Wright v. Meara et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit Massachusetts District Court, Case No. 1:04-cv-10211-RCL

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Suzanne Wright, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Cunningham, Machanic, Cetlin, Johnson & Harney LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Scott L. Machanic +1 781 237 7030 +1 508 653 0119 smachanic@cmlaw.net
v.
No Logo Brenda Meara, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Laredo & Smith, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Marc C. Laredo +1 617 367 7984 +1 617 367 6475 laredo@laredosmith.com
No Logo William Robert Meara, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Laredo & Smith, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Marc C. Laredo +1 617 367 7984 +1 617 367 6475 laredo@laredosmith.com
Office Boston
Filed 1/29/2004
Jury Demand Both
Demand
Nature of Suit 290 - Real Property: Other
Cause Section 28 U.S.C. § 1331(a) Fed. Question
Jurisdiction Diversity
Disposition Dismissed - Settled
County XX US, Outside State
Terminated 6/16/2005
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flag CLOSED
  Entries (69) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document 48 Filed: 8/16/2005, Entered: 8/16/2005 Stipulation of Dismissal
STIPULATION of Dismissal by Suzanne Wright, William Robert Meara, Brenda Meara. (Hourihan, Lisa)
    LREF
    Blank -- Filed: 8/16/2005, Entered: 8/16/2005 Order on Motion to Dismiss
    Judge Reginald C. Lindsay : Electronic ORDER entered terminating [47] Motion to Dismiss. This should have been efiled as a Stipulation of Dismissal as the attached document indicates. Clerk to make a separate entry attaching the stipulation of dismissal. (Hourihan, Lisa)
      LREF
      Blank -- Filed: 8/3/2005, Entered: 8/3/2005 Order on Motion to Vacate
      Judge Reginald C. Lindsay : Electronic ORDER entered granting [46] Joint Motion to Vacate Settlement Order of Dismissal (York, Steve)
        LREF
        Legal Document 47 Filed: 7/28/2005, Entered: 7/28/2005, Terminated: 8/16/2005 Motion to Dismiss
        Joint MOTION to Dismiss by Suzanne Wright.(Machanic, Scott)
          LREF
          Legal Document 46 Filed: 7/28/2005, Entered: 7/28/2005, Terminated: 8/3/2005 Motion to Vacate
          Joint MOTION to Vacate [45] Settlement Order of Dismissal by Suzanne Wright.(Machanic, Scott)
            LREF
            Legal Document 45 Filed: 6/16/2005, Entered: 6/16/2005 Settlement Order of DismissalCourt Filing
            Judge Reginald C. Lindsay : ORDER entered. SETTLEMENT ORDER OF DISMISSAL (Hourihan, Lisa)
              LREF
              Blank -- Filed: 6/16/2005, Entered: 6/16/2005 Terminated Case
              Civil Case Terminated. (Hourihan, Lisa)
                LREF
                Blank -- Filed: 6/16/2005, Entered: 6/16/2005 Remark
                Telephone message from Scott Machanic, Esq. and Marc Laredo, Esq. Case reported settled. Counsel request a 60 day Settlement Order of Dismissal. (Hourihan, Lisa)
                  LREF
                  Blank -- Filed: 6/2/2005, Entered: 6/2/2005 Order on Motion for Extension of Time
                  Judge Reginald C. Lindsay : Electronic ORDER entered granting [40] Motion for Extension of Time to File Response to Motion to Compel to 6/30/05. (Hourihan, Lisa)
                    LREF
                    Legal Document 40 Filed: 6/1/2005, Entered: 6/1/2005, Terminated: 6/2/2005 Motion for Extension of Time
                    Assented to MOTION for Extension of Time to June 30, 2005 to respond to plaintiff's motion to compel production of documents by William Robert Meara, Brenda Meara.(Laredo, Marc)
                      LREF
                      Blank -- Filed: 6/1/2005, Entered: 6/1/2005 Notice of correction to docket made by Court staff.
