidate case (Local Rule 12(b)) [11] in 14-2118.. Copies to all parties.. [14-2118, 14-2119] (RHS)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 10/31/2014, Entered: None
                                  DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS (Local Rule 26.1) by Appellee Genspera, Inc.. Was any question on Disclosure Form answered yes? No [999467185] [14-2118] John Nilsson
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 10/31/2014, Entered: None
                                    APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL (Local Rule 46(c)) by Seth I. Heller for Genspera, Inc..[999467178] [14-2118] Seth Heller
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 10/31/2014, Entered: None
                                      APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL (Local Rule 46(c)) by John E. Nilsson for Genspera, Inc..[999467174] [14-2118] John Nilsson
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 10/31/2014, Entered: None
                                        Initial mediation conference scheduled. [14-2118, 14-2119] (SLW)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 10/31/2014, Entered: None
                                          MOTION by Appellant Annastasiah Mudiwa Mhaka to consolidate case 14-2119 with 14-2118. Date and method of service: 10/31/2014 US mail, ecf. [999466959] [14-2118] Ezra Gollogly
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 10/31/2014, Entered: None
                                            DOCKETING STATEMENT by Appellant Annastasiah Mudiwa Mhaka. [14-2118] Ezra Gollogly
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 10/31/2014, Entered: None
                                              DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS (Local Rule 26.1) by Appellant Annastasiah Mudiwa Mhaka. Was any question on Disclosure Form answered yes? No [999466947] [14-2118] Ezra Gollogly
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 10/31/2014, Entered: None
                                                APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL (Local Rule 46(c)) by Spencer Hosie for Annastasiah Mudiwa Mhaka.[999466945] [14-2118] Ezra Gollogly
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 10/31/2014, Entered: None
                                                  APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL (Local Rule 46(c)) by Ezra S. Gollogly for Annastasiah Mudiwa Mhaka.[999466941] [14-2118] Ezra Gollogly
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 10/31/2014, Entered: None
                                                    APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL (Local Rule 46(c)) by Philip M. Andrews for Annastasiah Mudiwa Mhaka.[999466940] [14-2118] Ezra Gollogly
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 10/24/2014, Entered: None
                                                      NOTICE re: Withdrawal of Appearance by Annastasiah Mudiwa Mhaka. [14-2118] Ezra Gollogly
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 10/17/2014, Entered: None
                                                        DOCKETING NOTICE issued Re: [1] case docketed Initial forms due within 14 days. Originating case number: 1:12-cv-00772-MJG.. [14-2118] (RHS)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 10/17/2014, Entered: None
                                                          Case docketed. Originating case number: 1:12-cv-00772-MJG. Case manager: RSewell. [14-2118] (RHS)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                            Statistics

                                                            This case has been viewed 109 times.

                                                            No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                            Space
                                                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                             
                                                            PlainSite
                                                            Sign Up
                                                            Need Password Help?