Merrimack Mutual Fire Insurance Company v. Applica Consumer Products, Inc.
Federal Civil Lawsuit Massachusetts District Court, Case No. 1:04-cv-10091-MBB

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Space Space

No Logo Merrimack Mutual Fire Insurance Company, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by buchananassoc.com Law Firm Placeholder

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space James T. Buchanan +1 781 255 0330 +1 781 255 0339 jtb@buchananassoc.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Clark, Hunt & Embry

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Michael B. Newman +1 617 494 1920 +1 617 494 1921 mnewman@chelaw.com
v.
No Logo Applica Consumer Products, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Wilson Elser Moskowitz Edelman & Dicker LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Geoffrey M. Coan +1 617 422 5300 +1 617 423 6917 geoffrey.coan@wilsonelser.com
Space Maynard M. Kirpalani +1 617 422 5300 +1 617 423 6917 maynard.kirpalani@wilsonelser.com
Office Boston
Filed 1/14/2004
Jury Demand Both
Demand
Nature of Suit 385 - Personal Property: Property Damage Product Liability
Cause Section 28 U.S.C. § 1332 Diversity-Petition for Removal
Jurisdiction Federal Question
Disposition Transfer/Remand - Transfer to Another District
County Plymouth
Terminated 4/6/2005
Origin
Reopened 2/7/2005
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flag CLOSED
  Entries (28) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document 20 Filed: 4/6/2005, Entered: 4/6/2005 Judgment*Court Filing
Judge Marianne B. Bowler : Electronic ORDER FOR FINAL JUDGEMENT ENTERED. It is hereby ORDERED THAT THIS ACTION BE DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE AND WITHOUT COSTS.(Feeney, Eileen)
    LREF
    Blank -- Filed: 4/5/2005, Entered: 4/5/2005 Case Reopened
    Case Reopened; Final judgment for this case was not docketed before the case was closed. (Saccoccio, Dianalynn)
      LREF
      Legal Document 19 Filed: 3/16/2005, Entered: 3/18/2005 Stipulation of Dismissal
      STIPULATION of Dismissal by Merrimack Mutual Fire Insurance Company, Applica Consumer Products, Inc.. (Simeone, Maria)
        LREF
        Legal Document 18 Filed: 2/7/2005, Entered: 2/7/2005 Notice of Settlement
        NOTICE of Settlement by Merrimack Mutual Fire Insurance Company, Applica Consumer Products, Inc. (Simeone, Maria)
          LREF
          Blank -- Filed: 12/6/2004, Entered: 12/6/2004 Order on Motion for Leave to Appear
          Judge Marianne B. Bowler: Electronic ORDER entered granting [17] Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (Bowler, Marianne)
            LREF
            Legal Document 17 Filed: 11/24/2004, Entered: 12/3/2004 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice
            MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Michael O'Brien by Applica Consumer Products, Inc..(Nici, Richard)
              LREF
              Legal Document 16 Filed: 11/24/2004, Entered: 12/3/2004 Affidavit
              AFFIDAVIT of H. Michael O'Brien by Applica Consumer Products, Inc.. (Nici, Richard)
                LREF
                Blank -- Filed: 10/27/2004, Entered: 10/27/2004 Status Conference
                Electronic Clerk's Notes for proceedings held before Magistate Judge Marianne B. Bowler: Status conference held on 10/27/2004; James Buchanan for the pltf. and Geoffrey Coan for the deft.; Parties address the status of the case and the court sets a status conference for 2/8/2005 at 10:45 AM. (Tape #Digital.) (Saccoccio, Dianalynn)
                  LREF
                  Legal Document 15 Filed: 10/25/2004, Entered: 11/3/2004 Notice of Appearance/
                  NOTICE of Appearance by Michael B. Newman on behalf of Merrimack Mutual Fire Insurance Company (Abaid, Kim)
                    LREF
                    Legal Document 14 Filed: 10/25/2004, Entered: 11/3/2004 Notice of Appearance/
                    NOTICE of Appearance by James T. Buchanan on behalf of Merrimack Mutual Fire Insurance Company (Abaid, Kim)
                      LREF
                      Legal Document 13 Filed: 10/25/2004, Entered: 11/3/2004 Notice of Withdrawal of Appearance
                      NOTICE of Withdrawal of Appearance Attorney Edward A. Prisby terminated. (Abaid, Kim)
                        LREF
                        Blank -- Filed: 10/25/2004, Entered: 10/25/2004 Set/Reset Hearings
                        Set/Reset Hearings: Status conference reset for 10/27/2004 at 3:00 PM in Courtroom 25 before Magistrate Judge Marianne B. Bowler. (Saccoccio, Dianalynn)
                          LREF
                          Legal Document 12 Filed: 6/15/2004, Entered: 6/15/2004 Document disclosure
                          Document disclosure by Applica Consumer Products, Inc..(Coan, Geoffrey)
                            LREF
                            Legal Document 11 Filed: 5/27/2004, Entered: 6/1/2004 Certification pursuant to Local Rule 16.1
                            CERTIFICATION pursuant to Local Rule 16.1 by Merrimack Mutual Fire Insurance Company, FILED.(Boyce, Kathy)
                              LREF
                              Blank -- Filed: 5/12/2004, Entered: 5/12/2004 Electronic Endorsement (non-order)
                              Judge Mark L. Wolf : ORDER entered ELECTRONIC ENDORSEMENT Ordering case to be referred to MJ Bowler for all proceedings re [10] Consent to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge filed by Merrimack Mutual Fire Insurance Company, Applica Consumer Products, Inc.(Boyce, Kathy)
                                LREF
                                Legal Document 10 Filed: 5/5/2004, Entered: 5/11/2004 Consent by all parties to Jurisdiction by US MagisCourt Filing
                                CONSENT to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge by Applica Consumer Products, Inc., Merrimack Mutual Fire Insurance Company, FILED. (Boyce, Kathy)
                                  LREF
                                  Legal Document 9 Filed: 5/5/2004, Entered: 5/10/2004 Certification pursuant to Local Rule 16.1
                                  CERTIFICATION pursuant to Local Rule 16.1 by Applica Consumer Products, Inc. (Rynne, Michelle)
                                    LREF
                                    Blank -- Filed: 5/5/2004, Entered: 5/5/2004 Status Conference