                      Notice of correction to docket made by Court staff. Correction: Documents No. 42 and 43 were terminatedbecause they should not have been placed on the docket (Patch, Christine)
                        LREF
                        Blank -- Filed: 6/1/2005, Entered: 6/1/2005 Terminate Documents
                        Documents terminated: [42] Response filed by William Robert Meara,, Brenda Meara,, [43] Response filed by William Robert Meara,, Brenda Meara,. (Patch, Christine)
                          LREF
                          Legal Document 44 Filed: 5/31/2005, Entered: 6/1/2005 Certificate of Consultation
                          CERTIFICATE OF CONSULTATION re [41] MOTION to Compel by Scott L. Machanic on behalf of Suzanne Wright. (Patch, Christine)
                            LREF
                            Legal Document 43 Filed: 5/31/2005, Entered: 6/1/2005 Response
                            Response to Plaintiff's Second Request for Production of Documents by William Robert Meara, Brenda Meara. (Patch, Christine)
                              LREF
                              Legal Document 42 Filed: 5/31/2005, Entered: 6/1/2005 Response
                              Response to Plaintiff's First Request for Production of Documents, by William Robert Meara, Brenda Meara. (Patch, Christine) Modified on 6/1/2005 (Patch, Christine).
                                LREF
                                Legal Document 41 Filed: 5/31/2005, Entered: 6/1/2005 Motion to Compel
                                MOTION to Compel Production of Documents by Suzanne Wright.(Patch, Christine)
                                  LREF
                                  Legal Document 39 Filed: 5/13/2005, Entered: 5/16/2005 Notice of Withdrawal of Appearance
                                  NOTICE of Withdrawal of Appearance Attorney Lisa J. Cooney terminated. (Stanhope, Don)
                                    LREF
                                    Blank -- Filed: 1/12/2005, Entered: 1/13/2005 Scheduling Conference
                                    ElectronicClerk's Notes for proceedings held before Judge Reginald C. Lindsay : Scheduling Conference held on 1/12/2005. Automatic disclosure due by 1/21/05. Fact discovery due by 8/19/05. Amended Pleadings due by 7/19/2005. Expert disclosure due by 10/14/05. Discovery due by 12/16/2005. Joinder of Parties due by 7/19/2005. Motions due by 1/24/2006. Responses due by 2/24/06. Motion for leave to file reply due by 3/10/06.(Court Reporter None Present.) (Hourihan, Lisa)
                                      LREF
                                      Legal Document 38 Filed: 1/7/2005, Entered: 1/7/2005 Joint statement re scheduling conference
                                      JOINT STATEMENT re scheduling conference. (Machanic, Scott)
                                        LREF
                                        Legal Document 37 Filed: 12/7/2004, Entered: 12/7/2004 Notice of Scheduling ConferenceCourt Filing
                                        NOTICE of Scheduling Conference Scheduling Conference set for 1/12/2005 02:30 PM in Courtroom 11 before Judge Reginald C. Lindsay. (Hourihan, Lisa)
                                          LREF
                                          Blank -- Filed: 12/6/2004, Entered: 12/7/2004 Motion Hearing
                                          Electronic Clerk's Notes for proceedings held before Judge Reginald C. Lindsay : Motion Hearing held on 12/6/2004 re [27] MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings filed by William Robert Meara, Brenda Meara. The motion is granted as to Count III of the second amended complaint and denied as to other counts of the complaint. The dismissal of Count III is without prejudice to a later motion by the plaintiff to amend the complaint to add a breach of contract claim. (Court Reporter D. Joyce.) (Hourihan, Lisa)
                                            LREF
                                            Blank -- Filed: 12/6/2004, Entered: 12/6/2004 Order on Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings
                                            Judge Reginald C. Lindsay : electronic ORDER entered granting in part and denying in part [27] Defendant's Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings. The motion is granted as to count III of the second amended complaint (the "complaint") and denied as to all other counts of the complaint. The ruling as to count III is without prejudice to a later motion by the plaintiff to amend the complaint to add a claim for breach of contract. The reasons for these rulings were stated on the record at the hearing on the motion on December 6, 2004. The clerk shall set this case for a scheduling conference at the earliest available date. (Lindsay, Reginald)
                                              LREF
                                              Blank -- Filed: 11/2/2004, Entered: 11/2/2004 Notice of correction to docket made by Court staff.
                                              Notice of correction to docket made by Court staff. Status Conference deadline for 11/15/04 cancelled at the request of counsel. (Hourihan, Lisa)
                                                LREF
                                                Legal Document 36 Filed: 11/1/2004, Entered: 11/1/2004 Notice of Hearing on MotionCourt Filing
                                                NOTICE of Hearing on Motion [27] MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings: Motion Hearing set for 12/6/2004 03:00 PM in Courtroom 11 before Judge Reginald C. Lindsay. (Hourihan, Lisa)
                                                  LREF
                                                  Blank -- Filed: 11/1/2004, Entered: 11/1/2004 Set/Reset Hearings
                                                  Set/Reset Hearings: Status Conference set for 11/15/2004 02:30 PM in Courtroom 11 before Judge Reginald C. Lindsay. (Hourihan, Lisa)
                                                    LREF
                                                    Blank -- Filed: 10/30/2004, Entered: 10/30/2004 Order on Motion to Take Deposition
                                                    Judge Reginald C. Lindsay : electronic ORDER entered granting [33] motion for leave to take deposition. The court will address the pending dispositive motion as soon as its schedule permits. In the meantime, the clerk shall schedule a status conference. (Lindsay, Reginald)
                                                      LREF
                                                      Legal Document 35 Filed: 10/18/2004, Entered: 10/18/2004 Opposition to Motion
                                                      Opposition re [33] MOTION to Take Deposition from Hingham Centre, Ltd. Defendants William Robert Meara and Brenda Meara's Opposition to Plaintiffs Motion for Status Conference and for Leave to take Deposition filed by Brenda Meara, William Robert Meara. (Cooney, Lisa)
                                                        LREF
                                                        Legal Document 34 Filed: 10/13/2004, Entered: 10/13/2004 Memorandum in Support of Motion
                                                        MEMORANDUM in Support re [33] MOTION to Take Deposition from Hingham Centre, Ltd. w/ cert. conf. and cert. serv. filed by Suzanne Wright. (Machanic, Scott)
                                                          LREF
                                                          Legal Document 33 Filed: 10/13/2004, Entered: 10/13/2004, Terminated: 10/30/2004 Motion to Take Deposition
                                                          MOTION to Take Deposition from Hingham Centre, Ltd. by Suzanne Wright.(Machanic, Scott)
                                                            LREF
                                                            Legal Document 32 Filed: 8/4/2004, Entered: 8/5/2004 Certification pursuant to Local Rule 16.1
                                                            Plaintiff's CERTIFICATION pursuant to Local Rule 16.1 by Suzanne Wright.(Stanhope, Don)
                                                              LREF
                                                              Legal Document 31 Filed: 7/26/2004, Entered: 7/27/2004 Certificate of Consultation
                                                              CERTIFICATE OF CONSULTATION by Lisa J. Cooney on behalf of Brenda Meara, William Robert Meara. c/s. (Bell, Marie)
                                                                LREF
                                                                Legal Document 30 Filed: 7/6/2004, Entered: 7/6/2004 Opposition to Motion
                                                                Opposition re [27] MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings filed by Suzanne Wright. (Machanic, Scott)
                                                                  LREF
                                                                  Legal Document 29 Filed: 7/2/2004, Entered: 7/2/2004 Joint statement re scheduling conference
                                                                  JOINT STATEMENT re scheduling conference. (Machanic, Scott)
                                                                    LREF
                                                                    Legal Document 28 Filed: 6/28/2004, Entered: 6/29/2004 Memorandum in Support of Motion
                                                                    MEMORANDUM of Law in Support of [27] MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings filed by Brenda Meara, William Robert Meara. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A-C NOT SCANNED)(Stanhope, Don)
                                                                      LREF
                                                                      Legal Document 27 Filed: 6/28/2004, Entered: 6/29/2004 Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings
                                                                      Defendant's MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings by Brenda Meara, William Robert Meara. (Attachments: # (1))(Stanhope, Don)
                                                                        LREF
                                                                        Legal Document 26 Filed: 5/25/2004, Entered: 5/25/2004 Notice of Scheduling ConferenceCourt Filing
                                                                        NOTICE of Scheduling Conference Scheduling Conference set for 7/14/2004 02:00 PM in Courtroom 11 before Judge Reginald C. Lindsay. (Hourihan, Lisa)
                                                                          LREF
                                                                          Legal Document 25 Filed: 5/17/2004, Entered: 5/20/2004 Answer to Amended Complaint
                                                                          ANSWER to Second Amended Complaint by Brenda Meara.(Stanhope, Don)
                                                                            LREF
                                                                            Legal Document 24 Filed: 5/17/2004, Entered: 5/20/2004 Answer to Amended Complaint
                                                                            ANSWER to Second Amended Complaint by William Robert Meara.(Stanhope, Don)
                                                                              LREF
                                                                              Legal Document 23 Filed: 4/30/2004, Entered: 5/5/2004 ~Notice (other)
                                                                              Defendant's NOTICE that they do not Oppose Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to File Second Amended Complaint by Brenda Meara, William Robert Meara (Stanhope, Don)
                                                                                LREF
                                                                                Blank -- Filed: 4/30/2004, Entered: 4/30/2004 Order on Motion For Leave to File.