                                    Electronic Clerk's Notes for proceedings held before Judge Marianne B. Bowler : Status Conference held on 5/5/2004. Michael Newman for the plaintiff; Jeff Coan for the defendant; Court addresses matter of consent; Parties agree complete consent form and will file it with the clerks office; Status conference set for October 21, 2004 @ 2:30 PM (Tape #Digital.) (Saccoccio, Dianalynn)
                                      LREF
                                      Legal Document 8 Filed: 4/30/2004, Entered: 5/4/2004 Joint statement re scheduling conference
                                      JOINT STATEMENT Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(f) and L.R. 16.1 (b) re scheduling conference, FILED, c/s. (Boyce, Kathy)
                                        LREF
                                        Legal Document 7 Filed: 4/23/2004, Entered: 4/23/2004 Notice of Hearing.Court Filing
                                        NOTICE of Hearing: Status Conference set for 5/5/2004 10:30 AM in Courtroom 25 before Magistrate Judge Marianne B. Bowler. (Saccoccio, Dianalynn)
                                          LREF
                                          Blank -- Filed: 4/12/2004, Entered: 4/12/2004 Order
                                          Judge Marianne B. Bowler : ORDER entered Chief Magistrate Judge Marianne B. Bowler: Electronic ORDER RE: ELECTRONIC FILING entered: It is hereby ORDERED that, from the date of this order, unless leave is granted upon good cause shown to file paper documents in lieu of electronic filing via this Court's CM/ECF system, ALL future submissions in this case must be electronically filed. Such filings shall be made in accordance with, and subject to, the terms and conditions of electronic filing as set forth by this Court. All parties and counsel who choose to appear in this action must make arrangements to register for participation in electronic case filing, if they have not already done so. In addition to electronically filing any pleading, all parties and counsel shall also file all submissions relating to motions and dispositive matters with the Court in hard copy, clearly marked 'Courtesy Copy - Do Not Scan" on the cover page of each pleading/submission (notations in a cover letter is not deemed sufficient). Courtesy copies of Joint Statements and Status Reports shall also be provided. It is FURTHER ORDERED that Notices, Orders and Memoranda of the Court will only be filed and served electronically. Once a party or counsel has registered for electronic filing, it is his/her responsibility to monitor his/her e-mail to ensure receipt of electronic notices. Any changes in e-mail addresses must be reported to the Court immediately. Information and help on how to register for CM/ECF may be found at this Court's website, at www.mad.uscourts.gov (Feeney, Eileen)
                                            LREF
                                            Legal Document 6 Filed: 4/6/2004, Entered: 4/6/2004 Order case reassigned to Magistrate Judge for TriaCourt Filing
                                            Judge Mark L. Wolf : ORDER entered ORDER entered: Case reassigned to Chief Magistrate Judge Bowler for all purposes, including trial and entry of final judgment. Judge Mark L. Wolf no longer assigned to the case. Counsel are directed to the Court's Standing Orders re: Electronic Case Filing.(O'Leary, Dennis) Modified on 4/6/2004 (O'Leary, Dennis).
                                              LREF
                                              Legal Document 5 Filed: 3/3/2004, Entered: 3/3/2004 OrderCourt Filing
                                              Judge Mark L. Wolf : MEMORANDUM and ORDER. The parties are ordered to inform the court by March 26, 2004 whether they consent to a transfer of this case to the Magistrate Judge for all purposes. (Attachments: # (1))(O'Leary, Dennis)
                                              LREF
                                              Legal Document 4 Filed: 1/29/2004, Entered: 2/5/2004 state court record
                                              STATE COURT Record Applica Consumer Products, Inc. served on 12/31/2003, answer due 1/20/2004., FILED. (Boyce, Kathy)
                                                LREF
                                                Legal Document 3 Filed: 1/22/2004, Entered: 1/30/2004 Answer
                                                ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by Applica Consumer Products, Inc, FILED, c/s.(Boyce, Kathy)
                                                  LREF
                                                  Legal Document 2 Filed: 1/14/2004, Entered: 1/30/2004 Document disclosure
                                                  Corporate Document Disclosure Statement by Applica Consumer Products, Inc., FILED, c/s.(Boyce, Kathy)
                                                    LREF
                                                    Legal Document 1 Filed: 1/14/2004, Entered: 1/30/2004 Notice of Removal
                                                    NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Applica Consumer Products, Inc. from Plymouth County Superior Court, case number PLCV2003-01318. $ 150, receipt number 53148, filed by Applica Consumer Products, Inc..(Boyce, Kathy)
                                                      LREF
                                                      Blank -- Filed: 1/14/2004, Entered: 1/30/2004 Magistrate Judge Assignment
                                                      If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge Bowler. (Boyce, Kathy)
                                                        LREF

                                                        Statistics

                                                        This case has been viewed 68 times.

                                                        No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                        Space
                                                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                         
                                                        PlainSite
                                                        Sign Up
                                                        Need Password Help?