                                                                                Judge Reginald C. Lindsay : Electronic ORDER entered granting [17] MOTION for Leave to File second amended complaint by Suzanne Wright and [20] Motion for Extension of Time to Answer of Brenda Meara and William Robert Meara. (Lindsay, Reginald)
                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                  Blank -- Filed: 4/29/2004, Entered: 4/30/2004 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer
                                                                                  Judge Reginald C. Lindsay : Electronic ORDER entered granting [21] Motion for Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond to the Second Amended Complaint Brenda Meara, William Robert Meara. (Stanhope, Don)
                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document 21 Filed: 4/22/2004, Entered: 4/27/2004 Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer
                                                                                    ASSENTED TO MOTION for Extension of Time To Answer or Otherwise Respond to the Second Amended Complaint to 5/6/04 by Brenda Meara, William Robert Meara.(Stanhope, Don)
                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document 20 Filed: 4/15/2004, Entered: 4/20/2004 Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer
                                                                                      ASSENTED TO MOTION for Extension of Time to 4/23/04 to File Answer to Second Amended Complaint by Brenda Meara, William Robert Meara.(Stanhope, Don)
                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document 19 Filed: 4/13/2004, Entered: 4/15/2004 Certificate of Consultation
                                                                                        CERTIFICATE OF CONFERENCE re [17] MOTION for Leave to File by Suzanne Wright.;c/s (Stanhope, Don)
                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document 22 Filed: 4/7/2004, Entered: 5/3/2004 Amended Complaint
                                                                                          SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT (exhibits 1-6 scanned) against Brenda Meara, William Robert Meara , filed by Suzanne Wright. (Attachments: # (1) # (2))(Stanhope, Don)
                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document 18 Filed: 4/7/2004, Entered: 4/13/2004 Withdrawal of Motion
                                                                                          Withdrawal of motion: re [13] MOTION to Dismiss filed by William Robert Meara, Brenda Meara. (Stanhope, Don)
                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document 17 Filed: 4/7/2004, Entered: 4/9/2004 Motion for Leave to File
                                                                                            MOTION for Leave to File second amended complaint by Suzanne Wright.(Folan, Karen)
                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document 16 Filed: 4/6/2004, Entered: 4/9/2004 Opposition to Motion
                                                                                              Opposition re [13] MOTION to Dismiss filed by Suzanne Wright. (Folan, Karen)
                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                Blank -- Filed: 4/5/2004, Entered: 4/5/2004 Order on Motion for Writ
                                                                                                Judge Reginald C. Lindsay : electronic ORDER entered denying [4] Plaintiff's Motion for Writ of Attachment. (Lindsay, Reginald)
                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document 15 Filed: 3/25/2004, Entered: 3/26/2004 Memorandum in Support of Motion
                                                                                                  MEMORANDUM in Support re [13] MOTION to Dismiss filed by Brenda Meara, William Robert Meara; c/s. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A & B - NOT SCANNED)(Tebo, Susan)
                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                    Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                    Legal Document 14 Filed: 3/25/2004, Entered: 3/26/2004 Certificate of Consultation
                                                                                                    CERTIFICATE OF CONSULTATION re [13] MOTION to Dismiss by Lisa J. Cooney filed on behalf of Brenda Meara, William Robert Meara; c/s. (Tebo, Susan)
                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                      Legal Document 13 Filed: 3/25/2004, Entered: 3/26/2004 Motion to Dismiss
                                                                                                      MOTION to Dismiss filed by Brenda Meara, William Robert Meara; c/s.(Tebo, Susan)
                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document 12 Filed: 3/25/2004, Entered: 3/26/2004 Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                        Opposition re [4] MOTION for Writ filed by Brenda Meara, William Robert Meara; c/s. (Tebo, Susan)
                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                          Blank -- Filed: 3/15/2004, Entered: 3/15/2004 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Resp
                                                                                                          Judge Reginald C. Lindsay : Electronic ORDER entered granting [11] Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re [4] MOTION for Writ Responses due by 4/1/2004 (Hourihan, Lisa)
                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document 11 Filed: 3/9/2004, Entered: 3/12/2004 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Repl
                                                                                                            Assented to MOTION for Extension of Time to 4/1/04 to File Response as to [4] MOTION for Writ of Attachment by Brenda Meara, William Robert Meara. c/s.(Bell, Marie)
                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document 10 Filed: 3/8/2004, Entered: 3/9/2004 Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer
                                                                                                              ASSENTED-TO MOTION for Extension of Time to 4/1/04 to File Answer re [3] Amended Complaint .(Hourihan, Lisa)
                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document 9 Filed: 3/8/2004, Entered: 3/9/2004 Notice of Appearance/
                                                                                                                NOTICE of Appearance by Lisa J. Cooney, Marc C. Laredo on behalf of Brenda Meara, William Robert Meara (Hourihan, Lisa)
                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                  Blank -- Filed: 3/8/2004, Entered: 3/9/2004 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer
                                                                                                                  Judge Reginald C. Lindsay : Electronic ORDER entered granting [10] Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re [10] MOTION for Extension of Time to 4/1/04 to File Answer re [3] Amended Complaint Brenda Meara, William Robert Meara. (Hourihan, Lisa)
                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                    Legal Document 8 Filed: 2/25/2004, Entered: 2/26/2004 Summons Returned Executed
                                                                                                                    SUMMONS Returned Executed William Robert Meara served on 2/20/2004, answer due 3/11/2004. (Tebo, Susan)
                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                      Legal Document 7 Filed: 2/25/2004, Entered: 2/26/2004 Summons Returned Executed
                                                                                                                      SUMMONS Returned Executed Brenda Meara served on 2/20/2004, answer due 3/11/2004. (Tebo, Susan)
                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                        Legal Document 6 Filed: 2/24/2004, Entered: 2/25/2004 Remark
                                                                                                                        Request for Hearing on Plaintiff's Motion for Writ of Attachment, filed; c/s. (Tebo, Susan)
                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                          Legal Document 5 Filed: 2/23/2004, Entered: 2/25/2004 Affidavit
                                                                                                                          AFFIDAVIT of Scott L. Machanic re [4] MOTION for Writ Attachment filed by Suzanne Wright; c/s. (Tebo, Susan)
                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                            Legal Document 4 Filed: 2/23/2004, Entered: 2/25/2004 ~Motion for Writ
                                                                                                                            MOTION for Writ of Attachment filed by Suzanne Wright; c/s.(Tebo, Susan)
                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                              Legal Document 3 Filed: 1/29/2004, Entered: 2/13/2004 Amended Complaint
                                                                                                                              AMENDED COMPLAINT against Brenda Meara, William Robert Meara , filed by Suzanne Wright.(Tebo, Susan)
                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                Legal Document 2 Filed: 1/29/2004, Entered: 1/30/2004 Motion for TRO
                                                                                                                                MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order filed with Affidavit of Scott Machanic, Esq. by Suzanne Wright. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A- NOT SCANNED)(Tebo, Susan)
                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 1 Filed: 1/29/2004, Entered: 1/30/2004 Complaint
                                                                                                                                  COMPLAINT against Brenda Meara, William Robert Meara Filing fee: $ 150, receipt number 53465, filed by Suzanne Wright. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit 1 thru 6 - NOT SCANNED)(Tebo, Susan)
                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                  Blank -- Filed: 1/29/2004, Entered: 1/30/2004 Order on Motion for TRO
                                                                                                                                  Judge Reginald C. Lindsay : ELECTRONIC ORDER entered denying [2] Motion for TRO.....Motion denied. The court is without authority to grant the relief sought under Fed. R. Civ.P. 65. See Grupo Mexicano v Alliance Bond Fund, 119 S. Ct. 1961(1999). (Tebo, Susan)
                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                    Blank -- Filed: 1/29/2004, Entered: 1/30/2004 Magistrate Judge Assignment
                                                                                                                                    If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge Lawrence P. Cohen. (Tebo, Susan)
                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                      Blank -- Filed: 1/29/2004, Entered: 1/30/2004 Summons Issued
                                                                                                                                      Summons Issued as to Brenda Meara, William Robert Meara. (Tebo, Susan)
                                                                                                                                        LREF

                                                                                                                                        Statistics

                                                                                                                                        This case has been viewed 1,314 times.

                                                                                                                                        No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                        Space
                                                                                                                                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                         
                                                                                                                                        PlainSite
                                                                                                                                        Sign Up
                                                                                                                                        Need Password Help?